73 Bo-Bo
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6007 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6008 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6009 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6010 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6011 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6012 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6013 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6014 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6015 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6016 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6017 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6018 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6019 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6020 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6021 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6022 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6023 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6024 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6025 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6026 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6027 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 6028 | 70D | Eastleigh | |||
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6007 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6008 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6009 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6010 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6011 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6012 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6013 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6014 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6015 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6016 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6017 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6018 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6019 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6020 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6021 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6022 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6023 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6024 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6025 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6026 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6027 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 6028 | 70D | Eastleigh | 75D | Stewarts Lane | |
16/07/1972 | Condemned | 6027 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | COND | ||
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73118 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73122 | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |||
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73207 | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |||
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73123 | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |||
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73206 | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |||
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73134 | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |||
04/08/1981 | Reallocation | 73136 | 98Ss | Ramsgate | |||
01/09/1981 | Reallocation | 73123 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Hither Green | ||
01/09/1981 | Reallocation | 73206 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Hither Green | ||
11/1981 | Reallocation | 73118 | 98Ss | SL | Stewarts Lane | ||
11/1981 | Reallocation | 73122 | 98Ss | SL | Stewarts Lane | ||
11/1981 | Reallocation | 73207 | 98Ss | SL | Stewarts Lane | ||
11/1981 | Reallocation | 73123 | 98Ss | SL | Stewarts Lane | ||
11/1981 | Reallocation | 73206 | 98Ss | SL | Stewarts Lane |