Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 573 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 573 Week
» 18894 Month
» 107086 Year
» 991467 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Drummond "Motor Tanks" Class 0-4-4T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 22     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 23     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 24     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 25     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 26     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 27     FRA Fratton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 28     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 29     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 30     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 32     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 33     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 34     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 35     PLY Plymouth Friary  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 36     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 37     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 38     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 39     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 40     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 41     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 42     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 43     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 44     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 45     FRA Fratton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 46     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 47     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 48     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 49     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 52     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 53     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 54     FRA Fratton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 55     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 56     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 58     YEO Yeovil Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 59     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 60     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 104     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 105     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 106     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 107     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 108     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 109     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 110     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 111     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 112     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 123     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 124     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 125     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 127     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 128     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 129     YEO Yeovil Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 130     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 131     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 132     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 133     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 241     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 242     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 243     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 244     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 245     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 246     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 247     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 248     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 249     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 250     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 251     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 252     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 253     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 254     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 255     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 256     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 318     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 319     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 320     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 321     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 322     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 323     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 324     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 328     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 356     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 357     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 374     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 375     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 376     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 377     FRA Fratton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 378     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 379     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 479     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 480     FRA Fratton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 481     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 667     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 668     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 669     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 670     BPL Barnstaple Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 671     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 672     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 673     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 674     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 675     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 676     9E Nine Elms  
05/1948 Condemned 672 9E Nine Elms   COND  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30031 FEL Feltham 72B Salisbury  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30031 72B Salisbury 71A Eastleigh  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30039 EXJ Exmouth Junction 98S Exmouth Junction  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 30021 BM Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 30039 98S   72A Exmouth Junction  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 30249 9E Nine Elms 70B Feltham  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 30667 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 30053 ELH Eastleigh 71D Fratton  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 127 SAL Salisbury 71A Eastleigh  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 30243 SAL Salisbury 71A Eastleigh  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 30374 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30021 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30023 BPL Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 34 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30036 BPL Barnstaple Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30039 72A Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30109 ELH Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30251 BM Bournemouth 72E Barnstaple Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30252 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30253 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30321 BPL Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 356 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30374 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30375 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30480 FRA Fratton 71A Eastleigh  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30481 GFD Guildford 71A Eastleigh  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30670 BPL Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30673 9E Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30674 ELH Eastleigh 72B Salisbury  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30027 FRA Fratton 70C Guildford  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30038 9E Nine Elms 70B Feltham  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30041 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30049 EXJ Exmouth Junction 75D Horsham  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30249 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30021 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30023 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34 72D Plymouth Friary 72D Plymouth Friary  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30036 72D Plymouth Friary 72D Plymouth Friary  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30039 72D Plymouth Friary 72D Plymouth Friary  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 42 BPL Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30044 BPL Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30251 72E Barnstaple Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30252 72E Barnstaple Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30253 72E Barnstaple Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 255 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30256 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30321 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30356 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30374 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30375 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30480 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30667 71A Eastleigh 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30670 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30673 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30674 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30028 BM Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30040 BM Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30048 ELH Eastleigh 75D Horsham  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30051 BM Bournemouth 71D Fratton  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30055 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30056 GFD Guildford 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30060 GFD Guildford 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30105 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30357 ELH Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30379 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 30481 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30045 FRA Fratton 72A Exmouth Junction  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30054 FRA Fratton 71B Bournemouth  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30058 YEO Yeovil Town 71B Bournemouth  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30107 BM Bournemouth 71B Bournemouth  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30109 70C Guildford 70C Guildford  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30128 ELH Eastleigh 72C Yeovil Town  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30131 BM Bournemouth 72C Yeovil Town  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30030 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30124 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30676 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30242 ELH Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30243 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30245 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30040 72A Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30133 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30247 BPL Barnstaple Junction 70A Nine Elms  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30254 FEL Feltham 72E Barnstaple Junction  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30320 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30321 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30376 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30377 FRA Fratton 71A Eastleigh  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30133 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30245 72E Barnstaple Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30247 70A Nine Elms 72E Barnstaple Junction  
08/01/1953 Reallocation 30675 SAL Salisbury 70C Guildford  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 30108 GFD Guildford 75D Horsham  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 30133 70A Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30023 72A Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30052 BM Bournemouth 73E Faversham  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30053 71D Fratton 73E Faversham  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30129 YEO Yeovil Town 73E Faversham  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 30023 71D Fratton 71D Fratton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30023 71D Fratton 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30051 71D Fratton 75A Brighton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30052 73E Faversham 75A Brighton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30053 73E Faversham 75A Brighton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30055 71B Bournemouth 71D Fratton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30129 73E Faversham 75A Brighton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30356 72A Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30357 72A Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30375 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30676 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 30051 75A Brighton 75D Horsham  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30022 GFD Guildford 75B Redhill  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30104 BM Bournemouth 70E Reading (S.R.)  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30123 9E Nine Elms 75B Redhill  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30245 70A Nine Elms 75B Redhill  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30253 72E Barnstaple Junction 70B Feltham  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30374 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Reading (S.R.)  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30377 71A Eastleigh 75B Redhill  
10/12/1953 Reallocation 30667 72B Salisbury 70E Reading (S.R.)  
30/12/1953 Reallocation 30022 75B Redhill 70E Reading (S.R.)  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30022 70E Reading (S.R.) 70C Guildford  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30104 70E Reading (S.R.) 71B Bournemouth  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30123 75B Redhill 70A Nine Elms  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30245 75B Redhill 70A Nine Elms  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30253 70B Feltham 72E Barnstaple Junction  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30374 70E Reading (S.R.) 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30377 75B Redhill 71A Eastleigh  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 30667 70E Reading (S.R.) 72A Exmouth Junction  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 30041 72A Exmouth Junction 70B Feltham  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 30042 72A Exmouth Junction 70B Feltham  
20/08/1954 Reallocation 30130 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
20/08/1954 Reallocation 30133 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
08/02/1955 Reallocation 30127 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
08/02/1955 Reallocation 30324 GFD Guildford 71A Eastleigh  
08/02/1955 Reallocation 30328 GFD Guildford 71A Eastleigh  
08/02/1955 Reallocation 30356 71D Fratton 71A Eastleigh  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30022 70C Guildford 70F Fratton  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30028 70C Guildford 75E Three Bridges  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30031 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30039 72D Plymouth Friary 70F Fratton  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30040 72D Plymouth Friary 71B Bournemouth  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30052 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30054 71B Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30055 71D Fratton 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30056 71B Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30057 BM Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30058 71B Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30059 BM Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30328 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30379 71A Eastleigh 75E Three Bridges  
01/11/1955 Reallocation 30108 75D Horsham 75A Brighton  
19/12/1955 Reallocation 30324 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
19/12/1955 Reallocation 30328 71B Bournemouth 75E Three Bridges  
19/12/1955 Reallocation 30379 75E Three Bridges 71A Eastleigh  
20/04/1956 Reallocation 30055 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
20/04/1956 Reallocation 30059 75F Tunbridge Wells West 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30028 75E Three Bridges 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30052 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30054 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30056 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30057 75F Tunbridge Wells West 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30058 75F Tunbridge Wells West 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30108 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30129 75A Brighton 72C Yeovil Town  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30328 75E Three Bridges 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30671 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30025 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30124 70A Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30374 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
06/1957 Condemned 30042 70B Feltham   COND  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30374 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/1957 Condemned 30041 70B Feltham   COND  
08/1957 Condemned 30250 BPL Barnstaple Junction   COND  
10/1957 Condemned 30244 9E Nine Elms   COND  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 30052 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 30056 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 30243 70A Nine Elms 70B Feltham  
02/1958 Condemned 30038 70B Feltham   COND  
03/1958 Condemned 30675 70C Guildford   COND  
05/1958 Condemned 30022 70F Fratton   COND  
05/1958 Condemned 30037 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30109 70C Guildford 75A Brighton  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30110 GFD Guildford 75E Three Bridges  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30130 71A Eastleigh 70B Feltham  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30356 71A Eastleigh 70F Fratton  
08/1958 Condemned 30242 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 30243 70B Feltham   COND  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 30052 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 30056 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 30110 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
11/1958 Condemned 30322 9E Nine Elms   COND  
12/1958 Condemned 30356 70F Fratton   COND  
01/1959 Condemned 30054 75A Brighton   COND  
01/1959 Condemned 30376 71A Eastleigh   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 30046 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 30252 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30027 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30032 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70B Feltham  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30130 70B Feltham 71A Eastleigh  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30132 9E Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
04/1959 Condemned 30026 GFD Guildford   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 30256 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 30481 71A Eastleigh   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 30123 70A Nine Elms   COND  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30031 75A Brighton 70B Feltham  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30033 9E Nine Elms 72E Barnstaple Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30052 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30053 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30055 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30056 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30109 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30110 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30375 71A Eastleigh 72E Barnstaple Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30377 71A Eastleigh 70F Fratton  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30378 SAL Salisbury 70C Guildford  
07/1959 Condemned 30671 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30047 BM Bournemouth 75A Brighton  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30048 75D Horsham 75A Brighton  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30049 75D Horsham 75A Brighton  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30050 BM Bournemouth 75A Brighton  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30051 75D Horsham 75A Brighton  
19/08/1959 Reallocation 30048 75A Brighton 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/1959 Condemned 30324 71B Bournemouth   COND  
10/1959 Condemned 30030 71A Eastleigh   COND  
10/1959 Condemned 30374 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
22/10/1959 Reallocation 30056 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
22/10/1959 Reallocation 30110 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
11/1959 Condemned 30027 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30039 70F Fratton 71A Eastleigh  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30052 71A Eastleigh 75E Three Bridges  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30055 71A Eastleigh 75E Three Bridges  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30109 71A Eastleigh 75E Three Bridges  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30357 71D Fratton 71A Eastleigh  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30375 72E Barnstaple Junction 71A Eastleigh  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30377 70F Fratton 71A Eastleigh  
12/1959 Condemned 30130 71A Eastleigh   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 30318 BM Bournemouth   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 30323 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 30031 70B Feltham   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 30128 72C Yeovil Town   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 30319 9E Nine Elms   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 30047 75A Brighton   COND  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 30035 PLY Plymouth Friary 71A Eastleigh  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 30053 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 30328 71A Eastleigh 73J Tonbridge  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 30379 71A Eastleigh 73J Tonbridge  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30039 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30049 75A Brighton 75A Brighton  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30050 75A Brighton 75A Brighton  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30051 75A Brighton 75A Brighton  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30133 70A Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30357 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30375 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30377 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
10/06/1960 Reallocation 30052 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
08/1960 Condemned 30673 72B Salisbury   COND  
23/08/1960 Reallocation 30328 73J Tonbridge 75A Brighton  
23/08/1960 Reallocation 30379 73J Tonbridge 75A Brighton  
09/1960 Condemned 30058 71B Bournemouth   COND  
09/1960 Condemned 30255 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
05/10/1960 Reallocation 30023 72A Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
05/10/1960 Reallocation 30033 72E Barnstaple Junction 72B Salisbury  
05/10/1960 Reallocation 30125 ELH Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
19/11/1960 Condemned 30106 BM Bournemouth   COND  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 30035 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
02/1961 Condemned 30059 71B Bournemouth   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 30667 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30031 98W   71B Bournemouth  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30035 70A Nine Elms 70B Feltham  
04/1961 Condemned 30357 71A Eastleigh   COND  
04/1961 Condemned 30479 ELH Eastleigh   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 30043 GFD Guildford   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 30104 71B Bournemouth   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 30124 70C Guildford   COND  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30050 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30051 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30052 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30053 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30056 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30110 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30328 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30379 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
06/1961 Condemned 30040 71B Bournemouth   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 30109 75E Three Bridges   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30060 71B Bournemouth   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30248 9E Nine Elms   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30669 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30676 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 30049 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 30050 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 30328 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 30379 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
08/1961 Condemned 30674 72B Salisbury   COND  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 30055 75E Three Bridges 75E Three Bridges  
09/1961 Condemned 30044 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 30668 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 30246 GFD Guildford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 30247 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 30253 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
07/10/1961 Condemned 30023 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30021 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30670 72B Salisbury 72E Barnstaple Junction  
27/01/1962 Condemned 30050 71B Bournemouth   COND  
02/1962 Reallocation 30112 BM Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
02/1962 Reallocation 30378 70C Guildford 71B Bournemouth  
02/06/1962 Condemned 30049 70C Guildford   COND  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 30053 75E Three Bridges 71A Eastleigh  
30/07/1962 Reallocation 30034 72D Plymouth Friary 70A Nine Elms  
30/07/1962 Reallocation 30036 72D Plymouth Friary 71A Eastleigh  
30/07/1962 Reallocation 30055 75E Three Bridges 70C Guildford  
08/1962 Condemned 30377 71A Eastleigh   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 30321 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 30375 71A Eastleigh   COND  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 30034 70A Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
29/09/1962 Condemned 30028 71A Eastleigh   COND  
29/09/1962 Condemned 30051 70A Nine Elms   COND  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 30052 70A Nine Elms 72C Yeovil Town  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 30241 9E Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
27/10/1962 Condemned 30132 70C Guildford   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 30245 70A Nine Elms   COND  
01/12/1962 Condemned 30131 72C Yeovil Town   COND  
08/12/1962 Condemned 30045 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
22/12/1962 Condemned 30033 72B Salisbury   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30125 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30378 71B Bournemouth   COND  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30021 72B Salisbury 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30025 72B Salisbury 71B Bournemouth  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30029 ELH Eastleigh 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30036 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30053 71A Eastleigh 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30055 70C Guildford 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30133 71A Eastleigh 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30249 70A Nine Elms 70E Salisbury  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30251 72E Barnstaple Junction 70B Feltham  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30254 72E Barnstaple Junction 71B Bournemouth  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30328 71B Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30379 71B Bournemouth 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30480 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
09/02/1963 Condemned 30039 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/02/1963 Condemned 30112 70C Guildford   COND  
09/02/1963 Condemned 30320 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/02/1963 Condemned 30670 72E Barnstaple Junction   COND  
17/02/1963 Condemned 30034 72B Salisbury   COND  
17/02/1963 Condemned 30035 70B Feltham   COND  
03/03/1963 Condemned 30024 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
03/03/1963 Condemned 30328 75F Tunbridge Wells West   COND  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 30032 70B Feltham 71A Eastleigh  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 30241 72B Salisbury 71A Eastleigh  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 30249 70E Salisbury 71A Eastleigh  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 30251 70B Feltham 71A Eastleigh  
19/04/1963 Reallocation 30048 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
19/04/1963 Reallocation 30052 72C Yeovil Town 71B Bournemouth  
19/04/1963 Reallocation 30129 72C Yeovil Town 71B Bournemouth  
19/04/1963 Reallocation 30667 98W   71B Bournemouth  
05/1963 Condemned 30105 71B Bournemouth   COND  
05/1963 Condemned 30110 71B Bournemouth   COND  
06/1963 Condemned 30057 71B Bournemouth   COND  
07/1963 Condemned 30032 71A Eastleigh   COND  
07/1963 Condemned 30241 71A Eastleigh   COND  
07/1963 Condemned 30249 71A Eastleigh   COND  
07/1963 Condemned 30251 71A Eastleigh   COND  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 30021 75F Tunbridge Wells West 70E Salisbury  
09/1963 Condemned 30055 75F Tunbridge Wells West   COND  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 30029 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75E Three Bridges  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 30053 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75E Three Bridges  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 30055 98W   75E Three Bridges  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 30133 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75E Three Bridges  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 30379 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75E Three Bridges  
10/1963 Condemned 30379 75E Three Bridges   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 30127 71B Bournemouth   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 30129 71B Bournemouth   COND  
12/1963 Condemned 30056 71B Bournemouth   COND  
01/1964 Condemned 30036 71B Bournemouth   COND  
01/1964 Condemned 30048 71B Bournemouth   COND  
01/1964 Condemned 30111 BM Bournemouth   COND  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30025 71B Bournemouth 70E Salisbury  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30029 75E Three Bridges 70F Bournemouth  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30053 75E Three Bridges 70F Bournemouth  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30133 75E Three Bridges 70E Salisbury  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30254 71B Bournemouth 70E Salisbury  
03/1964 Condemned 30021 70E Salisbury   COND  
03/1964 Condemned 30133 70E Salisbury   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30025 70E Salisbury   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30029 70F Bournemouth   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30052 71B Bournemouth   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30053 70F Bournemouth   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30107 71B Bournemouth   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30108 71B Bournemouth   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30254 70E Salisbury   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 30480 71B Bournemouth   COND