120/2 |
50648
|
|
29/09/1987 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
30/06/1973 |
120/2 |
50658
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/11/1972 |
120/2 |
50659
|
|
29/09/1987 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/07/1973 |
120/2 |
50661
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
29/05/1971 |
120/2 |
50662
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
19/03/1973 |
120/2 |
50664
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/03/1972 |
120/2 |
50666
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
06/11/1971 |
120/2 |
50668
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/07/1971 |
120/2 |
50673
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
19/04/1973 |
120/2 |
50675
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
12/04/1973 |
120/2 |
50679
|
30/09/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/10/1972 |
120/2 |
50681
|
30/09/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/08/1971 |
120/2 |
50683
|
31/10/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/11/1972 |
120/2 |
50691
|
31/01/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
15/09/1973 |
120/2 |
50693
|
28/02/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
31/12/1971 |
120/2 |
50694
|
31/03/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/06/1972 |
120/2 |
50695
|
31/03/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/10/1972 |
120/1 |
50698
|
|
10/09/1987 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/10/1972 |
120/1 |
50699
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
19/03/1973 |
120/1 |
50700
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/07/1973 |
120/1 |
50701
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/08/1971 |
120/1 |
50702
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/03/1972 |
120/1 |
50706
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
30/06/1973 |
120/1 |
50710
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
29/05/1971 |
120/1 |
50711
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/11/1972 |
120/1 |
50712
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
31/12/1971 |
120/1 |
50716
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
12/04/1973 |
120/1 |
50721
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/07/1971 |
120/1 |
50724
|
31/08/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
19/04/1973 |
120/1 |
50727
|
31/08/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/10/1972 |
120/1 |
50728
|
31/08/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
15/09/1973 |
120/1 |
50732
|
30/11/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/06/1972 |
120/1 |
50735
|
30/11/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/11/1972 |
120/1 |
50738
|
31/12/1958 |
29/09/1987 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
31/12/1971 |
120/1 |
50739
|
31/12/1958 |
16/08/1987 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/10/1972 |
120/1 |
51574
|
31/01/1961 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
15/11/1972 |
120/1 |
51577
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/11/1973 |
120/1 |
51578
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/03/1973 |
120/1 |
51581
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
29/05/1971 |
120/2 |
51585
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
29/05/1971 |
120/2 |
51586
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/11/1973 |
120/2 |
51587
|
|
24/05/1988 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/03/1973 |