Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 901 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1801 Week
» 13622 Month
» 182394 Year
» 1066775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Drummond "Motor Tanks" Class 0-4-4T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Fri 16/07/1954 30033,
30324
70A,
70C
  Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review.
RO 9/1954  
Tue 20/07/1954 30024,
30123,
30246,
30252
72A,
70A,
70C,
72E
  Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 18/02/1961 30045,
30055,
30059
72A,
75E,
71B
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.
   
Sat 25/02/1961 30045,
30059
72A,
Wdn
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.
   
Sun 26/11/1961 30023,
30057,
30059,
30247
Wdn,
71B,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. SLS 1/1962