Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2862 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16268 Week
» 69284 Month
» 188811 Year
» 3215664 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Metropolitan Vickers 28 Co-Bo
Class |
BR (Pre Tops) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
28 |
D5700
|
25/07/1958 |
30/12/1967 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
18/06/1960 |
28 |
D5701
|
01/09/1958 |
07/09/1968 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
03/12/1960 |
28 |
D5704
|
05/11/1958 |
30/12/1967 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
08/10/1960 |
28 |
D5705
|
05/12/1958 |
07/09/1968 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
28/01/1961 |
28 |
D5710
|
14/02/1959 |
30/12/1967 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
28/01/1961 |
28 |
D5711
|
14/02/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
25/02/1961 |
28 |
D5712
|
07/03/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
26/12/1959 |
28 |
D5713
|
07/03/1959 |
30/12/1967 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
02/01/1960 |
28 |
D5714
|
14/03/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
02/01/1960 |
28 |
D5715
|
11/04/1959 |
04/05/1968 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
26/12/1959 |
28 |
D5716
|
16/05/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
26/12/1959 |
28 |
D5717
|
19/06/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
06/11/1960 |
28 |
D5718
|
11/07/1959 |
04/05/1968 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
03/12/1960 |
28 |
D5719
|
17/10/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
26/12/1959 |