Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 396 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5365 Week
» 17878 Month
» 106070 Year
» 990451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Adams "O2" Class 0-4-4T


Class LSWR SR (Pfx) SR (IOW) SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
O2 177 177   177 30177 12/1889 DOR
71A
70B
W
Dorchester
Eastleigh
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/05/1953
17/11/1956
10/1959
10/1959
O2 178 178 14 178   12/1889 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 179 179   179 30179 03/1890 9E
70A
71A
70B
W
Nine Elms
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/12/1953
08/02/1954
17/11/1956
12/1959
12/1959
O2 180 180 31     04/1890 W Withdrawn 03/1967 03/1967
O2 181 181 35 181   05/1890 W Withdrawn 10/1966 10/1966
O2 182 182   182 30182 05/1890 PLY
72C
72A
W
Plymouth Friary
Yeovil Town
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1953
13/10/1958
01/1960
01/1960
O2 183 183   183 30183 05/1890 PLY
71D
72D
72A
72D
W
Plymouth Friary
Fratton
Plymouth Friary
Exmouth Junction
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
29/10/1953
15/06/1956
19/07/1957
09/1961
09/1961
O2 184 184 27     06/1890 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 185 185   185   06/1890 W Withdrawn 05/1940 05/1940
O2 186 186 28     07/1890 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 187 187   187   10/1890 W Withdrawn 08/1945 08/1945
O2 188 188 23     10/1890 W Withdrawn 08/1955 08/1955
O2 189 189   189   10/1890 W Withdrawn 07/1933 07/1933
O2 190 190 25     11/1890 W Withdrawn 30/12/1962 30/12/1962
O2 191 191       11/1890 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
O2 192 192   192 30192 11/1890 EXJ
72F
72D
W
Exmouth Junction
Wadebridge
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
27/03/1953
08/1961
08/1961
O2 193 193   193 30193 11/1890 EXJ
70B
72A
72D
W
Exmouth Junction
Feltham
Exmouth Junction
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/12/1953
08/02/1954
12/06/1957
04/1962
04/1962
O2 194 194       12/1890 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
O2 195 195 15 195   12/1890 W Withdrawn 05/1956 05/1956
O2 196 196   196   03/1891 W Withdrawn 11/1937 11/1937
O2 197 197   197 30197 06/1891 PLY
W
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
O2 198 198 36 198   06/1891 W Withdrawn 06/1964 06/1964
O2 199 199   199 30199 06/1891 EXJ
72D
72A
71A
W
Exmouth Junction
Plymouth Friary
Exmouth Junction
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1957
19/07/1957
09/11/1961
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
O2 200 200   200 30200 06/1891 ELH
71A
83H
W
Eastleigh
Eastleigh
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/03/1961
21/04/1962
08/1962
08/1962
O2 201 201 34 201   07/1891 W Withdrawn 08/1955 08/1955
O2 202 202 29     07/1891 W Withdrawn 05/1966 05/1966
O2 203 203   203 30203 08/1891 WAD
W
Wadebridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1955
12/1955
O2 204 204   204 30204 08/1891 9E
W
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1953
01/1953
O2 205 205 21     09/1891 W Withdrawn 05/1966 05/1966
O2 206 206 19     09/1891 W Withdrawn 11/1955 11/1955
O2 207 207   207 30207 12/1891 EXJ
71D
W
Exmouth Junction
Fratton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1953
06/1957
06/1957
O2 208 208 17     12/1891 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 209 209 24     12/1891 W Withdrawn 03/1967 03/1967
O2 210 210 26     12/1891 W Withdrawn 05/1966 05/1966
O2 211 211 20     03/1892 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 212 212   212 30212 05/1892 9E
71A
W
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
12/1959
12/1959
O2 213 213   213 30213 05/1892 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
O2 214 214   214   06/1892 W Withdrawn 07/1940 07/1940
O2 215 215 22     06/1892 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 216 216   216 30216 06/1892 PLY
W
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1957
11/1957
O2 217 217 16 217   06/1892 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 218 218 33     08/1892 W Withdrawn 12/1966 12/1966
O2 219 219 30     09/1892 W Withdrawn 09/1965 09/1965
O2 220 220 18     09/1892 W Withdrawn 12/1965 12/1965
O2 221 221   221 30221 09/1892 DOR
W
Dorchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1953
08/1953
O2 222 222       09/1892 W Withdrawn 02/1933 02/1933
O2 223 223   223 30223 10/1892 DOR
71B
71A
W
Dorchester
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1952
17/11/1956
10/1961
10/1961
O2 224 224   224 30224 10/1892 EXJ
70A
W
Exmouth Junction
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/08/1953
02/1958
02/1958
O2 225 225   225 30225 11/1892 ELH
72D
71A
W
Eastleigh
Plymouth Friary
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/05/1954
02/1962
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
O2 226 226 32     11/1892 W Withdrawn 10/1964 10/1964
O2 227 227       11/1894 W Withdrawn 06/1933 06/1933
O2 228 228   228   12/1894 W Withdrawn 08/1943 08/1943
O2 229 229   229 30229 12/1894 DOR
71A
W
Dorchester
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
03/1961
03/1961
O2 230 230   230 30230 12/1894 EXJ
71C
70B
W
Exmouth Junction
Dorchester
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
19/03/1952
07/1956
07/1956
O2 231 231   231 30231 12/1894 ELH
71C
W
Eastleigh
Dorchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
02/1953
02/1953
O2 232 232   232 30232 01/1895 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1959
09/1959
O2 233 233   233 30233 01/1895 DOR
W
Dorchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1958
02/1958
O2 234 234   234   02/1895 W Withdrawn 03/1937 03/1937
O2 235 235       03/1895 W Withdrawn 02/1933 02/1933
O2 236 236   236 30236 03/1895 PLY
72F
W
Plymouth Friary
Wadebridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1955
01/1960
01/1960