120
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
31/07/1958 | To Service | 50722 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/07/1958 | To Service | 50723 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 50683 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 50684 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 50685 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 50686 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 50687 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 50688 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
28/11/1959 | To Service | 51781 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
28/11/1959 | To Service | 51782 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
28/11/1959 | To Service | 51783 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
05/12/1959 | To Service | 51784 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
05/12/1959 | To Service | 51785 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
12/12/1959 | To Service | 51786 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
12/12/1959 | To Service | 51787 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
09/01/1960 | To Service | 51788 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/01/1960 | To Service | 51789 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
23/01/1960 | To Service | 51790 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
23/01/1960 | To Service | 51791 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
13/02/1960 | To Service | 51792 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/02/1960 | To Service | 51793 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/02/1960 | To Service | 51794 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
05/05/1969 | Condemned | 50686 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | COND | |
05/05/1969 | Condemned | 50733 | NYA | COND | ||
18/12/1980 | Condemned | 51784 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
08/06/1986 | Condemned | 51794 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
24/02/1987 | Condemned | 51590 | COND | |||
15/07/1987 | Condemned | 50722 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | COND | |
16/08/1987 | Condemned | 50739 | NYA | COND | ||
16/08/1987 | Condemned | 51575 | NYA | COND | ||
10/09/1987 | Condemned | 50698 | COND | |||
10/09/1987 | Condemned | 51782 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
10/09/1987 | Condemned | 51788 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50648 | COND | |||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50650 | COND | |||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50652 | COND | |||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50659 | COND | |||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50670 | COND | |||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50709 | COND | |||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 50738 | NYA | COND | ||
16/11/1987 | Condemned | 51579 | COND | |||
24/05/1988 | Condemned | 51587 | COND |