SR Wainwright "H" Class 0-4-4T
SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1005 | 31005 | 05/1907 | 15/09/1963 | 56.33 | 57.04 | |||||
1016 | 31016 | 07/1915 | 07/07/1951 | 36 | ||||||
1158 | 31158 | 12/1909 | 16/04/1955 | 45.33 | ||||||
1161 | 31161 | 06/1909 | 11/11/1961 | 52.42 | 52.54 | |||||
1162 | 31162 | 03/1909 | 07/1961 | 52.33 | 52.04 | |||||
1164 | 31164 | 02/1909 | 24/10/1959 | 50.67 | 50.70 | |||||
1177 | 31177 | 03/1909 | 07/10/1961 | 52.58 | 52.62 | |||||
1182 | 31182 | 06/1909 | 07/07/1951 | 42.08 | ||||||
1184 | 31184 | 04/1915 | 08/03/1958 | 42.92 | 42.95 | |||||
1193 | 31193 | 12/1909 | 25/03/1961 | 51.25 | 51.45 | |||||
1239 | 31239 | 11/1909 | 09/01/1960 | 50.17 | 50.20 | |||||
1259 | 31259 | 11/1905 | 11/1959 | 54 | 54.20 | |||||
1261 | 31261 | 11/1905 | 07/10/1961 | 55.92 | 55.95 | |||||
1263 | 31263 | 05/1905 | 05/01/1964 | 58.67 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
1265 | 31265 | 05/1905 | 06/08/1960 | 55.25 | 55.38 | |||||
1266 | 31266 | 05/1905 | 01/10/1960 | 55.42 | 55.62 | |||||
1269 | 31269 | 11/1905 | 12/12/1959 | 54.08 | 54.12 | |||||
1274 | 31274 | 06/1905 | 11/1957 | 52.42 | 52.45 | |||||
1276 | 31276 | 06/1905 | 25/02/1961 | 55.67 | 55.95 | |||||
1278 | 31278 | 07/1905 | 06/10/1962 | 57.25 | 57.38 | |||||
1279 | 31279 | 11/1909 | 09/1959 | 49.83 | 49.95 | |||||
1295 | 31295 | 12/1909 | 30/05/1959 | 49.42 | 49.45 | |||||
1305 | 31305 | 05/1906 | 17/11/1962 | 56.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1964 | 58.21 | ||
1306 | 31306 | 05/1906 | 30/12/1961 | 55.58 | 55.71 | |||||
1307 | 31307 | 12/1906 | 26/08/1961 | 54.67 | 54.79 | |||||
1308 | 31308 | 06/1906 | 23/12/1962 | 56.5 | 57.46 | |||||
1309 | 31309 | 06/1906 | 06/1955 | 49 | ||||||
1310 | 31310 | 06/1906 | 05/1960 | 53.92 | 54.04 | |||||
1311 | 31311 | 05/1907 | 06/11/1954 | 47.5 | ||||||
1319 | 31319 | 12/1909 | 30/01/1960 | 50.08 | 50.20 | |||||
1320 | 31320 | 05/1907 | 17/12/1955 | 48.58 | ||||||
1321 | 31321 | 12/1906 | 11/1957 | 50.92 | 50.95 | |||||
1322 | 31322 | 06/1909 | 22/04/1961 | 51.83 | 52.04 | |||||
1324 | 31324 | 05/1907 | 28/07/1962 | 55.17 | 55.29 | |||||
1326 | 31326 | 12/1906 | 10/1961 | 54.83 | 54.96 | |||||
1327 | 31327 | 06/1907 | 07/11/1959 | 52.42 | 52.45 | |||||
1328 | 31328 | 12/1906 | 25/02/1961 | 54.17 | 54.37 | |||||
1329 | 31329 | 12/1906 | 14/11/1959 | 52.92 | 52.95 | |||||
1500 | 31500 | 11/1905 | 10/06/1961 | 55.58 | 55.62 | |||||
1503 | 31503 | 12/1905 | 08/08/1959 | 53.67 | 53.95 | |||||
1512 | 31512 | 01/1909 | 10/06/1961 | 52.42 | 52.62 | |||||
1517 | 31517 | 01/1909 | 05/1961 | 52.33 | 52.53 | |||||
1518 | 31518 | 07/1909 | 05/01/1964 | 54.5 | 55.38 | |||||
1519 | 31519 | 07/1909 | 02/1961 | 51.58 | 51.95 | |||||
1520 | 31520 | 06/1909 | 08/1960 | 51.17 | 51.29 | |||||
1521 | 31521 | 08/1909 | 19/05/1962 | 52.75 | 52.87 | |||||
1522 | 31522 | 08/1909 | 27/01/1963 | 53.42 | 53.54 | |||||
1523 | 31523 | 09/1909 | 10/01/1959 | 49.33 | 49.37 | |||||
1530 | 31530 | 07/1905 | 24/03/1962 | 56.67 | 56.70 | |||||
1531 | 31531 | 07/1905 | 04/1955 | 49.75 | ||||||
1532 | 31532 | 07/1905 | 03/03/1951 | 45.67 | 45.78 | |||||
1533 | 31533 | 07/1905 | 15/09/1962 | 57.17 | 57.21 | |||||
1540 | 31540 | 11/1904 | 27/02/1960 | 55.25 | 55.45 | |||||
1541 | 31541 | 11/1904 | 07/04/1951 | 46.42 | 46.44 | |||||
1542 | 31542 | 11/1904 | 17/11/1962 | 58 | 59.70 | |||||
1543 | 31543 | 01/1909 | 07/07/1963 | 54.5 | 55.20 | |||||
1544 | 31544 | 11/1904 | 15/09/1963 | 58.83 | 59.12 | |||||
1546 | 31546 | 11/1904 | 02/1951 | 46.25 | 46.36 | |||||
1548 | 31548 | 12/1904 | 08/08/1959 | 54.67 | 54.79 | |||||
1550 | 31550 | 11/1904 | 25/02/1961 | 56.25 | 56.37 | |||||
1551 | 31551 | 01/1905 | 05/01/1964 | 59 | 59.54 | |||||
1552 | 31552 | 01/1905 | 11/11/1961 | 56.83 | 56.95 | |||||
1553 | 31553 | 02/1905 | 06/1961 | 56.33 | 56.45 | |||||
1554 | 31554 | 12/1909 | 30/05/1959 | 49.42 | 49.53 |