Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 64 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 64 Week
» 18385 Month
» 106577 Year
» 990958 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Adams "O2" Class 0-4-4T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
02/1933 Condemned 222       COND  
02/1933 Condemned 235       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 191       COND  
06/1933 Condemned 227       COND  
07/1933 Condemned 189       COND  
08/1933 Condemned 194       COND  
03/1937 Condemned 234       COND  
11/1937 Condemned 196       COND  
05/1940 Condemned 185       COND  
07/1940 Condemned 214       COND  
08/1943 Condemned 228       COND  
08/1945 Condemned 187       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 177     DOR Dorchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 179     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 182     PLY Plymouth Friary  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 183     PLY Plymouth Friary  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 192     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 193     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 197     PLY Plymouth Friary  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 199     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 200     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 203     WAD Wadebridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 204     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 207     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 212     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 213     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 216     PLY Plymouth Friary  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 221     DOR Dorchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 223     DOR Dorchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 224     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 225     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 229     DOR Dorchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 230     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 231     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 232     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 233     DOR Dorchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 236     PLY Plymouth Friary  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30231 ELH Eastleigh 71C Dorchester  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30229 DOR Dorchester 71A Eastleigh  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30192 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72F Wadebridge  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30230 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71C Dorchester  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30230 71C Dorchester 70B Feltham  
13/08/1952 Reallocation 30223 DOR Dorchester 71B Bournemouth  
01/1953 Condemned 30204 9E Nine Elms   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 30197 PLY Plymouth Friary   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 30213 ELH Eastleigh   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 30231 71C Dorchester   COND  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30182 PLY Plymouth Friary 72C Yeovil Town  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30192 72F Wadebridge 72D Plymouth Friary  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30207 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 30177 DOR Dorchester 71A Eastleigh  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30183 PLY Plymouth Friary 71D Fratton  
08/1953 Condemned 30221 DOR Dorchester   COND  
24/08/1953 Reallocation 30224 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
29/10/1953 Reallocation 30183 71D Fratton 72D Plymouth Friary  
30/12/1953 Reallocation 30179 9E Nine Elms 70A Nine Elms  
30/12/1953 Reallocation 30193 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70B Feltham  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30179 70A Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30193 70B Feltham 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 30225 ELH Eastleigh 72D Plymouth Friary  
08/1955 Condemned 23       COND  
08/1955 Condemned 34       COND  
11/1955 Condemned 19       COND  
12/1955 Condemned 30203 WAD Wadebridge   COND  
19/12/1955 Reallocation 30236 PLY Plymouth Friary 72F Wadebridge  
05/1956 Condemned 195       COND  
05/1956 Condemned 15       COND  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30183 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
07/1956 Condemned 30230 70B Feltham   COND  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30177 71A Eastleigh 70B Feltham  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30179 71A Eastleigh 70B Feltham  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30212 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30223 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
06/1957 Condemned 30207 71D Fratton   COND  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30193 72A Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30199 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
19/07/1957 Reallocation 30183 72A Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
19/07/1957 Reallocation 30199 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/1957 Condemned 30216 PLY Plymouth Friary   COND  
02/1958 Condemned 30224 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/1958 Condemned 30233 DOR Dorchester   COND  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 30182 72C Yeovil Town 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/1959 Condemned 30232 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
10/1959 Condemned 30177 70B Feltham   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 30179 70B Feltham   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 30212 71A Eastleigh   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 30182 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 30236 72F Wadebridge   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 30229 71A Eastleigh   COND  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 30200 ELH Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
08/1961 Condemned 30192 72D Plymouth Friary   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 30183 72D Plymouth Friary   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 30223 71A Eastleigh   COND  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30199 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
02/1962 Reallocation 30225 72D Plymouth Friary 71A Eastleigh  
04/1962 Condemned 30193 72D Plymouth Friary   COND  
21/04/1962 Reallocation 30200 71A Eastleigh 83H Plymouth Friary  
08/1962 Condemned 30200 83H Plymouth Friary   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30199 71A Eastleigh   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30225 71A Eastleigh   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 25       COND  
06/1964 Condemned 36       COND  
10/1964 Condemned 32       COND  
09/1965 Condemned 30       COND  
12/1965 Condemned 18       COND  
05/1966 Condemned 29       COND  
05/1966 Condemned 21       COND  
05/1966 Condemned 26       COND  
10/1966 Condemned 35       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 14       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 27       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 28       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 17       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 20       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 22       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 16       COND  
12/1966 Condemned 33       COND  
03/1967 Condemned 31       COND  
03/1967 Condemned 24       COND