LSWR/SR Adams "395" Class 0-6-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jumbos | 3029 | 30564 | 11/1885 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/04/1958 |
12/04/1958 |
Jumbos | 3083 | 30565 | 11/1885 | GFD 71A 71A W |
Guildford Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 14/02/1953 |
14/02/1953 |
Jumbos | 3101 | 30566 | 12/1885 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 |
07/02/1959 |
Jumbos | 3154 | 30567 | 03/1883 | FEL FEL W |
Feltham Feltham Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 09/1959 |
09/1959 |
Jumbos | 3155 | 30568 | 03/1883 | GFD 70B W |
Guildford Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 12/04/1958 |
12/04/1958 |
Jumbos | 3163 | 30569 | 05/1883 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1956 |
06/1956 |
Jumbos | 3167 | 30570 | 05/1883 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1956 |
29/12/1956 |
Jumbos | 3397 | 30571 | 12/1881 | ELH 70B W |
Eastleigh Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 07/1953 |
07/1953 |
Jumbos | 3400 | 30572 | 01/1882 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1957 |
26/01/1957 |
Jumbos | 3433 | 30573 | 04/1883 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/11/1956 |
24/11/1956 |
Jumbos | 3436 | 30574 | 04/1883 | GFD GFD W |
Guildford Guildford Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 05/01/1957 |
05/01/1957 |
Jumbos | 3439 | 30575 | 05/1883 | GFD 72A 70C W |
Guildford Exmouth Junction Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1952 11/12/1954 13/12/1958 |
13/12/1958 |
Jumbos | 3440 | 30576 | 05/1883 | KESR W |
Kent and East Sussex Railway Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/12/1950 |
30/12/1950 |
Jumbos | 3441 | 30577 | 05/1883 | SAL 70C 70C 70C W |
Salisbury Guildford Guildford Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 30/06/1952 04/02/1956 |
04/02/1956 |
Jumbos | 3442 | 30578 | 05/1883 | GFD W |
Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1957 |
10/08/1957 |
Jumbos | 3496 | 30579 | 10/1885 | FEL 70C W |
Feltham Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 14/01/1956 |
14/01/1956 |
Jumbos | 3506 | 30580 | 12/1885 | GFD 72A 70C W |
Guildford Exmouth Junction Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 11/12/1954 06/1957 |
06/1957 |
Jumbos | 3509 | 30581 | 12/1885 | ELH EXJ EXJ W |
Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 28/05/1949 14/03/1953 |
14/03/1953 |