125
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/12/1958 | To Service | 50988 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/12/1958 | To Service | 51154 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
06/01/1959 | To Service | 50992 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
06/01/1959 | To Service | 51158 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
09/01/1959 | To Service | 50990 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
09/01/1959 | To Service | 50991 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
09/01/1959 | To Service | 51156 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
09/01/1959 | To Service | 51157 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
15/01/1959 | To Service | 50989 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
15/01/1959 | To Service | 51155 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
28/01/1959 | To Service | 50994 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
28/01/1959 | To Service | 51160 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
30/01/1959 | To Service | 50993 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
30/01/1959 | To Service | 51159 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
03/02/1959 | To Service | 50995 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
03/02/1959 | To Service | 51161 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
13/02/1959 | To Service | 50997 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
13/02/1959 | To Service | 51163 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1959 | To Service | 50998 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1959 | To Service | 51164 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
26/02/1959 | To Service | 50999 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
26/02/1959 | To Service | 51165 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
05/03/1959 | To Service | 50996 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
05/03/1959 | To Service | 51162 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/03/1959 | To Service | 51000 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/03/1959 | To Service | 51166 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1959 | To Service | 51004 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1959 | To Service | 51005 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1959 | To Service | 51170 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1959 | To Service | 51171 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
07/05/1959 | To Service | 51006 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
07/05/1959 | To Service | 51172 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/05/1959 | To Service | 51001 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/05/1959 | To Service | 51002 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/05/1959 | To Service | 51003 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/05/1959 | To Service | 51167 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/05/1959 | To Service | 51168 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | |
12/05/1959 | To Service | 51169 | NEW | 30A | Stratford |