SR Stirling "O1" Class 0-6-0
Class | SER | SR (1923) | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
O1 | 282 | 10/1878 | 12/1912 | ||||||
O1 | 316 | 316 | 1316 | 31369 | 09/1882 | FAV 74C W |
Faversham Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 09/1951 |
09/1951 |
O1 | 119 | 119 | 05/1883 | 03/1925 | |||||
O1 | 369 | 369 | 1369 | 31370 | 08/1891 | TON 73A 70A W 73H |
Tonbridge Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Withdrawn Dover Marine |
01/01/1948 13/10/1958 14/06/1959 02/1960 09/02/1960 |
02/1960 |
O1 | 370 | 370 | 1370 | 31371 | 08/1891 | EKR W |
East Kent Railway Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
O1 | 371 | 371 | 1371 | 31372 | 08/1891 | EKR W |
East Kent Railway Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
O1 | 372 | 372 | 08/1891 | 05/1923 | |||||
O1 | 373 | 373 | 1373 | 31373 | 09/1891 | DOV W |
Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1951 |
07/1951 |
O1 | 374 | 374 | 1374 | 31374 | 09/1891 | HIT GIL W |
Hither Green Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
O1 | 377 | 377 | 1377 | 31377 | 09/1891 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 |
O1 | 378 | 378 | 1378 | 31378 | 09/1891 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1948 |
11/1948 |
O1 | 14 | 14 | 1014 | 31014 | 06/1893 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |
O1 | 41 | 41 | 1041 | 31041 | 06/1893 | STL AFD W |
St Leonards Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 |
O1 | 238 | 238 | 1238 | 31238 | 06/1893 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 |
O1 | 379 | 379 | 1379 | 31379 | 09/1893 | FAV W |
Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 |
O1 | 380 | 380 | 1380 | 31380 | 09/1893 | TON GIL W |
Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
O1 | 381 | 381 | 1381 | 31381 | 09/1893 | DOV W |
Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 |
O1 | 383 | 383 | 1383 | 31383 | 09/1893 | EKR 74C W |
East Kent Railway Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 07/04/1951 |
07/04/1951 |
O1 | 384 | 384 | 1384 | 31384 | 09/1893 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
O1 | 385 | 385 | 1385 | 31385 | 09/1893 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
O1 | 386 | 386 | 1386 | 31386 | 10/1893 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1948 |
10/1948 |
O1 | 388 | 388 | 1388 | 31388 | 10/1893 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1948 |
07/1948 |
O1 | 389 | 389 | 1389 | 31389 | 10/1893 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
O1 | 390 | 390 | 1390 | 31390 | 10/1893 | AFD W |
Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 |
O1 | 391 | 391 | 1391 | 31391 | 10/1893 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
O1 | 393 | 393 | 10/1893 | 06/1926 | |||||
O1 | 395 | 395 | 1395 | 31395 | 11/1893 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
O1 | 396 | 396 | 1396 | 31396 | 12/1893 | TON W |
Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 |
O1 | 397 | 397 | 1397 | 31397 | 12/1893 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |
O1 | 398 | 398 | 1398 | 31398 | 12/1893 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
O1 | 48 | 48 | 1048 | 31048 | 12/1893 | TON 74C 74A 74A 73A 70A 73H W |
Tonbridge Dover Marine Ashford Ashford Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 15/10/1960 |
15/10/1960 |
O1 | 106 | 106 | 1106 | 31106 | 05/1894 | FAV W |
Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
O1 | 258 | 258 | 1258 | 31316 | 05/1894 | RAM W |
Ramsgate Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
O1 | 3 | 3 | 1003 | 31003 | 05/1896 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
O1 | 109 | 109 | 1109 | 31109 | 05/1896 | HIT TON W |
Hither Green Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
O1 | 123 | 123 | 1123 | 31123 | 05/1896 | AFD W |
Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 |
O1 | 248 | 248 | 1248 | 31248 | 05/1896 | HIT GIL W |
Hither Green Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
O1 | 46 | 46 | 1046 | 31046 | 06/1894 | FAV W |
Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1948 |
10/1948 |
O1 | 65 | 65 | 1065 | 31065 | 09/1896 | DOV 74A 74C W |
Dover Marine Ashford Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 18/06/1954 24/06/1961 |
24/06/1961 |
O1 | 64 | 64 | 1064 | 31064 | 11/1896 | GIL 74A 73A W |
Gillingham (Kent) Ashford Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 12/06/1957 24/05/1958 |
24/05/1958 |
O1 | 251 | 251 | 1251 | 31258 | 11/1896 | HIT 74C 74A 74C W |
Hither Green Dover Marine Ashford Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 12/06/1957 19/07/1957 02/1961 |
02/1961 |
O1 | 39 | 39 | 1039 | 31039 | 06/1897 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
O1 | 66 | 66 | 1066 | 31066 | 06/1897 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
O1 | 80 | 80 | 1080 | 31080 | 06/1897 | RAM W |
Ramsgate Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
O1 | 108 | 108 | 1108 | 31108 | 06/1897 | DOV W |
Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1951 |
07/1951 |
O1 | 425 | 425 | 1425 | 31425 | 08/1897 | BA DOV W |
Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 |
O1 | 426 | 426 | 1426 | 31426 | 08/1897 | AFD W |
Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 |
O1 | 428 | 428 | 1428 | 31428 | 09/1897 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
O1 | 429 | 429 | 1429 | 31429 | 09/1897 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
O1 | 430 | 430 | 1430 | 31430 | 09/1897 | GIL 74C W |
Gillingham (Kent) Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
O1 | 432 | 432 | 1432 | 31432 | 09/1897 | STL TON GIL W |
St Leonards Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 04/02/1950 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
O1 | 434 | 434 | 1434 | 31434 | 09/1897 | AFD 74A 74C W |
Ashford Ashford Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1950 24/06/1950 15/08/1959 |
15/08/1959 |
O1 | 437 | 437 | 1437 | 31437 | 10/1897 | TON W |
Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1948 |
10/1948 |
O1 | 438 | 438 | 1438 | 31438 | 10/1897 | FAV W |
Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1948 |
11/1948 |
O1 | 439 | 439 | 1439 | 31439 | 10/1897 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
O1 | 93 | 93 | 1093 | 31093 | 11/1897 | BA DOV W |
Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 05/1951 |
05/1951 |
O1 | 44 | 44 | 1044 | 31044 | 12/1898 | HIT GIL W |
Hither Green Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
O1 | 51 | 51 | 1051 | 31051 | 12/1898 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 |
O1 | 7 | 7 | 1007 | 31007 | 08/1899 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |