126
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/09/1956 | To Service | 79096 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
03/09/1956 | To Service | 79097 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/09/1956 | To Service | 79100 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/10/1956 | To Service | 79101 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
15/10/1956 | To Service | 79102 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
30/10/1956 | To Service | 79103 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
12/11/1956 | To Service | 79104 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
26/11/1956 | To Service | 79105 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/12/1956 | To Service | 79108 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/12/1956 | To Service | 79109 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
07/01/1957 | To Service | 79110 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
07/01/1957 | To Service | 79111 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/01/1957 | To Service | 79155 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/01/1957 | To Service | 79156 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
15/04/1957 | To Service | 79167 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
15/04/1957 | To Service | 79168 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79157 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79158 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79159 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79160 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79161 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79162 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79163 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79164 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79165 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/04/1957 | To Service | 79166 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
26/04/1957 | To Service | 79106 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
26/04/1957 | To Service | 79107 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | |
30/03/1959 | To Service | 51008 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | |
30/03/1959 | To Service | 51009 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | |
30/03/1959 | To Service | 51010 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | |
30/03/1959 | To Service | 51011 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | |
30/03/1959 | To Service | 51012 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | |
30/03/1959 | To Service | 51013 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | |
27/10/1959 | To Service | 51023 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
27/10/1959 | To Service | 51024 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
31/10/1959 | To Service | 51025 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
31/10/1959 | To Service | 51026 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
07/11/1959 | To Service | 51027 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
07/11/1959 | To Service | 51028 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
14/11/1959 | To Service | 50936 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
14/11/1959 | To Service | 51029 | NEW | 64C | Dalry Road | |
16/02/1969 | Condemned | 79092 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | COND | |
08/12/1973 | Condemned | 79165 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | |
27/09/1978 | Condemned | 79168 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | |
24/07/1981 | Condemned | 79088 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | COND |