SR Stirling "O1" Class 0-6-0
SER | SR (1923) | SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
282 | 10/1878 | 04/1906 from O |
12/1912 | 34.17 | |||||||||
316 | A316 | 1316 | 31369 | 09/1882 | 05/1906 from O |
09/1951 | 69 | ||||||
119 | A119 | 05/1883 | 09/1906 from O |
03/1925 | 41.83 | ||||||||
369 | A369 | 1369 | 31370 | 08/1891 | 06/1914 from O |
02/1960 | 68.5 | 68.71 | |||||
370 | A370 | 1370 | 31371 | 08/1891 | 11/1906 from O |
01/1949 | 57.42 | ||||||
371 | A371 | 1371 | 31372 | 08/1891 | 05/1909 from O |
02/1949 | 57.5 | ||||||
372 | A372 | 08/1891 | 10/1932 from O |
05/1923 | 31.75 | ||||||||
373 | A373 | 1373 | 31373 | 09/1891 | 05/1906 from O |
07/1951 | 59.83 | ||||||
374 | A374 | 1374 | 31374 | 09/1891 | 08/1905 from O |
09/1949 | 58 | ||||||
377 | A377 | 1377 | 31377 | 09/1891 | 03/1906 from O |
01/1950 | 58.33 | 58.70 | |||||
378 | A378 | 1378 | 31378 | 09/1891 | 06/1916 from O |
11/1948 | 57.17 | ||||||
14 | A14 | 1014 | 31014 | 06/1893 | 03/1905 from O |
06/1948 | 55 | 55.04 | |||||
41 | A41 | 1041 | 31041 | 06/1893 | 06/1908 from O |
05/1951 | 57.92 | ||||||
238 | A238 | 1238 | 31238 | 06/1893 | 12/1903 from O |
07/1949 | 56.08 | ||||||
379 | A379 | 1379 | 31379 | 09/1893 | 04/1908 from O |
05/1951 | 57.67 | 57.70 | |||||
380 | A380 | 1380 | 31380 | 09/1893 | 11/1908 from O |
11/1949 | Gillingham (Kent) | 56.17 | |||||
381 | A381 | 1381 | 31381 | 09/1893 | 05/1915 from O |
05/1951 | 57.67 | ||||||
383 | A383 | 1383 | 31383 | 09/1893 | 12/1908 from O |
07/04/1951 | 57.58 | 57.62 | |||||
384 | A384 | 1384 | 31384 | 09/1893 | 06/1910 from O |
12/1949 | 56.25 | ||||||
385 | A385 | 1385 | 31385 | 09/1893 | 04/1913 from O |
09/1949 | 56 | ||||||
386 | A386 | 1386 | 31386 | 10/1893 | 01/1917 from O |
10/1948 | 55 | ||||||
388 | A388 | 1388 | 31388 | 10/1893 | 07/1914 from O |
07/1948 | 54.75 | 54.78 | |||||
389 | A389 | 1389 | 31389 | 10/1893 | 09/1907 from O |
02/1949 | 55.33 | ||||||
390 | A390 | 1390 | 31390 | 10/1893 | 12/1915 from O |
05/1951 | 57.58 | ||||||
391 | A391 | 1391 | 31391 | 10/1893 | 09/1907 from O |
06/1951 | 57.67 | 57.70 | |||||
393 | A393 | 10/1893 | 12/1908 from O |
06/1926 | 32.67 | ||||||||
395 | A395 | 1395 | 31395 | 11/1893 | 01/1914 from O |
06/1951 | 57.58 | 57.62 | |||||
396 | A396 | 1396 | 31396 | 12/1893 | 08/1913 from O |
08/1948 | 54.67 | 54.70 | |||||
397 | A397 | 1397 | 31397 | 12/1893 | 07/1917 from O |
06/1948 | 54.5 | 54.62 | |||||
398 | A398 | 1398 | 31398 | 12/1893 | 10/1907 from O |
05/1949 | 55.42 | ||||||
48 | A48 | 1048 | 31048 | 12/1893 | 08/1908 from O |
15/10/1960 | 66.83 | 66.88 | |||||
106 | A106 | 1106 | 31106 | 05/1894 | 06/1903 from O |
01/1949 | 54.67 | ||||||
258 | A258 | 1258 | 31316 | 05/1894 | 05/1914 from O |
06/1949 | Ramsgate | 55.08 | |||||
3 | A3 | 1003 | 31003 | 05/1896 | 03/1912 from O |
01/1949 | 52.67 | ||||||
109 | A109 | 1109 | 31109 | 05/1896 | 10/1927 from O |
01/1949 | 52.67 | ||||||
123 | A123 | 1123 | 31123 | 05/1896 | 07/1915 from O |
01/1950 | 53.67 | 53.95 | |||||
248 | A248 | 1248 | 31248 | 05/1896 | 10/1912 from O |
06/1951 | 55.08 | ||||||
46 | A46 | 1046 | 31046 | 06/1894 | 02/1909 from O |
10/1948 | 54.33 | ||||||
65 | A65 | 1065 | 31065 | 09/1896 | 09/1908 from O |
24/06/1961 | 64.75 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
64 | A64 | 1064 | 31064 | 11/1896 | 09/1913 from O |
24/05/1958 | 61.5 | 61.53 | |||||
251 | A251 | 1251 | 31258 | 11/1896 | 12/1917 from O |
02/1961 | 64.25 | 64.29 | |||||
39 | A39 | 1039 | 31039 | 06/1897 | 11/1912 from O |
08/1949 | 52.17 | ||||||
66 | A66 | 1066 | 31066 | 06/1897 | 05/1916 from O |
06/1951 | 54 | 54.03 | |||||
80 | A80 | 1080 | 31080 | 06/1897 | 05/1916 from O |
08/1949 | 52.17 | ||||||
108 | A108 | 1108 | 31108 | 06/1897 | 05/1915 from O |
07/1951 | 54.08 | ||||||
425 | A425 | 1425 | 31425 | 08/1897 | 05/1914 from O |
29/08/1959 | 62 | 62.29 | |||||
426 | A426 | 1426 | 31426 | 08/1897 | 09/1915 from O |
08/1948 | 51 | 51.12 | |||||
428 | A428 | 1428 | 31428 | 09/1897 | 04/1914 from O |
03/1949 | 51.5 | ||||||
429 | A429 | 1429 | 31429 | 09/1897 | 04/1913 from O |
09/1949 | 52 | ||||||
430 | A430 | 1430 | 31430 | 09/1897 | 05/1913 from O |
16/05/1959 | 61.67 | 61.79 | |||||
432 | A432 | 1432 | 31432 | 09/1897 | 12/1913 from O |
06/1951 | 53.75 | 53.78 | |||||
434 | A434 | 1434 | 31434 | 09/1897 | 12/1918 from O |
15/08/1959 | 61.92 | 61.95 | |||||
437 | A437 | 1437 | 31437 | 10/1897 | 03/1914 from O |
10/1948 | 51 | ||||||
438 | A438 | 1438 | 31438 | 10/1897 | 12/1912 from O |
11/1948 | 51.08 | ||||||
439 | A439 | 1439 | 31439 | 10/1897 | 01/1913 from O |
05/1949 | 51.58 | ||||||
93 | A93 | 1093 | 31093 | 11/1897 | 07/1916 from O |
05/1951 | 53.5 | 53.53 | |||||
44 | A44 | 1044 | 31044 | 12/1898 | 01/1912 from O |
06/1951 | 52.5 | ||||||
51 | A51 | 1051 | 31051 | 12/1898 | 01/1913 from O |
08/1948 | 49.67 | 49.78 | |||||
7 | A7 | 1007 | 31007 | 08/1899 | 05/1913 from O |
05/1949 | 49.75 |