SR "USA" Class 0-6-0T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 61 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 62 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 63 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 64 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 65 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 66 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 67 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 68 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 69 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 70 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 71 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 72 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 73 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 74 | SOT | Southampton Docks | |||
02/06/1962 | Condemned | 30063 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
06/10/1962 | Condemned | 30065 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
06/10/1962 | Condemned | 30070 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
20/10/1962 | Condemned | 30061 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 30062 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
30/12/1962 | Condemned | 30066 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
03/1963 | Condemned | 30074 | SOT | Southampton Docks | COND | ||
04/03/1963 | Reallocation | 30072 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 70C | Guildford | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30064 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 71A | Eastleigh | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30067 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 71A | Eastleigh | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30068 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 71A | Eastleigh | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30069 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 71A | Eastleigh | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30071 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 71A | Eastleigh | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30073 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 71A | Eastleigh | |
15/03/1964 | Condemned | 30068 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
22/08/1966 | Reallocation | 30064 | 71A | Eastleigh | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
17/10/1966 | Reallocation | 30064 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 70D | Eastleigh | |
08/01/1967 | Condemned | 30073 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 30064 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 30067 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 30069 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 30071 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 30072 | 70C | Guildford | COND |