37 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (37/0) | BR (37/5) | BR (37/7) | BR (37/4) | BR (37/3 (1)) | BR (37/9M) | BR (37/9R) | BR (37/3 (2)) | BR (37/0 (R)) | BR (37/6) | BR (37/0 (R2)) | BR (Dept) | BR (37/4 (R)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6706 | 37006 | 37798 | 20/01/1961 | EE | March | 01/01/2005 | 44 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2009 | 48.52 | |||||||||||||
D6761 | 37061 | 37799 | 24/10/1962 | EE | Thornaby | 61.28 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6781 | 37081 | 37797 | 22/11/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 01/02/2003 | 40.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/2006 | 43.26 | |||||||||||||
D6805 | 37105 | 37796 | 16/01/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/10/2000 | 37.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/2009 | 46.12 | |||||||||||||
D6843 | 37143 | 37800 | 29/05/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 60.68 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6863 | 37163 | 37802 | 06/08/1963 | EE | Landore | 01/01/2003 | 39.42 | Cut | Unknown (at Calatayud, Spain) | 07/2003 | 39.97 | |||||||||||||
D6873 | 37173 | 37801 | 12/09/1963 | EE | Landore | 60.39 | ||||||||||||||||||
D6908 | 37208 | 37803 | 20/11/1963 | EE | Landore | 01/10/2000 | 36.92 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 07/2007 | 43.68 |