33 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (33/3) | BR (Revert) | BR (Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6500 | 33001 | 30/01/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
30/01/1960 07/02/1966 17/03/1988 |
17/03/1988 | ||
D6501 | 33002 | 27/02/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
27/02/1960 25/10/1965 01/09/1996 |
01/09/1996 | ||
D6502 | 12/03/1960 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
12/03/1960 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |||
D6503 | 33003 | 19/03/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
19/03/1960 25/10/1965 05/08/1987 |
05/08/1987 | ||
D6504 | 33004 | 26/03/1960 | 73C 34G 73C 71A 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Finsbury Park Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Withdrawn |
26/03/1960 18/02/1961 25/02/1961 27/08/1962 27/04/1964 20/11/1964 21/06/1991 |
21/06/1991 | ||
D6505 | 33005 | 09/04/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
09/04/1960 27/08/1962 25/06/1987 |
25/06/1987 | ||
D6506 | 33006 | 23/04/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
23/04/1960 27/08/1962 06/08/1991 |
06/08/1991 | ||
D6507 | 33007 | 04/05/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/05/1960 25/10/1965 10/12/1986 |
10/12/1986 | ||
D6508 | 33008 | 21/05/1960 | 73C 71A 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Withdrawn |
21/05/1960 27/08/1962 27/04/1964 10/05/1965 01/02/1996 |
01/02/1996 | ||
D6509 | 33009 | 21/05/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
21/05/1960 25/10/1965 13/03/1993 |
13/03/1993 | ||
D6510 | 33010 | 04/06/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/06/1960 07/03/1966 18/04/1988 |
18/04/1988 | ||
D6511 | 33101 | 04/06/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/06/1960 07/02/1966 24/05/1993 |
24/05/1993 | ||
D6512 | 33011 | 18/06/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
18/06/1960 22/07/1963 23/03/1989 |
23/03/1989 | ||
D6513 | 33102 | 25/06/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
25/06/1960 15/05/1967 06/11/1992 |
06/11/1992 | ||
D6514 | 33103 | 02/07/1960 | 73C 70D |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
02/07/1960 02/05/1966 |
|||
D6515 | 33012 | 08/07/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/07/1960 25/10/1965 01/02/1997 |
01/02/1997 | ||
D6516 | 33104 | 15/07/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
15/07/1960 04/04/1966 16/12/1985 |
16/12/1985 | ||
D6517 | 33105 | 22/07/1960 | 73C 34E 70D W |
Hither Green (New) New England Eastleigh Withdrawn |
22/07/1960 16/12/1961 07/03/1966 27/10/1987 |
27/10/1987 | ||
D6518 | 33013 | 19/08/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
19/08/1960 02/05/1966 14/03/1989 |
14/03/1989 | ||
D6519 | 33106 | 27/08/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
27/08/1960 02/05/1966 16/11/1990 |
16/11/1990 | ||
D6520 | 33107 | 03/09/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
03/09/1960 22/07/1963 16/05/1989 |
16/05/1989 | ||
D6521 | 33108 | 11/09/1960 | 73C 71A |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
11/09/1960 22/07/1963 |
|||
D6522 | 33014 | 17/09/1960 | 73C 70D 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Withdrawn |
17/09/1960 07/03/1966 18/03/1968 23/09/1968 17/02/1986 |
17/02/1986 | ||
D6523 | 33015 | 24/09/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
24/09/1960 22/07/1963 28/07/1989 |
28/07/1989 | ||
D6524 | 33016 | 01/10/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/10/1960 22/07/1963 04/10/1989 |
04/10/1989 | ||
D6525 | 33109 | 08/10/1960 | 73C 71A |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
08/10/1960 22/07/1963 |
|||
D6526 | 33017 | 15/10/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
15/10/1960 22/07/1963 05/01/1988 |
05/01/1988 | ||
D6527 | 33110 | 22/10/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
22/10/1960 22/07/1963 01/09/1992 |
01/09/1992 | ||
D6528 | 33111 | 29/10/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
29/10/1960 21/12/1964 24/06/1991 |
24/06/1991 | ||
D6529 | 33112 | 05/11/1960 | 73C 70D 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Withdrawn |
05/11/1960 10/01/1966 07/02/1966 17/04/1967 11/11/1988 |
11/11/1988 | ||
D6530 | 33018 | 12/11/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/11/1960 27/08/1962 01/02/1988 |
01/02/1988 | ||
D6531 | 33113 | 22/11/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
22/11/1960 22/08/1966 09/10/1992 |
09/10/1992 | ||
D6532 | 33114 | 19/11/1960 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
19/11/1960 18/01/1965 01/02/1993 |
01/02/1993 | ||
D6533 | 33115 | 03/12/1960 | 73C 71A SL W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
03/12/1960 27/08/1962 04/10/1987 10/05/1989 |
10/05/1989 | ||
D6534 | 33019 | 03/12/1960 | 73C 71A |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
03/12/1960 22/07/1963 |
|||
D6535 | 33116 | 10/12/1960 | 73C 70D SL |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Stewarts Lane |
10/12/1960 21/12/1964 04/10/1987 |
|||
D6536 | 33117 | 17/12/1960 | 73C 71A SL W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
17/12/1960 27/08/1962 04/10/1987 01/05/1993 |
01/05/1993 | ||
D6537 | 33020 | 31/12/1960 | 73C 71A W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
31/12/1960 22/07/1963 20/04/1993 |
20/04/1993 | ||
D6538 | 33118 | 07/01/1961 | 73C 70D SL W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
07/01/1961 22/08/1966 04/10/1987 16/04/1993 |
16/04/1993 | ||
D6539 | 33021 | 14/01/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh |
14/01/1961 22/08/1966 17/04/1967 10/10/1967 |
|||
D6540 | 33022 | 21/01/1961 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
21/01/1961 17/08/1964 24/12/1989 |
24/12/1989 | ||
D6541 | 33023 | 28/01/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Withdrawn |
28/01/1961 17/08/1964 10/05/1965 25/10/1965 31/05/2005 |
31/05/2005 | ||
D6542 | 33024 | 04/02/1961 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/02/1961 22/08/1966 17/02/1986 |
17/02/1986 | ||
D6543 | 33025 | 10/02/1961 | 73C 70D |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
10/02/1961 19/09/1966 |
|||
D6544 | 33026 | 25/02/1961 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
25/02/1961 18/01/1965 31/08/2003 |
31/08/2003 | ||
D6545 | 33027 | 08/03/1961 | 73C 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/03/1961 21/12/1964 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||
D6546 | 33028 | 18/03/1961 | 73C 71A 70D W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
18/03/1961 27/08/1962 27/01/1964 05/10/1988 |
05/10/1988 | ||
D6547 | 33029 | 25/03/1961 | 73C 70D |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
25/03/1961 23/09/1968 |
|||
D6548 | 33030 | 01/04/1961 | 73C 70D |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh |
01/04/1961 18/01/1965 |
|||
D6549 | 33031 | 01/04/1961 | 73C 71A 73C 70D EH W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/04/1961 27/08/1962 29/04/1971 30/09/1971 26/09/1973 30/06/1974 06/02/1989 |
06/02/1989 | ||
D6550 | 33032 | 13/04/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D EH W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
13/04/1961 25/10/1965 29/04/1971 30/09/1971 26/09/1973 18/04/1975 25/03/1987 |
25/03/1987 | ||
D6551 | 33033 | 20/04/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D HG EH HG EH HG W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
20/04/1961 12/12/1966 29/04/1971 30/09/1971 19/07/1973 18/04/1975 04/10/1976 01/11/1976 10/1977 17/05/1993 |
17/05/1993 | ||
D6552 | 33034 | 24/04/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D 73C 70D HG W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
24/04/1961 17/10/1966 21/05/1968 01/01/1969 29/04/1971 30/09/1971 18/05/1973 25/01/1988 |
25/01/1988 | ||
D6553 | 33035 | 06/05/1961 | 73C 34E 73C 16C 73C 82A 73C 70D 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) New England (on loan) Hither Green Derby (on loan) Hither Green Bristol Bath Road (on loan) Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
06/05/1961 27/07/1963 09/1963 25/01/1964 31/01/1964 03/1964 04/1964 18/01/1967 22/12/1970 30/09/1971 02/05/1973 01/10/1996 |
01/10/1996 | ||
D6554 | 33036 | 13/05/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
13/05/1961 18/01/1967 30/10/1970 29/12/1971 31/01/1972 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 | ||
D6555 | 33037 | 20/05/1961 | 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
20/05/1961 01/01/1969 30/10/1970 23/09/1987 |
23/09/1987 | ||
D6556 | 33038 | 01/06/1961 | 73C 34E 73C 71A 73C W |
Hither Green (New) New England (on loan) Hither Green Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/06/1961 12/11/1961 03/12/1961 27/08/1962 25/10/1965 05/10/1988 |
05/10/1988 | ||
D6557 | 33039 | 03/06/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
03/06/1961 18/05/1989 |
18/05/1989 | ||
D6558 | 33040 | 10/06/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
10/06/1961 14/05/1993 |
14/05/1993 | ||
D6559 | 33041 | 24/06/1961 | 73C 34G 34E 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Finsbury Park (on loan) New England (on loan) Hither Green Withdrawn |
24/06/1961 02/12/1961 09/12/1961 23/12/1961 30/11/1975 |
30/11/1975 | ||
D6560 | 33042 | 15/07/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
15/07/1961 08/10/1996 |
08/10/1996 | ||
D6561 | 33043 | 08/07/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
08/07/1961 23/09/1987 |
23/09/1987 | ||
D6562 | 33044 | 15/07/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
15/07/1961 11/09/1987 |
11/09/1987 | ||
D6563 | 33045 | 22/07/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
22/07/1961 30/10/1987 |
30/10/1987 | ||
D6564 | 33046 | 29/07/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
29/07/1961 31/03/2007 |
31/03/2007 | ||
D6565 | 33047 | 19/08/1961 | 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
19/08/1961 17/10/1966 17/10/1966 12/02/1993 |
12/02/1993 | ||
D6566 | 33048 | 26/08/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
26/08/1961 13/02/1997 |
13/02/1997 | ||
D6567 | 33049 | 09/09/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
09/09/1961 28/03/1988 |
28/03/1988 | ||
D6568 | 33050 | 09/09/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
09/09/1961 14/05/1993 |
14/05/1993 | ||
D6569 | 33051 | 16/09/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
16/09/1961 31/08/2003 |
31/08/2003 | ||
D6570 | 33052 | 30/09/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
30/09/1961 13/02/1997 |
13/02/1997 | ||
D6571 | 33053 | 14/10/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
14/10/1961 01/01/1995 |
01/01/1995 | ||
D6572 | 33054 | 14/10/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
14/10/1961 17/12/1986 |
17/12/1986 | ||
D6573 | 33055 | 04/11/1961 | 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
04/11/1961 10/01/1966 15/05/1967 24/12/1989 |
24/12/1989 | ||
D6574 | 33056 | 28/10/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
28/10/1961 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 | ||
D6575 | 33057 | 04/11/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
04/11/1961 31/08/2005 |
31/08/2005 | ||
D6576 | 11/11/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
11/11/1961 03/11/1968 |
03/11/1968 | |||
D6577 | 33058 | 18/11/1961 | 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
18/11/1961 17/10/1966 12/12/1966 21/06/1991 |
21/06/1991 | ||
D6578 | 33059 | 25/11/1961 | 73C 71A 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
25/11/1961 22/07/1963 23/09/1968 27/09/1988 |
27/09/1988 | ||
D6579 | 33060 | 02/12/1961 | 73C 70D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
02/12/1961 18/03/1968 23/09/1968 29/10/1990 |
29/10/1990 | ||
D6580 | 33119 | 09/12/1961 | 73C 70D 73C 70D SL W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
09/12/1961 25/10/1965 22/11/1965 10/10/1967 04/10/1987 26/10/1989 |
26/10/1989 | ||
D6581 | 33061 | 16/12/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
16/12/1961 25/06/1987 |
25/06/1987 | ||
D6582 | 33062 | 23/12/1961 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
23/12/1961 23/09/1987 |
23/09/1987 | ||
D6583 | 33063 | 06/01/1962 | 73C 71A 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
06/01/1962 27/08/1962 10/10/1967 13/02/1997 |
13/02/1997 | ||
D6584 | 33064 | 13/01/1962 | 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Withdrawn |
13/01/1962 15/10/1994 |
15/10/1994 | ||
D6585 | 33065 | 13/01/1962 | 73C 71A 73C W |
Hither Green (New) Eastleigh Hither Green Withdrawn |
13/01/1962 27/08/1962 10/10/1967 13/02/1997 |
13/02/1997 | ||
D6586 | 33201 | 02/02/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
02/02/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 01/10/1993 |
01/10/1993 | ||
D6587 | 33202 | 09/02/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
09/02/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 01/09/2007 |
01/09/2007 | ||
D6588 | 33203 | 16/02/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
16/02/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 19/04/1991 |
19/04/1991 | ||
D6589 | 33204 | 23/02/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
23/02/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 13/02/1997 |
13/02/1997 | ||
D6590 | 33302 | 33205 | 33205 | 23/02/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
23/02/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 27/07/1992 |
27/07/1992 |
D6591 | 33206 | 09/03/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
09/03/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 08/10/1996 |
08/10/1996 | ||
D6592 | 33207 | 16/03/1962 | 73C 73D 73C |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green |
16/03/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 |
|||
D6593 | 33208 | 23/03/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
23/03/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 01/02/1997 |
01/02/1997 | ||
D6594 | 33209 | 30/03/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
30/03/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 02/12/1988 |
02/12/1988 | ||
D6595 | 33210 | 13/04/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
13/04/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 05/08/1987 |
05/08/1987 | ||
D6596 | 33211 | 27/04/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
27/04/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 01/10/1993 |
01/10/1993 | ||
D6597 | 33212 | 11/05/1962 | 73C 73D 73C W |
Hither Green (New) St Leonards Hither Green Withdrawn |
11/05/1962 22/07/1963 20/10/1967 11/09/1987 |
11/09/1987 |