31 A1A-A1A
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (31/1) | BR (31/4) | BR (31/0) | BR (Dept) | BR (97/2) | BR (31/9) | BR (31/5) | BR (31/4 (2)) | BR (31/5 (2)) | BR (31/6) | Date To Service | Bld | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5522 | 31104 | 31418 | 12/03/1959 | BH | 18/11/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 06/10/1995 | 36.58 | Prs | Preserved | 64.85 | |||||||||||
D5532 | 31114 | 31453 | 31553 | 04/06/1959 | BH | 14/11/1967 from 30 |
Norwich Thorpe | 01/11/1995 | 36.42 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 12/2001 | 42.56 | |||||||||
D5533 | 31115 | 31466 | 04/06/1959 | BH | 10/05/1968 from 30 |
Norwich Thorpe | 01/02/2001 | 41.67 | Prs | Preserved | 64.62 | |||||||||||
D5547 | 31129 | 31461 | 27/08/1959 | BH | 01/1968 from 30 |
Ipswich | 64.39 | |||||||||||||||
D5551 | 31133 | 31450 | 10/09/1959 | BH | 10/1967 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/12/1998 | 39.25 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 04/1999 | 39.62 | ||||||||||
D5555 | 31137 | 31444 | 31544 | 31444 | 01/10/1959 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/12/1995 | 36.17 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 03/2001 | 41.48 | ||||||||
D5557 | 31139 | 31438 | 31538 | 15/10/1959 | BH | 03/1965 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/09/1995 | 35.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.25 | ||||||||||
D5558 | 31140 | 31421 | 22/10/1959 | BH | 02/1968 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/03/1997 | 37.42 | Prs | Preserved | 47.85 | |||||||||||
D5566 | 31148 | 31448 | 31548 | 19/11/1959 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/07/1995 | 35.67 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 06/2001 | 41.60 | |||||||||
D5569 | 31151 | 31436 | 03/12/1959 | BH | 03/1967 from 30 |
Hornsey | 01/10/1986 | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 02/1988 | 28.22 | ||||||||||
D5571 | 31153 | 31432 | 10/12/1959 | BH | 08/1965 from 30 |
March | 01/05/1996 | 36.42 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 06/2001 | 41.54 | ||||||||||
D5575 | 31157 | 31424 | 31524 | 23/12/1959 | BH | 25/04/1968 from 30 |
Norwich Thorpe | 01/05/1996 | 36.42 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2006 | 46.68 | |||||||||
D5587 | 31169 | 31457 | 04/02/1960 | BH | 08/1965 from 30 |
Hornsey | 01/02/1994 | 34 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1994 | 34.13 | ||||||||||
D5589 | 31401 | 11/02/1960 | BH | 25/05/1968 from 30 |
Hornsey | 31/03/1988 | 28.08 | Cut | C F Booth (at Doncaster Works) | 09/1988 | 28.61 | |||||||||||
D5591 | 31172 | 31420 | 18/02/1960 | BH | 13/11/1965 from 30 |
Hornsey | 01/01/2001 | 40.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2007 | 47.44 | ||||||||||
D5592 | 31402 | 25/02/1960 | BH | 25/05/1968 from 30 |
Hornsey | 20/03/1992 | 32.08 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2002 | 42.75 | |||||||||||
D5596 | 31403 | 10/03/1960 | BH | 07/1966 from 30 |
Hornsey | 04/02/2000 | 39.92 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 06/2003 | 43.29 | |||||||||||
D5598 | 31177 | 31443 | 17/03/1960 | BH | 10/1967 from 30 |
Hornsey | 01/07/1989 | 29.33 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 04/1990 | 30.10 | ||||||||||
D5600 | 31179 | 31435 | 24/03/1960 | BH | 03/1967 from 30 |
Hornsey | 01/11/1995 | 35.67 | Prs | Preserved | 63.81 | |||||||||||
D5603 | 31182 | 31437 | 31537 | 31437 | 31/03/1960 | BH | 04/1967 from 30 |
Hornsey | 63.79 | |||||||||||||
D5605 | 31404 | 07/04/1960 | BH | 04/1966 from 30 |
Hornsey | 21/02/1991 | 30.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1994 | 33.96 | |||||||||||
D5606 | 31405 | 14/04/1960 | BH | 05/1966 from 30 |
Hornsey | Cut | EMR (at Doncaster Carr MPD) | 03/2000 | 39.95 | |||||||||||||
D5614 | 31191 | 31602 | 12/05/1960 | BH | 05/1966 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 63.68 | |||||||||||||||
D5616 | 31406 | 19/05/1960 | BH | 11/12/1965 from 30 |
Stratford | 04/01/1991 | 30.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 12/1991 | 31.59 | |||||||||||
D5617 | 31193 | 31426 | 31526 | 31426 | 19/05/1960 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/05/1995 | 35 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2006 | 46.52 | ||||||||
D5618 | 31194 | 31427 | 26/05/1960 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/02/1999 | 38.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2007 | 47.25 | ||||||||||
D5621 | 31197 | 31423 | 02/06/1960 | BH | 04/04/1968 from 30 |
March | 01/09/1996 | 36.25 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 09/2009 | 49.32 | ||||||||||
D5628 | 31204 | 31440 | 30/06/1960 | BH | 10/1967 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/03/1987 | 26.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1988 | 27.73 | ||||||||||
D5635 | 31211 | 31428 | 21/07/1960 | BH | 04/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/01/1991 | 30.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 12/2001 | 41.43 | ||||||||||
D5637 | 31213 | 31465 | 31565 | 31465 | 28/07/1960 | BH | 25/08/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 63.47 | |||||||||||||
D5640 | 31407 | 31507 | 18/08/1960 | BH | 24/09/1966 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 31/05/2006 | 45.75 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 10/2006 | 46.19 | ||||||||||
D5641 | 31216 | 31467 | 18/08/1960 | BH | 21/03/1968 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 01/03/1998 | 37.58 | Prs | Preserved | 48.02 | |||||||||||
D5645 | 31220 | 31441 | 31541 | 01/09/1960 | BH | 03/1965 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 01/03/1996 | 35.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) | 02/2002 | 41.48 | |||||||||
D5646 | 31408 | 01/09/1960 | BH | 03/1966 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 03/2001 | 40.56 | |||||||||||||
D5654 | 31228 | 31454 | 31554 | 31454 | 29/09/1960 | BH | 18/11/1967 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 63.29 | |||||||||||||
D5656 | 31409 | 06/10/1960 | BH | 23/07/1968 from 30 |
March | 04/01/1991 | 30.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1992 | 31.46 | |||||||||||
D5663 | 31236 | 31433 | 31533 | 31433 | 03/11/1960 | BH | 03/1967 from 30 |
March | 01/07/1995 | 34.67 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 09/2006 | 45.90 | ||||||||
D5666 | 31239 | 31439 | 10/11/1960 | BH | 10/1967 from 30 |
March | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 63.18 | |||||||||||||
D5669 | 31410 | 24/11/1960 | BH | 10/12/1968 from 30 |
March | 30/06/2003 | 42.58 | Prs | Preserved | 44.09 | ||||||||||||
D5674 | 31246 | 31455 | 31555 | 31455 | 01/12/1960 | BH | 18/11/1967 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 01/09/1996 | 35.75 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 02/2000 | 39.23 | ||||||||
D5679 | 31251 | 31442 | 22/12/1960 | BH | 01/1968 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 01/09/1993 | 32.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2004 | 43.76 | ||||||||||
D5681 | 31253 | 31431 | 31531 | 05/01/1961 | BH | 08/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1995 | 34 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 07/2003 | 42.55 | |||||||||
D5684 | 31256 | 31459 | 26/01/1961 | BH | 04/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 62.97 | |||||||||||||||
D5686 | 31258 | 31434 | 09/02/1961 | BH | 11/09/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/11/1998 | 37.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/2003 | 42.21 | ||||||||||
D5691 | 31411 | 31511 | 16/03/1961 | BH | 05/1966 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 30/11/2005 | 44.67 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 11/2005 | 44.70 | ||||||||||
D5692 | 31412 | 31512 | 23/03/1961 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 31/05/2006 | 45.17 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 10/2006 | 45.59 | ||||||||||
D5695 | 31265 | 31430 | 31530 | 20/04/1961 | BH | 06/11/1968 from 30 |
Stratford | Prs | Preserved | 62.74 | ||||||||||||
D5696 | 31266 | 31460 | 04/05/1961 | BH | 09/12/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/12/1992 | 31.58 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 01/2007 | 45.73 | ||||||||||
D5697 | 31267 | 31419 | 31519 | 11/05/1961 | BH | 26/06/1965 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/12/1995 | 34.58 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 03/2001 | 39.87 | |||||||||
D5699 | 31269 | 31429 | 27/04/1961 | BH | 04/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/11/1991 | 30.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1993 | 31.99 | ||||||||||
D5804 | 31274 | 31425 | 29/06/1961 | BH | 03/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/09/1991 | 30.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1994 | 32.98 | ||||||||||
D5807 | 31277 | 31469 | 31569 | 20/07/1961 | BH | 07/1966 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1995 | 33.58 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 06/2003 | 41.93 | |||||||||
D5809 | 31279 | 31452 | 31552 | 31452 | 27/07/1961 | BH | 07/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 62.47 | |||||||||||||
D5812 | 31413 | 31/08/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/05/1997 | 35.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1998 | 36.40 | |||||||||||
D5814 | 31414 | 31514 | 14/09/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1999 | 37.42 | Prs | Preserved | 62.33 | |||||||||||
D5823 | 31291 | 31456 | 31556 | 31456 | 31556 | 16/11/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | Prs | Preserved | 48.20 | ||||||||||
D5824 | 31415 | 23/11/1961 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/07/1995 | 33.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/2009 | 47.59 | |||||||||||
D5828 | 31295 | 31447 | 31547 | 28/12/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1996 | 34.08 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2002 | 40.91 | |||||||||
D5830 | 31297 | 31463 | 31563 | 11/01/1962 | BH | 10/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1998 | 36.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.01 | ||||||||||
D5833 | 31300 | 31445 | 31545 | 15/02/1962 | BH | 08/12/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/05/1997 | 35.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 10/2002 | 40.69 | |||||||||
D5836 | 31303 | 31458 | 31558 | 31458 | 12/04/1962 | BH | 01/1968 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1996 | 33.75 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 12/2005 | 43.71 | ||||||||
D5840 | 31307 | 31449 | 31549 | 31449 | 10/05/1962 | BH | 13/11/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/03/1996 | 33.83 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 02/2005 | 42.80 | ||||||||
D5842 | 31416 | 31516 | 24/05/1962 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/10/1995 | 33.42 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 10/2001 | 39.42 | ||||||||||
D5844 | 31310 | 31422 | 31522 | 07/06/1962 | BH | 11/09/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 61.61 | ||||||||||||||
D5849 | 31315 | 31462 | 12/07/1962 | BH | 04/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/04/1998 | 35.75 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 07/2006 | 44.04 | ||||||||||
D5850 | 31316 | 31446 | 31546 | 18/07/1962 | BH | 04/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/11/1995 | 33.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 04/2003 | 40.77 | |||||||||
D5852 | 31318 | 31451 | 31551 | 02/08/1962 | BH | 30/11/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/03/1996 | 33.58 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 09/1998 | 36.15 | |||||||||
D5855 | 31321 | 31468 | 31568 | 31468 | 30/08/1962 | BH | 08/1965 from 30 |
March | 61.38 | |||||||||||||
D5856 | 31417 | 30/08/1962 | BH | 01/1966 from 30 |
March | 30/11/2005 | 43.25 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 01/2006 | 43.41 | |||||||||||
D5860 | 31325 | 31464 | 11/10/1962 | BH | 02/1968 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1991 | 28.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/1991 | 29.03 |