Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
123
Class |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
123/2 |
52087
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
23/03/1973 |
123/2 |
52088
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
06/11/1971 |
123/2 |
52090
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/10/1973 |
123/2 |
52092
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/07/1971 |
123/2 |
52094
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/11/1973 |
123/2 |
52095
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
12/02/1972 |
123/1 |
52097
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/07/1971 |
123/1 |
52099
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
06/11/1971 |
123/1 |
52100
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/09/1973 |
123/1 |
52101
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
02/12/1972 |
123/1 |
52102
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
15/10/1973 |