SR Bulleid "Q1" Class 0-6-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlies | C1 | 33001 | 03/1942 | GFD 73J 70B 70C W |
Guildford Tonbridge Feltham Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 16/09/1963 17/05/1964 |
17/05/1964 |
Charlies | C2 | 33002 | 05/1942 | GFD 73E 70C 73J 70B W |
Guildford Faversham Guildford Tonbridge Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 27/03/1953 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 |
Charlies | C3 | 33003 | 05/1942 | GFD 73J 70B W |
Guildford Tonbridge Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
Charlies | C4 | 33004 | 06/1942 | GFD 73E 70C 73J 70B 75E 70C W |
Guildford Faversham Guildford Tonbridge Feltham Three Bridges Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 20/07/1953 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 14/10/1963 06/01/1964 03/01/1965 |
03/01/1965 |
Charlies | C5 | 33005 | 06/1942 | GFD 73E 70C W |
Guildford Faversham Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 26/05/1953 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 |
Charlies | C6 | 33006 | 06/1942 | GFD FEL 75E 70C 70B 70C 70A 70C W |
Guildford Feltham Three Bridges Guildford Feltham Guildford Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 14/10/1963 06/01/1964 22/06/1964 20/11/1964 08/06/1965 22/11/1965 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 |
Charlies | C7 | 33007 | 07/1942 | GFD FEL 73C 70B W |
Guildford Feltham Hither Green Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 14/02/1953 26/05/1953 26/01/1964 |
26/01/1964 |
Charlies | C8 | 33008 | 07/1942 | GFD FEL W |
Guildford Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 25/08/1963 |
25/08/1963 |
Charlies | C9 | 33009 | 07/1942 | GFD FEL 73C 70B 70C 70A W |
Guildford Feltham Hither Green Feltham Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 14/02/1953 26/05/1953 14/09/1964 08/06/1965 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 |
Charlies | C10 | 33010 | 08/1942 | GFD FEL W |
Guildford Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C11 | 33011 | 09/1942 | GFD FEL 73C 70B W |
Guildford Feltham Hither Green Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 14/02/1953 26/05/1953 25/08/1963 |
25/08/1963 |
Charlies | C12 | 33012 | 09/1942 | GFD FEL 70C W |
Guildford Feltham Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 14/09/1964 22/11/1964 |
22/11/1964 |
Charlies | C13 | 33013 | 10/1942 | GFD FEL W |
Guildford Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 |
Charlies | C14 | 33014 | 10/1942 | ELH 70C 73C 73J 70B 75E W 70C |
Eastleigh Guildford Hither Green Tonbridge Feltham Three Bridges Withdrawn Guildford |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 27/07/1951 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 17/12/1962 05/01/1964 06/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C15 | 33015 | 11/1942 | ELH 70C 73C 75C 73A 70A 70B 75E 70C W |
Eastleigh Guildford Hither Green Norwood Junction Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Three Bridges Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 27/07/1951 18/06/1954 06/11/1954 08/02/1955 10/02/1961 17/12/1962 06/01/1964 15/11/1964 |
15/11/1964 |
Charlies | C16 | 33016 | 11/1942 | ELH 70C 71D 71A 73E 73C 75C 70B 75E W |
Eastleigh Guildford Fratton Eastleigh Faversham Hither Green Norwood Junction Feltham Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 27/06/1951 21/01/1952 14/02/1953 20/07/1953 13/05/1954 06/11/1954 17/12/1962 25/08/1963 |
25/08/1963 |
Charlies | C17 | 33017 | 05/1942 | ELH 75A 73A 70A 70B 75E W |
Eastleigh Brighton Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1954 06/11/1954 08/02/1955 10/02/1961 17/12/1962 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C18 | 33018 | 04/1942 | ELH 74B 70C 73A 70C 73C 75C 70B 75E 70C 70A W |
Eastleigh Ramsgate Guildford Stewarts Lane Guildford Hither Green Norwood Junction Feltham Three Bridges Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1953 26/05/1953 20/07/1953 24/08/1953 01/10/1953 13/05/1954 06/11/1954 17/12/1962 06/01/1964 08/06/1965 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 |
Charlies | C19 | 33019 | 05/1942 | ELH 74B 73A 70C W |
Eastleigh Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 24/08/1953 01/12/1963 |
01/12/1963 |
Charlies | C20 | 33020 | 05/1942 | ELH 70B 70C 70A 70C W |
Eastleigh Feltham Guildford Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1964 20/11/1964 08/06/1965 22/11/1965 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 |
Charlies | C21 | 33021 | 05/1942 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/08/1963 |
18/08/1963 |
Charlies | C22 | 33022 | 06/1942 | ELH 74B 73A 70C W |
Eastleigh Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 01/10/1953 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C23 | 33023 | 06/1942 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
Charlies | C24 | 33024 | 06/1942 | ELH 74D 70B 75E W |
Eastleigh Tonbridge Feltham Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1953 10/02/1961 24/09/1962 25/08/1963 |
25/08/1963 |
Charlies | C25 | 33025 | 07/1942 | ELH 70A 70C W |
Eastleigh Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1954 20/08/1954 07/07/1963 |
07/07/1963 |
Charlies | C26 | 33026 | 07/1942 | TON 73D 73D 74D 70B 75E 70B 70C 70A W |
Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Gillingham (Kent) Tonbridge Feltham Three Bridges Feltham Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/09/1951 01/10/1953 24/09/1962 06/01/1964 20/11/1964 08/06/1965 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 |
Charlies | C27 | 33027 | 07/1942 | TON 73D 74D 70B 70C 70A 70C W |
Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Tonbridge Feltham Guildford Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 05/09/1951 01/10/1953 20/11/1964 08/06/1965 22/11/1965 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 |
Charlies | C28 | 33028 | 08/1942 | TON 73D 74D 70B 75E W |
Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Tonbridge Feltham Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 05/09/1951 28/05/1962 24/09/1962 03/02/1963 |
03/02/1963 |
Charlies | C29 | 33029 | 09/1942 | TON 70B 75E W |
Tonbridge Feltham Three Bridges Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1962 24/09/1962 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C30 | 33030 | 09/1942 | TON 70A 70B W |
Tonbridge Nine Elms Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1962 06/01/1964 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
Charlies | C31 | 33031 | 10/1942 | FEL TON 70A W |
Feltham Tonbridge Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 28/05/1962 29/09/1963 |
29/09/1963 |
Charlies | C32 | 33032 | 10/1942 | FEL TON 70C W |
Feltham Tonbridge Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 28/05/1962 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C33 | 33033 | 11/1942 | FEL TON 70C W |
Feltham Tonbridge Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 28/05/1962 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
Charlies | C34 | 33034 | 11/1942 | FEL TON 70C W |
Feltham Tonbridge Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 26/05/1961 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C35 | 33035 | 11/1942 | FEL TON 70C W |
Feltham Tonbridge Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 26/05/1961 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
Charlies | C36 | 33036 | 12/1942 | FEL BAT TON 73A 74D 70C W |
Feltham Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 04/02/1950 27/07/1951 07/10/1952 26/05/1961 28/06/1964 |
28/06/1964 |
Charlies | C37 | 33037 | 11/1942 | FEL BAT TON 73A 73C 75A 73C 73J 71A W |
Feltham Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Stewarts Lane Hither Green Brighton Hither Green Tonbridge Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 04/02/1950 27/07/1951 07/10/1952 13/05/1954 06/11/1954 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 06/10/1963 |
06/10/1963 |
Charlies | C38 | 33038 | 12/1942 | FEL BAT TON 73A 71A 75C 73A 70A 70B W |
Feltham Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Norwood Junction Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 04/02/1950 27/07/1951 07/10/1952 18/06/1954 06/11/1954 08/02/1955 10/02/1961 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 |
Charlies | C39 | 33039 | 12/1942 | FEL BAT 74D 74E 73C 73J 71A W |
Feltham Stewarts Lane Tonbridge St Leonards Hither Green Tonbridge Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 24/06/1950 19/07/1957 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
Charlies | C40 | 33040 | 12/1942 | FEL BAT 74D 74E 73C 73J 70B W |
Feltham Stewarts Lane Tonbridge St Leonards Hither Green Tonbridge Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 24/06/1950 19/07/1957 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |