24/0 |
D5000
|
24005
|
|
|
05/09/1958 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5001
|
24001
|
|
|
29/10/1958 |
05/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5002
|
24002
|
|
|
03/12/1958 |
05/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
13/11/1970 |
24/0 |
D5003
|
24003
|
|
|
12/12/1958 |
16/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5004
|
24004
|
|
|
22/12/1958 |
05/10/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
16/05/1964 |
24/0 |
D5005
|
|
|
|
03/01/1959 |
25/01/1969 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
16/05/1964 |
24/0 |
D5006
|
24006
|
|
|
03/01/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
13/06/1964 |
24/0 |
D5007
|
24007
|
|
|
07/02/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
13/06/1964 |
24/0 |
D5008
|
24008
|
|
|
28/02/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5009
|
24009
|
|
|
14/03/1959 |
18/07/1976 |
Engine hours recorder fitted |
25/07/1962 |
24/0 |
D5010
|
24010
|
|
|
21/03/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
13/06/1964 |
24/0 |
D5011
|
24011
|
|
|
28/03/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Engine hours recorder fitted |
13/10/1962 |
24/0 |
D5012
|
24012
|
|
|
11/04/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
16/05/1964 |
24/0 |
D5013
|
24013
|
|
|
18/04/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
11/07/1964 |
24/0 |
D5014
|
24014
|
|
|
09/05/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Modify 'catch and stay' on water duct |
18/04/1964 |
24/0 |
D5015
|
24015
|
|
|
30/05/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
Provision of discharge pipes |
11/11/1963 |
24/0 |
D5016
|
24016
|
|
|
30/05/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
08/04/1964 |
24/0 |
D5017
|
24017
|
|
|
06/06/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Engine hours recorder fitted |
12/01/1963 |
24/0 |
D5018
|
24018
|
|
|
27/06/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
11/07/1964 |
24/0 |
D5019
|
24019
|
|
|
11/07/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
19/02/1962 |
24/0 |
D5020
|
24020
|
|
|
20/08/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5021
|
24021
|
|
|
20/08/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5022
|
24022
|
|
|
07/09/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5023
|
24023
|
|
|
25/09/1959 |
03/09/1978 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5024
|
24024
|
|
|
02/10/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5025
|
24025
|
|
|
16/10/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
13/05/1971 |
24/0 |
D5026
|
24026
|
|
|
22/10/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5027
|
24027
|
|
|
31/10/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5028
|
|
|
|
13/11/1959 |
04/06/1972 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5029
|
24029
|
|
|
28/11/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5030
|
24030
|
|
|
06/06/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5031
|
24031
|
|
|
25/06/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5032
|
24032
|
|
|
29/07/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5033
|
24033
|
|
|
05/08/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5034
|
24034
|
|
|
03/09/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5035
|
24035
|
|
|
31/08/1959 |
15/10/1978 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5036
|
24036
|
|
|
03/09/1959 |
20/11/1977 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5037
|
24037
|
|
|
07/09/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5038
|
24038
|
|
|
15/09/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5039
|
24039
|
|
|
24/10/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5040
|
24040
|
|
|
12/10/1959 |
04/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5041
|
24041
|
|
|
28/09/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5042
|
24042
|
|
|
12/10/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5043
|
|
|
|
16/10/1959 |
10/08/1969 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5044
|
24044
|
|
|
23/10/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5045
|
24045
|
|
|
12/11/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5046
|
24046
|
|
|
29/10/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5047
|
24047
|
|
|
21/11/1959 |
16/11/1978 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5048
|
24048
|
|
|
05/11/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/0 |
D5049
|
24049
|
|
|
04/04/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5050
|
24050
|
|
|
27/11/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1971 |
24/1 |
D5052
|
24052
|
|
|
04/12/1959 |
04/12/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
24/1 |
D5054
|
24054
|
TDB968008
|
|
18/12/1959 |
01/07/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
24/1 |
D5055
|
24055
|
|
|
18/12/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5056
|
24056
|
|
|
11/12/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
02/1971 |
24/1 |
D5057
|
24057
|
|
|
22/12/1959 |
15/01/1978 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5058
|
24058
|
|
|
01/01/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5060
|
24060
|
|
|
02/01/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5061
|
24061
|
TDB968007
|
97201
|
15/01/1960 |
01/08/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5062
|
24062
|
|
|
18/01/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
24/1 |
D5063
|
24063
|
|
|
26/01/1960 |
09/04/1979 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5064
|
24064
|
|
|
27/01/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5066
|
24066
|
|
|
19/12/1959 |
02/02/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5067
|
|
|
|
24/12/1959 |
09/10/1972 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5068
|
|
|
|
31/12/1959 |
09/10/1972 |
EQ Brakes Added |
03/1971 |
24/1 |
D5069
|
24069
|
|
|
01/01/1960 |
01/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5070
|
24070
|
|
|
23/01/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5071
|
24071
|
|
|
06/02/1960 |
16/08/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5072
|
24072
|
|
|
17/02/1960 |
05/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5074
|
24074
|
|
|
14/03/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
24/1 |
D5075
|
24075
|
|
|
26/03/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5076
|
24076
|
|
|
10/02/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
09/1971 |
24/1 |
D5077
|
24077
|
|
|
17/02/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5078
|
24078
|
|
|
18/02/1960 |
24/04/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5079
|
24079
|
|
|
25/02/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
11/1971 |
24/1 |
D5081
|
24081
|
|
|
19/03/1960 |
05/10/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5082
|
24082
|
|
|
29/03/1960 |
01/03/1979 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
11/1971 |
24/1 |
D5083
|
24083
|
|
|
08/04/1960 |
27/03/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
06/01/1970 |
24/1 |
D5084
|
24084
|
|
|
25/04/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
24/1 |
D5085
|
24085
|
|
|
20/08/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
24/1 |
D5086
|
24086
|
|
|
21/05/1960 |
04/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5089
|
24089
|
|
|
20/06/1960 |
04/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5091
|
24091
|
|
|
25/06/1960 |
20/11/1977 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5092
|
24092
|
|
|
15/07/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
24/1 |
D5094
|
24094
|
|
|
18/02/1960 |
29/09/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5095
|
24095
|
|
|
23/03/1960 |
16/08/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5096
|
24096
|
|
|
09/04/1960 |
16/08/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5100
|
24100
|
|
|
25/06/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5102
|
24102
|
|
|
16/07/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
24/1 |
D5103
|
24103
|
|
|
06/08/1960 |
01/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5104
|
24104
|
|
|
27/08/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5105
|
24105
|
|
|
10/09/1960 |
05/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5106
|
24106
|
|
|
24/09/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5107
|
24107
|
|
|
08/10/1960 |
01/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5108
|
24108
|
|
|
22/10/1960 |
18/07/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5109
|
24109
|
|
|
05/11/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5110
|
24110
|
|
|
16/11/1960 |
01/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5111
|
24111
|
|
|
26/11/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5113
|
24113
|
|
|
28/01/1961 |
31/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5115
|
24115
|
|
|
30/04/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
Headlight(s) removed |
09/1975 |
24/1 |
D5116
|
24116
|
|
|
07/05/1960 |
15/09/1976 |
Headlight(s) removed |
09/1975 |
24/1 |
D5118
|
24118
|
|
|
21/05/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5119
|
24119
|
|
|
28/05/1960 |
18/07/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5120
|
24120
|
|
|
04/06/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5121
|
24121
|
|
|
11/06/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
30/10/1970 |
24/1 |
D5123
|
24123
|
|
|
25/06/1960 |
18/07/1976 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
30/10/1970 |
24/1 |
D5124
|
24124
|
|
|
02/07/1960 |
01/12/1976 |
Headlight(s) removed |
09/1975 |
24/1 |
D5125
|
24125
|
|
|
14/07/1960 |
27/03/1976 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
30/10/1970 |
24/1 |
D5126
|
24126
|
|
|
23/07/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
30/10/1970 |
24/1 |
D5128
|
24128
|
|
|
13/08/1960 |
18/07/1976 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
30/10/1970 |
24/1 |
D5129
|
24129
|
|
|
27/08/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
Headlight(s) removed |
09/1975 |
24/1 |
D5130
|
24130
|
|
|
03/09/1960 |
01/12/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5131
|
|
|
|
17/09/1960 |
11/09/1971 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5134
|
24134
|
|
|
06/10/1960 |
04/12/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5135
|
24135
|
|
|
08/10/1960 |
04/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5136
|
24136
|
|
|
22/10/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5137
|
24137
|
|
|
18/10/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5138
|
|
|
|
27/10/1960 |
10/08/1969 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5139
|
|
|
|
29/10/1960 |
10/08/1969 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5140
|
24140
|
|
|
05/11/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5141
|
24141
|
|
|
12/11/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
24/1 |
D5142
|
24142
|
TDB968009
|
|
19/11/1960 |
01/07/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1972 |
24/1 |
D5144
|
24144
|
|
|
03/12/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
20/12/1970 |
24/1 |
D5145
|
24145
|
|
|
07/12/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
24/1 |
D5146
|
24146
|
|
|
10/12/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
06/01/1970 |