37 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (37/0) | BR (37/5) | BR (37/7) | BR (37/4) | BR (37/3 (1)) | BR (37/9M) | BR (37/9R) | BR (37/3 (2)) | BR (37/0 (R)) | BR (37/6) | BR (37/0 (R2)) | BR (Dept) | BR (37/4 (R)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6705 | 37005 | 37501 | 37601 | 12/01/1961 | EE | Stratford | 63.09 | |||||||||||||||||
D6707 | 37007 | 37506 | 37604 | 03/02/1961 | EE | March | 63.03 | |||||||||||||||||
D6717 | 37017 | 37503 | 30/05/1961 | EE | Stratford | 62.71 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6718 | 37018 | 37517 | 05/06/1961 | EE | Stratford | 62.70 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6722 | 37022 | 37512 | 37608 | 13/07/1961 | EE | Norwich Thorpe | 62.59 | |||||||||||||||||
D6727 | 37027 | 37519 | 15/09/1961 | EE | Stratford | 01/11/1999 | 38.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/2008 | 46.53 | |||||||||||||
D6728 | 37028 | 37505 | 22/09/1961 | EE | Stratford | 01/12/2000 | 39.25 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 02/2008 | 46.43 | |||||||||||||
D6736 | 37036 | 37507 | 37605 | 25/04/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 61.81 | |||||||||||||||||
D6739 | 37039 | 37504 | 37603 | 18/05/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 61.75 | |||||||||||||||||
D6741 | 37041 | 37520 | 07/06/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 01/06/2002 | 40 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 10/2007 | 45.39 | |||||||||||||
D6756 | 37056 | 37513 | 28/09/1962 | EE | Thornaby | 01/11/2000 | 38.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/2008 | 45.41 | |||||||||||||
D6764 | 37064 | 37515 | 07/11/1962 | EE | Thornaby | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 61.27 | ||||||||||||||||
D6776 | 37076 | 37518 | 08/10/1962 | EE | Thornaby | 01/12/2000 | 38.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.35 | ||||||||||||||
D6782 | 37082 | 37502 | 37602 | 29/11/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 61.21 | |||||||||||||||||
D6786 | 37086 | 37516 | 28/12/1962 | EE | Gateshead | 61.13 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6790 | 37090 | 37508 | 37606 | 28/01/1963 | EE | Gateshead | 61.05 | |||||||||||||||||
D6793 | 37093 | 37509 | 20/02/1963 | EE | Gateshead | 01/12/2001 | 38.83 | Cut | Unknown (at Cardiff Canton MPD) | 08/2005 | 42.51 | |||||||||||||
D6803 | 37103 | 37511 | 37607 | 09/01/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 61.10 | |||||||||||||||||
D6812 | 37112 | 37510 | 13/02/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 61.00 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6815 | 37115 | 37514 | 37609 | 22/02/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 60.98 | |||||||||||||||||
D6817 | 37117 | 37521 | 06/03/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 60.95 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6821 | 37121 | 37677 | 08/04/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2002 | 39.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 10/2008 | 45.55 | |||||||||||||
D6822 | 37122 | 37692 | 10/04/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2004 | 41.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2009 | 46.30 | |||||||||||||
D6823 | 37123 | 37679 | 25/04/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2000 | 37.67 | Prs | Preserved | 60.81 | ||||||||||||||
D6826 | 37126 | 37676 | 14/05/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.76 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6829 | 37129 | 37669 | 20/03/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.91 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6830 | 37130 | 37681 | 25/03/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/08/1992 | 29.42 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 08/1995 | 32.41 | |||||||||||||
D6832 | 37132 | 37673 | 03/04/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2000 | 37.67 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 05/2008 | 45.15 | |||||||||||||
D6834 | 37134 | 37684 | 10/04/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 60.85 | ||||||||||||||||
D6851 | 37151 | 37667 | 02/07/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.62 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6857 | 37157 | 37695 | 25/07/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/03/2004 | 40.67 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 04/2008 | 44.76 | |||||||||||||
D6864 | 37164 | 37675 | 22/08/1963 | EE | Landore | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 60.48 | ||||||||||||||||
D6869 | 37169 | 37674 | 23/08/1963 | EE | Landore | 01/01/2005 | 41.42 | Prs | Preserved | 60.48 | ||||||||||||||
D6871 | 37171 | 37690 | 37611 | 17/09/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.41 | |||||||||||||||||
D6872 | 37172 | 37686 | 06/09/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/07/2000 | 36.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/2006 | 42.64 | |||||||||||||
D6879 | 37179 | 37691 | 37612 | 02/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.37 | |||||||||||||||||
D6881 | 37181 | 37687 | 37610 | 21/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.32 | |||||||||||||||||
D6882 | 37182 | 37670 | 28/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.30 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6887 | 37187 | 37683 | 31/01/1964 | EE | Landore | 60.04 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6889 | 37189 | 37672 | 09/01/1964 | EE | Cardiff Canton | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 60.10 | ||||||||||||||||
D6892 | 37192 | 37694 | 20/02/1964 | EE | Landore | 01/06/2004 | 40.33 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 01/2008 | 43.93 | |||||||||||||
D6895 | 37195 | 37689 | 17/03/1964 | EE | Landore | Cut | EMR (Attercliffe) | 59.91 | ||||||||||||||||
D6905 | 37205 | 37688 | 05/11/1963 | EE | Landore | 60.28 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6910 | 37210 | 37693 | 26/11/1963 | EE | Landore | Cut | EMR (Attercliffe) | 60.22 | ||||||||||||||||
D6924 | 37224 | 37680 | 30/01/1964 | EE | Landore | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 60.04 | ||||||||||||||||
D6928 | 37228 | 37696 | 28/02/1964 | EE | Landore | 59.96 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6934 | 37234 | 37685 | 10/04/1964 | EE | Landore | 59.85 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6936 | 37236 | 37682 | 29/04/1964 | EE | Landore | 10/2014 | 50.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/11/2016 | 52.55 | |||||||||||||
D6943 | 37243 | 37697 | 17/09/1964 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1999 | 34.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/2006 | 41.52 | |||||||||||||
D6946 | 37246 | 37698 | 08/10/1964 | EE | Cardiff Canton | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 59.35 | ||||||||||||||||
D6947 | 37247 | 37671 | 22/10/1964 | EE | Cardiff Canton | Cut | EMR (Attercliffe) | 59.31 | ||||||||||||||||
D6953 | 37253 | 37699 | 05/01/1965 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/08/1997 | 32.58 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 07/1997 | 32.55 | |||||||||||||
D6956 | 37256 | 37678 | 08/01/1965 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/12/2000 | 35.92 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 06/2007 | 42.46 | |||||||||||||
D6957 | 37257 | 37668 | 12/01/1965 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 59.09 |