37 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (37/0) | BR (37/5) | BR (37/7) | BR (37/4) | BR (37/3 (1)) | BR (37/9M) | BR (37/9R) | BR (37/3 (2)) | BR (37/0 (R)) | BR (37/6) | BR (37/0 (R2)) | BR (Dept) | BR (37/4 (R)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6603 | 37303 | 37333 | 37271 | 16/09/1965 | EE | Landore | 01/08/1997 | 31.92 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 07/1997 | 31.85 | ||||||||||||
D6604 | 37304 | 37334 | 37272 | 22/09/1965 | EE | Landore | 01/03/1997 | 31.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 39.92 | ||||||||||||
D6700 | 37119 | 37350 | 02/12/1960 | EE | Stratford | 01/12/1999 | 39 | Prs | Preserved | 63.11 | ||||||||||||||
D6702 | 37002 | 37351 | 19/12/1960 | EE | Stratford | 01/12/1999 | 39 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2007 | 46.94 | |||||||||||||
D6708 | 37008 | 37352 | 37008 | 10/02/1961 | EE | Ipswich | 24/02/1992 | 31 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 07/1996 | 35.45 | ||||||||||||
D6709 | 37009 | 37340 | 17/02/1961 | EE | Stratford | 01/03/1995 | 34.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.90 | ||||||||||||||
D6715 | 37015 | 37341 | 19/05/1961 | EE | Stratford | 01/09/1994 | 33.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/2003 | 41.77 | |||||||||||||
D6732 | 37032 | 37353 | 37032 | 09/03/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 04/03/1994 | 32 | Prs | Preserved | 61.84 | |||||||||||||
D6743 | 37043 | 37354 | 37043 | 22/06/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 31/03/2003 | 40.75 | Cut | Sims Metals (Beeston) | 13/05/2003 | 40.92 | ||||||||||||
D6745 | 37045 | 37355 | 37045 | 06/07/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 31/10/2003 | 41.25 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) | 20/11/2003 | 41.40 | ||||||||||||
D6749 | 37049 | 37322 | 37343 | 37049 | 17/08/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1995 | 32.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) | 12/2003 | 41.36 | |||||||||||
D6753 | 37053 | 37344 | 14/09/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/07/1996 | 33.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/2006 | 43.53 | |||||||||||||
D6768 | 37068 | 37356 | 37068 | 23/11/1962 | EE | Thornaby | 31/05/2005 | 42.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 19/08/2005 | 42.77 | ||||||||||||
D6779 | 37079 | 37357 | 37079 | 06/11/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 30/06/2008 | 45.58 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 08/2008 | 45.81 | ||||||||||||
D6791 | 37091 | 37358 | 31/01/1963 | EE | Gateshead | 01/03/1997 | 34.17 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 05/2007 | 44.32 | |||||||||||||
D6801 | 37101 | 37345 | 28/12/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1994 | 31.17 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Immingham MPD) | 08/2003 | 40.66 | |||||||||||||
D6818 | 37118 | 37359 | 15/03/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/11/1994 | 31.67 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) | 01/2005 | 41.87 | |||||||||||||
D6827 | 37127 | 37370 | 28/05/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/11/2000 | 37.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2005 | 42.33 | |||||||||||||
D6828 | 37128 | 37330 | 07/06/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/02/1997 | 33.67 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2001 | 38.47 | |||||||||||||
D6845 | 37145 | 37313 | 37382 | 37145 | 06/06/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1994 | 30.58 | Cut | Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) | 04/2000 | 36.88 | |||||||||||
D6847 | 37147 | 37371 | 13/06/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/11/1999 | 36.42 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 06/2001 | 38.03 | |||||||||||||
D6859 | 37159 | 37372 | 26/06/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2004 | 41.5 | Prs | Preserved | 60.54 | ||||||||||||||
D6860 | 37160 | 37373 | 05/07/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/1993 | 30.42 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) | 07/1997 | 34.05 | |||||||||||||
D6865 | 37165 | 37374 | 37165 | 29/08/1963 | EE | Landore | 30/06/2008 | 44.83 | 60.37 | |||||||||||||||
D6867 | 37167 | 37383 | 16/09/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/02/1999 | 35.42 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe LNWR) | 01/2008 | 44.36 | |||||||||||||
D6893 | 37193 | 37375 | 20/02/1964 | EE | Landore | 01/01/2004 | 39.92 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 02/01/2008 | 43.90 | |||||||||||||
D6899 | 37199 | 37376 | 10/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/10/2000 | 37 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/02/2006 | 42.35 | |||||||||||||
D6900 | 37200 | 37377 | 15/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2001 | 38.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 10/2009 | 46.03 | |||||||||||||
D6902 | 37202 | 37331 | 23/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/03/1995 | 31.42 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) | 08/2003 | 39.84 | |||||||||||||
D6904 | 37204 | 37378 | 05/11/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/05/1996 | 32.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1996 | 32.63 | |||||||||||||
D6926 | 37226 | 37379 | 14/02/1964 | EE | Landore | 01/12/2001 | 37.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/2008 | 43.95 | |||||||||||||
D6939 | 37239 | 37332 | 21/08/1964 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/1998 | 34.33 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) | 06/2000 | 35.84 | |||||||||||||
D6958 | 37258 | 37384 | 15/01/1965 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/1999 | 34.92 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 11/2005 | 40.86 | |||||||||||||
D6959 | 37259 | 37380 | 37259 | 13/01/1965 | EE | Tinsley | 58.99 | |||||||||||||||||
D6984 | 37284 | 37381 | 21/05/1965 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/10/1993 | 28.42 | Cut | Raxstar (at Frodingham MPD) | 05/2000 | 35.01 | |||||||||||||
D6985 | 37285 | 37335 | 27/05/1965 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/08/1994 | 29.25 | Cut | Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) | 05/2000 | 34.99 |