SR Billinton "E4" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 2495 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2463 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2464 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2465 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2467 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2468 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2469 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2470 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2471 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2472 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2473 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2474 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2475 | NHN | Newhaven | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2476 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2479 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2480 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2481 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2482 | NHN | Newhaven | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2484 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2485 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2486 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2487 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2488 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2490 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2491 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2492 | NHN | Newhaven | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2493 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2494 | NHN | Newhaven | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2495 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NORW | Norwood Junction | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2496 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2497 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2498 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2499 | NHN | Newhaven | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2500 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2501 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2502 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2503 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2504 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2505 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2506 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2507 | RED | Redhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2508 | NHN | Newhaven | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2509 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2510 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2511 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2512 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2513 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2514 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2515 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2516 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2517 | RED | Redhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2518 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2519 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2520 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2556 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2557 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2558 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2559 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | RED | Redhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2561 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2562 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2563 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2564 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2565 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2566 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2577 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2578 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2579 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2580 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2581 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2582 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2467 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2469 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2472 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2480 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 3Br | Three Bridges | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2496 | HOR | Horsham | HOR | Horsham | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2514 | BTN | Brighton | BTN | Brighton | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2558 | BTN | Brighton | BTN | Brighton | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2577 | BTN | Brighton | BTN | Brighton | |
01/03/1948 | Reallocation | 2481 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ELH | Eastleigh | |
01/03/1948 | Reallocation | 2562 | FRA | Fratton | ELH | Eastleigh | |
01/03/1948 | Reallocation | 2578 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | NORW | Norwood Junction | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2487 | GFD | Guildford | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2492 | NHN | Newhaven | FRA | Fratton | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 2468 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 32493 | NORW | Norwood Junction | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2490 | FRA | Fratton | BAS | Basingstoke | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2500 | GFD | Guildford | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2509 | FRA | Fratton | BTN | Brighton | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 32559 | FRA | Fratton | ELH | Eastleigh | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2561 | NORW | Norwood Junction | RED | Redhill | |
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 32504 | GFD | Guildford | NHN | Newhaven | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32492 | FRA | Fratton | ELH | Eastleigh | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2557 | HOR | Horsham | ELH | Eastleigh | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32558 | BTN | Brighton | ELH | Eastleigh | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32563 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ELH | Eastleigh | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2579 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ELH | Eastleigh | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2581 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | TON | Tonbridge | |
03/05/1949 | Reallocation | 32499 | NHN | Newhaven | BA | Bricklayers Arms | |
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 32482 | NHN | Newhaven | HOR | Horsham | |
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 32496 | HOR | Horsham | NHN | Newhaven | |
26/09/1949 | Reallocation | 32496 | NHN | Newhaven | 3B | Bushbury | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 2487 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | FRA | Fratton | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 32490 | BAS | Basingstoke | 70C | Guildford | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 32491 | BTN | Brighton | 71A | Eastleigh | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 2473 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32498 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 70A | Nine Elms | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32499 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32512 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 75B | Redhill | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32582 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32498 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32499 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32512 | 75B | Redhill | 75B | Redhill | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32582 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32496 | 3B | Bushbury | 75A | Brighton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 2487 | FRA | Fratton | 70C | Guildford | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32496 | 75A | Brighton | NHN | Newhaven | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32501 | HOR | Horsham | 70A | Nine Elms | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32502 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 70A | Nine Elms | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32582 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 75E | Three Bridges | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 2487 | 70C | Guildford | 70C | Guildford | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32501 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32502 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32582 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75E | Three Bridges | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32501 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32502 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/03/1951 | Reallocation | 32582 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
20/03/1951 | Reallocation | 32582 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 32496 | NHN | Newhaven | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 32502 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 32506 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 75A | Brighton | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 32511 | HOR | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 32582 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 32506 | 75A | Brighton | 72B | Salisbury | |
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 32581 | TON | Tonbridge | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 32481 | ELH | Eastleigh | 75E | Three Bridges | |
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 32497 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 70A | Nine Elms | |
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 32501 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32463 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 75D | Horsham | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32465 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 75D | Horsham | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32467 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 75D | Horsham | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32482 | HOR | Horsham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32496 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 75A | Brighton | |
08/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32463 | 75D | Horsham | 75D | Horsham | |
08/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32465 | 75D | Horsham | 75D | Horsham | |
08/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32467 | 75D | Horsham | 75D | Horsham | |
08/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32482 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75E | Three Bridges | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32468 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | 75D | Horsham | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32469 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 75D | Horsham | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32470 | BTN | Brighton | 75D | Horsham | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32505 | BTN | Brighton | 71D | Fratton | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32509 | BTN | Brighton | 71D | Fratton | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32517 | RED | Redhill | 74C | Dover Marine | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32556 | HOR | Horsham | 71A | Eastleigh | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32578 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 74D | Tonbridge | |
21/01/1952 | Reallocation | 32471 | BTN | Brighton | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
21/01/1952 | Reallocation | 32479 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 71D | Fratton | |
21/01/1952 | Reallocation | 32495 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 71D | Fratton | |
21/01/1952 | Reallocation | 32515 | HOR | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
19/03/1952 | Reallocation | 32486 | BTN | Brighton | 71A | Eastleigh | |
19/03/1952 | Reallocation | 32507 | RED | Redhill | 75B | Redhill | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 32486 | 71A | Eastleigh | 72B | Salisbury | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 2485 | EBN | Eastbourne | 75A | Brighton | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 32517 | 74C | Dover Marine | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 32518 | EBN | Eastbourne | 75A | Brighton | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 32482 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75E | Three Bridges | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 32505 | 71D | Fratton | 71D | Fratton | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 32578 | 74D | Tonbridge | 74D | Tonbridge | |
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 32476 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/02/1954 | Reallocation | 32558 | ELH | Eastleigh | 71C | Dorchester | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 32482 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
11/12/1954 | Reallocation | 32484 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
11/12/1954 | Reallocation | 32578 | 74D | Tonbridge | 74E | St Leonards | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 32484 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 75E | Three Bridges | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 32502 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 70D | Basingstoke | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 32578 | 74E | St Leonards | 74D | Tonbridge | |
11/03/1955 | Reallocation | 32468 | 75D | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
11/03/1955 | Reallocation | 32481 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
26/03/1955 | Condemned | 32465 | 75D | Horsham | COND | ||
20/04/1955 | Reallocation | 32516 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
04/06/1955 | Condemned | 32518 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
16/07/1955 | Condemned | 32501 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
16/09/1955 | Reallocation | 32503 | TON | Tonbridge | 75A | Brighton | |
16/09/1955 | Reallocation | 32506 | 72B | Salisbury | 70C | Guildford | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32467 | 75D | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32484 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32491 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32492 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32495 | 71D | Fratton | 70A | Nine Elms | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32505 | 71D | Fratton | 70C | Guildford | |
10/10/1955 | Reallocation | 32512 | 75B | Redhill | 75A | Brighton | |
15/10/1955 | Condemned | 32482 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
15/10/1955 | Condemned | 32516 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
29/10/1955 | Condemned | 32496 | 75ANEW | COND | |||
17/12/1955 | Condemned | 32490 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
19/12/1955 | Reallocation | 32495 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70F | Fratton | |
14/01/1956 | Condemned | 32513 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
27/01/1956 | Reallocation | 32491 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Basingstoke | |
27/01/1956 | Reallocation | 32563 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
04/02/1956 | Condemned | 32464 | HOR | Horsham | COND | ||
28/04/1956 | Condemned | 32561 | RED | Redhill | COND | ||
15/06/1956 | Reallocation | 32562 | ELH | Eastleigh | 75A | Brighton | |
15/09/1956 | Condemned | 32511 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
15/09/1956 | Condemned | 32514 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
29/10/1956 | Condemned | 32582 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | COND | ||
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 32480 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 75D | Horsham | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 32486 | 72B | Salisbury | 70A | Nine Elms | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 32491 | 70D | Basingstoke | 71A | Eastleigh | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 32502 | 70D | Basingstoke | 75A | Brighton | |
01/12/1956 | Condemned | 32558 | 98W | COND | |||
12/01/1957 | Condemned | 32520 | 3Br | Three Bridges | COND | ||
20/04/1957 | Condemned | 32476 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
04/05/1957 | Condemned | 32492 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
01/06/1957 | Condemned | 32499 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
08/06/1957 | Condemned | 32488 | TON | Tonbridge | COND | ||
08/10/1957 | Reallocation | 32560 | RED | Redhill | 70A | Nine Elms | |
07/12/1957 | Condemned | 32485 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
08/02/1958 | Condemned | 32493 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
08/02/1958 | Condemned | 32502 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 32487 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 32480 | 75D | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 32507 | 75B | Redhill | 75A | Brighton | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 32519 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
12/04/1958 | Condemned | 32481 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
26/04/1958 | Condemned | 32467 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
06/06/1958 | Reallocation | 32557 | ELH | Eastleigh | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
09/08/1958 | Condemned | 32560 | 98W | COND | |||
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 32557 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
24/01/1959 | Condemned | 32486 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
25/04/1959 | Condemned | 32566 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
02/05/1959 | Condemned | 32507 | 98W | COND | |||
04/07/1959 | Condemned | 32517 | 98W | COND | |||
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 32463 | 75D | Horsham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 32469 | 75D | Horsham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 32470 | 75D | Horsham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
12/09/1959 | Condemned | 32471 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | COND | ||
12/09/1959 | Condemned | 32519 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
19/09/1959 | Condemned | 32494 | NHN | Newhaven | COND | ||
03/10/1959 | Condemned | 32463 | 98W | COND | |||
22/10/1959 | Reallocation | 32580 | TON | Tonbridge | 75A | Brighton | |
24/10/1959 | Condemned | 32577 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 32480 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 32497 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 32579 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 32479 | 71D | Fratton | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 32495 | 70F | Fratton | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 32509 | 71D | Fratton | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
30/01/1960 | Condemned | 32508 | NHN | Newhaven | COND | ||
10/03/1960 | Reallocation | 32564 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 75E | Three Bridges | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 32479 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 75A | Brighton | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 32495 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 75A | Brighton | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 32509 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
06/05/1960 | Reallocation | 32505 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
06/05/1960 | Reallocation | 32506 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
02/07/1960 | Condemned | 32559 | 98W | COND | |||
08/07/1960 | Reallocation | 32472 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/07/1960 | Reallocation | 32473 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
06/08/1960 | Condemned | 32562 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
23/08/1960 | Reallocation | 32578 | 74D | Tonbridge | 75A | Brighton | |
17/09/1960 | Condemned | 32484 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
17/09/1960 | Condemned | 32495 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
14/01/1961 | Condemned | 32491 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
17/01/1961 | Reallocation | 32506 | 70A | Nine Elms | 71A | Eastleigh | |
17/01/1961 | Reallocation | 32563 | 70A | Nine Elms | 71A | Eastleigh | |
18/03/1961 | Reallocation | 32509 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 75A | Brighton | |
18/03/1961 | Reallocation | 32581 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 75A | Brighton | |
25/03/1961 | Condemned | 32505 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
22/04/1961 | Condemned | 32578 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
20/05/1961 | Condemned | 32515 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
27/05/1961 | Condemned | 32512 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
24/06/1961 | Condemned | 32475 | NHN | Newhaven | COND | ||
24/06/1961 | Condemned | 32506 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
01/07/1961 | Condemned | 32563 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
01/07/1961 | Condemned | 32565 | 98W | COND | |||
23/09/1961 | Condemned | 32564 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 32469 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 32556 | 98W | COND | |||
10/10/1961 | Reallocation | 32474 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 75E | Three Bridges | |
09/11/1961 | Reallocation | 32557 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
11/11/1961 | Condemned | 32498 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
25/11/1961 | Condemned | 32504 | NHN | Newhaven | COND | ||
27/01/1962 | Condemned | 32500 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
31/03/1962 | Condemned | 32509 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
17/04/1962 | Condemned | 32580 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
17/04/1962 | Condemned | 32581 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
01/05/1962 | Reallocation | 32470 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
01/05/1962 | Reallocation | 32474 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
23/06/1962 | Condemned | 32470 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
30/06/1962 | Condemned | 32472 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
29/09/1962 | Condemned | 32510 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
27/10/1962 | Condemned | 32473 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
23/12/1962 | Condemned | 32487 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
23/12/1962 | Condemned | 32557 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
20/01/1963 | Condemned | 32468 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
14/04/1963 | Condemned | 32503 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
19/05/1963 | Condemned | 32474 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
02/06/1963 | Condemned | 32479 | 75A | Brighton | COND |