BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (27/0) |
BR (27/1 Renum) |
BR (27/2) |
BR (Tops) |
BR (Dept) |
Built |
|
Depot Name |
From |
Date Withdrawn |
D5347
|
|
|
|
27001
|
|
30/06/1961 |
62A 65A 64B 65A 64B ED W |
Thornton Junction (New) Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
30/06/1961 29/07/1961 28/02/1970 26/02/1972 01/04/1972 19/05/1973 08/07/1987 |
08/07/1987 |
D5348
|
|
|
|
27002
|
|
17/07/1961 |
62A 65A 64B 65A 64B 65A IS W |
Thornton Junction (New) Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
17/07/1961 29/07/1961 28/02/1970 26/02/1972 01/04/1972 05/08/1972 05/10/1981 06/01/1986 |
06/01/1986 |
D5349
|
|
|
|
27003
|
|
28/07/1961 |
65A 64B ED W |
Eastfield (New) Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/07/1961 05/08/1972 19/05/1973 16/01/1987 |
16/01/1987 |
D5350
|
|
|
|
27004
|
|
23/08/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
23/08/1961 12/05/1986 |
12/05/1986 |
D5351
|
|
|
|
27005
|
|
30/08/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
30/08/1961 10/07/1987 |
10/07/1987 |
D5352
|
|
|
|
27006
|
|
06/09/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
06/09/1961 21/01/1976 |
21/01/1976 |
D5353
|
|
|
|
27007
|
|
13/09/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
13/09/1961 28/01/1985 |
28/01/1985 |
D5354
|
|
|
|
27008
|
|
20/09/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
20/09/1961 18/08/1987 |
18/08/1987 |
D5355
|
|
|
|
27009
|
|
28/09/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
28/09/1961 27/07/1980 |
27/07/1980 |
D5356
|
|
|
|
27010
|
|
11/10/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
11/10/1961 20/04/1986 |
20/04/1986 |
D5357
|
|
|
|
27011
|
|
18/10/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
18/10/1961 30/03/1981 |
30/03/1981 |
D5358
|
|
|
|
27012
|
|
25/10/1961 |
65A
ED W |
Eastfield (New)
Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/10/1961 26/07/1975 27/09/1975 11/05/1986 |
11/05/1986 |
D5359
|
|
|
|
27013
|
|
01/11/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
01/11/1961 13/07/1976 |
13/07/1976 |
D5360
|
|
|
|
27014
|
|
18/11/1961 |
65A ZH W |
Eastfield (New) Glasgow Works (on loan) Withdrawn |
18/11/1961 10/10/1981 08/09/1986 |
08/09/1986 |
D5361
|
|
|
|
27015
|
|
22/11/1961 |
65A
W |
Eastfield (New)
Withdrawn |
22/11/1961 01/1977 27/01/1977 |
27/01/1977 |
D5362
|
|
|
|
27016
|
|
30/11/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
30/11/1961 09/04/1984 |
09/04/1984 |
D5363
|
|
|
|
27017
|
|
07/12/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
07/12/1961 12/05/1986 |
12/05/1986 |
D5364
|
|
|
|
27018
|
|
13/12/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
13/12/1961 12/05/1986 |
12/05/1986 |
D5365
|
|
|
|
27019
|
|
30/12/1961 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
30/12/1961 28/05/1984 |
28/05/1984 |
D5366
|
|
|
|
27020
|
|
04/01/1962 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
04/01/1962 20/04/1986 |
20/04/1986 |
D5367
|
|
|
|
27021
|
|
04/01/1962 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
04/01/1962 03/06/1985 |
03/06/1985 |
D5368
|
|
|
|
27022
|
|
11/01/1962 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
11/01/1962 28/01/1985 |
28/01/1985 |
D5369
|
|
|
|
27023
|
|
17/01/1962 |
65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
17/01/1962 12/05/1986 |
12/05/1986 |
D5370
|
|
|
|
27024
|
ADB968028
|
17/01/1962 |
51L D15 51L D15 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
17/01/1962 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 03/01/1966 15/11/1969 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5371
|
|
|
|
27025
|
|
29/01/1962 |
51L D15 51L D15 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
29/01/1962 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 03/01/1966 28/02/1970 18/06/1987 |
18/06/1987 |
D5372
|
|
|
|
27026
|
|
24/01/1962 |
51L D15 51L D15 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
24/01/1962 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 03/01/1966 25/10/1969 06/07/1987 |
06/07/1987 |
D5373
|
|
|
|
27027
|
|
31/01/1962 |
51L 51L D15 65A IS W |
Thornaby (New) Thornaby (on loan) Leicester Division Eastfield Inverness (on loan) Withdrawn |
31/01/1962 11/12/1965 08/01/1966 15/11/1969 30/07/1981 13/06/1983 |
13/06/1983 |
D5374
|
27045
|
|
|
27101
|
|
07/02/1962 |
51L 51L D15 65A HA W |
Thornaby (New) Thornaby (on loan) Leicester Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
07/02/1962 11/12/1965 08/01/1966 01/11/1969 29/12/1973 01/05/1986 |
01/05/1986 |
D5375
|
|
|
|
27028
|
|
14/02/1962 |
51L 51L D15 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Thornaby (on loan) Leicester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
14/02/1962 11/12/1965 08/01/1966 01/11/1969 19/08/1984 |
19/08/1984 |
D5376
|
|
|
|
27029
|
|
21/02/1962 |
51L 51L D16 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Thornaby (on loan) Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
21/02/1962 11/12/1965 22/01/1966 28/02/1970 09/01/1986 |
09/01/1986 |
D5377
|
|
|
|
27030
|
|
28/02/1962 |
51L 51L D16 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Thornaby (on loan) Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/02/1962 11/12/1965 22/01/1966 07/03/1970 20/04/1986 |
20/04/1986 |
D5378
|
|
|
|
27031
|
|
07/03/1962 |
51L 51L D16 65A W |
Thornaby (New) Thornaby (on loan) Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/03/1962 11/12/1965 22/01/1966 08/11/1969 06/05/1978 |
06/05/1978 |
D5379
|
|
|
|
27032
|
|
27/03/1962 |
14A 14C 14B ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Bedford Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
27/03/1962 18/01/1964 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 15/01/1966 08/11/1969 27/05/1985 |
27/05/1985 |
D5380
|
27046
|
|
|
27102
|
|
06/04/1962 |
14A 14C 14B ML D16 65A 64B 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Bedford Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
06/04/1962 18/01/1964 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 08/11/1969 26/02/1972 01/04/1972 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5381
|
|
|
|
27033
|
|
06/04/1962 |
14A 14C 14B ML D14 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Bedford Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
06/04/1962 18/01/1964 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 25/06/1966 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 28/02/1970 24/02/1986 |
24/02/1986 |
D5382
|
|
|
|
27034
|
|
18/04/1962 |
14A 14C 14B ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Bedford Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
18/04/1962 18/01/1964 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 22/07/1984 |
22/07/1984 |
D5383
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/04/1962 |
14A 14C 14B D14 ML W |
Cricklewood East (New) Bedford Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Withdrawn |
26/04/1962 18/01/1964 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 06/03/1965 15/01/1966 |
15/01/1966 |
D5384
|
|
|
|
27035
|
|
01/05/1962 |
14A 15A 14B D14 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/05/1962 02/11/1963 04/07/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 17/06/1968 28/02/1970 29/09/1976 |
29/09/1976 |
D5385
|
|
|
|
27036
|
|
07/05/1962 |
14A D14 ML D14 D16 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/05/1962 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 25/06/1966 30/09/1967 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 28/02/1970 20/04/1986 |
20/04/1986 |
D5386
|
27066
|
|
27212
|
27103
|
|
18/05/1962 |
14A 15A 14B 15A D15 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Cricklewood West Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
18/05/1962 05/10/1963 27/06/1964 04/07/1964 16/01/1965 07/08/1965 17/06/1968 25/10/1969 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5387
|
27048
|
|
|
27104
|
|
21/05/1962 |
14A 15A ML D14 D16 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
21/05/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 25/06/1966 30/09/1967 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/11/1969 01/05/1986 |
01/05/1986 |
D5388
|
27049
|
|
|
27105
|
|
28/05/1962 |
14A 15A D15 ML D16 65A 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/05/1962 19/10/1963 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 07/03/1970 28/03/1970 01/04/1987 |
01/04/1987 |
D5389
|
|
|
|
27037
|
|
28/05/1962 |
14A D14 ML D16 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/05/1962 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 25/06/1966 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 15/11/1969 24/03/1986 |
24/03/1986 |
D5390
|
|
|
|
27038
|
|
04/06/1962 |
14A 2E 14B 15A D15 ML D15 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Saltley Cricklewood West Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
04/06/1962 05/10/1963 16/11/1963 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 07/08/1965 18/09/1965 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/11/1969 10/02/1987 |
10/02/1987 |
D5391
|
|
|
27201
|
27119
|
|
04/06/1962 |
14A 15A D15 66A 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
04/06/1962 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 05/07/1969 26/07/1969 01/05/1971 01/01/1979 |
01/01/1979 |
D5392
|
|
|
27202
|
27120
|
|
12/06/1962 |
14A 15A D15 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
12/06/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 28/06/1969 27/03/1971 01/08/1980 |
01/08/1980 |
D5393
|
27057
|
|
27203
|
27121
|
|
12/06/1962 |
14A 15A D15 65A 64B R W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Eastfield Haymarket Reinstated Withdrawn |
12/06/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 28/06/1969 27/03/1971 07/1981 01/05/1983 |
01/05/1983 |
D5394
|
27050
|
|
|
27106
|
|
20/06/1962 |
14A 15A D15 65A IS W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
20/06/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 20/07/1968 05/10/1981 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5395
|
27051
|
|
|
27107
|
|
20/06/1962 |
14A 15A D15 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/06/1962 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 28/06/1969 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5396
|
27052
|
|
|
27108
|
|
27/06/1962 |
14A D14 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
27/06/1962 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 04/05/1968 20/07/1968 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5397
|
27053
|
|
|
27109
|
|
10/08/1962 |
14A 15A D15 65A IS W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
10/08/1962 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 12/07/1969 05/10/1981 01/05/1987 |
01/05/1987 |
D5398
|
|
|
|
27039
|
|
03/07/1962 |
14A D14 D16 65A
W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Nottingham Division Eastfield
Withdrawn |
03/07/1962 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 28/06/1969 27/09/1975 05/10/1975 |
05/10/1975 |
D5399
|
27054
|
|
|
27110
|
|
03/07/1962 |
14A D14 D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/07/1962 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 28/06/1969 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5400
|
27055
|
|
|
27111
|
|
10/07/1962 |
14A D14 D01 D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
10/07/1962 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 28/06/1969 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5401
|
27056
|
|
|
27112
|
|
10/07/1962 |
14A D14 D01 D01 D16 65A 64B 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) London Division London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
10/07/1962 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 06/07/1968 20/07/1968 28/06/1969 26/02/1972 01/04/1972 01/02/1987 |
01/02/1987 |
D5402
|
|
|
|
27040
|
|
12/07/1962 |
14A D14 D01 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) London Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
12/07/1962 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 27/07/1968 27/01/1986 |
27/01/1986 |
D5403
|
27058
|
|
27204
|
27122
|
|
17/07/1962 |
14A 31B 14B D14 D01 D16 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) March Cricklewood West London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
17/07/1962 31/08/1963 09/11/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 01/03/1969 26/12/1970 01/05/1986 |
01/05/1986 |
D5404
|
27061
|
|
27207
|
27113
|
|
19/07/1962 |
14A 16C 15A D15 ML D16 D14 D01 D16 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) Derby Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
19/07/1962 26/10/1963 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 25/06/1966 08/10/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 01/03/1969 27/03/1971 01/05/1986 |
01/05/1986 |
D5405
|
|
|
|
27041
|
|
24/07/1962 |
14A 15A D15 ML D16 D14 D01 D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
24/07/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 05/02/1966 19/11/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 08/03/1969 11/05/1986 |
11/05/1986 |
D5406
|
|
|
|
27042
|
|
31/07/1962 |
14A 15A D15 ML D16 D14 D01 D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
31/07/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 05/02/1966 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 08/03/1969 06/07/1987 |
06/07/1987 |
D5407
|
27062
|
|
27208
|
27114
|
|
02/08/1962 |
14A 15A 14B D14 ML D14 D01 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
02/08/1962 30/11/1963 08/08/1964 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 27/07/1968 27/03/1971 01/02/1986 |
01/02/1986 |
D5408
|
27063
|
|
27209
|
27115
|
|
15/08/1962 |
14A D14 ML D14 D01 D16 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
15/08/1962 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 01/03/1969 27/03/1971 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5409
|
27064
|
|
27210
|
27116
|
|
10/08/1962 |
14A 15A 14B D14 D16 D16 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Cricklewood West London (Midland) Nottingham Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
10/08/1962 05/10/1963 27/06/1964 16/01/1965 27/01/1968 20/07/1968 08/03/1969 27/03/1971 01/05/1986 |
01/05/1986 |
D5410
|
27059
|
|
27205
|
27123
|
|
30/08/1962 |
14A D14 D16 65A 64B 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
30/08/1962 16/01/1965 27/01/1968 01/03/1969 27/03/1971 01/04/1972 01/07/1987 |
01/07/1987 |
D5411
|
27065
|
|
27211
|
27117
|
|
10/09/1962 |
14A 15A D15 ML D16 65A 64B W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
10/09/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 05/02/1966 01/03/1969 26/12/1970 01/05/1986 |
01/05/1986 |
D5412
|
|
|
27206
|
27124
|
|
03/09/1962 |
14A 15A D15 ML D16 D14 ML D16 65A 64B 65A HA ED W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/09/1962 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 12/02/1966 19/11/1966 25/11/1967 04/05/1968 01/03/1969 27/03/1971 01/04/1972 08/09/1973 29/12/1973 01/03/1986 |
01/03/1986 |
D5413
|
27047
|
27103
|
|
27118
|
|
13/09/1962 |
14A 15A D15 ML D16 65A 64B 64B HA W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Haymarket Haymarket Withdrawn |
13/09/1962 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 17/06/1968 08/03/1969 03/10/1970 27/03/1971 15/11/1975 01/04/1986 |
01/04/1986 |
D5414
|
|
|
|
27043
|
|
18/09/1962 |
14A 15A D15 12A D15 ML D16 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Division Carlisle Kingmoor Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
18/09/1962 30/11/1963 16/01/1965 27/02/1965 26/06/1965 29/01/1966 17/06/1968 03/08/1968 21/04/1980 |
21/04/1980 |
D5415
|
|
|
|
27044
|
|
06/10/1962 |
14A D14 ML D16 65A 64B 65A W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
06/10/1962 16/01/1965 29/01/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 27/03/1971 02/10/1971 14/07/1980 |
14/07/1980 |