Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1184 Today
» 1219 Yesterday
» 3694 Week
» 35483 Month
» 184248 Year
» 1405813 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

24 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) BR (Dept) BR (Dept 97) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D5000 24005     05/09/1958 5B
17A
73C
73C
5A
1A
1B
1A
1E
D01
D05
W
R
66A
65A
LO

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby (on loan)
Hither Green (on loan)
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe North
Willesden
Camden
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
Reinstated
Polmadie
Eastfield
Longsight

Withdrawn
05/09/1958
05/09/1958
27/01/1959
16/06/1962
17/08/1963
14/09/1963
09/01/1965
27/02/1965
02/10/1965
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
04/01/1969
05/10/1969
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
11/01/1975
12/07/1975
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5001 24001     29/10/1958 5B
17A
73C
1A
73C
1A
1C
1A
5A
1A
1B
1A
1F
2F
D02
D01
D05
W
R
66A
65A
LO
ED
KD

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby (on loan)
Hither Green (on loan)
Willesden
Hither Green (on loan)
Willesden (returned from loan)
Watford
Willesden
Crewe North
Willesden
Camden
Willesden
Rugby
Bescot
Birmingham Division
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
Reinstated
Polmadie
Eastfield
Longsight
Eastfield
Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan)

Withdrawn
29/10/1958
01/11/1958
04/02/1959
01/06/1962
16/06/1962
28/07/1962
06/10/1962
16/02/1963
17/08/1963
14/09/1963
09/01/1965
27/02/1965
02/10/1965
12/03/1966
18/04/1966
01/10/1966
08/04/1967
25/01/1969
05/10/1969
16/10/1971
03/1972
11/01/1975
08/02/1975
07/1975
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5002 24002     03/12/1958 17A
73C
5B
1A
2A
1E
1F
D01
D05
D05
65A

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe South
Willesden
Rugby
Bletchley
Rugby
London Division
Stoke Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield

Withdrawn
03/12/1958
11/03/1959
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
16/06/1962
03/07/1965
26/03/1966
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
29/03/1969
06/03/1971
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5003 24003     12/12/1958 17A
73C
5B
1A
2A
1E
D01
D05
65A

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe South
Willesden
Rugby
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield

Withdrawn
12/12/1958
11/03/1959
30/04/1960
17/03/1962
16/06/1962
03/07/1965
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
06/03/1971
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5004 24004     22/12/1958 17A
73C
5B
73C
1A
1B
1A
1F
D01
D05
65A
LO
ED

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe South
Hither Green (on loan)
Willesden
Camden
Willesden
Rugby
London Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield
Longsight
Eastfield

Withdrawn
22/12/1958
11/03/1959
16/01/1960
16/06/1962
29/09/1962
09/01/1965
27/02/1965
02/10/1965
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
06/03/1971
11/01/1975
08/02/1975
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5005       03/01/1959 17A
73C
5B
73C
5A
2A
1E
D01
D05
W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe South
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe North
Rugby
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
03/01/1959
11/03/1959
04/06/1960
20/08/1960
02/06/1962
16/06/1962
03/07/1965
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
25/01/1969
25/01/1969
D5006 24006     03/01/1959 17A
73C
5B
5B
5A
1F
5A
1F
D01
D05
65A

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
Crewe South
Crewe South
Crewe North
Rugby
Crewe Diesel
Rugby
London Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield

Withdrawn
03/01/1959
11/03/1959
05/03/1960
17/03/1962
12/05/1962
14/09/1963
17/07/1965
02/10/1965
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
06/03/1971
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5007 24007     07/02/1959 17A
73C
91S
1A
1B
1E
D01
D05
65A

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
To Southern Region
Willesden
Camden
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield

Withdrawn
07/02/1959
21/03/1959
16/06/1962
24/11/1962
09/01/1965
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
08/04/1967
06/03/1971
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5008 24008     28/02/1959 17A
73C
73C
18A
17A
1B
73C
1B
12B
1B
5A
1A
1F
D01
D05
65A

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green (on loan)
Hither Green (on loan)
Toton
Derby
Camden
Hither Green (on loan)
Camden
Carlisle Upperby
Camden
Crewe North
Willesden
Rugby
London Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield

Withdrawn
28/02/1959
21/03/1959
25/04/1959
09/05/1959
26/09/1959
24/10/1959
09/01/1960
21/07/1962
13/10/1962
22/12/1962
05/01/1963
11/09/1965
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
22/04/1967
06/03/1971
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5009 24009     14/03/1959 17A
73C
5B
5A
1A
5A
1B
1E
D01
D05
65A

HA

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green
Crewe South
Crewe North
Willesden
Crewe North
Camden
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division
Eastfield

Haymarket

Withdrawn
14/03/1959
28/03/1959
12/05/1962
12/05/1962
23/11/1963
05/12/1964
09/01/1965
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
22/04/1967
06/03/1971
23/08/1975
27/09/1975
29/05/1976
18/07/1976
18/07/1976
D5010 24010     21/03/1959 17A
73C
21D
2A
1E
D01
D02
D05
W
R
66A
65A

W
Derby (New)
Hither Green
Aston
Rugby
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
Reinstated
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
21/03/1959
11/04/1959
02/06/1962
16/06/1962
03/07/1965
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
03/06/1967
01/1969
02/08/1969
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5011 24011     28/03/1959 5B
17A
73C
5B
1A
2A
1E

D02
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Hither Green
Crewe South
Willesden
Rugby
Bletchley

Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
28/03/1959
28/03/1959
11/04/1959
05/05/1962
05/05/1962
16/06/1962
03/07/1965
16/04/1966
09/07/1966
03/06/1967
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5012 24012     11/04/1959 5B
17A
73C
5B
5A
1A
5A
1F
2F
D02
D05
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Hither Green
Crewe South
Crewe North
Willesden
Crewe North
Rugby
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
11/04/1959
11/04/1959
18/04/1959
12/05/1962
12/05/1962
23/11/1963
05/12/1964
09/01/1965
26/03/1966
18/04/1966
03/06/1967
01/11/1969
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5013 24013     18/04/1959 5B
17A
73C
91S
2A
D01
D05
D02
D05

55A
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Hither Green
To Southern Region
Rugby
London Division
Stoke Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
18/04/1959
18/04/1959
25/04/1959
16/06/1962
28/07/1962
18/04/1966
30/04/1966
01/10/1966
03/06/1967
26/04/1969
11/10/1969
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5014 24014     09/05/1959 5B
17A
73C
91S
2A
9A
1F
9A
D01
D01
D02
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Hither Green
To Southern Region
Rugby
Longsight
Rugby
Longsight
London Division
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
09/05/1959
09/05/1959
16/05/1959
16/06/1962
30/06/1962
26/12/1964
01/05/1965
20/11/1965
18/04/1966
23/04/1966
09/07/1966
03/06/1967
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5015 24015     30/05/1959 5B
17A
5B
1B
1A
1B
2F
D02
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby (on loan)
Crewe South
Camden
Willesden
Camden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
30/05/1959
30/05/1959
13/06/1959
29/08/1959
19/09/1959
17/10/1959
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
03/06/1967
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5016 24016     30/05/1959 5B
17A
5B
1A
1B
1E
D01
D02
D05
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Crewe South
Willesden
Camden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
30/05/1959
30/05/1959
13/06/1959
26/09/1959
17/10/1959
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
03/06/1967
29/03/1969
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5017 24017     06/06/1959 5B
17A
73C
5B
1A
2A
5A
1A
1F
D01
D02
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Hither Green
Crewe South
Willesden
Rugby
Crewe North
Willesden
Rugby
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
06/06/1959
06/06/1959
04/07/1959
05/05/1962
05/05/1962
16/06/1962
19/01/1963
11/09/1965
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
03/06/1967
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5018 24018     27/06/1959 5B
17A
5B
1B
1E
5A
D02
D05
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Crewe South
Camden
Bletchley
Crewe Diesel
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
27/06/1959
27/06/1959
26/09/1959
17/10/1959
03/01/1966
26/03/1966
01/10/1966
10/06/1967
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5019 24019     11/07/1959 5B
17A
5B
1B
1E
D01
D02
D05
W
R
52A
66A
65A

W
Crewe South (New)
Derby
Crewe South
Camden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
Reinstated
Gateshead
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
11/07/1959
11/07/1959
26/09/1959
17/10/1959
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
10/06/1967
01/1969
11/10/1969
08/05/1971
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
26/07/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5020 24020     20/08/1959 32B
30A
1A
1B
2F
D02
D05
D09

W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Camden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Manchester Division

Withdrawn
20/08/1959
18/03/1961
29/04/1961
09/01/1965
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
10/06/1967
08/04/1972
12/07/1975
10/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5021 24021     20/08/1959 32B
30A
1A
1B
2F
D02
D05
D09

W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Camden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Manchester Division

Withdrawn
20/08/1959
01/04/1961
29/04/1961
09/01/1965
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
10/06/1967
08/04/1972
12/07/1975
10/08/1975
23/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5022 24022     07/09/1959 32B
32A
32B
1B
2F
D02
D05
D09

W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Camden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Manchester Division

Withdrawn
07/09/1959
26/09/1959
07/11/1959
18/03/1961
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
10/06/1967
08/04/1972
12/07/1975
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5023 24023     25/09/1959 32B
1C
1A
1B
2F
D02
D05
D09
CD
W
Ipswich (New)
Watford
Willesden
Camden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Manchester Division
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
25/09/1959
18/03/1961
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
10/06/1967
08/04/1972
09/08/1975
03/09/1978
03/09/1978
D5024 24024     02/10/1959 32B
30A
1A
2F
D02
D05
D09
D05
D09

W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Manchester Division

Withdrawn
02/10/1959
18/03/1961
18/03/1961
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
12/08/1967
08/04/1972
01/07/1972
07/10/1972
12/07/1975
10/08/1975
23/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5025 24025     16/10/1959 32B
1A
1E
D01
D02
D05
LO
CD

W
Ipswich (New)
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Longsight
Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
16/10/1959
15/07/1961
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
12/08/1967
12/05/1973
10/05/1975
12/07/1975
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5026 24026     22/10/1959 32B
30A
1B
2F
D02
D05
LO
CD
LO
CD

W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Camden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Longsight
Crewe Diesel
Longsight
Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
22/10/1959
17/09/1960
19/11/1960
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
12/08/1967
12/05/1973
09/03/1974
11/01/1975
10/05/1975
12/07/1975
10/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5027 24027     31/10/1959 32B
30A
1A
1F
D01
D02
D05
LO

CD

W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Rugby
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Longsight

Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
31/10/1959
17/09/1960
17/12/1960
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
12/08/1967
06/10/1973
12/07/1975
20/12/1975
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5028       13/11/1959 32B
30A
1A
1E
D01
D02
D05
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
13/11/1959
17/09/1960
11/04/1961
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
12/08/1967
04/06/1972
04/06/1972
D5029 24029     28/11/1959 32B
30A
1A
2F
D02
D05
LO
CE
LO
CD

W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Longsight
Crewe Diesel
Longsight
Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
28/11/1959
17/09/1960
11/04/1961
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
12/08/1967
12/05/1973
06/10/1973
11/01/1975
08/03/1975
12/07/1975
10/08/1975
23/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5030 24030     06/06/1959 31B
30A
1A
1E
D01
D02
D05

W
March (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
06/06/1959
09/01/1960
14/01/1961
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
09/07/1966
12/08/1967
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5031 24031     25/06/1959 31B
30A
1A
1C
1A
D01
D02
D05

W
March (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Watford
Willesden
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
25/06/1959
08/08/1959
28/01/1961
09/09/1961
16/02/1963
18/04/1966
05/11/1966
12/08/1967
12/07/1975
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5032 24032     29/07/1959 31B
30A
1A
1E
D01
D02
D05

W
March (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
29/07/1959
09/01/1960
10/12/1960
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
05/11/1966
12/08/1967
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5033 24033     05/08/1959 31B
31B
30A
1A
1E
D01
D02
D05

W
March (New)
March
Stratford
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
05/08/1959
08/08/1959
24/10/1959
11/04/1961
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
05/11/1966
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5034 24034     03/09/1959 31B
30A
30A
1A
1A
1E
D01
D02
D05

W
March (New)
Stratford
Stratford
Willesden
Willesden
Bletchley
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
03/09/1959
20/02/1960
18/03/1961
01/04/1961
11/04/1961
08/01/1966
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5035 24035     31/08/1959 31B
30A
1A
1A
1C
1A
D01
D02
D05
W
March (New)
Stratford
Willesden
Willesden
Watford
Willesden
London Division
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
31/08/1959
20/02/1960
25/03/1961
08/04/1961
09/09/1961
09/01/1965
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
12/08/1967
15/10/1978
15/10/1978
D5036 24036     03/09/1959 31B
32B
32B
D05
W
March (New)
Ipswich
Ipswich
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
03/09/1959
07/05/1960
23/02/1963
12/08/1967
20/11/1977
20/11/1977
D5037 24037     07/09/1959 31B
32B
D05

CD

W
March (New)
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
07/09/1959
07/05/1960
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
23/08/1975
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5038 24038     15/09/1959 32B
31B
32B
D05

CD

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
15/09/1959
09/01/1960
11/06/1960
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
20/12/1975
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5039 24039     24/10/1959 32B
31B
32B
D05

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
24/10/1959
05/12/1959
11/06/1960
12/08/1967
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5040 24040     12/10/1959 32B
31B
32B
41A
32B
1E
D05

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Tinsley
Ipswich
Bletchley
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
12/10/1959
28/11/1959
11/06/1960
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
03/01/1966
12/08/1967
20/12/1975
04/01/1976
04/01/1976
D5041 24041     28/09/1959 32B
31B
32B
D05

CD

CD

CD

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel

Crewe Diesel

Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
28/09/1959
28/11/1959
11/06/1960
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
23/08/1975
11/10/1975
20/12/1975
27/12/1975
24/01/1976
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5042 24042     12/10/1959 32B
31B
32B
D05

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
12/10/1959
31/10/1959
11/06/1960
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
10/08/1975
23/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5043       16/10/1959 32B
31B
32B
31B
32B
D05

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
March
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
16/10/1959
31/10/1959
23/07/1960
26/11/1960
08/07/1961
19/08/1967
19/07/1969
10/08/1969
10/08/1969
D5044 24044     23/10/1959 32B
31B
32B
32B
D05

W
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
23/10/1959
31/10/1959
23/07/1960
07/01/1961
12/08/1967
24/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5045 24045     12/11/1959 31B
30A
32B
D05
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
12/11/1959
17/09/1960
18/03/1961
12/08/1967
10/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5046 24046     29/10/1959 31B
30A
32B
41A
32B
D05

CD

CD

W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Tinsley
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel

Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
29/10/1959
17/09/1960
18/03/1961
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
23/08/1975
11/10/1975
20/12/1975
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5047 24047     21/11/1959 31B
30A
32B
41A
32B
D05
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Tinsley
Ipswich
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
21/11/1959
17/09/1960
01/04/1961
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
12/08/1967
16/11/1978
16/11/1978
D5048 24048     05/11/1959 31B
30A
32B
41A
32B
D05
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Tinsley
Ipswich
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
05/11/1959
17/09/1960
18/03/1961
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
12/08/1967
10/08/1975
10/08/1975
D5049 24049     04/04/1960 31B
30A
32B
41A
32B
D05

CD

W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Tinsley
Ipswich
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel

Withdrawn
04/04/1960
17/09/1960
18/03/1961
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
12/08/1967
09/08/1975
23/08/1975
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5050 24050     27/11/1959 31B
30A
34G
65A
64B
9A
D09
D05

W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Haymarket
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
27/11/1959
17/09/1960
18/03/1961
08/10/1966
31/12/1966
13/01/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
23/08/1975
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5051       05/12/1959 31B
34G
65A
W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Withdrawn
05/12/1959
14/01/1961
08/10/1966
02/12/1967
02/12/1967
D5052 24052     04/12/1959 31B
34G
65A
9A
D09
D05

W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
04/12/1959
14/01/1961
08/10/1966
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
24/07/1976
04/12/1976
04/12/1976
D5053 24053     03/12/1959 31B
34G
65A
9A
D09
D05

W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
03/12/1959
25/03/1961
08/10/1966
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5054 24054 TDB968008   18/12/1959 31B
34G
65A
9A
D09
D05

W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
18/12/1959
28/01/1961
08/10/1966
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
08/05/1976
01/07/1976
01/07/1976
D5055 24055     18/12/1959 31B
34G
65A
9A
D09
D05
W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
18/12/1959
21/01/1961
08/10/1966
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5056 24056     11/12/1959 31B
34G
65A
9A
D09
D05
W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
11/12/1959
18/02/1961
08/10/1966
04/05/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5057 24057     22/12/1959 31B
34G
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
22/12/1959
11/02/1961
06/08/1966
15/04/1967
15/01/1978
15/01/1978
D5058 24058     01/01/1960 31B
34G
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
01/01/1960
04/03/1961
06/08/1966
15/04/1967
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5059 24059     29/12/1959 31B
1A
1B
34G
34G
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
Camden
Finsbury Park
Finsbury Park
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
29/12/1959
22/10/1960
11/02/1961
18/03/1961
01/04/1961
06/08/1966
15/04/1967
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5060 24060     02/01/1960 31B
9A
1A
1A
9A
5A
1A
34G
34G
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Longsight
Willesden
Willesden
Longsight
Crewe North
Willesden
Finsbury Park
Finsbury Park
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
29/10/1960
05/11/1960
12/11/1960
19/11/1960
14/01/1961
11/02/1961
18/03/1961
01/04/1961
06/08/1966
15/04/1967
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5061 24061 TDB968007 97201 15/01/1960 31B
1A
2A
1A
34G
64B
9A
D09
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Willesden
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
15/01/1960
22/10/1960
12/11/1960
18/03/1961
15/07/1961
13/08/1966
03/02/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
01/08/1975
01/08/1975
D5062 24062     18/01/1960 31B
30F
34G
64B
9A
D09
D05
W
March (New)
Parkeston Quay
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
18/01/1960
10/12/1960
25/03/1961
13/08/1966
13/01/1968
17/06/1968
14/09/1968
04/10/1974
04/10/1974
D5063 24063     26/01/1960 31B
1A
1C
34G
34G
64B
9A
D09
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
Watford
Finsbury Park (on loan)
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
26/01/1960
05/11/1960
11/02/1961
11/03/1961
01/04/1961
05/11/1966
13/01/1968
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
09/04/1979
09/04/1979
D5064 24064     27/01/1960 31B
1A
34G
64B
9A
D09
D05

W
March (New)
Willesden
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
27/01/1960
05/11/1960
11/03/1961
13/08/1966
27/01/1968
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5065 24065     02/02/1960 31B
1A
34G
34G
64B
65A
9A
D09
D05
64B
ED

HA
W
March (New)
Willesden
Finsbury Park (on loan)
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Haymarket
Eastfield

Haymarket
Withdrawn
02/02/1960
05/11/1960
15/04/1961
29/04/1961
13/08/1966
30/03/1968
11/05/1968
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
05/12/1970
24/05/1975
26/07/1975
03/01/1976
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5066 24066     19/12/1959 31B
34G
34G
64B
65A
9A
D09
D05
64B
65A
64B

W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Eastfield
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Haymarket
Eastfield
Haymarket

Withdrawn
19/12/1959
18/03/1961
01/04/1961
20/08/1966
30/03/1968
11/05/1968
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
02/08/1969
27/03/1971
01/05/1971
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5067       24/12/1959 31B
30A
34G
64B
64B
W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Haymarket (on loan)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
24/12/1959
28/01/1961
18/03/1961
09/1966
10/1966
09/10/1972
09/10/1972
D5068       31/12/1959 31B
34G
34G
64B
W
March (New)
Finsbury Park (on loan)
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Withdrawn
31/12/1959
15/04/1961
29/04/1961
13/08/1966
09/10/1972
09/10/1972
D5069 24069     01/01/1960 31B
30A
34G
64B

HA

W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Haymarket

Haymarket

Withdrawn
01/01/1960
17/12/1960
07/01/1961
13/08/1966
23/08/1975
03/01/1976
02/10/1976
01/12/1976
01/12/1976
D5070 24070     23/01/1960 31B
30A
30A
34G
64B
64B

W
March (New)
Stratford
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Haymarket

Withdrawn
23/01/1960
19/11/1960
07/01/1961
07/01/1961
24/09/1966
26/11/1966
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5071 24071     06/02/1960 31B
30A
34G
64B

W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Haymarket

Withdrawn
06/02/1960
19/11/1960
18/03/1961
13/08/1966
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5072 24072     17/02/1960 31B
1A
34G
64B

W
March (New)
Willesden
Finsbury Park
Haymarket

Withdrawn
17/02/1960
02/04/1960
06/05/1961
13/08/1966
23/08/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5073 24073     04/03/1960 31B
1A
D01
D05
66A
65A

W
March (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
04/03/1960
02/04/1960
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
09/10/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5074 24074     14/03/1960 31B
1A
1C
1A
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
Watford
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
14/03/1960
02/04/1960
19/11/1960
09/01/1965
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5075 24075     26/03/1960 31B
1A
D01
D05

W
March (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
26/03/1960
09/04/1960
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5076 24076     10/02/1960 31B
1A
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
10/02/1960
30/07/1960
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5077 24077     17/02/1960 31B
1A
D01
D05

W
March (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
17/02/1960
30/07/1960
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5078 24078     18/02/1960 31B
1A
D01
D05

W
March (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
18/02/1960
02/04/1960
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
20/03/1976
24/04/1976
24/04/1976
D5079 24079     25/02/1960 31B
1A
2A
1A
9A
12B
1A
D01
D05

W
March (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Willesden
Longsight
Carlisle Upperby
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
25/02/1960
02/04/1960
20/08/1960
24/09/1960
08/10/1960
15/10/1960
03/06/1961
18/04/1966
10/12/1966
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5080 24080     01/03/1960 31B
1A
2A
1A
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
01/03/1960
02/04/1960
09/04/1960
10/09/1960
18/04/1966
17/12/1966
22/09/1976
22/09/1976
D5081 24081     19/03/1960 31B
1A
2A
1A
1C
1A
D01
D05
W
March (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Willesden
Watford
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
19/03/1960
02/04/1960
21/05/1960
20/08/1960
19/11/1960
09/01/1965
18/04/1966
17/12/1966
05/10/1980
05/10/1980
D5082 24082     29/03/1960 31B
1A
2A
1A
1C
5A
D01
D05

CD
W
March (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Willesden
Watford
Crewe North
London Division
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
29/03/1960
02/04/1960
21/05/1960
09/07/1960
12/05/1962
05/01/1963
06/08/1966
07/01/1967
10/07/1976
02/10/1976
01/03/1979
01/03/1979
D5083 24083     08/04/1960 31B
1A
9A
1A
9A
1A
5A
1A
5A
D01
D05

W
March (New)
Willesden
Longsight
Willesden
Longsight
Willesden
Crewe North
Willesden
Crewe Diesel
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
08/04/1960
09/04/1960
21/05/1960
05/11/1960
19/11/1960
18/03/1961
05/01/1963
16/10/1965
03/01/1966
01/10/1966
07/01/1967
21/02/1976
27/03/1976
27/03/1976
D5084 24084     25/04/1960 31B
2A
14A
D14
1A
D01
D05

W
March (New)
Rugby
Cricklewood East
London (Midland)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
25/04/1960
30/04/1960
17/12/1960
16/01/1965
13/03/1965
18/04/1966
22/04/1967
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5085 24085     20/08/1960 1A
14A
D14
1A
D01
D05

W
Willesden (New)
Cricklewood East
London (Midland)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
20/08/1960
28/01/1961
16/01/1965
03/04/1965
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5086 24086     21/05/1960 1A
14A
D14
1A
D01
D05

W
Willesden (New)
Cricklewood East
London (Midland)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
21/05/1960
21/01/1961
16/01/1965
10/04/1965
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
29/11/1975
04/01/1976
04/01/1976
D5087 24087     09/06/1960 1A
1A
14A
1A
D01
D05

CD
W
Willesden (New)
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
09/06/1960
11/06/1960
17/12/1960
12/12/1964
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
10/07/1976
24/07/1976
01/02/1978
01/02/1978
D5088       13/06/1960 14A
D14
1A
D01
D05
W
Cricklewood East (New)
London (Midland)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
13/06/1960
16/01/1965
06/02/1965
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
27/06/1970
27/06/1970
D5089 24089     20/06/1960 14A
14A
1A
14B
1A
D05

W
Cricklewood East (New)
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Cricklewood West
Willesden
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
20/06/1960
25/06/1960
29/08/1964
05/09/1964
12/12/1964
11/03/1967
20/12/1975
04/01/1976
04/01/1976
D5090 24090     18/06/1960 14A
1A
D01
D05

55A
52A
66A
65A

W
Cricklewood East (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Holbeck (MR)
Gateshead
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
18/06/1960
12/12/1964
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
16/08/1969
06/12/1969
08/05/1971
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5091 24091     25/06/1960 14A
1A
D01
9A
D05
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Willesden
London Division
Longsight
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
25/06/1960
05/09/1964
18/04/1966
24/12/1966
11/03/1967
20/11/1977
20/11/1977
D5092 24092     15/07/1960 14A
14A
1A
D01
D05
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Cricklewood East
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
15/07/1960
16/07/1960
12/12/1964
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5093       28/07/1960 14A
1A
D01
D05

W
Cricklewood East (New)
Willesden
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
28/07/1960
12/12/1964
18/04/1966
11/03/1967
19/07/1969
14/08/1969
14/08/1969
D5094 24094     18/02/1960 31B
30A
34G
64B
64B
HA

W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Haymarket
Haymarket
Haymarket

Withdrawn
18/02/1960
11/03/1961
01/04/1961
03/09/1966
24/09/1966
03/01/1976
29/09/1976
29/09/1976
29/09/1976
D5095 24095     23/03/1960 31B
34G
64B

W
March (New)
Finsbury Park
Haymarket

Withdrawn
23/03/1960
17/06/1961
13/08/1966
26/07/1975
16/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5096 24096     09/04/1960 52A
50A
55A
52A
66A
65A
W
Gateshead (New)
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Gateshead
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
09/04/1960
23/02/1963
17/06/1967
08/05/1971
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
16/08/1975
23/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5097 24097     05/05/1960 52A
55A
66A
65A

W
Gateshead (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
05/05/1960
07/10/1967
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5098 24098     26/05/1960 52B
50A
55A
66A
65A
W
Heaton (New)
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
26/05/1960
16/03/1963
17/06/1967
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
16/08/1975
23/08/1975
16/08/1975
D5099 24099     03/06/1960 52B
50A
55A
66A
65A

W
Heaton (New)
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
03/06/1960
02/03/1963
17/06/1967
31/07/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5100 24100     25/06/1960 52A
12C
52A
50A
55A
66A
65A

W
Gateshead (New)
Carlisle Canal
Gateshead
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
25/06/1960
05/05/1962
12/05/1962
30/03/1963
20/05/1967
31/07/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5101 24101     09/07/1960 52A
55A
66A
65A
65A
60A

W
Gateshead (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Eastfield
Inverness

Withdrawn
09/07/1960
07/10/1967
31/07/1971
01/04/1972
24/02/1973
24/02/1973
23/08/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5102 24102     16/07/1960 52A
IS

W
Gateshead (New)
Inverness

Withdrawn
16/07/1960
11/05/1974
25/10/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5103 24103     06/08/1960 52A
IS

HA

W
Gateshead (New)
Inverness

Haymarket

Withdrawn
06/08/1960
11/05/1974
25/10/1975
01/05/1976
04/09/1976
01/12/1976
01/12/1976
D5104 24104     27/08/1960 52A
IS

HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Inverness

Haymarket
Withdrawn
27/08/1960
11/05/1974
23/08/1975
01/05/1976
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5105 24105     10/09/1960 52A
ED

W
Gateshead (New)
Eastfield

Withdrawn
10/09/1960
11/05/1974
23/08/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5106 24106     24/09/1960 52A
ED
HA

HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Eastfield
Haymarket

Haymarket
Withdrawn
24/09/1960
11/05/1974
23/08/1975
25/10/1975
15/11/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5107 24107     08/10/1960 52A
HA
ED
HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Haymarket
Eastfield
Haymarket
Withdrawn
08/10/1960
06/04/1974
27/04/1974
23/08/1975
01/12/1976
01/12/1976
D5108 24108     22/10/1960 52A
D05
HA
ED
HA


W
Gateshead (New)
Stoke Division
Haymarket
Eastfield
Haymarket


Withdrawn
22/10/1960
18/04/1966
06/04/1974
27/04/1974
23/08/1975
25/10/1975
01/05/1976
18/07/1976
18/07/1976
D5109 24109     05/11/1960 52A
HA
ED
HA

W
Gateshead (New)
Haymarket
Eastfield
Haymarket

Withdrawn
05/11/1960
06/04/1974
27/04/1974
23/08/1975
25/10/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5110 24110     16/11/1960 52A
HA
IS
HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Haymarket
Inverness
Haymarket
Withdrawn
16/11/1960
11/05/1974
24/05/1975
25/10/1975
01/12/1976
01/12/1976
D5111 24111     26/11/1960 52A
HA
ED
IS
ED
HA

W
Gateshead (New)
Haymarket
Eastfield
Inverness
Eastfield
Haymarket

Withdrawn
26/11/1960
09/03/1974
27/04/1974
28/12/1974
29/03/1975
23/08/1975
25/10/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5112 24112     30/12/1960 52A
51L
52A
55A
66A
65A
IS
HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Thornaby
Gateshead
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Inverness
Haymarket
Withdrawn
30/12/1960
16/12/1961
20/06/1964
07/10/1967
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
23/02/1974
15/11/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5113 24113     28/01/1961 52A
51L
52A
55A
66A
65A
60A
ED
IS
HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Thornaby
Gateshead
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Inverness
Eastfield
Inverness
Haymarket
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
16/12/1961
20/06/1964
04/11/1967
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
29/04/1972
03/11/1973
23/02/1974
25/10/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5114       23/04/1960 60A
W
Inverness (New)
Withdrawn
23/04/1960
09/10/1972
09/10/1972
D5115 24115     30/04/1960 60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
30/04/1960
25/10/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5116 24116     07/05/1960 60A
66A
60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Polmadie
Inverness
Haymarket
Withdrawn
07/05/1960
17/12/1960
03/06/1961
25/10/1975
15/09/1976
02/10/1976
15/09/1976
D5117 24117     14/05/1960 60A
65A
60A
60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Eastfield
Inverness (on loan)
Inverness
Haymarket
Withdrawn
14/05/1960
19/11/1960
08/04/1961
06/1961
29/11/1975
02/02/1976
07/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5118 24118     21/05/1960 60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
21/05/1960
25/10/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5119 24119     28/05/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
28/05/1960
15/11/1975
01/05/1976
18/07/1976
18/07/1976
D5120 24120     04/06/1960 60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
04/06/1960
25/10/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5121 24121     11/06/1960 60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
11/06/1960
25/10/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5122       18/06/1960 60A
W
Inverness (New)
Withdrawn
18/06/1960
02/10/1968
02/10/1968
D5123 24123     25/06/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
25/06/1960
25/10/1975
03/07/1976
18/07/1976
18/07/1976
D5124 24124     02/07/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
02/07/1960
15/11/1975
24/07/1976
01/12/1976
01/12/1976
D5125 24125     14/07/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
14/07/1960
25/10/1975
15/11/1975
27/03/1976
27/03/1976
D5126 24126     23/07/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
23/07/1960
25/10/1975
03/01/1976
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5127 24127     30/07/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
30/07/1960
15/11/1975
03/01/1976
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5128 24128     13/08/1960 60A
HA

W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket

Withdrawn
13/08/1960
25/10/1975
29/05/1976
18/07/1976
18/07/1976
D5129 24129     27/08/1960 60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
27/08/1960
15/11/1975
31/12/1976
31/12/1976
D5130 24130     03/09/1960 60A
HA
W
Inverness (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
03/09/1960
15/11/1975
01/12/1976
01/12/1976
D5131       17/09/1960 60A
W
Inverness (New)
Withdrawn
17/09/1960
11/09/1971
11/09/1971
D5132 24132     23/09/1960 60A

W
Inverness (New)

Withdrawn
23/09/1960
25/10/1975
02/02/1976
02/02/1976
D5133 24133     24/09/1960 9A
5A
1A
12C
1A
9A
5A
1E
D01
D05
W
Longsight (New)
Crewe North
Willesden
Carlisle Canal
Willesden
Longsight
Crewe North
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
24/09/1960
12/11/1960
24/12/1960
26/05/1962
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
15/09/1962
26/03/1966
18/04/1966
01/10/1966
12/03/1978
12/03/1978
D5134 24134     06/10/1960 9A
1B
1F
9A
1F
D01
9A
D01
9A
D09
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Camden
Rugby
Longsight
Rugby
London Division
Longsight
London Division
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
06/10/1960
06/01/1962
26/12/1964
01/05/1965
20/11/1965
18/04/1966
23/04/1966
24/12/1966
11/03/1967
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
02/10/1976
04/12/1976
04/12/1976
D5135 24135     08/10/1960 9A
1B
D09
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Camden
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
08/10/1960
07/04/1962
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
20/12/1975
04/01/1976
04/01/1976
D5136 24136     22/10/1960 9A
D09
D05
W
Longsight (New)
Manchester Division
Stoke Division
Withdrawn
22/10/1960
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5137 24137     18/10/1960 9A
D09
D05

91E

W
Longsight (New)
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

To Eastern Region

Withdrawn
18/10/1960
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
28/02/1976
20/03/1976
08/05/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5138       27/10/1960 9A
D09
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
27/10/1960
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
19/07/1969
10/08/1969
10/08/1969
D5139       29/10/1960 9A
D09
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
29/10/1960
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
19/07/1969
10/08/1969
10/08/1969
D5140 24140     05/11/1960 9A
1E
D01
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Bletchley
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
05/11/1960
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
01/10/1966
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5141 24141     12/11/1960 9A
2F
D02
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Bescot
Birmingham Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
12/11/1960
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
01/10/1966
28/02/1976
17/07/1976
17/07/1976
D5142 24142 TDB968009   19/11/1960 9A
1B
17A
1B
9A
16C
9A
D09
D05

W
Longsight (New)
Camden
Derby
Camden
Longsight
Derby
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
19/11/1960
27/01/1962
10/03/1962
24/03/1962
07/04/1962
07/03/1964
28/03/1964
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
28/02/1976
01/07/1976
01/07/1976
D5143 24143     26/11/1960 1A
5A
1A
5A
D05
D01
D05

W
Willesden (New)
Crewe Diesel
Willesden
Crewe Diesel
Stoke Division
London Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
26/11/1960
17/07/1965
16/10/1965
03/01/1966
18/04/1966
06/08/1966
01/10/1966
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5144 24144     03/12/1960 1A
5A
1F
D05
9A
D09
D05

W
Willesden (New)
Crewe North
Rugby
Stoke Division
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
03/12/1960
28/11/1964
09/01/1965
01/10/1966
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5145 24145     07/12/1960 1A
5A
1F
D01
D05
9A
D09
D05

W
Willesden (New)
Crewe North
Rugby
London Division
Stoke Division
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
07/12/1960
28/11/1964
09/01/1965
18/04/1966
01/10/1966
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5146 24146     10/12/1960 1A
21E
1A
9A
D09
D05

W
Willesden (New)
Monument Lane
Willesden
Longsight
Manchester Division
Stoke Division

Withdrawn
10/12/1960
20/05/1961
08/07/1961
25/04/1964
17/06/1968
09/11/1968
10/01/1976
31/01/1976
31/01/1976
D5147 24147     17/12/1960 52A
55A
66A
65A
HA

W
Gateshead (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Haymarket

Withdrawn
17/12/1960
02/12/1967
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
01/05/1976
18/07/1976
18/07/1976
D5148 24148     23/12/1960 52A
55A
66A
65A

W
Gateshead (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield

Withdrawn
23/12/1960
28/09/1968
16/10/1971
01/04/1972
23/08/1975
05/10/1975
05/10/1975
D5149       07/02/1961 52A
55A
66A
65A
W
Gateshead (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
07/02/1961
28/09/1968
16/10/1971
30/10/1971
09/10/1972
09/10/1972
D5150 24150     27/02/1961 52A
55A
66A
65A
HA
W
Gateshead (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Haymarket
Withdrawn
27/02/1961
28/09/1968
16/10/1971
30/10/1971
23/08/1975
01/12/1976
01/12/1976