SR "R1" Class 0-4-4T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1696 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1697 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1698 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1699 | FAV | Faversham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1700 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1703 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1704 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1705 | DOV | Dover Marine | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1706 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1707 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1708 | DOV | Dover Marine | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1709 | FAV | Faversham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1710 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1696 | FEL | Feltham | FEL | Feltham | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1698 | FEL | Feltham | FEL | Feltham | |
01/03/1948 | Reallocation | 1696 | FEL | Feltham | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/03/1948 | Reallocation | 1698 | FEL | Feltham | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
02/1949 | Condemned | 31707 | TON | Tonbridge | COND | ||
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 1696 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | FAV | Faversham | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 1698 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | FAV | Faversham | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 31705 | DOV | Dover Marine | FAV | Faversham | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 31708 | DOV | Dover Marine | DOV | Dover Marine | |
10/1949 | Condemned | 31709 | FAV | Faversham | COND | ||
01/1950 | Condemned | 31699 | FAV | Faversham | COND | ||
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 31710 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 74A | Ashford | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 31706 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 74E | St Leonards | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 31706 | 74E | St Leonards | 74E | St Leonards | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 31706 | 74E | St Leonards | 74D | Tonbridge | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 31706 | 74D | Tonbridge | 74D | Tonbridge | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 31706 | 74D | Tonbridge | 74D | Tonbridge | |
03/03/1951 | Condemned | 31696 | FAV | Faversham | COND | ||
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 31708 | DOV | Dover Marine | 73E | Faversham | |
06/1951 | Condemned | 31710 | 74A | Ashford | COND | ||
09/06/1951 | Condemned | 31705 | FAV | Faversham | COND | ||
10/1952 | Condemned | 31700 | TON | Tonbridge | COND | ||
11/10/1952 | Condemned | 31708 | 73E | Faversham | COND | ||
12/1952 | Condemned | 31706 | 74D | Tonbridge | COND | ||
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 31698 | FAV | Faversham | 74D | Tonbridge | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 31704 | TON | Tonbridge | 73E | Faversham | |
03/1953 | Condemned | 31697 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | COND | ||
27/03/1953 | Reallocation | 31704 | 73E | Faversham | 74D | Tonbridge | |
03/1954 | Condemned | 31703 | TON | Tonbridge | COND | ||
15/10/1955 | Condemned | 31698 | 74D | Tonbridge | COND | ||
14/04/1956 | Condemned | 31704 | 74D | Tonbridge | COND |