101
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
50138 | 17/10/1956 | (New) | 17/10/1956 | ||
50139 | 17/10/1956 | (New) | 17/10/1956 | ||
50140 | 17/10/1956 | (New) | 17/10/1956 | ||
50141 | 17/10/1956 | (New) | 17/10/1956 | ||
50142 | 23/10/1956 | (New) | 23/10/1956 | ||
50143 | 23/10/1956 | (New) | 23/10/1956 | 29/09/1987 | |
50144 | 09/11/1956 | (New) | 09/11/1956 | ||
50145 | 09/11/1956 | (New) | 09/11/1956 | ||
50146 | 09/11/1956 | (New) | 09/11/1956 | ||
50147 | 09/11/1956 | (New) | 09/11/1956 | ||
50148 | 21/11/1956 | (New) | 21/11/1956 | ||
50149 | 21/11/1956 | (New) | 21/11/1956 | ||
50150 | 30/11/1956 | (New) | 30/11/1956 | ||
50151 | 30/11/1956 | (New) | 30/11/1956 | ||
50152 | 10/12/1956 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 10/12/1956 | |
50153 | 10/12/1956 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 10/12/1956 | |
50154 | 17/12/1956 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 17/12/1956 | |
50155 | 17/12/1956 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 17/12/1956 | |
50156 | 01/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 01/01/1957 | |
50157 | 01/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 01/01/1957 | |
50158 | 10/12/1956 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 10/12/1956 | |
50159 | 10/12/1956 | 56G NL |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) Neville Hill |
10/12/1956 27/09/1987 |
|
50160 | 17/12/1956 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 17/12/1956 | |
50161 | 17/12/1956 | 56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) |
17/12/1956 04/10/1987 |
|
50162 | 01/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 01/01/1957 | |
50163 | 01/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 01/01/1957 | |
50164 | 10/01/1957 | 56G HA |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) Haymarket |
10/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50165 | 10/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 10/01/1957 | |
50166 | 23/01/1957 | 56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) |
23/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50167 | 23/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 23/01/1957 | |
50168 | 10/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 10/01/1957 | |
50169 | 10/01/1957 | 56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) |
10/01/1957 23/08/1987 |
|
50170 | 23/01/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 23/01/1957 | |
50171 | 23/01/1957 | 56G DN |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) Darlington |
23/01/1957 27/11/1977 |
|
50172 | 28/01/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 28/01/1957 | 10/09/1987 |
50173 | 28/01/1957 | 51A W |
Darlington (New) Withdrawn |
28/01/1957 07/10/1957 |
07/10/1957 |
50174 | 04/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 04/02/1957 | 10/09/1987 |
50175 | 04/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 04/02/1957 | 29/09/1987 |
50176 | 11/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 11/02/1957 | |
50177 | 11/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 11/02/1957 | |
50178 | 15/02/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
15/02/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50179 | 15/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 15/02/1957 | |
50180 | 28/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 28/02/1957 | |
50181 | 28/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 28/02/1957 | |
50182 | 19/03/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
19/03/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50183 | 19/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 19/03/1957 | |
50184 | 28/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 28/02/1957 | |
50185 | 28/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 28/02/1957 | |
50186 | 06/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 06/03/1957 | |
50187 | 06/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 06/03/1957 | |
50188 | 14/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 14/03/1957 | |
50189 | 14/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 14/03/1957 | |
50190 | 25/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 25/03/1957 | |
50191 | 25/03/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
25/03/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50192 | 29/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 29/03/1957 | |
50193 | 29/03/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 29/03/1957 | |
50194 | 04/04/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 04/04/1957 | |
50195 | 04/04/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
04/04/1957 23/08/1987 |
|
50196 | 12/04/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
12/04/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50197 | 12/04/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 12/04/1957 | |
50198 | 25/04/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 25/04/1957 | |
50199 | 25/04/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 25/04/1957 | |
50200 | 03/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 03/05/1957 | |
50201 | 03/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 03/05/1957 | |
50202 | 15/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 15/05/1957 | |
50203 | 15/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 15/05/1957 | |
50204 | 21/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 21/05/1957 | |
50205 | 29/04/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
29/04/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50206 | 29/04/1957 | 51A BG NL |
Darlington (New) Hull Botanic Gardens Neville Hill |
29/04/1957 16/08/1987 04/10/1987 |
|
50207 | 22/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 22/05/1957 | |
50208 | 22/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 22/05/1957 | |
50209 | 21/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 21/05/1957 | |
50210 | 28/05/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 28/05/1957 | |
50211 | 28/05/1957 | 54A NL |
Sunderland (New) Neville Hill |
28/05/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50212 | 06/06/1957 | 54A LA |
Sunderland (New) Laira |
06/06/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50213 | 06/06/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 06/06/1957 | |
50214 | 26/06/1957 | 54A |
Sunderland (New) |
26/06/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50215 | 02/07/1957 | 54A NL |
Sunderland (New) Neville Hill |
02/07/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50216 | 02/07/1957 | 54A ED |
Sunderland (New) Eastfield |
02/07/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50217 | 09/07/1957 | 54A |
Sunderland (New) |
09/07/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50218 | 23/07/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 23/07/1957 | |
50219 | 31/07/1957 | 54A TS |
Sunderland (New) Tyseley |
31/07/1957 16/03/1988 |
|
50220 | 31/07/1957 | 54A |
Sunderland (New) |
31/07/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50221 | 21/08/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 21/08/1957 | |
50222 | 13/06/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 13/06/1957 | |
50223 | 13/06/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 13/06/1957 | |
50224 | 20/06/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 20/06/1957 | |
50225 | 25/06/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 25/06/1957 | |
50226 | 09/07/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 09/07/1957 | |
50227 | 16/07/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 16/07/1957 | |
50228 | 16/07/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 16/07/1957 | |
50229 | 23/07/1957 | 54A |
Sunderland (New) |
23/07/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50230 | 21/08/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 21/08/1957 | |
50231 | 27/08/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 27/08/1957 | |
50232 | 27/08/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 27/08/1957 | |
50233 | 03/09/1957 | 54A | Sunderland (New) | 03/09/1957 | |
50234 | 17/09/1957 | (New) | 17/09/1957 | ||
50235 | 17/09/1957 | (New) |
17/09/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50236 | 24/09/1957 | (New) | 24/09/1957 | 13/09/1965 | |
50237 | 24/09/1957 | (New) |
24/09/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50238 | 01/10/1957 | (New) | 01/10/1957 | ||
50239 | 01/10/1957 | (New) | 01/10/1957 | ||
50240 | 08/10/1957 | (New) |
08/10/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50241 | 08/10/1957 | (New) | 08/10/1957 | ||
50242 | 15/10/1957 | (New) | 15/10/1957 | ||
50243 | 15/10/1957 | (New) | 15/10/1957 | ||
50244 | 22/10/1957 | (New) | 22/10/1957 | ||
50245 | 22/10/1957 | (New) | 22/10/1957 | ||
50246 | 03/09/1957 | (New) | 03/09/1957 | ||
50247 | 10/09/1957 | LA | (New) Laira |
10/09/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50248 | 10/09/1957 | (New) | 10/09/1957 | ||
50250 | 14/06/1957 | 51A ED |
Darlington (New) Eastfield |
14/06/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50251 | 26/06/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 26/06/1957 | |
50252 | 08/07/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 08/07/1957 | |
50253 | 25/07/1957 | 51A HA |
Darlington (New) Haymarket |
25/07/1957 27/09/1987 |
|
50254 | 26/08/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 26/08/1957 | |
50255 | 06/09/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 06/09/1957 | |
50256 | 14/10/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 14/10/1957 | |
50257 | 04/10/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
04/10/1957 23/08/1987 |
|
50258 | 18/10/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 18/10/1957 | |
50259 | 31/10/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
31/10/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50260 | 14/06/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 14/06/1957 | |
50261 | 26/06/1957 | 51A |
Darlington (New) |
26/06/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50262 | 08/07/1957 | 51A NL |
Darlington (New) Neville Hill |
08/07/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50263 | 25/07/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 25/07/1957 | |
50264 | 26/08/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 26/08/1957 | |
50265 | 06/09/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 06/09/1957 | |
50266 | 14/10/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 14/10/1957 | |
50267 | 04/10/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 04/10/1957 | |
50268 | 18/10/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 18/10/1957 | |
50269 | 31/10/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 31/10/1957 | |
50290 | 13/11/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 13/11/1957 | |
50291 | 21/11/1957 | 51A ED |
Darlington (New) Eastfield |
21/11/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50292 | 26/11/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 26/11/1957 | |
50293 | 05/12/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 05/12/1957 | |
50294 | 05/12/1957 | 51A ED |
Darlington (New) Eastfield |
05/12/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
50295 | 11/12/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 11/12/1957 | |
50296 | 11/12/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 11/12/1957 | |
50303 | |||||
50304 | |||||
50305 | |||||
50306 | |||||
50307 | |||||
50308 | |||||
50309 | CH | Chester West | 23/09/1987 | ||
50310 | |||||
50311 | |||||
50312 | |||||
50313 | |||||
50314 | TS | Tyseley | 04/10/1987 | ||
50315 | LA | Laira | 23/09/1987 | ||
50316 | TS | Tyseley | 01/06/1981 | ||
50317 | |||||
50318 | TS | Tyseley | 22/04/1988 | ||
50319 | |||||
50320 | NL | Neville Hill | 04/10/1987 | ||
50321 | |||||
50322 | |||||
50323 | |||||
50324 | |||||
50325 | |||||
50326 | |||||
50327 | TS | Tyseley | 04/10/1987 | ||
50328 | |||||
50329 | |||||
50330 | LA | Laira | 23/09/1987 | ||
50331 | |||||
50332 | |||||
50333 | |||||
50334 | TS TS |
Tyseley Tyseley |
01/06/1981 22/04/1988 |
||
50335 | |||||
50336 | |||||
50337 | |||||
50338 | CH | Chester West | 23/09/1987 | ||
50745 | 13/11/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 13/11/1957 | |
50746 | 21/11/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 21/11/1957 | |
50747 | 26/11/1957 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 26/11/1957 | |
50748 | 05/11/1957 | (New) | 05/11/1957 | ||
50749 | 05/11/1957 | (New) | 05/11/1957 | ||
50750 | 12/11/1957 | (New) | 12/11/1957 | ||
50751 | 12/11/1957 | (New) | 12/11/1957 | ||
51174 | 31/10/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 31/10/1958 | |
51175 | 08/11/1958 | 3C NL |
Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) Neville Hill |
08/11/1958 04/10/1987 |
|
51176 | 08/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 08/11/1958 | |
51177 | 08/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 08/11/1958 | |
51178 | 08/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 08/11/1958 | |
51179 | 15/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 15/11/1958 | |
51180 | 15/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 15/11/1958 | |
51181 | 15/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 15/11/1958 | |
51182 | 15/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 15/11/1958 | |
51183 | 29/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 29/11/1958 | |
51184 | 22/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 22/11/1958 | |
51185 | 29/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 29/11/1958 | |
51186 | 29/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 29/11/1958 | |
51187 | 06/11/1958 | 3E TS |
Monument Lane (New) Tyseley |
06/11/1958 14/05/1988 |
|
51188 | 06/11/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 06/11/1958 | |
51189 | 13/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 13/11/1958 | |
51190 | 13/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 13/11/1958 | |
51191 | 13/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 13/11/1958 | |
51192 | 13/11/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) | 13/11/1958 | |
51193 | 20/12/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 20/12/1958 | 29/09/1987 |
51194 | 20/12/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 20/12/1958 | |
51195 | 27/12/1958 | 2D | Coventry (New) | 27/12/1958 | |
51196 | 27/12/1958 | 2D | Coventry (New) | 27/12/1958 | |
51197 | 03/01/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 03/01/1959 | |
51198 | 10/01/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 10/01/1959 | |
51199 | 17/01/1959 | 26A W |
Newton Heath (New) Withdrawn |
17/01/1959 28/09/1986 |
28/09/1986 |
51200 | 17/01/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 17/01/1959 | |
51201 | 24/01/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 24/01/1959 | |
51202 | 24/01/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 24/01/1959 | |
51203 | 24/01/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 24/01/1959 | |
51204 | 31/07/1958 | 56G NL |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) Neville Hill |
31/07/1958 04/10/1987 |
|
51205 | 31/07/1958 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 31/07/1958 | |
51206 | 08/08/1958 | 56G TS |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) Tyseley |
08/08/1958 16/03/1988 |
|
51207 | 08/08/1958 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 08/08/1958 | |
51208 | 29/08/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 29/08/1958 | |
51209 | 29/08/1958 | 53C TS |
Hull Springhead (New) Tyseley |
29/08/1958 10/05/1988 |
|
51210 | 11/09/1958 | 56G NL |
Bradford Hammerton Street (New) Neville Hill |
11/09/1958 04/10/1987 |
|
51211 | 11/09/1958 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 11/09/1958 | |
51212 | 11/09/1958 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 11/09/1958 | |
51213 | 18/09/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 18/09/1958 | |
51214 | 18/09/1958 | 53C |
Hull Springhead (New) |
18/09/1958 04/10/1987 |
|
51215 | 25/09/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 25/09/1958 | |
51216 | 25/09/1958 | 53C |
Hull Springhead (New) |
25/09/1958 23/08/1987 |
|
51217 | 02/10/1958 | (New) |
02/10/1958 04/10/1987 |
||
51218 | 02/10/1958 | (New) | 02/10/1958 | ||
51219 | 10/10/1958 | (New) | 10/10/1958 | ||
51220 | 10/10/1958 | (New) | 10/10/1958 | ||
51221 | 16/10/1958 | (New) | 16/10/1958 | ||
51222 | 16/10/1958 | (New) | 16/10/1958 | ||
51223 | 23/10/1958 | 53C LA |
Hull Springhead (New) Laira |
23/10/1958 04/10/1987 |
|
51224 | |||||
51225 | |||||
51226 | |||||
51227 | |||||
51228 | |||||
51229 | |||||
51230 | |||||
51231 | |||||
51232 | |||||
51233 | |||||
51234 | |||||
51235 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
51236 | |||||
51237 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
51238 | |||||
51239 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
51240 | |||||
51241 | |||||
51242 | |||||
51243 | |||||
51244 | |||||
51245 | |||||
51246 | |||||
51247 | |||||
51248 | |||||
51249 | |||||
51250 | NL | Neville Hill | 27/09/1987 | ||
51251 | |||||
51252 | |||||
51253 |