31 A1A-A1A
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5677 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Tinsley | |
20/02/1965 | Reallocation | 5540 | 32B | Ipswich | 41A | Tinsley | |
13/03/1965 | Reallocation | 5527 | 40A | Lincoln | 30A | Stratford | |
13/03/1965 | Reallocation | 5534 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
13/03/1965 | Reallocation | 5557 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 41A | Tinsley | |
20/03/1965 | Reallocation | 5645 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 5541 | 32B | Ipswich | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 5556 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 5559 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
01/05/1965 | Reallocation | 5848 | 41A | Tinsley | O/L | Leicester Division | |
22/05/1965 | Reallocation | 5848 | O/L | 41A | Tinsley | ||
29/05/1965 | Reallocation | 5850 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
05/06/1965 | Reallocation | 5632 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 5677 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/06/1965 | Reallocation | 5570 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
10/07/1965 | Reallocation | 5850 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/07/1965 | Reallocation | 5861 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
14/08/1965 | Reallocation | 5571 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
21/08/1965 | Reallocation | 5841 | 41A | Tinsley | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
21/08/1965 | Reallocation | 5861 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Tinsley | |
28/08/1965 | Reallocation | 5841 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 41A | Tinsley | |
28/08/1965 | Reallocation | 5845 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
11/09/1965 | Reallocation | 5687 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/09/1965 | Reallocation | 5525 | 32B | Ipswich | 30A | Stratford | |
25/09/1965 | Reallocation | 5687 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
25/09/1965 | Reallocation | 5845 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Tinsley | |
25/09/1965 | Reallocation | 5848 | 41A | Tinsley | O/L | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
16/10/1965 | Reallocation | 5677 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | To London Midland Region | |
16/10/1965 | Reallocation | 5848 | O/L | 41A | Tinsley | ||
23/10/1965 | Reallocation | 5677 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/10/1965 | Reallocation | 5686 | 41A | Tinsley | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
06/11/1965 | Reallocation | 5686 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 41A | Tinsley | |
06/11/1965 | Reallocation | 5687 | 41A | Tinsley | 91E | To Eastern Region | |
06/11/1965 | Reallocation | 5861 | 41A | Tinsley | 91E | To Eastern Region | |
13/11/1965 | Reallocation | 5574 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
13/11/1965 | Reallocation | 5686 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
27/11/1965 | Reallocation | 5686 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
18/12/1965 | Reallocation | 5616 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
08/01/1966 | Reallocation | 5630 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
08/01/1966 | Reallocation | 5633 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
15/01/1966 | Reallocation | 5633 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
15/01/1966 | Reallocation | 5848 | 41A | Tinsley | O/L | Nottingham Division | |
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 5581 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 5848 | O/L | 41A | Tinsley | ||
05/03/1966 | Reallocation | 5862 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5525 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5527 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5534 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5559 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5570 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5571 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 5574 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 5587 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 5591 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 5594 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 5645 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 5576 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 5590 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 5677 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 5697 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 5861 | 91E | To Eastern Region | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 5616 | 41A | Tinsley | 32B | Ipswich | |
25/02/1967 | Reallocation | 5556 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
25/02/1967 | Reallocation | 5584 | 41A | Tinsley | 30A | Stratford | |
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5587 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
18/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5633 | 41A | Tinsley | 41C | Wath | |
18/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5834 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5587 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5673 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5675 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 5676 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
15/04/1967 | Reallocation | 5616 | 32B | Ipswich | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5525 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5527 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5534 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5548 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5556 | 41A | Tinsley | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5559 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5562 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5570 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5571 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5574 | 40B | Immingham | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5581 | 41A | Tinsley | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5633 | 41C | Wath | 32B | Ipswich | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5665 | 31B | March | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 5842 | 41C | Wath | 32B | Ipswich | |
09/09/1967 | Reallocation | 5677 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/09/1967 | Reallocation | 5678 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 5548 | 32B | Ipswich | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 5584 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
18/11/1967 | Reallocation | 5537 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/02/1968 | Reallocation | 5861 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5520 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5521 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5522 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5523 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5524 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5525 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5527 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5529 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5534 | 32B | Ipswich | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5551 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5555 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5556 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5559 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5562 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5570 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5571 | 32B | Ipswich | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5574 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5575 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5581 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5633 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5658 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5679 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5811 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5812 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5813 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5814 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5815 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5816 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5817 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5818 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5819 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5820 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5821 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5822 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5823 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5824 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5825 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5826 | 41F.1 | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5827 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5829 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5830 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5831 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5832 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5833 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5836 | 41C | Wath | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5837 | 41C | Wath | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5838 | 41C | Wath | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5839 | 41C | Wath | 40B | Immingham | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 5842 | 32B | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5536 | 41A | Tinsley | 30A | Stratford | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5537 | 41A | Tinsley | 30A | Stratford | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5592 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5656 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
24/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5589 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
24/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5602 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
24/08/1968 | Reallocation | 5622 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Tinsley | |
12/10/1968 | Reallocation | 5543 | 30A | Stratford | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
12/10/1968 | Reallocation | 5557 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
12/10/1968 | Reallocation | 5577 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
12/10/1968 | Reallocation | 5578 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
12/10/1968 | Reallocation | 5582 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
12/10/1968 | Reallocation | 5583 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
09/11/1968 | Reallocation | 5568 | 41A | Tinsley | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/11/1968 | Reallocation | 5685 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
30/11/1968 | Reallocation | 5535 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
28/12/1968 | Reallocation | 5530 | 31B | March | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
28/12/1968 | Reallocation | 5539 | 41A | Tinsley | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
28/12/1968 | Reallocation | 5547 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
28/12/1968 | Reallocation | 5602 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 5583 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 5660 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 40B | Immingham | |
22/02/1969 | Reallocation | 5568 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
22/02/1969 | Reallocation | 5622 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
15/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5537 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
15/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5652 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
15/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5653 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 31B | March | |
15/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5679 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5528 | 31B | March | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5543 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 41A | Tinsley | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5655 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5685 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 5697 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5577 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5627 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 31B | March | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5650 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5651 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5653 | 31B | March | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5689 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5801 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5802 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5803 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5828 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5854 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5855 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5856 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5859 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
24/05/1969 | Reallocation | 5536 | 30A | Stratford | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
07/06/1969 | Reallocation | 5537 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
07/06/1969 | Reallocation | 5547 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
07/06/1969 | Reallocation | 5655 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
07/06/1969 | Reallocation | 5679 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
14/06/1969 | Reallocation | 5544 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 41A | Tinsley | |
05/07/1969 | Reallocation | 5568 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
05/07/1969 | Reallocation | 5586 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5532 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5533 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5534 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5545 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5560 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5563 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5564 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5566 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5569 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5572 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5579 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5580 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5616 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5622 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5653 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5661 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5662 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5663 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5664 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5665 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5666 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5667 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5682 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5692 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5694 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 5847 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 41A | Tinsley | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 5520 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 5620 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
10/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5548 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
10/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5549 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
10/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5586 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5622 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
10/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5677 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
31/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5653 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
31/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5657 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
31/01/1970 | Reallocation | 5662 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
07/02/1970 | Reallocation | 5616 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5801 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5813 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5815 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5817 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5825 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5828 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5829 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5834 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5837 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5838 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5839 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5862 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
14/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5553 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
14/03/1970 | Reallocation | 5632 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5617 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5622 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5627 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5628 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5661 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5663 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
09/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5677 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
23/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5534 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5630 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
23/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5637 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/05/1970 | Reallocation | 5696 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 5617 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 5618 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5550 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5551 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5552 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5554 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5555 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5556 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5558 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5559 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5562 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5565 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/07/1970 | Reallocation | 5567 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5517 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5540 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5543 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5544 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5546 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5628 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5661 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5663 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5681 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5697 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5517 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5518 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5520 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5537 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5662 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 5679 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
07/11/1970 | Reallocation | 5678 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
07/11/1970 | Reallocation | 5685 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/11/1970 | Reallocation | 5848 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5550 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5551 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
23/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5518 | 31B | March | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
30/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5540 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
30/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5543 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
30/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5544 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
30/01/1971 | Reallocation | 5546 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
27/03/1971 | Reallocation | 5547 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
27/03/1971 | Reallocation | 5553 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5518 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5520 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5521 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5522 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5525 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5583 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5616 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5618 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5656 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5658 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5847 | 41A | Tinsley | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5848 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5849 | 41A | Tinsley | 30A | Stratford | |
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 5850 | 41A | Tinsley | 30A | Stratford | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5546 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5552 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5554 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5555 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5556 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5586 | 41A | Tinsley | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5637 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5657 | 30A | Stratford | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5658 | 30A | Stratford | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5662 | 31B | March | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5680 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5683 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5848 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
15/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5534 | 41A | Tinsley | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5534 | 52A | Gateshead | 51L | Thornaby | |
29/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5541 | 41A | Tinsley | 55C | Healey Mills | |
29/05/1971 | Reallocation | 5548 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/08/1971 | Reallocation | 5550 | 40B | Immingham | 51L | Thornaby | |
14/08/1971 | Reallocation | 5825 | 40B | Immingham | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
11/09/1971 | Reallocation | 5538 | 41A | Tinsley | D10 | Preston Division | |
11/09/1971 | Reallocation | 5817 | 40B | Immingham | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
11/09/1971 | Reallocation | 5825 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 40B | Immingham | |
18/09/1971 | Reallocation | 5549 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
18/09/1971 | Reallocation | 5802 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5520 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5521 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5522 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5527 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5529 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5531 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5532 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5533 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5534 | 51L | Thornaby | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5537 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5538 | D10 | Preston Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5541 | 55C | Healey Mills | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5542 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5543 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5544 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5549 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5558 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5559 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5562 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5565 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5567 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5583 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5587 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5591 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5594 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5596 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5597 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5598 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5600 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5603 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5616 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5618 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5650 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5651 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5652 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5653 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5686 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5692 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5693 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5694 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5695 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5696 | 31B | March | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5802 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5817 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 30A | Stratford | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5825 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5847 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5848 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5849 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5850 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5858 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
16/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5809 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
16/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5812 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
23/10/1971 | Reallocation | 5597 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | D10 | Preston Division | |
06/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5529 | 52A | Gateshead | 30A | Stratford | |
06/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5532 | 52A | Gateshead | 30A | Stratford | |
06/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5597 | D10 | Preston Division | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
06/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5603 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55A | Preston Division | |
13/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5550 | 51L | Thornaby | 30A | Stratford | |
13/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5558 | 51L | Thornaby | 30A | Stratford | |
13/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5559 | 51L | Thornaby | 30A | Stratford | |
20/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5591 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | D10 | Preston Division | |
20/11/1971 | Reallocation | 5603 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
04/12/1971 | Reallocation | 5692 | 40B | Immingham | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
04/12/1971 | Reallocation | 5695 | 40B | Immingham | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/12/1971 | Reallocation | 5654 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
11/12/1971 | Reallocation | 5656 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
18/12/1971 | Reallocation | 5591 | D10 | Preston Division | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
18/12/1971 | Reallocation | 5594 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | D10 | Preston Division | |
01/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5594 | D10 | Preston Division | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
01/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5599 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55B | York (North) | |
01/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5616 | 55B | York (North) | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5525 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5529 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5532 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5533 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5537 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5548 | 52A | Gateshead | 51L | Thornaby | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5554 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5606 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 51L | Thornaby | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5655 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5668 | 31B | March | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5682 | 31B | March | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5688 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5696 | 52A | Gateshead | 51L | Thornaby | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5803 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5809 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5812 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5814 | 41A | Tinsley | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5818 | 41A | Tinsley | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5823 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5824 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5826 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5827 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5828 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5837 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5842 | 31B | March | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5843 | 41A | Tinsley | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5850 | 55B | York (North) | 51L | Thornaby | |
22/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5806 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
29/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5685 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
29/01/1972 | Reallocation | 5806 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
05/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5558 | 30A | Stratford | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
05/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5685 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
12/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5549 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
12/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5550 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
12/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5654 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
12/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5802 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
12/02/1972 | Reallocation | 5817 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
04/03/1972 | Reallocation | 5603 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 40B | Immingham | |
04/03/1972 | Reallocation | 5691 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
18/03/1972 | Reallocation | 5558 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
18/03/1972 | Reallocation | 5658 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/03/1972 | Reallocation | 5540 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/03/1972 | Reallocation | 5658 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5540 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
08/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5653 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 31B | March | |
08/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5666 | 31B | March | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5669 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
15/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5584 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
15/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5666 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 31B | March | |
22/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5584 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
22/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5596 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
22/04/1972 | Reallocation | 5607 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Tinsley | |
06/05/1972 | Reallocation | 5534 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
06/05/1972 | Reallocation | 5560 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
06/05/1972 | Reallocation | 5653 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
06/05/1972 | Reallocation | 5654 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
06/05/1972 | Reallocation | 5659 | 30A | Stratford | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
06/05/1972 | Reallocation | 5856 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
24/06/1972 | Reallocation | 5599 | 55B | York (North) | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
24/06/1972 | Reallocation | 5656 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
24/06/1972 | Reallocation | 5659 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55B | York (North) | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5594 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 40B | Immingham | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5597 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 40B | Immingham | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5617 | 40B | Immingham | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5654 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5686 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5687 | 91E | To Eastern Region | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5689 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5690 | 40B | Immingham | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
08/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5696 | 51L | Thornaby | 40B | Immingham | |
29/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5541 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 51L | Thornaby | |
29/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5606 | 51L | Thornaby | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
29/07/1972 | Reallocation | 5669 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5807 | 41A | Tinsley | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5523 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5524 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5527 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5531 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5533 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5545 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5546 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5549 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5551 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5552 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5553 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5563 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5568 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5574 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5577 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5581 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5583 | 55B | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5620 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1972 | Reallocation | 5807 | 52A | Gateshead | 51L | Thornaby | |
02/09/1972 | Reallocation | 5811 | 41A | Tinsley | 52A | Gateshead | |
02/09/1972 | Reallocation | 5821 | 41A | Tinsley | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5518 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5538 | 41A | Tinsley | 55B | York (North) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5540 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5555 | 40B | Immingham | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5556 | 40B | Immingham | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5558 | 41A | Tinsley | 55B | York (North) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5559 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5560 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5585 | 41A | Tinsley | 55B | York (North) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5591 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5607 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5639 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5647 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 31B | March | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5683 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5801 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5802 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5811 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5817 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5835 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5841 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5844 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5847 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5849 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5854 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
07/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5860 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
21/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5665 | 31B | March | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
28/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5581 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
28/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5684 | 41A | Tinsley | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
28/10/1972 | Reallocation | 5685 | 41A | Tinsley | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5537 | 40B | Immingham | 55B | York (North) | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5541 | 51L | Thornaby | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5548 | 51L | Thornaby | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5586 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5617 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5657 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5658 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5659 | 55B | York (North) | 40B | Immingham | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5662 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5680 | 31B | March | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5692 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5695 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5803 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5804 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5805 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5808 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5809 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5810 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5811 | 41A | Tinsley | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5814 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5816 | 41A | Tinsley | 31B | March | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5818 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5845 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
25/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5810 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 51L | Thornaby | |
25/11/1972 | Reallocation | 5811 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 51L | Thornaby | |
16/12/1972 | Reallocation | 5665 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 31B | March | |
06/01/1973 | Reallocation | 5601 | 34G | Finsbury Park | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/01/1973 | Reallocation | 5810 | 51L | Thornaby | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
03/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5677 | 34G | Finsbury Park | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5528 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5550 | 31B | March | 55B | York (North) | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5551 | 31B | March | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5594 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5597 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5598 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5601 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5603 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5639 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5647 | 31B | March | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5654 | 40B | Immingham | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5800 | 31B | March | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5811 | 51L | Thornaby | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5836 | 41A | Tinsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
10/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5842 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5617 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5814 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5602 | 34G | Finsbury Park | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 5677 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
21/04/1973 | Reallocation | 5593 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 16A | Toton | |
21/04/1973 | Reallocation | 5602 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
12/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5617 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
12/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5803 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
12/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5809 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5521 | 55B | York (North) | FP | Finsbury Park | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5537 | 55B | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5541 | 41A | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5593 | 16A | Toton | FP | Finsbury Park | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5618 | 55B | York (North) | FP | Finsbury Park | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5820 | 41A | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5822 | 41A | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 5859 | 40B | Immingham | SX | Stratford | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5530 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5594 | 34G | Finsbury Park | MC | March | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5597 | 34G | Finsbury Park | MC | March | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5598 | 34G | Finsbury Park | MC | March | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5603 | 34G | Finsbury Park | MC | March | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5631 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5633 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5634 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5638 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 5824 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
07/07/1973 | Reallocation | 5617 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
07/07/1973 | Reallocation | 5834 | 40B | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
07/07/1973 | Reallocation | 5859 | SX | Stratford | FP | Finsbury Park | |
18/08/1973 | Reallocation | 31104 | 55B | York (North) | CD | Cricklewood East | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5520 | 55B | York (North) | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5538 | 55B | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5540 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5543 | 51L | Thornaby | FP | Finsbury Park | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5544 | 51L | Thornaby | FP | Finsbury Park | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5550 | 55B | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5551 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5554 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5555 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | TE | Thornaby | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5556 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | TE | Thornaby | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5558 | 55B | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5581 | 41A | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5584 | 41A | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5585 | 55B | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5587 | 55B | York (North) | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5588 | 34G | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5591 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5600 | 55B | York (North) | MR | March | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5619 | 40B | Immingham | FP | Finsbury Park | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5655 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5662 | 41A | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5668 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5677 | 34G | Finsbury Park | YK | York (North) | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5678 | 34G | Finsbury Park | YK | York (North) | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5846 | 41A | Tinsley | MR | March | |
13/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5820 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | GD | Gateshead | |
13/10/1973 | Reallocation | 5856 | 52A | Gateshead | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
03/11/1973 | Reallocation | 5808 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
03/11/1973 | Reallocation | 5822 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 5653 | 34G | Finsbury Park | YK | York (North) | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 5668 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 5677 | YK | York (North) | FP | Finsbury Park | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 31323 | 41A | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 5862 | 41A | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
29/12/1973 | Reallocation | 31267 | 31B | March | CW | Cricklewood East | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5538 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5559 | 55B | York (North) | TE | Thornaby | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5560 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5565 | 40B | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5581 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5584 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5636 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5637 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5653 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5660 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5662 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5665 | 31B | March | IM | Immingham | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5678 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 31266 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5800 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5805 | 51L | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5817 | 30A | Stratford | TE | Thornaby | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5825 | 30A | Stratford | TE | Thornaby | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5829 | 40B | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
12/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5850 | 51L | Thornaby | YK | York (North) | |
19/01/1974 | Reallocation | 5681 | 31B | March | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
19/01/1974 | Reallocation | 31308 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | MR | March | |
23/02/1974 | Reallocation | 5694 | 40B | Immingham | TO | Toton | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31108 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31115 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31132 | TI | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31134 | 31B | March | IM | Immingham | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31157 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31167 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 5590 | 34G | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31173 | FP | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 5595 | 34G | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31178 | 34G | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 5601 | 34G | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31248 | 40B | Immingham | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31264 | TO | Toton | IM | Immingham | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31279 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/03/1974 | Reallocation | 31284 | 31B | March | TE | Thornaby | |
27/04/1974 | Reallocation | 31256 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/04/1974 | Reallocation | 31257 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/04/1974 | Reallocation | 31291 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
27/04/1974 | Reallocation | 31295 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31130 | 41A | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31143 | 30A | Stratford | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31146 | 31B | March | YK | York (North) | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31148 | 31B | March | YK | York (North) | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31152 | 40B | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31159 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31172 | MR | March | TI | Tinsley | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31197 | 31B | March | TI | Tinsley | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31278 | TI | Tinsley | GD | Gateshead | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31279 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31282 | 40B | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31283 | 40B | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31287 | 41A | Tinsley | GD | Gateshead | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31290 | TI | Tinsley | GD | Gateshead | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31297 | 41A | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31306 | 41A | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31314 | 30A | Stratford | MR | March | |
18/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31274 | 51L | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
18/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31284 | TE | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
18/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31299 | 41A | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
18/05/1974 | Reallocation | 31300 | 41A | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
22/06/1974 | Reallocation | 31172 | TI | Tinsley | CW | Cricklewood East | |
06/07/1974 | Reallocation | 31153 | 40B | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
06/07/1974 | Reallocation | 31302 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
06/07/1974 | Reallocation | 31306 | TE | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
06/07/1974 | Reallocation | 31308 | MR | March | TI | Tinsley | |
17/08/1974 | Reallocation | 31140 | TI | Tinsley | CW | Cricklewood East | |
24/08/1974 | Reallocation | 31140 | CW | Cricklewood East | CW | Cricklewood East | |
28/09/1974 | Reallocation | 31310 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | CW | Cricklewood East | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31134 | IM | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31139 | 40B | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31212 | SF | Stratford | MR | March | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31213 | SF | Stratford | MR | March | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31253 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31255 | 30A | Stratford | MR | March | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31263 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31280 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31302 | TI | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31305 | 41A | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31308 | TI | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31312 | MR | March | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31318 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31319 | 40B | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31321 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
19/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31197 | TI | Tinsley | CW | Cricklewood East | |
26/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31111 | 31B | March | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
26/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31281 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
26/10/1974 | Reallocation | 31305 | YK | York (North) | MR | March | |
09/11/1974 | Reallocation | 31115 | FP | Finsbury Park | YK | York (North) | |
09/11/1974 | Reallocation | 31134 | YK | York (North) | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/11/1974 | Reallocation | 31157 | FP | Finsbury Park | CW | Cricklewood East | |
09/11/1974 | Reallocation | 31227 | TI | Tinsley | FP | Finsbury Park | |
30/11/1974 | Reallocation | 31134 | FP | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
30/11/1974 | Reallocation | 31264 | IM | Immingham | FP | Finsbury Park | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 31257 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 31278 | GD | Gateshead | TE | Thornaby | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 31280 | YK | York (North) | IM | Immingham | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 31281 | YK | York (North) | IM | Immingham | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 31284 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 31290 | GD | Gateshead | TE | Thornaby | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31115 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31116 | 40B | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31119 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31123 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31142 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31146 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31148 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31163 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31166 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31170 | MR | March | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31171 | GD | Gateshead | FP | Finsbury Park | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31173 | GD | Gateshead | FP | Finsbury Park | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31174 | MC | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31184 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | FP | Finsbury Park | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31200 | 34G | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31212 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31213 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31216 | 34G | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31221 | 34G | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31228 | 34G | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31229 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31230 | 41A | Tinsley | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31231 | 41A | Tinsley | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31253 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31255 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31270 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31293 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31308 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31309 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 31312 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
12/04/1975 | Reallocation | 31230 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
12/04/1975 | Reallocation | 31231 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31124 | 51L | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31132 | TE | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31165 | 41A | Tinsley | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31213 | SF | Stratford | FP | Finsbury Park | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31255 | SF | Stratford | FP | Finsbury Park | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31256 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31261 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31262 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31272 | 30A | Stratford | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31287 | GD | Gateshead | TE | Thornaby | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31296 | TE | Thornaby | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31302 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31304 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/05/1975 | Reallocation | 31307 | 41A | Tinsley | TI | Tinsley | |
12/07/1975 | Reallocation | 31244 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
12/07/1975 | Reallocation | 31275 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
12/07/1975 | Reallocation | 31299 | TE | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
12/07/1975 | Reallocation | 31300 | TE | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
12/07/1975 | Reallocation | 31302 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
12/07/1975 | Reallocation | 31303 | 51L | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
04/10/1975 | Condemned | 31150 | 31B | March | COND | ||
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31004 | 30A | Stratford | MR | March | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31418 | CD | Cricklewood East | FP | Finsbury Park | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31148 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31196 | 40B | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31262 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | IM | Immingham | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31419 | CW | Cricklewood East | OC | Old Oak Common | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31272 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31279 | OC | Old Oak Common | MR | March | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31291 | OC | Old Oak Common | MR | March | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31295 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31309 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31316 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
11/10/1975 | Reallocation | 31319 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 31136 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 31229 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 31286 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 31293 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
25/01/1976 | Reallocation | 31004 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
25/01/1976 | Reallocation | 31196 | SF | Stratford | IM | Immingham | |
28/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31421 | CW | Cricklewood East | OC | Old Oak Common | |
29/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31120 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
29/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31124 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
29/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31132 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
29/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31134 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
29/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31167 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
29/02/1976 | Reallocation | 31262 | IM | Immingham | MR | March | |
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 31136 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 31421 | OC | Old Oak Common | OC | Old Oak Common | |
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 31254 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31101 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31102 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31103 | FP | Finsbury Park | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31418 | FP | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31111 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31114 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31115 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | YK | York (North) | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31119 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31120 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31122 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31124 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31129 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31132 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31133 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31134 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31147 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31424 | CW | Cricklewood East | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31159 | FP | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31167 | TI | Tinsley | SF | Stratford | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31168 | 40B | Immingham | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31423 | CW | Cricklewood East | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31209 | FP | Finsbury Park | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31210 | FP | Finsbury Park | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31213 | FP | Finsbury Park | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31411 | 52A | Gateshead | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31288 | GD | Gateshead | IM | Immingham | |
02/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31422 | CW | Cricklewood East | FP | Finsbury Park | |
08/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31209 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31210 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31213 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
16/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31105 | 40B | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
16/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31106 | 40B | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
16/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31268 | 40B | Immingham | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31103 | SF | Stratford | MR | March | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31109 | 40B | Immingham | MR | March | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31195 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31211 | 31B | March | IM | Immingham | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31233 | MR | March | IM | Immingham | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31234 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31237 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
23/05/1976 | Reallocation | 31255 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
10/07/1976 | Condemned | 31018 | 98S | COND | |||
10/07/1976 | Condemned | 31001 | 98S | COND | |||
10/07/1976 | Condemned | 31009 | 98S | COND | |||
10/07/1976 | Condemned | 31010 | 98S | COND | |||
10/07/1976 | Condemned | 31011 | 98S | COND | |||
10/07/1976 | Condemned | 31016 | 98S | COND | |||
18/09/1976 | Reallocation | 31260 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/1976 | Reallocation | 31115 | YK | York (North) | IM | Immingham | |
10/1976 | Reallocation | 31127 | 40B | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
10/1976 | Reallocation | 31131 | 40B | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
10/1976 | Reallocation | 31194 | FP | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
09/10/1976 | Reallocation | 31110 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | TI | Tinsley | |
09/10/1976 | Reallocation | 31112 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | SF | Stratford | |
09/10/1976 | Reallocation | 31123 | YK | York (North) | OC | Old Oak Common | |
09/10/1976 | Reallocation | 31124 | IM | Immingham | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/10/1976 | Reallocation | 31132 | IM | Immingham | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/10/1976 | Reallocation | 31163 | YK | York (North) | OC | Old Oak Common | |
01/11/1976 | Condemned | 31014 | 98S | COND | |||
04/11/1976 | Condemned | 31007 | 98S | COND | |||
04/11/1976 | Condemned | 31012 | 98S | COND | |||
01/1977 | Reallocation | 31109 | MR | March | IM | Immingham | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 31113 | 40B | Immingham | IM | Immingham | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 31171 | FP | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 31181 | 34G | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31108 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31111 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31125 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31145 | 40B | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31146 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31148 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31156 | 40B | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31159 | IM | Immingham | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31166 | TI | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31170 | TI | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31175 | GD | Gateshead | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31178 | GD | Gateshead | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31180 | IM | Immingham | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31200 | TI | Tinsley | MR | March | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31216 | TI | Tinsley | MR | March | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31253 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31265 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31271 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31298 | 41A | Tinsley | GD | Gateshead | |
05/1977 | Reallocation | 31319 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 31128 | 31B | March | TI | Tinsley | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 31131 | YK | York (North) | TI | Tinsley | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 31209 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 31227 | FP | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 31265 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 31298 | GD | Gateshead | TE | Thornaby | |
08/1977 | Reallocation | 31421 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/1977 | Reallocation | 31165 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31125 | MR | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31424 | FP | Finsbury Park | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31161 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31423 | FP | Finsbury Park | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31213 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31229 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | MR | March | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31240 | 31B | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31261 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | MR | March | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31414 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31296 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31416 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31309 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | MR | March | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 31422 | FP | Finsbury Park | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31107 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31109 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31110 | TI | Tinsley | SF | Stratford | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31124 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31125 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31126 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31136 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31137 | TE | Thornaby | SF | Stratford | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31138 | TE | Thornaby | SF | Stratford | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31185 | 34G | Finsbury Park | SF | Stratford | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31240 | FP | Finsbury Park | MR | March | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31254 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31260 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31419 | OC | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31297 | TE | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31298 | TE | Thornaby | TI | Tinsley | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 31324 | FP | Finsbury Park | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
26/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31258 | 81A | Old Oak Common | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31111 | TI | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31146 | TI | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31159 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31166 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31175 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31181 | IM | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31253 | TI | Tinsley | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
27/11/1977 | Reallocation | 31327 | IM | Immingham | YK | York (North) | |
09/01/1978 | Reallocation | 31132 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | OC | Old Oak Common | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31127 | YK | York (North) | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31161 | FP | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31168 | FP | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31174 | FP | Finsbury Park | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31183 | 34G | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31184 | FP | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31186 | 34G | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31187 | 34G | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31195 | MR | March | FP | Finsbury Park | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31214 | FP | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31215 | 34G | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31234 | FP | Finsbury Park | HO | Holbeck (MR) | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31237 | FP | Finsbury Park | GD | Gateshead | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31248 | FP | Finsbury Park | TE | Thornaby | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31266 | MR | March | TE | Thornaby | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 31279 | MR | March | TE | Thornaby | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31131 | TI | Tinsley | OC | Old Oak Common | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31135 | 31B | March | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31154 | 31B | March | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31158 | 31B | March | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31401 | 34G | Finsbury Park | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31193 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | MR | March | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31293 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | MR | March | |
19/02/1978 | Reallocation | 31295 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | MR | March | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 31147 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 31203 | 34G | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 31248 | TE | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 31252 | 41A | Tinsley | FP | Finsbury Park | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 31266 | TE | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 31311 | 51L | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
01/03/1979 | Condemned | 31013 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
10/03/1979 | Reallocation | 31151 | 31B | March | SF | Stratford | |
10/03/1979 | Reallocation | 31156 | SF | Stratford | IM | Immingham | |
10/03/1979 | Reallocation | 31317 | 31B | March | IM | Immingham | |
30/11/1979 | Reallocation | 31171 | IM | Immingham | HM | Healey Mills | |
30/11/1979 | Reallocation | 31245 | 40B | Immingham | HM | Healey Mills | |
30/11/1979 | Reallocation | 31281 | IM | Immingham | HM | Healey Mills | |
01/12/1979 | Condemned | 31254 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
01/01/1980 | Condemned | 31002 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
05/01/1980 | Condemned | 31006 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
03/02/1980 | Condemned | 31003 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
03/02/1980 | Condemned | 31005 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
04/05/1980 | Condemned | 31015 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
04/05/1980 | Condemned | 31017 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
24/08/1980 | Condemned | 31136 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
01/10/1980 | Condemned | 31008 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
05/10/1980 | Condemned | 31004 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
05/10/1980 | Condemned | 31019 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
05/10/1980 | Condemned | 31103 | MR | March | COND | ||
01/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31326 | 98W | 98D | Swindon Works | ||
05/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31175 | TI | Tinsley | YK | York (North) | |
05/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31219 | 34G | Finsbury Park | TI | Tinsley | |
20/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31234 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TI | Tinsley | |
20/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31240 | MR | March | TI | Tinsley | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31114 | SF | Stratford | MR | March | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31130 | TE | Thornaby | IM | Immingham | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31155 | 40B | Immingham | IM | Immingham | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31234 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 31240 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
18/10/1981 | Reallocation | 31149 | 40B | Immingham | TO | Toton | |
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 31120 | IM | Immingham | IM | Immingham | |
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 31173 | FP | Finsbury Park | SF | Stratford | |
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 31266 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 31300 | TI | Tinsley | SF | Stratford | |
07/01/1982 | Reallocation | 31326 | 98D | TO | Toton | ||
14/03/1982 | Condemned | 31241 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
19/09/1982 | Condemned | 31314 | MR | March | COND | ||
10/10/1982 | Condemned | 31192 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
15/05/1983 | Condemned | 31214 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
29/05/1983 | Condemned | 31262 | MR | March | COND | ||
31/05/1983 | Condemned | 31244 | MR | March | COND | ||
31/05/1983 | Condemned | 31313 | 31B | March | COND | ||
12/06/1983 | Condemned | 31111 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
01/10/1986 | Condemned | 31436 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
05/01/1987 | Condemned | 31245 | HM | Healey Mills | COND | ||
05/01/1987 | Condemned | 31261 | MR | March | COND | ||
22/01/1987 | Condemned | 31122 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/03/1987 | Condemned | 31440 | 31B | March | COND | ||
02/03/1987 | Condemned | 31175 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
11/03/1987 | Condemned | 31117 | 81A | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
27/04/1987 | Condemned | 31176 | MC | March | COND | ||
06/07/1987 | Condemned | 97203 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
09/09/1987 | Condemned | 31287 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31106 | SF | Stratford | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31116 | TI | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31118 | 81A | Old Oak Common | IM | Immingham | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31119 | TI | Tinsley | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31120 | IM | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31123 | OC | Old Oak Common | IM | Immingham | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31135 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31421 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | IM | Immingham | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31145 | SF | Stratford | TI | Tinsley | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31149 | TO | Toton | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31156 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31159 | TI | Tinsley | TI | Tinsley | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31165 | OC | Old Oak Common | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31170 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31171 | HM | Healey Mills | TI | Tinsley | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31403 | 34G | Finsbury Park | IM | Immingham | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31181 | YK | York (North) | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31200 | MR | March | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31270 | TI | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31271 | TI | Tinsley | BS | Bescot | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31275 | TI | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31276 | 41A | Tinsley | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31288 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31289 | 52A | Gateshead | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31290 | TE | Thornaby | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31305 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31309 | MR | March | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31311 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31312 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TE | Thornaby | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31319 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31417 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | IM | Immingham | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31323 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31324 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | TE | Thornaby | |
12/10/1987 | Reallocation | 31217 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
04/02/1988 | Condemned | 31195 | FP | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
11/03/1988 | Condemned | 31109 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
31/03/1988 | Condemned | 31401 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | COND | ||
20/04/1988 | Condemned | 31218 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31105 | SF | Stratford | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31466 | IM | Immingham | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31131 | OC | Old Oak Common | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31450 | SF | Stratford | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31134 | IM | Immingham | SF | Stratford | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31438 | TE | Thornaby | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31421 | IM | Immingham | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31448 | SF | Stratford | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31432 | TE | Thornaby | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31424 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31400 | IM | Immingham | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31420 | CW | Cricklewood East | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31402 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31443 | MC | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31435 | MR | March | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31437 | MC | March | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31404 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31405 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31406 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31426 | MR | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31423 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31465 | OC | Old Oak Common | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31215 | IM | Immingham | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31407 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31467 | MR | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31408 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31223 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31225 | 34G | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31227 | TI | Tinsley | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31454 | TI | Tinsley | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31229 | MR | March | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31409 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31230 | OC | Old Oak Common | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31231 | OC | Old Oak Common | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31433 | 31B | March | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31410 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31248 | IM | Immingham | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31249 | FP | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31442 | 31B | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31252 | FP | Finsbury Park | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31255 | MR | March | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31459 | OC | Old Oak Common | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31260 | OC | Old Oak Common | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31411 | FP | Finsbury Park | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31412 | 81A | Old Oak Common | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31264 | FP | Finsbury Park | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31430 | OC | Old Oak Common | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31469 | 51L | Thornaby | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31414 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31286 | OC | Old Oak Common | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31288 | SF | Stratford | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31289 | SF | Stratford | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31445 | SF | Stratford | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31304 | OC | Old Oak Common | SF | Stratford | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31306 | TI | Tinsley | SF | Stratford | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31308 | TI | Tinsley | SF | Stratford | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31416 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31422 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31462 | 31B | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31446 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | BS | Bescot | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31451 | MR | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31468 | MR | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31464 | 31B | March | CD | Crewe Diesel | |
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31183 | IM | Immingham | IM | Immingham | |
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31248 | BS | Bescot | TI | Tinsley | |
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 31304 | SF | Stratford | IM | Immingham | |
05/06/1988 | Reallocation | 31184 | GD | Gateshead | TE | Thornaby | |
08/07/1988 | Condemned | 31183 | 98Su | COND | |||
28/08/1988 | Reallocation | 31231 | CD | Crewe Diesel | IM | Immingham | |
01/09/1988 | Condemned | 31121 | 81A | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
27/09/1988 | Condemned | 31167 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
13/10/1988 | Condemned | 31222 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
24/10/1988 | Condemned | 31280 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
28/10/1988 | Condemned | 31202 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
12/12/1988 | Condemned | 31143 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
16/12/1988 | Condemned | 31227 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
03/01/1989 | Condemned | 31226 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
25/01/1989 | Condemned | 31141 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
02/02/1989 | Condemned | 31138 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
07/02/1989 | Condemned | 31311 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
20/02/1989 | Condemned | 31118 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
02/03/1989 | Condemned | 31259 | 81A | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
07/03/1989 | Condemned | 31225 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
22/03/1989 | Condemned | 31131 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
29/03/1989 | Condemned | 31278 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
14/04/1989 | Condemned | 31173 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
15/05/1989 | Condemned | 31281 | HM | Healey Mills | COND | ||
26/05/1989 | Condemned | 31189 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
01/06/1989 | Condemned | 31152 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
08/06/1989 | Condemned | 31323 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
21/06/1989 | Condemned | 31127 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
01/07/1989 | Condemned | 31443 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
28/07/1989 | Condemned | 31322 | 31B | March | COND | ||
30/08/1989 | Condemned | 31284 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
03/11/1989 | Condemned | 31283 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
08/01/1990 | Condemned | 31170 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
12/01/1990 | Condemned | 31260 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
17/01/1990 | Condemned | 31240 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
22/01/1990 | Condemned | 31231 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
07/02/1990 | Condemned | 31292 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
13/03/1990 | Condemned | 31208 | 31B | March | COND | ||
16/03/1990 | Condemned | 31198 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
28/04/1990 | Condemned | 31320 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
25/05/1990 | Condemned | 31124 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
10/09/1990 | Condemned | 31257 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 31299 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
09/11/1990 | Condemned | 31293 | MR | March | COND | ||
01/01/1991 | Condemned | 31428 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
01/01/1991 | Condemned | 31464 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
04/01/1991 | Condemned | 31406 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
04/01/1991 | Condemned | 31409 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
21/02/1991 | Condemned | 31404 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
08/04/1991 | Condemned | 31243 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
08/04/1991 | Condemned | 31264 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
08/04/1991 | Condemned | 31288 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
08/04/1991 | Condemned | 31309 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/07/1991 | Condemned | 31400 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
30/08/1991 | Condemned | 31221 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/09/1991 | Condemned | 31425 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/09/1991 | Condemned | 31970 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
01/09/1991 | Condemned | 97204 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
27/09/1991 | Condemned | 31108 | MR | March | COND | ||
27/09/1991 | Condemned | 31120 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
01/11/1991 | Condemned | 31429 | 31B | March | COND | ||
08/11/1991 | Condemned | 31305 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
16/12/1991 | Condemned | 31212 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
16/12/1991 | Condemned | 31223 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
16/12/1991 | Condemned | 31249 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
20/12/1991 | Condemned | 31168 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
20/12/1991 | Condemned | 31286 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
28/02/1992 | Condemned | 31156 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/03/1992 | Condemned | 31289 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
16/03/1992 | Condemned | 31123 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
20/03/1992 | Condemned | 31402 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/05/1992 | Condemned | 31162 | 31B | March | COND | ||
01/12/1992 | Condemned | 31460 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
11/01/1993 | Condemned | 31101 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
26/02/1993 | Condemned | 31196 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
16/04/1993 | Condemned | 31324 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
04/06/1993 | Condemned | 31215 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
11/06/1993 | Condemned | 31234 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
08/07/1993 | Condemned | 31217 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/09/1993 | Condemned | 31442 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/12/1993 | Condemned | 31296 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
17/01/1994 | Condemned | 31282 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
01/02/1994 | Condemned | 31457 | MR | March | COND | ||
12/1994 | Condemned | 31125 | MR | March | COND | ||
01/01/1995 | Condemned | 31531 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
01/02/1995 | Condemned | 31569 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
01/05/1995 | Condemned | 31526 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/07/1995 | Condemned | 31548 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/07/1995 | Condemned | 31533 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
01/07/1995 | Condemned | 31415 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
15/08/1995 | Condemned | 31272 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
09/1995 | Condemned | 31119 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/09/1995 | Condemned | 31538 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/10/1995 | Condemned | 31516 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
06/10/1995 | Condemned | 31418 | GD | Gateshead | COND | ||
01/11/1995 | Condemned | 31106 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/11/1995 | Condemned | 31553 | MR | March | COND | ||
01/11/1995 | Condemned | 31435 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
01/11/1995 | Condemned | 31546 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
01/12/1995 | Condemned | 31444 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/12/1995 | Condemned | 31519 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | COND | ||
01/01/1996 | Condemned | 31547 | MR | March | COND | ||
01/01/1996 | Condemned | 31558 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
14/01/1996 | Condemned | 31312 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
01/03/1996 | Condemned | 31541 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
01/03/1996 | Condemned | 31549 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/03/1996 | Condemned | 31551 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/05/1996 | Condemned | 31432 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/05/1996 | Condemned | 31524 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
12/06/1996 | Condemned | 31159 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/09/1996 | Condemned | 31423 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/09/1996 | Condemned | 31455 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
11/1996 | Condemned | 31102 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/03/1997 | Condemned | 31421 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/05/1997 | Condemned | 31105 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
01/05/1997 | Condemned | 31112 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
01/05/1997 | Condemned | 31271 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
01/05/1997 | Condemned | 31413 | 81A | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
01/05/1997 | Condemned | 31545 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
08/1997 | Condemned | 31130 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
01/02/1998 | Condemned | 31563 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/03/1998 | Condemned | 31467 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/04/1998 | Condemned | 31462 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/11/1998 | Condemned | 31434 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | COND | ||
01/12/1998 | Condemned | 31450 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
14/12/1998 | Condemned | 31242 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
19/01/1999 | Condemned | 31163 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
19/01/1999 | Condemned | 31166 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
24/01/1999 | Condemned | 31188 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
01/02/1999 | Condemned | 31427 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
01/02/1999 | Condemned | 31514 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31126 | MR | March | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31134 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31145 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31160 | 31B | March | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31238 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31302 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
14/01/2000 | Condemned | 31304 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
21/01/2000 | Condemned | 31165 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31116 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31135 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31403 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31184 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31247 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31290 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
04/02/2000 | Condemned | 31294 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | COND | ||
11/02/2000 | Condemned | 31250 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
11/02/2000 | Condemned | 31268 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
11/02/2000 | Condemned | 31276 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
18/02/2000 | Condemned | 31205 | 31B | March | COND | ||
18/02/2000 | Condemned | 31219 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
03/03/2000 | Condemned | 31180 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
03/03/2000 | Condemned | 31187 | GD | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/03/2000 | Condemned | 31146 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
24/03/2000 | Condemned | 31201 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
31/03/2000 | Condemned | 31185 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
31/03/2000 | Condemned | 31248 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
31/03/2000 | Condemned | 31252 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
05/05/2000 | Condemned | 31142 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
05/05/2000 | Condemned | 31149 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
05/05/2000 | Condemned | 31199 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
26/05/2000 | Condemned | 31155 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
26/05/2000 | Condemned | 31232 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
26/05/2000 | Condemned | 31235 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
26/05/2000 | Condemned | 31270 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
16/06/2000 | Condemned | 31132 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
16/06/2000 | Condemned | 31237 | GD | Gateshead | COND | ||
23/06/2000 | Condemned | 31178 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
30/06/2000 | Condemned | 31224 | 34G | Finsbury Park | COND | ||
07/07/2000 | Condemned | 31158 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | COND | ||
01/01/2001 | Condemned | 31420 | BS | Bescot | COND | ||
01/02/2001 | Condemned | 31466 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
12/04/2001 | Condemned | 31273 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
10/08/2001 | Condemned | 31229 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
10/08/2001 | Condemned | 31263 | MR | March | COND | ||
13/03/2003 | Condemned | 31181 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
15/05/2003 | Condemned | 31209 | OC | Old Oak Common | COND | ||
30/06/2003 | Condemned | 31410 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
31/10/2003 | Condemned | 31171 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
30/07/2004 | Condemned | 31113 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
31/01/2005 | Condemned | 31275 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
30/11/2005 | Condemned | 31511 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
30/11/2005 | Condemned | 31417 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
31/05/2006 | Condemned | 31110 | SF | Stratford | COND | ||
31/05/2006 | Condemned | 31154 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | COND | ||
31/05/2006 | Condemned | 31507 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
31/05/2006 | Condemned | 31512 | CD | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
30/11/2006 | Condemned | 31206 | 31B | March | COND | ||
30/04/2007 | Condemned | 31319 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
30/06/2007 | Condemned | 31200 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
31/10/2008 | Condemned | 31107 | SF | Stratford | COND |