LBSCR/SR Marsh "C3" Class 0-6-0
Class | LBSCR | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marsh Goods | 300 | 2300 | 32300 | 03/1906 | HOR FRA W |
Horsham Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 14/07/1951 |
14/07/1951 |
Marsh Goods | 301 | 2301 | 32301 | 06/1906 | HOR FRA W |
Horsham Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 03/1951 |
03/1951 |
Marsh Goods | 302 | 2302 | 32302 | 08/1906 | NORW HOR 71D 71D W |
Norwood Junction Horsham Fratton Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 12/01/1952 |
12/01/1952 |
Marsh Goods | 303 | 2303 | 32303 | 06/1906 | 3B FRA W |
Three Bridges Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 10/1951 |
10/1951 |
Marsh Goods | 304 | 2304 | 07/1906 | 07/1936 | ||||
Marsh Goods | 305 | 2305 | 07/1906 | 09/1937 | ||||
Marsh Goods | 306 | 2306 | 32306 | 08/1908 | HOR FRA W |
Horsham Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 12/1951 |
12/1951 |
Marsh Goods | 307 | 2307 | 32307 | 08/1906 | HOR W |
Horsham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
Marsh Goods | 308 | 2308 | 32308 | 11/1906 | HOR W |
Horsham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1948 |
11/1948 |
Marsh Goods | 309 | 2309 | 32309 | 09/1906 | NORW W |
Norwood Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |