120
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
50647 | |||||
50648 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
50649 | |||||
50650 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
50651 | |||||
50652 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
50653 | |||||
50654 | |||||
50655 | |||||
50656 | |||||
50657 | |||||
50658 | |||||
50659 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
50660 | |||||
50661 | |||||
50662 | |||||
50663 | |||||
50664 | |||||
50665 | |||||
50666 | |||||
50667 | |||||
50668 | |||||
50669 | |||||
50670 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
50671 | |||||
50672 | |||||
50673 | |||||
50674 | |||||
50675 | |||||
50676 | |||||
50677 | 30/09/1958 | (New) | 30/09/1958 | ||
50678 | 30/09/1958 | (New) | 30/09/1958 | ||
50679 | 30/09/1958 | (New) | 30/09/1958 | ||
50680 | 30/09/1958 | (New) | 30/09/1958 | ||
50681 | 30/09/1958 | (New) | 30/09/1958 | ||
50682 | 30/09/1958 | (New) | 30/09/1958 | ||
50683 | 31/10/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/10/1958 | |
50684 | 31/10/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/10/1958 | |
50685 | 31/10/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/10/1958 | |
50686 | 31/10/1958 | 91W W |
To Western Region / GWR (New) Withdrawn |
31/10/1958 05/05/1969 |
05/05/1969 |
50687 | 31/10/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/10/1958 | |
50688 | 31/10/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/10/1958 | |
50689 | 31/01/1959 | (New) | 31/01/1959 | ||
50690 | 31/01/1959 | (New) | 31/01/1959 | ||
50691 | 31/01/1959 | (New) | 31/01/1959 | ||
50692 | 28/02/1959 | (New) | 28/02/1959 | ||
50693 | 28/02/1959 | (New) | 28/02/1959 | ||
50694 | 31/03/1959 | (New) | 31/03/1959 | ||
50695 | 31/03/1959 | (New) | 31/03/1959 | ||
50696 | |||||
50697 | |||||
50698 | 10/09/1987 | ||||
50699 | |||||
50700 | |||||
50701 | |||||
50702 | |||||
50703 | |||||
50704 | |||||
50705 | |||||
50706 | |||||
50707 | |||||
50708 | |||||
50709 | 29/09/1987 | ||||
50710 | |||||
50711 | |||||
50712 | |||||
50713 | |||||
50714 | |||||
50715 | |||||
50716 | |||||
50717 | |||||
50718 | |||||
50719 | |||||
50720 | |||||
50721 | |||||
50722 | 31/07/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/07/1958 | 15/07/1987 |
50723 | 31/07/1958 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/07/1958 | |
50724 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50725 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50726 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50727 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50728 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50729 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50730 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50731 | 31/08/1958 | (New) | 31/08/1958 | ||
50732 | 30/11/1958 | (New) | 30/11/1958 | ||
50733 | 30/11/1958 | W | (New) Withdrawn |
30/11/1958 05/05/1969 |
05/05/1969 |
50734 | 30/11/1958 | (New) | 30/11/1958 | ||
50735 | 30/11/1958 | (New) | 30/11/1958 | ||
50736 | 30/11/1958 | (New) | 30/11/1958 | ||
50737 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | ||
50738 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | 29/09/1987 | |
50739 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | 16/08/1987 | |
50740 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | ||
50741 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | ||
50742 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | ||
50743 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | ||
50744 | 31/12/1958 | (New) | 31/12/1958 | ||
51573 | 31/01/1961 | (New) | 31/01/1961 | ||
51574 | 31/01/1961 | (New) | 31/01/1961 | ||
51575 | 31/01/1961 | (New) | 31/01/1961 | 16/08/1987 | |
51576 | |||||
51577 | |||||
51578 | |||||
51579 | W | Withdrawn | 16/11/1987 | 16/11/1987 | |
51580 | |||||
51581 | |||||
51582 | |||||
51583 | |||||
51584 | |||||
51585 | |||||
51586 | |||||
51587 | 24/05/1988 | ||||
51588 | |||||
51589 | |||||
51590 | W | Withdrawn | 24/02/1987 | 24/02/1987 | |
51781 | 28/11/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 28/11/1959 | |
51782 | 28/11/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 28/11/1959 | 10/09/1987 |
51783 | 28/11/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 28/11/1959 | |
51784 | 05/12/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 05/12/1959 | 18/12/1980 |
51785 | 05/12/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 05/12/1959 | |
51786 | 12/12/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 12/12/1959 | |
51787 | 12/12/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 12/12/1959 | |
51788 | 09/01/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 09/01/1960 | 10/09/1987 |
51789 | 16/01/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 16/01/1960 | |
51790 | 23/01/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 23/01/1960 | |
51791 | 23/01/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 23/01/1960 | |
51792 | 13/02/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 13/02/1960 | |
51793 | 20/02/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 20/02/1960 | |
51794 | 20/02/1960 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
20/02/1960 08/06/1986 |
08/06/1986 |