119
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
51080 | 30/09/1958 | 65.54 | ||||||||
51081 | 30/09/1958 | 14/12/1968 | 10.25 | 65.54 | ||||||
51082 | 31/10/1958 | To Western Region / GWR | 65.45 | |||||||
51083 | 31/10/1958 | To Western Region / GWR | 29/03/1988 | Reading (W.R.) | 29.42 | 65.45 | ||||
51084 | 30/11/1958 | 65.37 | ||||||||
51085 | 30/11/1958 | 65.37 | ||||||||
51086 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
51087 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
51088 | 31/01/1959 | 65.20 | ||||||||
51089 | 31/01/1959 | 14/12/1968 | 9.92 | 65.20 | ||||||
51090 | 28/02/1959 | 65.12 | ||||||||
51091 | 28/02/1959 | 65.12 | ||||||||
51092 | 31/03/1959 | 65.04 | ||||||||
51093 | 31/03/1959 | 65.04 | ||||||||
51094 | 30/04/1959 | 64.96 | ||||||||
51095 | ||||||||||
51096 | 16/12/1986 | Reading (W.R.) | ||||||||
51097 | ||||||||||
51098 | ||||||||||
51099 | ||||||||||
51100 | 29/03/1988 | Reading (W.R.) | ||||||||
51101 | ||||||||||
51102 | ||||||||||
51103 | 31/10/1959 | 64.45 | ||||||||
51104 | 31/10/1959 | 64.45 | ||||||||
51105 | 30/11/1959 | 16/12/1986 | Cardiff Canton | 27.08 | 64.37 | |||||
51106 | 31/12/1959 | 64.28 | ||||||||
51107 | 30/01/1960 | 64.20 |