NBL 22 B-B
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 03/09/1960 | D6318 | 83D | Working the overnight Manchester-Penzance service at Stoneycombe, Devon - piloting D807 | Green Diesel Days - Huntriss | ||
Sun 12/11/1961 | D6303, D6320 |
83D, 83D |
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Outside weigh house. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 04/03/1962 | D6315, D6323 |
83D, 83D |
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. |
|||
Sun 29/11/1964 | D6307, D6326, D6330, D6351 |
84A, 81A, 83A, 81A |
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop |
RO 1/1965 | ||
Sun 22/08/1965 | D6355 | 81A | Shunting vans at Paddington - Green with small yellow warning panels | |||
Fri 27/06/1969 | D6357 | Wdn | Passed through Gloucester behind a Hymek in a move from Reading to Cashmore's scrapyard, Newport | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D6326, D6332, D6336, D6340, D6345, D6346 |
81A, 81A, 81A, 81A, Wdn, Wdn |
Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D6348, D6352 |
82A, 82A |
Gloucester depot: On shed Gloucester depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 22/07/1969 | D6315, D6322, D6330, D6349 |
84A, 84A, Wdn, Wdn |
Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Wed 23/07/1969 | D6338 | 83A | Exeter St Davids station and depot: On Exeter St Davids depot. | RO 10/1969 | ||
Wed 13/08/1969 | D6345, D6346, D6353 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Noted at J Cashmore's scrapyard, Newport: For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap Noted at J Cashmore's scrapyard, Newport: For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap Noted at J Cashmore's scrapyard, Newport: For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap |
RO489 11/69 | ||
Sat 01/05/1971 | D6318 | 98S | St Blazey open day exhibit | |||
Sun 02/05/1971 | D6318 | 98S | Stored at Newton Abbot | Harris | ||
Tue 09/1971 | D6318 | Wdn | Stored at St Philips Marsh Junction, Bristol | Harris | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D6315, D6327 |
Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: In scrapyard being stripped for spares Swindon Works visit: In scrapyard being stripped for spares |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D6312, D6356 |
Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: In scrapyard being cut up Swindon Works visit: In scrapyard being cut up |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D6310, D6320, D6326, D6331, D6340, D6354 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D6308, D6318, D6319, D6322, D6323, D6328, D6330, D6333, D6334, D6336, D6337, D6338, D6339, D6348 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol |
RO 517 | ||
Fri 21/01/1972 | D6310, D6315, D6320, D6326, D6327, D6331, D6340, D6354 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works - Being cut up. Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Mon 02/1972 | D6318 | Wdn | Moved to Swindon | Harris | ||
Thu 10/02/1972 | D6318, D6322, D6333, D6336, D6338, D6339 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: New arrivals Swindon Works visit: New arrivals Swindon Works visit: New arrivals Swindon Works visit: New arrivals Swindon Works visit: New arrivals Swindon Works visit: New arrivals |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sat 26/02/1972 | D6308, D6319, D6328, D6330, D6334, D6337, D6348 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump | RO 4/1972 |