37 Co-Co
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 26/02/1961 | D6700, D6700, D6707, D6707, D6707, D6709, D6709 |
30A, 30A, 31B, 31B, 31B, 30A, 30A |
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - New erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - New erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Fri 25/01/1963 | D6808, D6808 |
41A, 41A |
Released from English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number EE/VF3237/D762 1962 As D6808 Released from English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number EE/VF3237/D762 1962 As D6808 |
|||
Sun 12/04/1964 | D6808, D6808 |
41A, 41A |
Stabled on Retford Stabled on Retford |
|||
Tue 18/08/1964 | D6808, D6808 |
41A, 41A |
Passed through Doncaster on a Local Coal Working Passed through Doncaster on a Local Coal Working |
|||
Sat 26/09/1964 | D6747, D6748, D6807, D6809 |
41A, 41A, 41A, 41A |
Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 26/09/1964 | D6727, D6727 |
30A, 30A |
Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled the Harwich Boat Train. A Stratford (30A) Type 3 was always diagrammed for this train Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled the Harwich Boat Train. A Stratford (30A) Type 3 was always diagrammed for this train |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 03/10/1964 | D6798 | 41A | A morning spent at Kiveton Park (ex MSLR): Passing | John Thickitt | ||
Sun 05/11/1967 | D6903 | 64B | Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. | RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Thu 01/02/1968 | D6762 | 51L | 08:30 additional from Millerhill to Carlisle via the Waverley route | RCTS 4/1968 | ||
Sun 23/06/1968 | D6934, D6934 |
87E, 87E |
Stabled at Pantyffynon - Green with full yellow end. Carrying headlight for working the Central Wales line Stabled at Pantyffynon - Green with full yellow end. Carrying headlight for working the Central Wales line |
Green Diesel Days - Huntriss | ||
Fri 20/06/1969 | D6822, D6822 |
51L, 51L |
Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Mon 30/06/1969 | D6607, D6607 |
87E, 87E |
Locomotive convoy: Hauled 4 class 14's from Cardiff and dropped them off in the shed. Locomotive convoy: Hauled 4 class 14's from Cardiff and dropped them off in the shed. |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D6838, D6845, D6845, D6845, D6849, D6849 |
65A, 65A, 65A, 65A, 65A, 65A |
Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 13/07/1969 | D6837, D6837, D6840, D6856, D6856 |
66A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A |
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Thu 17/07/1969 | D6854, D6856, D6856, D6905, D6905 |
66A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A |
Motherwell depot: On shed Motherwell depot: On shed Motherwell depot: On shed Motherwell depot: On shed Motherwell depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 20/07/1969 | D6886, D6886 |
86A, 86A |
Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Fri 20/08/1971 | D6845, D6845, D6845 |
65A, 65A, 65A |
Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Outside the shed - BR blue livery with yellow ends. Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Outside the shed - BR blue livery with yellow ends. Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Outside the shed - BR blue livery with yellow ends. |
Keith Long | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D6999, D6999 |
86A, 86A |
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Fri 06/04/1973 | D6808, D6808 |
41A, 41A |
1505 St. Pancras - Sheffield 1505 St. Pancras - Sheffield |
|||
Sun 24/06/1973 | D6808, D6808 |
TI, TI |
Barnsley - Blackpool excursion Barnsley - Blackpool excursion |
|||
Sun 29/06/1975 | 37027, 37027 |
MR, MR |
On Stratford depot - Stabled On Stratford depot - Stabled |
|||
Sun 20/07/1975 | 37292, 37292, 37297, 37297 |
CF, CF, CF, CF |
On Cardiff Canton depot - Stabled - blue with BR symbol under cabside window On Cardiff Canton depot - Stabled - blue with BR symbol under cabside window On Cardiff Canton depot - Stabled On Cardiff Canton depot - Stabled |
|||
Thu 19/08/1976 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
1840 Scarborough - Sheffield 1840 Scarborough - Sheffield |
|||
Sat 21/08/1976 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
1M46 | Seen passing through Rotherwood (1M46) Seen passing through Rotherwood (1M46) |
||
Sat 21/08/1976 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
Stabled on Tinsley (TI) Stabled on Tinsley (TI) |
|||
Sun 01/05/1977 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
Stabled on Tinsley (TI) Stabled on Tinsley (TI) |
|||
Sat 28/05/1977 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
0745 Sheffield - Bridlington 0745 Sheffield - Bridlington |
|||
Sat 16/07/1977 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
1M06 | 0928 Sheffield - Blackpool (1M06) 0928 Sheffield - Blackpool (1M06) |
||
Sat 16/07/1977 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
1E57 | 1400 Blackpool - Sheffield (1E57) 1400 Blackpool - Sheffield (1E57) |
||
Sat 20/08/1977 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
1E12 | 1035 Portsmouth - Sheffield Between Nottingham - Sheffield (1E12) 1035 Portsmouth - Sheffield Between Nottingham - Sheffield (1E12) |
||
Fri 02/09/1977 | 37108, 37108 |
TI, TI |
Stabled on Saltley depot Stabled on Saltley depot |
|||
Tue 28/03/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Stabled on Eastfield Stabled on Eastfield |
|||
Thu 30/03/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2245 Carstairs - Edinburgh 2245 Carstairs - Edinburgh |
|||
Fri 26/05/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street |
|||
Fri 26/05/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Fort Wiliam 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Fort Wiliam |
|||
Sat 27/05/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Malaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Malaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William |
|||
Mon 29/05/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T24 | 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24) 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24) |
||
Wed 07/06/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig |
|||
Mon 03/07/1978 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1515 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street 1515 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street |
|||
Sat 17/03/1979 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1V93 | Edinburgh - Plymouth Between York - Bristol TM (1V93) Edinburgh - Plymouth Between York - Bristol TM (1V93) |
||
Sun 15/04/1979 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Stabled on Eastfield Stabled on Eastfield |
|||
Fri 22/08/1980 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1O92 | 2020 Stirling - Dover Between Stirling - Mossend (1O92) 2020 Stirling - Dover Between Stirling - Mossend (1O92) |
||
Mon 15/09/1980 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L31 | 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31) 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31) |
||
Mon 15/09/1980 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2T25 | 1139 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T25) 1139 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T25) |
||
Sat 15/11/1980 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L31 | 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31) 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31) |
||
Sat 15/11/1980 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2T25 | 1139 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T25) 1139 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T25) |
||
Fri 17/04/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow Q St - Mallaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Ft William (1B07) 0600 Glasgow Q St - Mallaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Ft William (1B07) |
||
Mon 11/05/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street |
|||
Mon 11/05/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William |
|||
Sat 23/05/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B14 | 1635 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William (1B14) 1635 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William (1B14) |
||
Sat 30/05/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L31 | 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31) 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31) |
||
Mon 08/06/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Mon 08/06/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B11 | 1254 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) 1254 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) |
||
Mon 08/06/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T51 | 1758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T51) 1758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T51) |
||
Wed 15/07/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L53 | 1644 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53) 1644 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53) |
||
Wed 15/07/1981 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2T53 | 1939 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T53) 1939 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T53) |
||
Sat 13/02/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T24 | 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Qsreet Between Mallaig - Corrour & Failed. (1T24) 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Qsreet Between Mallaig - Corrour & Failed. (1T24) |
||
Sat 06/03/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L27 | 0640 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L27) 0640 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L27) |
||
Sat 06/03/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2T17 | 0939 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T17) 0939 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T17) |
||
Sat 06/03/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B15 | 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) |
||
Sat 27/03/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig Between Glasgow - Fort William (1B07) 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig Between Glasgow - Fort William (1B07) |
||
Sat 27/03/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B16 | 1230 Mallaig - Fort William (1B16) 1230 Mallaig - Fort William (1B16) |
||
Sat 27/03/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2B12 | 1630 Fort William - Mallaig (2B12) 1630 Fort William - Mallaig (2B12) |
||
Mon 12/04/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T24 | 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24) 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24) |
||
Thu 15/04/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig (1B07) 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig (1B07) |
||
Wed 28/07/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B08 | 0804 Glasgow - Oban (1B08) 0804 Glasgow - Oban (1B08) |
||
Wed 28/07/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T32 | 1225 Oban - Glasgow (1T32) 1225 Oban - Glasgow (1T32) |
||
Wed 28/07/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B15 | 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) |
||
Sat 31/07/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L53 | 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53) 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53) |
||
Sat 31/07/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2T51 | 1903 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T51) 1903 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T51) |
||
Fri 27/08/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B14 | 1634 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig Between Glasgow - Fort William (1B14) 1634 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig Between Glasgow - Fort William (1B14) |
||
Sat 25/09/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
LNER Society railtour over West Highland Line With 37081 (37797) LNER Society railtour over West Highland Line With 37081 (37797) |
|||
Sat 04/12/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig (1B07) 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig (1B07) |
||
Sat 18/12/1982 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T56 | 1610 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T56) 1610 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T56) |
||
Sat 19/03/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T03 | 0435 Edinburgh - Glasgow Queen Street (1T03) 0435 Edinburgh - Glasgow Queen Street (1T03) |
||
Wed 23/03/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig Between ? -? (1B07) 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig Between ? -? (1B07) |
||
Wed 30/03/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T02 | 2055 Euston - Mallaig Between Between Mossend - Cowlairs (1T02) 2055 Euston - Mallaig Between Between Mossend - Cowlairs (1T02) |
||
Wed 30/03/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T02 | 2055 Euston - Fort William Glasgow Queen Street shunt, attach to 1B07. (1T02) 2055 Euston - Fort William Glasgow Queen Street shunt, attach to 1B07. (1T02) |
||
Mon 04/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B08 | 0804 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B08) 0804 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B08) |
||
Mon 04/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T32 | 1225 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T32) 1225 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T32) |
||
Mon 04/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B15 | 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) |
||
Tue 05/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0754 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0754 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Tue 05/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B11 | 1255 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) 1255 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) |
||
Sat 16/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1Z48 | 1704 Queens Park - Aberdeen (1Z48) 1704 Queens Park - Aberdeen (1Z48) |
||
Sat 23/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig (1B07) 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig (1B07) |
||
Thu 28/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Sat 30/04/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1Z53 | +1Z54 1130 Footex Dundee - Cartsdyke And Return, Via Lenzie, Springburn And Shields Jn (1Z53) +1Z54 1130 Footex Dundee - Cartsdyke And Return, Via Lenzie, Springburn And Shields Jn (1Z53) |
||
Sat 21/05/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B15 | 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) |
||
Mon 04/07/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T56 | 1610 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street (1T56) 1610 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street (1T56) |
||
Thu 07/07/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Fri 08/07/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B11 | 1255 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) 1255 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) |
||
Fri 08/07/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T52 | 1758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52) 1758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52) |
||
Tue 19/07/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig (1B07) 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig (1B07) |
||
Tue 19/07/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B16 | 1225 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street Between Mallaig - Fort William (1B16) 1225 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street Between Mallaig - Fort William (1B16) |
||
Mon 01/08/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig With 37192 (37694) (1B07) 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig With 37192 (37694) (1B07) |
||
Wed 10/08/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T03 | 0435 Edinburgh - Glasgow Queen Street (1T03) 0435 Edinburgh - Glasgow Queen Street (1T03) |
||
Wed 10/08/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B08 | 0805 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B08) 0805 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B08) |
||
Wed 10/08/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T26 | 1225 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T26) 1225 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T26) |
||
Thu 11/08/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Fri 12/08/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T04 | 2350 Inverness - Glasgow Queen Street (1T04) 2350 Inverness - Glasgow Queen Street (1T04) |
||
Thu 15/09/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1S06 | 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Mossend - Cowlairs (1S06) 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Mossend - Cowlairs (1S06) |
||
Thu 15/09/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B15 | 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) |
||
Sun 18/09/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1Z19 | 0905 Edinburgh - Oban (1Z19) 0905 Edinburgh - Oban (1Z19) |
||
Sun 18/09/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1Z19 | 1530 Oban - Edinburgh (1Z19) 1530 Oban - Edinburgh (1Z19) |
||
Mon 19/09/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1S06 | 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Cowlairs - Glasgow Queen Street (1S06) 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Cowlairs - Glasgow Queen Street (1S06) |
||
Mon 26/09/1983 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B07 | 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig With 37085 (37711) (1B07) 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig With 37085 (37711) (1B07) |
||
Tue 14/02/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T24 | 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24) 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24) |
||
Sat 18/02/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B11 | 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) |
||
Tue 22/05/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T52 | 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52) 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52) |
||
Thu 24/05/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Stabled on Fort William Stabled on Fort William |
|||
Thu 24/05/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Fort William - Mallaig Fort William - Mallaig |
|||
Thu 24/05/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Mallaig - Fort William Mallaig - Fort William |
|||
Tue 29/05/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Stabled on Fort William Stabled on Fort William |
|||
Tue 29/05/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2B18 | 1850 Mallaig - Fort William (2B18) 1850 Mallaig - Fort William (2B18) |
||
Fri 01/06/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T24 | 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street With 37192 (37694) (1T24) 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street With 37192 (37694) (1T24) |
||
Tue 28/08/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B11 | 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) |
||
Tue 28/08/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T52 | 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52) 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52) |
||
Sat 13/10/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2L53 | 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53) 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53) |
||
Fri 19/10/1984 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1S07 | 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Cowlairs - Glasgow Queen Street (1S07) 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Cowlairs - Glasgow Queen Street (1S07) |
||
Tue 12/03/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Arpley - Healey Mills Arpley - Healey Mills |
|||
Mon 08/04/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B15 | 1820 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) 1820 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15) |
||
Tue 09/04/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Thu 11/04/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2O49 | 1715 Glasgow Queen Street - Edinburgh (2O49) 1715 Glasgow Queen Street - Edinburgh (2O49) |
||
Sat 13/04/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1B11 | 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11) |
||
Sat 20/04/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T16 | 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16) |
||
Mon 08/07/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T44 | 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T44) 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T44) |
||
Wed 10/07/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1M16 | 1550 Mallaig - Euston Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1M16) 1550 Mallaig - Euston Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1M16) |
||
Mon 15/07/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1T12 | 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T12) 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T12) |
||
Fri 16/08/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1Y23 | 1650 Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William (1Y23) 1650 Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William (1Y23) |
||
Sat 17/08/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1M16 | 1742 Fort William - Euston Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1M16) 1742 Fort William - Euston Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1M16) |
||
Wed 21/08/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2Y52 | 0650 Mallaig - Fort William (2Y52) 0650 Mallaig - Fort William (2Y52) |
||
Fri 20/12/1985 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno |
|||
Thu 02/01/1986 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno |
|||
Fri 10/01/1986 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Junc Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Junc |
|||
Thu 23/01/1986 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Junc Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Junc |
|||
Tue 28/01/1986 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
On light engine Test to Llandudno Junc On light engine Test to Llandudno Junc |
|||
Tue 04/02/1986 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Rhyl Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Rhyl |
|||
Fri 09/05/1986 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
6S46 | Doncaster - Gartcosh Speedlink (6S46) Doncaster - Gartcosh Speedlink (6S46) |
||
Sun 27/07/1986 | 37325, 37325 |
ED, ED |
1M46 | 1610 Glasgow Central - Euston Between Carstairs - Beattock (1M46) 1610 Glasgow Central - Euston Between Carstairs - Beattock (1M46) |
||
Sun 27/07/1986 | 37325, 37325 |
ED, ED |
1M52 | 1710 Glasgow - Euston Between Carstairs - Beatock summit (1M52) 1710 Glasgow - Euston Between Carstairs - Beatock summit (1M52) |
||
Mon 24/10/1988 | 37325, 37325 |
ED, ED |
1S07 | 2100 Euston - Fort William Rear assist over Beattock With 37311 (37156) (1S07) 2100 Euston - Fort William Rear assist over Beattock With 37311 (37156) (1S07) |
||
Mon 09/07/1990 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
Working Hunterston - BSc Ravenscraig iron ore train through Holytown With 37026 + 37040 Working Hunterston - BSc Ravenscraig iron ore train through Holytown With 37026 + 37040 |
|||
Tue 16/06/1992 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1N97 | 1714 Manchester V - Blackpool (1N97) 1714 Manchester V - Blackpool (1N97) |
||
Tue 16/06/1992 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2F38 | 1857 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street Between Blackpool - Wigan NW (2F38) 1857 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street Between Blackpool - Wigan NW (2F38) |
||
Wed 17/06/1992 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2F32 | 0650 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street (2F32) 0650 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street (2F32) |
||
Wed 17/06/1992 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2N49 | 1037 Liverpool - Blackpool (2N49) 1037 Liverpool - Blackpool (2N49) |
||
Wed 17/06/1992 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
2F32 | 1325 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street (2F32) 1325 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street (2F32) |
||
Sat 02/10/1993 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1Z16 | 0520 Preston - Cwmgwarch Between Preston - Kidwelly Loop With 37068 (1Z16) 0520 Preston - Cwmgwarch Between Preston - Kidwelly Loop With 37068 (1Z16) |
||
Sun 03/10/1993 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1M16 | 2020 Inverness - Euston Between Preston - Stockport With 37068 (1M16) 2020 Inverness - Euston Between Preston - Stockport With 37068 (1M16) |
||
Wed 01/12/1993 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
0600 Paddington - Glasgow Central Between Heyford - Birmingham NS 0600 Paddington - Glasgow Central Between Heyford - Birmingham NS |
|||
Fri 13/05/1994 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1K64 | 1400 Holyhead - Crewe Between Penmaenmawr - Llandudno Jn dragging 37425 DIT (1K64) 1400 Holyhead - Crewe Between Penmaenmawr - Llandudno Jn dragging 37425 DIT (1K64) |
||
Fri 26/08/1994 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
On ballast at Penmaenmawr With 37683 On ballast at Penmaenmawr With 37683 |
|||
Wed 09/08/1995 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1M18 | Glasgow Central - Euston Between Penrith - Preston (1M18) Glasgow Central - Euston Between Penrith - Preston (1M18) |
||
Fri 19/04/1996 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1V92 | 2138 Crewe - Cardiff Between Leominster - Cardiff (1V92) 2138 Crewe - Cardiff Between Leominster - Cardiff (1V92) |
||
Thu 04/07/1996 | 37108, 37108 |
ED, ED |
1S48 | 0905 Birmingham - Glasgow Between Shap - Carlisle (1S48) |