LSWR/SR Drummond "M7" Class 0-4-4T
Class | LSWR | BR | BR (Renum) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Motor Tanks | 242 | 30242 | 03/1897 | ELH 70A 70A W |
Eastleigh Nine Elms Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 30/06/1952 08/1958 |
08/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 243 | 30243 | 03/1897 | SAL 71A 71A 70A 70A 70B W |
Salisbury Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Nine Elms Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 13/04/1951 30/06/1952 08/10/1957 09/1958 |
09/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 244 | 30244 | 03/1897 | 9E W |
Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1957 |
10/1957 | |
Motor Tanks | 245 | 30245 | 04/1897 | EXJ 72E 70A 75B 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Nine Elms Redhill Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1952 11/12/1952 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 246 | 30246 | 04/1897 | GFD 70A W |
Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 28/10/1961 |
28/10/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 247 | 30247 | 04/1897 | BPL 70A 72E W |
Barnstaple Junction Nine Elms Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1952 11/12/1952 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 248 | 30248 | 05/1897 | 9E W |
Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 249 | 30249 | 05/1897 | 9E 70B 70B 70B 70A 70A 70E 71A W |
Nine Elms Feltham Feltham Feltham Nine Elms Nine Elms Salisbury Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 30/01/1963 01/04/1963 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 250 | 30250 | 05/1897 | BPL W |
Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/08/1957 |
31/08/1957 | |
Motor Tanks | 251 | 30251 | 06/1897 | BM 72E 72E 72E 70B 71A W |
Bournemouth Barnstaple Junction Barnstaple Junction Barnstaple Junction Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 30/01/1963 01/04/1963 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 252 | 30252 | 08/1897 | EXJ 72E 72E 72E W |
Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Barnstaple Junction Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 07/02/1959 |
07/02/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 253 | 30253 | 08/1897 | EXJ 72E 72E 70B 72E W |
Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Barnstaple Junction Feltham Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 254 | 30254 | 08/1897 | FEL 72E 71B 70E W |
Feltham Barnstaple Junction Bournemouth Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1952 30/01/1963 06/01/1964 10/05/1964 |
10/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 255 | 30255 | 08/1897 | EXJ 72E 72E W |
Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 12/05/1951 10/09/1960 |
10/09/1960 | |
Motor Tanks | 256 | 30256 | 08/1897 | EXJ 72E W |
Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 23/05/1959 |
23/05/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 667 | 30667 | 30106 | 09/1897 | 9E 71A 71A 72A 72B 70E 72A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Salisbury Reading (S.R.) Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1950 30/11/1950 13/04/1951 12/05/1951 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 02/1961 |
25/02/1961 |
Motor Tanks | 668 | 30668 | 09/1897 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1961 |
09/09/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 669 | 30669 | 09/1897 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 670 | 30670 | 10/1897 | BPL 72A 72A 72B 72E W |
Barnstaple Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 10/10/1961 09/02/1963 |
30/03/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 671 | 30671 | 10/1897 | EXJ 72E W |
Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1956 11/07/1959 |
11/07/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 672 | 30672 | 10/1897 | 9E W |
Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1948 |
29/05/1948 | |
Motor Tanks | 673 | 30673 | 11/1897 | 9E ELH 72B 72B 72B W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Salisbury Salisbury Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 06/08/1960 |
06/08/1960 | |
Motor Tanks | 674 | 30674 | 11/1897 | ELH 72B 72B 72B W |
Eastleigh Salisbury Salisbury Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 26/08/1961 |
26/08/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 675 | 30675 | 11/1897 | SAL 70C W |
Salisbury Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1953 22/03/1958 |
22/03/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 676 | 30676 | 11/1897 | 9E 72A 72A W |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1952 20/07/1953 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 31 | 30031 | 30128 | 03/1898 | FEL 72B 72B 71A 71A 75A 70B |
Feltham Salisbury Salisbury Eastleigh Eastleigh Brighton Feltham |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 17/06/1950 31/07/1950 21/06/1955 14/06/1959 |
07/01/1961 |
Motor Tanks | 32 | 30032 | 03/1898 | EXJ EXJ 71A 70B 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 22/04/1950 11/03/1959 01/04/1963 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 33 | 30033 | 04/1898 | 9E 71A 72E 72B W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Barnstaple Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 14/06/1959 05/10/1960 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 34 | 30034 | 04/1898 | EXJ 72C 72D 72D 70A 72B W |
Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Nine Elms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 30/07/1962 24/09/1962 17/02/1963 |
17/02/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 35 | 30035 | 04/1898 | PLY 71A 70A 70B W |
Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Nine Elms Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/02/1960 17/01/1961 10/02/1961 17/02/1963 |
17/02/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 36 | 30036 | 05/1898 | BPL 72C 72D 72D 71A 71B W |
Barnstaple Junction Yeovil Town Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 30/07/1962 30/01/1963 12/01/1964 |
12/01/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 37 | 30037 | 05/1898 | EXJ PLY W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/08/1948 31/05/1958 |
31/05/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 38 | 30038 | 05/1898 | 9E 70B 70B W |
Nine Elms Feltham Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 02/1958 |
02/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 39 | 30039 | 05/1898 | EXJ S 72A 72D 72D 70F 71A 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Stored Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Fratton Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 09/09/1950 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 21/06/1955 26/11/1959 05/04/1960 09/02/1963 |
02/03/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 40 | 30040 | 06/1898 | BM 72A 72A 72D 71B W |
Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 07/10/1952 21/06/1955 10/06/1961 |
10/06/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 22 | 30022 | 01/1899 | GFD 75B 70E 70C 70F W |
Guildford Redhill Reading (S.R.) Guildford Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1953 30/12/1953 08/02/1954 21/06/1955 17/05/1958 |
17/05/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 23 | 30023 | 01/1899 | BPL SAL 72A 72A 72A 71D 71D 72A 72E W |
Barnstaple Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Fratton Fratton Exmouth Junction Barnstaple Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 27/03/1953 26/05/1953 20/07/1953 05/10/1960 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 24 | 30024 | 01/1899 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/03/1963 |
03/03/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 25 | 30025 | 02/1899 | EXJ EXJ 72B 71B 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Bournemouth Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 17/11/1956 30/01/1963 06/01/1964 10/05/1964 |
10/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 26 | 30026 | 02/1899 | GFD W |
Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1959 |
04/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 41 | 30041 | 03/1899 | SAL 72A 72A 70B W |
Salisbury Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 18/06/1954 31/08/1957 |
31/08/1957 | |
Motor Tanks | 42 | 30042 | 03/1899 | BPL 72A 72A 70B W |
Barnstaple Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 12/05/1951 18/06/1954 08/06/1957 |
08/06/1957 | |
Motor Tanks | 43 | 30043 | 03/1899 | GFD FEL W |
Guildford Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 05/1961 |
05/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 44 | 30044 | 03/1899 | BPL 72A 72A W |
Barnstaple Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 12/05/1951 09/09/1961 |
09/09/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 241 | 30241 | 05/1899 | 9E 72B 71A W |
Nine Elms Salisbury Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1962 01/04/1963 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 112 | 30112 | 07/1900 | BM 70C 70C W |
Bournemouth Guildford Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 02/1962 09/02/1963 |
02/02/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 318 | 30318 | 08/1900 | BM W |
Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 319 | 30319 | 08/1900 | 9E 71B W |
Nine Elms Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 23/01/1960 |
23/01/1960 | |
Motor Tanks | 320 | 30320 | 08/1900 | EXJ 71B 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 07/10/1952 09/02/1963 |
02/03/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 321 | 30321 | 08/1900 | BPL 72A 71B 72A 70A 83H W |
Barnstaple Junction Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1951 13/04/1951 12/05/1951 07/10/1952 12/08/1962 30/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 322 | 30322 | 08/1900 | 9E 71A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 22/11/1958 |
22/11/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 323 | 30323 | 10/1900 | EXJ 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 324 | 30324 | 10/1900 | GFD 71A 71A 71B W |
Guildford Eastleigh Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 08/02/1955 19/12/1955 12/09/1959 |
12/09/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 356 | 30356 | 10/1900 | EXJ PLY 72A 72A 72A 71D 71A 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Fratton Eastleigh Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 20/07/1953 08/02/1955 06/06/1958 06/12/1958 |
06/12/1958 | |
Motor Tanks | 357 | 30357 | 10/1900 | ELH 72A 72A 71D 71A 71A W |
Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Fratton Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 20/07/1953 26/11/1959 05/04/1960 29/04/1961 |
29/04/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 123 | 30123 | 02/1903 | 9E 71A 75B 70A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Redhill Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 06/1959 |
06/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 124 | 30124 | 02/1903 | EXJ 71A 70A 70C W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 19/03/1952 17/11/1956 20/05/1961 |
20/05/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 130 | 30130 | 02/1903 | 9E 71A 70B 71A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1954 06/06/1958 11/03/1959 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 132 | 30132 | 03/1903 | 9E 70C W |
Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/03/1959 27/10/1962 |
27/10/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 133 | 30133 | 03/1903 | EXJ 72C 71A 70A 71A 70A 71A 75F 75E 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Eastleigh Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Eastleigh Tunbridge Wells West Three Bridges Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 07/10/1952 11/12/1952 14/02/1953 20/08/1954 05/04/1960 30/01/1963 16/09/1963 06/01/1964 15/03/1964 |
15/03/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 374 | 30374 | 04/1903 | EXJ 72D 72A 72A 72A 70E 72A 72B 72A W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Reading (S.R.) Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 17/11/1956 12/06/1957 10/10/1959 |
10/10/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 375 | 30375 | 05/1903 | EXJ PLY 72A 72A 72A 71A 72E 71A 71A 83H W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Barnstaple Junction Eastleigh Eastleigh Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/08/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 20/07/1953 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 05/04/1960 12/08/1962 30/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 376 | 30376 | 05/1903 | EXJ 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1952 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 377 | 30377 | 05/1903 | FRA 71A 75B 71A 70F 71A 71A W |
Fratton Eastleigh Redhill Eastleigh Fratton Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1952 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 05/04/1960 18/08/1962 |
18/08/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 378 | 30378 | 05/1903 | SAL ELH 72A 70C 71B W |
Salisbury Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Guildford Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1949 13/04/1951 14/06/1959 02/1962 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 21 | 30021 | 01/1904 | BM HOR 70C 70C 72A 72A 72A 72B 75F 70E W |
Bournemouth Horsham Guildford Guildford Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Tunbridge Wells West Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 09/09/1950 09/10/1950 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 10/10/1961 30/01/1963 22/07/1963 15/03/1964 |
15/03/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 27 | 30027 | 01/1904 | FRA HOR 70C 70C 72A W |
Fratton Horsham Guildford Guildford Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 11/03/1959 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 28 | 30028 | 01/1904 | BM 70C 70C 75E 71A W |
Bournemouth Guildford Guildford Three Bridges Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 29/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 29 | 30029 | 02/1904 | ELH 70C 75F 75E 70F W |
Eastleigh Guildford Tunbridge Wells West Three Bridges Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 30/01/1963 16/09/1963 06/01/1964 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 30 | 30030 | 02/1904 | EXJ 71A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 19/03/1952 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 108 | 30108 | 03/1904 | GFD 75D 75A 71B W |
Guildford Horsham Brighton Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 01/11/1955 15/06/1956 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 109 | 30109 | 03/1904 | ELH 70C 70C 70C 70C 75A 71A 75E W |
Eastleigh Guildford Guildford Guildford Guildford Brighton Eastleigh Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/06/1958 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 06/1961 |
06/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 110 | 30110 | 03/1904 | GFD 75E 75A 71A 75A 71B W |
Guildford Three Bridges Brighton Eastleigh Brighton Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 13/10/1958 14/06/1959 22/10/1959 03/05/1961 05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 111 | 30111 | 03/1904 | BM 70C W |
Bournemouth Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 379 | 30379 | 06/1904 | 9E 72A 71A 75E 71A 73J 75A 71A 71B 75F 75E W |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Three Bridges Eastleigh Tonbridge Brighton Eastleigh Bournemouth Tunbridge Wells West Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 21/06/1955 19/12/1955 10/03/1960 23/08/1960 03/05/1961 06/07/1961 30/01/1963 16/09/1963 06/10/1963 |
06/10/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 104 | 30104 | 03/1905 | BM 70E 71B W |
Bournemouth Reading (S.R.) Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1953 08/02/1954 13/05/1961 |
13/05/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 105 | 30105 | 03/1905 | EXJ 71B 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 05/1963 |
01/06/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 106 | 30106 | 30667 | 03/1905 | BM W 71B |
Bournemouth Withdrawn Bournemouth |
01/01/1948 19/11/1960 19/04/1963 |
19/11/1960 |
Motor Tanks | 107 | 30107 | 04/1905 | BM 71B 71B 71B W |
Bournemouth Bournemouth Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 45 | 30045 | 05/1905 | FRA 72A 72A 72A W |
Fratton Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 46 | 30046 | 05/1905 | EXJ 72D W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 07/02/1959 |
07/02/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 47 | 30047 | 05/1905 | BM HOR 75A W |
Bournemouth Horsham Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 18/07/1959 06/02/1960 |
06/02/1960 | |
Motor Tanks | 48 | 30048 | 05/1905 | ELH 75D 75A 72A 71B W |
Eastleigh Horsham Brighton Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 18/07/1959 19/08/1959 19/04/1963 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 49 | 30049 | 05/1905 | EXJ 75D 75D 75A 75A 70C W |
Exmouth Junction Horsham Horsham Brighton Brighton Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 06/07/1961 02/06/1962 |
02/06/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 50 | 30050 | 06/1905 | BM HOR 71D 75D 75A 75A 71A 71B W |
Bournemouth Horsham Fratton Horsham Brighton Brighton Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 22/04/1950 06/12/1951 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 03/05/1961 06/07/1961 27/01/1962 |
27/01/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 51 | 30051 | 11/1905 | BM 71D 71D 75A 75D 75A 75A 70A W |
Bournemouth Fratton Fratton Brighton Horsham Brighton Brighton Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 20/07/1953 01/10/1953 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 03/05/1961 29/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 52 | 30052 | 12/1905 | BM 71D 71D 73E 75A 75E 75A 75E 75A 71A 75E 75A 70A 72C 71B W |
Bournemouth Fratton Fratton Faversham Brighton Three Bridges Brighton Three Bridges Brighton Eastleigh Three Bridges Brighton Nine Elms Yeovil Town Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 06/12/1951 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 08/10/1957 13/10/1958 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 10/06/1960 03/05/1961 22/10/1962 19/04/1963 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 53 | 30053 | 12/1905 | ELH 71D 71D 71D 73E 75A 71A 75A 75E 71A 75F 75E 70F W |
Eastleigh Fratton Fratton Fratton Faversham Brighton Eastleigh Brighton Three Bridges Eastleigh Tunbridge Wells West Three Bridges Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 14/06/1959 10/03/1960 03/05/1961 02/07/1962 30/01/1963 16/09/1963 06/01/1964 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 54 | 30054 | 12/1905 | FRA 71B 71B 71D 75F 75A W |
Fratton Bournemouth Bournemouth Fratton Tunbridge Wells West Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 | |
Motor Tanks | 55 | 30055 | 12/1905 | EXJ 71B 71B 71D 75F 75A 71A 75E 75E 70C 75F W 75E |
Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Bournemouth Fratton Tunbridge Wells West Brighton Eastleigh Three Bridges Three Bridges Guildford Tunbridge Wells West Withdrawn Three Bridges |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 20/07/1953 21/06/1955 20/04/1956 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 23/08/1961 30/07/1962 30/01/1963 15/09/1963 16/09/1963 |
15/09/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 56 | 30056 | 01/1906 | GFD 71B 75F 75A 75E 75A 71A 75A 71B W |
Guildford Bournemouth Tunbridge Wells West Brighton Three Bridges Brighton Eastleigh Brighton Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 08/10/1957 13/10/1958 14/06/1959 22/10/1959 03/05/1961 08/12/1963 |
08/12/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 57 | 30057 | 01/1906 | BM 75F 71B W |
Bournemouth Tunbridge Wells West Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 23/06/1963 |
23/06/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 58 | 30058 | 03/1906 | YEO 71B 71B 71B 75F 71B W |
Yeovil Town Bournemouth Bournemouth Bournemouth Tunbridge Wells West Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 24/09/1960 |
24/09/1960 | |
Motor Tanks | 59 | 30059 | 03/1906 | BM 75F 71B W |
Bournemouth Tunbridge Wells West Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/06/1955 20/04/1956 25/02/1961 |
25/02/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 60 | 30060 | 03/1906 | GFD 71B 71B W |
Guildford Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 125 | 30125 | 06/1911 | ELH 72A W |
Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/10/1960 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 126 | 08/1911 | 05/1937 | |||||
Motor Tanks | 127 | 30127 | 10/1911 | SAL 71A 71A 71A 71B W |
Salisbury Eastleigh Eastleigh Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 08/02/1955 10/11/1963 |
10/11/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 128 | 30128 | 30031 | 11/1911 | ELH 72C 72C 71B 71B |
Eastleigh Yeovil Town Yeovil Town Bournemouth Bournemouth |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 10/02/1961 |
01/06/1963 |
Motor Tanks | 129 | 30129 | 11/1911 | YEO 73E 75A 72C 71B W |
Yeovil Town Faversham Brighton Yeovil Town Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 15/06/1956 19/04/1963 17/11/1963 |
17/11/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 131 | 30131 | 11/1911 | BM 72C 72C 72C W |
Bournemouth Yeovil Town Yeovil Town Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | |
Motor Tanks | 328 | 30328 | 11/1911 | GFD 71A 71A 71B 75E 71A 73J 75A 71A 71B 75F W |
Guildford Eastleigh Eastleigh Bournemouth Three Bridges Eastleigh Tonbridge Brighton Eastleigh Bournemouth Tunbridge Wells West Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1951 08/02/1955 21/06/1955 19/12/1955 15/06/1956 10/03/1960 23/08/1960 03/05/1961 06/07/1961 30/01/1963 03/03/1963 |
03/03/1963 | |
Motor Tanks | 479 | 30479 | 11/1911 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1961 |
22/04/1961 | |
Motor Tanks | 480 | 30480 | 11/1911 | FRA 71A 71A 71A 71B W |
Fratton Eastleigh Eastleigh Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 30/01/1963 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 | |
Motor Tanks | 481 | 30481 | 11/1911 | GFD 71A 71A 71A W |
Guildford Eastleigh Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 27/06/1951 30/05/1959 |
30/05/1959 |