37 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (37/0) | BR (37/5) | BR (37/7) | BR (37/4) | BR (37/3 (1)) | BR (37/9M) | BR (37/9R) | BR (37/3 (2)) | BR (37/0 (R)) | BR (37/6) | BR (37/0 (R2)) | BR (Dept) | BR (37/4 (R)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6705 | 37005 | 37501 | 37601 | 12/01/1961 | EE | Stratford | 63.00 | |||||||||||||||||
D6707 | 37007 | 37506 | 37604 | 03/02/1961 | EE | March | 62.94 | |||||||||||||||||
D6722 | 37022 | 37512 | 37608 | 13/07/1961 | EE | Norwich Thorpe | 62.50 | |||||||||||||||||
D6736 | 37036 | 37507 | 37605 | 25/04/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 61.72 | |||||||||||||||||
D6739 | 37039 | 37504 | 37603 | 18/05/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 61.65 | |||||||||||||||||
D6782 | 37082 | 37502 | 37602 | 29/11/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 61.12 | |||||||||||||||||
D6790 | 37090 | 37508 | 37606 | 28/01/1963 | EE | Gateshead | 60.96 | |||||||||||||||||
D6803 | 37103 | 37511 | 37607 | 09/01/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 61.01 | |||||||||||||||||
D6815 | 37115 | 37514 | 37609 | 22/02/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 60.89 | |||||||||||||||||
D6871 | 37171 | 37690 | 37611 | 17/09/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.32 | |||||||||||||||||
D6879 | 37179 | 37691 | 37612 | 02/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.28 | |||||||||||||||||
D6881 | 37181 | 37687 | 37610 | 21/10/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.23 |