Beyer-Peacock 35 B-B
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wed 31/05/1961 | D7000 | 82A | Noted at Swindon outside the Works | John Sutters | ||
Sun 03/12/1961 | D7012 | 82A | Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Just delivered from Beyer Peacock | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 29/12/1962 | D7017 | 82A | Down parcels working at Old Oak - all over green | The Early Years of London Diesels | ||
Sat 19/10/1963 | D7020 | 82A | Down parcels train from Paddington | The Early Years of London Diesels | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | D7013, D7031 |
82A, 86A |
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop |
RO 1/1965 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D7027, D7035, D7045, D7062, D7065, D7066 |
81A, 81A, 81A, 81A, 81A, 81A |
Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Wed 23/07/1969 | D7000 | 82A | Exeter St Davids station and depot: On Exeter St Davids depot. | RO 10/1969 | ||
Sun 18/07/1971 | D7001 | 82A | 1Z30 | Locomotive failure: 08:30 Paignton - Weymouth - PANTHER failed at Whiteball with a water pump problem, only to be rescued by D7001. Subsequently relieved by D824 at Westbury. (1Z30) | ||
Sun 03/10/1971 | D7002 | Wdn | Dumped at Bristol Marsh Junction | Harris | ||
Sun 19/12/1971 | D7006, D7058, D7062, D7069, D7079, D7081 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Old Oak Common depot: Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. Old Oak Common depot: Around the shed. - Stripping for spares outside the old works. Old Oak Common depot: Around the shed. - Stripping for spares outside the old works. Old Oak Common depot: Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. Old Oak Common depot: Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. Old Oak Common depot: Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D7045 | 82A | Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point | RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D7059 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: At Swindon | RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D7002, D7010, D7014, D7020, D7024, D7042, D7063, D7067, D7078 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol Stabled at St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol: Stabled on St Philips Marsh depot, Bristol |
RO 517 | ||
Tue 11/01/1972 | D7006, D7027, D7069, D7072, D7079, D7081, D7085, D7086 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, 81A, Wdn |
Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common |
RO 517 | ||
Fri 21/01/1972 | D7010, D7020, D7024, D7042, D7059 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works Swindon Works visit: Around the works |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Sat 22/01/1972 | D7060, D7064, D7070, D7073, D7083, D7086, D7088 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton: Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
RO 517 | ||
Mon 02/1972 | D7002 | Wdn | Dumped at Swindon Works | |||
Tue 01/02/1972 | D7076 | 82A | 07:15 Exeter St. Davids - Waterloo. D6544 was piloted by Hymek D7076 - possibly for insurance after failure the previous day. 5 minutes late arrival. | RO 4/1972 | ||
Tue 01/02/1972 | D7076 | 82A | 13:05 Waterloo - Exeter St. Davids | RO 4/1972 | ||
Sat 05/02/1972 | D7006, D7013, D7027, D7033, D7034, D7035, D7036, D7046, D7049, D7052, D7053, D7069, D7071, D7072, D7079, D7081 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common In store at Old Oak Common |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Thu 10/02/1972 | D7002 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: New arrivals | RO 4/1972 | ||
Sat 26/02/1972 | D7003, D7008, D7021, D7025, D7040, D7041, D7043, D7047, D7051, D7056, D7057, D7063, D7065, D7067, D7078 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump Bristol St. Philips Marsh depot: Dump |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sun 27/02/1972 | D7051 | Wdn | Bristol Bath Road - Moved around. | RO 4/1972 | ||
Mon 30/07/1973 | D7000 | Wdn | Dumped at Old Oak Common | |||
Tue 05/1974 | D7001 | Wdn | Dumped at Old Oak Common | Harris | ||
Tue 19/11/1974 | D7000 | Wdn | Moved to Swindon Works | |||
Mon 17/02/1975 | D7001 | Wdn | Towed to Cohen's, Kettering for scrap | Harris | ||
Sun 22/06/1975 | D7017 | Wdn | Old Oak Common shed: On shed - Covered in notices advising new owners are the D&EG and not to rob the loco | |||
Sun 22/06/1975 | D7001 | Wdn | Noted at George Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering | Harris | ||
Mon 11/08/1975 | D7001 | Wdn | Cabs and frames only at Cohen's | Harris | ||
Mon 15/09/1975 | D7000 | Wdn | This loco was cannibalised at Swindon Works Open Day by souvenir hunters in a sponsored 'Scrap a Loco' stunt. |