37/4 |
D6600
|
37300
|
37429
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/08/1965 |
01/10/2002 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/4 |
D6601
|
37301
|
37412
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/09/1965 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/06/1969 |
37/4 |
D6602
|
37302
|
37416
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/09/1965 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/3 v2 |
D6603
|
37303
|
|
37271
|
37333
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/09/1965 |
01/08/1997 |
Air Brakes fitted |
22/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6604
|
37304
|
|
37272
|
37334
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/09/1965 |
01/03/1997 |
Air Brakes fitted |
25/01/1969 |
37/4 |
D6605
|
37305
|
37407
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/10/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
13/09/1976 |
37 |
D6606
|
37306
|
|
37273
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/10/1965 |
01/09/1991 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/03/1969 |
37/4 |
D6607
|
37307
|
37403
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
06/1980 |
37 |
D6608
|
37308
|
|
37274
|
|
37308
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/11/1965 |
01/01/2005 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/3 v2 |
D6700
|
37119
|
|
|
37350
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/12/1960 |
01/12/1999 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
03/1973 |
37/7 v1 |
D6701
|
37001
|
|
|
|
|
37707
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/12/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6702
|
37002
|
|
|
37351
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/12/1960 |
01/12/1999 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6703
|
37003
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/12/1960 |
21/01/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6704
|
37004
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/01/1961 |
12/06/1996 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/6 |
D6705
|
37005
|
|
|
|
|
|
37501
|
37601
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/01/1961 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v2 |
D6706
|
37006
|
|
|
|
|
37798
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/01/1961 |
01/01/2005 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/6 |
D6707
|
37007
|
|
|
|
|
|
37506
|
37604
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/02/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6708
|
37008
|
|
37008
|
37352
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/02/1961 |
24/02/1992 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6709
|
37009
|
|
|
37340
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/02/1961 |
01/03/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6710
|
37010
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/02/1961 |
30/06/2005 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37 |
D6711
|
37011
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/03/1961 |
03/08/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37 |
D6712
|
37012
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/03/1961 |
31/03/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/07/1969 |
37 |
D6713
|
37013
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/03/1961 |
16/11/2001 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
11/1975 |
37/7 v1 |
D6714
|
37014
|
|
|
|
|
37709
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/03/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
06/1973 |
37/3 v2 |
D6715
|
37015
|
|
|
37341
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/05/1961 |
01/09/1994 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6716
|
37016
|
|
|
|
|
37706
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
09/1975 |
37/5 |
D6717
|
37017
|
|
|
|
|
|
37503
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/05/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
06/1973 |
37/5 |
D6718
|
37018
|
|
|
|
|
|
37517
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
07/1975 |
37 |
D6719
|
37019
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/06/1961 |
31/01/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
10/02/1977 |
37/7 v1 |
D6720
|
37020
|
|
|
|
|
37702
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/06/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
16/05/1977 |
37/7 v1 |
D6721
|
37021
|
|
|
|
|
37715
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/07/1961 |
01/06/1999 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
37/6 |
D6722
|
37022
|
|
|
|
|
|
37512
|
37608
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/07/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
02/1975 |
37 |
D6723
|
37023
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/07/1961 |
31/12/2007 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/1977 |
37/7 v1 |
D6724
|
37024
|
|
|
|
|
37714
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/08/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
11/1975 |
37 |
D6725
|
37025
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/08/1961 |
01/02/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v1 |
D6726
|
37026
|
|
37026
|
|
|
|
|
|
37320
|
|
|
|
|
08/09/1961 |
28/01/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6727
|
37027
|
|
|
|
|
|
37519
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/09/1961 |
01/11/1999 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
18/08/1978 |
37/5 |
D6728
|
37028
|
|
|
|
|
|
37505
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/09/1961 |
01/12/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/1975 |
37 |
D6729
|
37029
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/10/1961 |
31/12/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6730
|
37030
|
|
|
|
|
37701
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/10/1961 |
01/12/1999 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
37 |
D6731
|
37031
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/10/1961 |
14/01/1994 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6732
|
37032
|
|
37032
|
37353
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/03/1962 |
04/03/1994 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6733
|
37033
|
|
|
|
|
37719
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/03/1962 |
01/12/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
26/03/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6734
|
37034
|
|
|
|
|
37704
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/03/1962 |
01/10/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
14/05/1971 |
37 |
D6735
|
37035
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/04/1962 |
21/01/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
37/6 |
D6736
|
37036
|
|
|
|
|
|
37507
|
37605
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/04/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
37/3 v1 |
D6737
|
37037
|
|
37037
|
|
|
|
|
|
37321
|
|
|
|
|
04/05/1962 |
01/08/2000 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
09/1981 |
37 |
D6738
|
37038
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/05/1962 |
01/03/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/6 |
D6739
|
37039
|
|
|
|
|
|
37504
|
37603
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/05/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
07/1981 |
37 |
D6740
|
37040
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/06/1962 |
30/06/2005 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
08/08/1978 |
37/5 |
D6741
|
37041
|
|
|
|
|
|
37520
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/06/1962 |
01/06/2002 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/02/1971 |
37 |
D6742
|
37042
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/06/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
11/1975 |
37/3 v2 |
D6743
|
37043
|
|
37043
|
37354
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/06/1962 |
31/03/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/11/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6744
|
37044
|
|
|
|
|
37710
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/06/1962 |
|
Unmodified headcode box |
12/1978 |
37/3 v2 |
D6745
|
37045
|
|
37045
|
37355
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/07/1962 |
31/10/2003 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6746
|
37046
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/07/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
11/1975 |
37 |
D6747
|
37047
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/07/1962 |
31/10/2007 |
Air Brakes fitted |
26/02/1970 |
37 |
D6748
|
37048
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/08/1962 |
31/03/2003 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6749
|
37049
|
|
37049
|
37343
|
|
|
|
|
37322
|
|
|
|
|
17/08/1962 |
01/02/1995 |
Air Brakes fitted |
14/05/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6750
|
37050
|
|
|
|
|
37717
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/08/1962 |
01/12/2004 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37 |
D6751
|
37051
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/08/1962 |
31/12/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6752
|
37052
|
|
|
|
|
37713
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/09/1962 |
01/03/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6753
|
37053
|
|
|
37344
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/09/1962 |
01/07/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6754
|
37054
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/09/1962 |
31/08/2003 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6755
|
37055
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/09/1962 |
31/12/2007 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/07/1969 |
37/5 |
D6756
|
37056
|
|
|
|
|
|
37513
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/09/1962 |
01/11/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6757
|
37057
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6758
|
37058
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/10/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
11/1975 |
37 |
D6759
|
37059
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/10/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6760
|
37060
|
|
|
|
|
37705
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/10/1962 |
01/12/1999 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/7 v2 |
D6761
|
37061
|
|
|
|
|
37799
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/10/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6762
|
37062
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/10/1962 |
13/03/1989 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6763
|
37063
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/11/1962 |
31/01/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6764
|
37064
|
|
|
|
|
|
37515
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/11/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6765
|
37065
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/11/1962 |
31/10/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
37 |
D6766
|
37066
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/11/1962 |
15/08/1997 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6767
|
37067
|
|
|
|
|
37703
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/11/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6768
|
37068
|
|
37068
|
37356
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/11/1962 |
31/05/2005 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6769
|
37069
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/07/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6770
|
37070
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/08/1962 |
19/05/1996 |
Air Brakes fitted |
22/05/1970 |
37 |
D6771
|
37071
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/08/1962 |
30/06/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6772
|
37072
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/09/1962 |
31/01/1999 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6773
|
37073
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/09/1962 |
31/03/2003 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6774
|
37074
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1962 |
30/06/2005 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6776
|
37076
|
|
|
|
|
|
37518
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/10/1962 |
01/12/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6777
|
37077
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/10/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6778
|
37078
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/10/1962 |
31/01/2004 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
37/3 v2 |
D6779
|
37079
|
|
37079
|
37357
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/11/1962 |
30/06/2008 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6780
|
37080
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/11/1962 |
18/09/1996 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/7 v2 |
D6781
|
37081
|
|
|
|
|
37797
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/11/1962 |
01/02/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/04/1971 |
37/6 |
D6782
|
37082
|
|
|
|
|
|
37502
|
37602
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/11/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
04/1975 |
37 |
D6783
|
37083
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/12/1962 |
14/07/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/03/1971 |
37/7 v1 |
D6784
|
37084
|
|
|
|
|
37718
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/12/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
18/08/1978 |
37/7 v1 |
D6785
|
37085
|
|
|
|
|
37711
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/12/1962 |
01/12/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6786
|
37086
|
|
|
|
|
|
37516
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/12/1962 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
14/08/1969 |
37 |
D6787
|
37087
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/12/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
37/3 v1 |
D6788
|
37088
|
|
37088
|
|
|
|
|
|
37323
|
|
|
|
|
14/01/1963 |
30/09/2002 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/08/1977 |
37/7 v1 |
D6789
|
37089
|
|
|
|
|
37708
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/01/1963 |
01/10/2002 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/07/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6791
|
37091
|
|
|
37358
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/01/1963 |
01/03/1997 |
Air Brakes fitted |
26/07/1969 |
37 |
D6792
|
37092
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/02/1963 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6793
|
37093
|
|
|
|
|
|
37509
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1963 |
01/12/2001 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
04/1975 |
37/7 v1 |
D6794
|
37094
|
|
|
|
|
37716
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/02/1963 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6795
|
37095
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/03/1963 |
31/01/1999 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
24/08/1978 |
37 |
D6796
|
37096
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/11/1962 |
27/02/1991 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
27/03/1977 |
37 |
D6797
|
37097
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/12/1962 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6798
|
37098
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/12/1962 |
01/05/2002 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v1 |
D6799
|
37099
|
|
37099
|
|
|
|
|
|
37324
|
|
|
|
|
14/12/1962 |
17/06/1997 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6800
|
37100
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
97301
|
20/12/1962 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6801
|
37101
|
|
|
37345
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/12/1962 |
01/02/1994 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6802
|
37102
|
|
|
|
|
37712
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/01/1963 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/6 |
D6803
|
37103
|
|
|
|
|
|
37511
|
37607
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/01/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
01/1979 |
37 |
D6804
|
37104
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/01/1963 |
14/07/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/1976 |
37/7 v2 |
D6805
|
37105
|
|
|
|
|
37796
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/01/1963 |
01/10/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
16/08/1978 |
37 |
D6806
|
37106
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/01/1963 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6807
|
37107
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/01/1963 |
28/01/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
37/3 v1 |
D6808
|
37108
|
|
37108
|
|
|
|
|
|
37325
|
|
|
|
|
25/01/1963 |
01/09/1996 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
37 |
D6809
|
37109
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/02/1963 |
01/01/2005 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
37 |
D6810
|
37110
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/02/1963 |
14/07/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37/3 v1 |
D6811
|
37111
|
|
37111
|
|
|
|
|
|
37326
|
|
|
|
|
08/02/1963 |
18/09/1998 |
Air Brakes fitted |
30/07/1975 |
37/5 |
D6812
|
37112
|
|
|
|
|
|
37510
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/02/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
01/1979 |
37 |
D6813
|
37113
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/02/1963 |
14/09/1995 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
20/02/1977 |
37 |
D6814
|
37114
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1963 |
31/12/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
37/6 |
D6815
|
37115
|
|
|
|
|
|
37514
|
37609
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/02/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
37 |
D6816
|
37116
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/03/1963 |
28/02/2007 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
18/08/1978 |
37/5 |
D6817
|
37117
|
|
|
|
|
|
37521
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/03/1963 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
27/03/1971 |
37/3 v2 |
D6818
|
37118
|
|
|
37359
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/03/1963 |
01/11/1994 |
Air Brakes fitted |
17/06/1971 |
37/7 v1 |
D6819
|
37283
|
|
|
|
|
37895
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/03/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
23/01/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6820
|
37120
|
|
|
|
|
37887
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/03/1963 |
01/10/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/10/1968 |
37/5 |
D6821
|
37121
|
|
|
|
|
|
37677
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/04/1963 |
01/12/2002 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6822
|
37122
|
|
|
|
|
|
37692
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/04/1963 |
01/12/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6823
|
37123
|
|
|
|
|
|
37679
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/04/1963 |
01/12/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6824
|
37124
|
|
|
|
|
37894
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/04/1963 |
01/10/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
28/09/1968 |
37/9 Mirrlees |
D6825
|
37125
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
37904
|
|
|
|
08/05/1963 |
01/04/1996 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/10/1968 |
37/5 |
D6826
|
37126
|
|
|
|
|
|
37676
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/05/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
01/1979 |
37/3 v2 |
D6827
|
37127
|
|
|
37370
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/05/1963 |
01/11/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6828
|
37128
|
|
|
37330
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/06/1963 |
01/02/1997 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6829
|
37129
|
|
|
|
|
|
37669
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/03/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6830
|
37130
|
|
|
|
|
|
37681
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/03/1963 |
01/08/1992 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
14/01/1969 |
37 |
D6831
|
37131
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/03/1963 |
30/06/2005 |
Air Brakes fitted |
14/09/1968 |
37/5 |
D6832
|
37132
|
|
|
|
|
|
37673
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/04/1963 |
01/12/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6833
|
37133
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/04/1963 |
31/10/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6834
|
37134
|
|
|
|
|
|
37684
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/04/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1979 |
37/7 v1 |
D6835
|
37135
|
|
|
|
|
37888
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/04/1963 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
19/11/1968 |
37/9 Ruston |
D6836
|
37136
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
37905
|
|
|
19/04/1963 |
01/12/1998 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
01/1979 |
37/3 v1 |
D6837
|
37137
|
|
37137
|
|
|
|
|
|
37312
|
|
|
|
|
24/04/1963 |
31/05/2006 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
12/1971 |
37 |
D6839
|
37139
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/05/1963 |
31/10/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/1972 |
37 |
D6840
|
37140
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/05/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1978 |
37 |
D6842
|
37142
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/05/1963 |
01/05/1997 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1972 |
37 |
D6844
|
37144
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1963 |
31/08/2003 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
11/1971 |
37/3 v2 |
D6845
|
37145
|
|
37145
|
37382
|
|
|
|
|
37313
|
|
|
|
|
06/06/1963 |
01/01/1994 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
01/1979 |
37/7 v1 |
D6849
|
37149
|
|
|
|
|
37892
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
01/01/2000 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37/9 Mirrlees |
D6850
|
37150
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
37901
|
|
|
|
01/07/1963 |
01/11/1998 |
Air Brakes fitted |
06/12/1969 |
37/5 |
D6851
|
37151
|
|
|
|
|
|
37667
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/07/1963 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37/3 v1 |
D6852
|
37152
|
|
37152
|
|
|
|
|
|
37310
|
|
|
|
|
08/07/1963 |
01/12/1999 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37 |
D6853
|
37153
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/07/1963 |
15/01/2003 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37 |
D6854
|
37154
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/07/1963 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1979 |
37/7 v1 |
D6855
|
37155
|
|
|
|
|
37897
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/07/1963 |
01/03/2000 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37/3 v1 |
D6856
|
37156
|
|
37156
|
|
|
|
|
|
37311
|
|
|
|
|
25/07/1963 |
01/06/1999 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
37/5 |
D6857
|
37157
|
|
|
|
|
|
37695
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/07/1963 |
01/03/2004 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37 |
D6858
|
37158
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/08/1963 |
30/04/2008 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
31/12/1972 |
37/3 v2 |
D6859
|
37159
|
|
|
37372
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/06/1963 |
01/12/2004 |
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
09/1981 |
37/3 v2 |
D6860
|
37160
|
|
|
37373
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
01/12/1993 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6861
|
37161
|
|
|
|
|
37899
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/07/1963 |
01/04/2002 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6862
|
37162
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/07/1963 |
30/06/2005 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v2 |
D6863
|
37163
|
|
|
|
|
37802
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/08/1963 |
01/01/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/06/1969 |
37/5 |
D6864
|
37164
|
|
|
|
|
|
37675
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/08/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6865
|
37165
|
|
37165
|
37374
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/08/1963 |
30/06/2008 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
29/01/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6866
|
37166
|
|
|
|
|
37891
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/09/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6867
|
37167
|
|
|
37383
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/09/1963 |
01/02/1999 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6868
|
37168
|
|
|
|
|
37890
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/10/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6869
|
37169
|
|
|
|
|
|
37674
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/08/1963 |
01/01/2005 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6870
|
37170
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
97302
|
30/08/1963 |
30/06/2005 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/6 |
D6871
|
37171
|
|
|
|
|
|
37690
|
37611
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6872
|
37172
|
|
|
|
|
|
37686
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/09/1963 |
01/07/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
31/01/1969 |
37/7 v2 |
D6873
|
37173
|
|
|
|
|
37801
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/09/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6874
|
37174
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/09/1963 |
31/10/2007 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6875
|
37175
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/09/1963 |
31/08/2006 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/10/1969 |
37/7 v1 |
D6876
|
37176
|
|
|
|
|
37883
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/10/1963 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
30/05/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6877
|
37177
|
|
|
|
|
37885
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/10/1963 |
01/04/2002 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
08/10/1977 |
37 |
D6878
|
37178
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
97303
|
09/10/1963 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
14/06/1969 |
37/6 |
D6879
|
37179
|
|
|
|
|
|
37691
|
37612
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/10/1963 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
08/10/1977 |
37/7 v1 |
D6880
|
37180
|
|
|
|
|
37886
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/10/1963 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
14/02/1970 |
37/6 |
D6881
|
37181
|
|
|
|
|
|
37687
|
37610
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/10/1963 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
10/1974 |
37/5 |
D6882
|
37182
|
|
|
|
|
|
37670
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/10/1963 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
09/09/1976 |
37/7 v1 |
D6883
|
37183
|
|
|
|
|
37884
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/11/1963 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
02/05/1970 |
37 |
D6884
|
37184
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/11/1963 |
19/05/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6886
|
37186
|
|
|
|
|
37898
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/11/1963 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
02/05/1970 |
37/5 |
D6887
|
37187
|
|
|
|
|
|
37683
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/01/1964 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
10/10/1970 |
37 |
D6888
|
37188
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/01/1964 |
31/03/2006 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
08/10/1977 |
37/5 |
D6889
|
37189
|
|
|
|
|
|
37672
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/01/1964 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
08/10/1977 |
37/3 v1 |
D6890
|
37190
|
|
37190
|
|
|
|
|
|
37314
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
01/07/1993 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
03/1974 |
37 |
D6891
|
37191
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
09/02/2001 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/5 |
D6892
|
37192
|
|
|
|
|
|
37694
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1964 |
01/06/2004 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6893
|
37193
|
|
|
37375
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1964 |
01/01/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6894
|
37194
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/03/1964 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/5 |
D6895
|
37195
|
|
|
|
|
|
37689
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/03/1964 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6896
|
37196
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/04/1964 |
30/09/2008 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6897
|
37197
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/04/1964 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6898
|
37198
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/05/1964 |
31/07/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6899
|
37199
|
|
|
37376
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/10/1963 |
01/10/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6900
|
37200
|
|
|
37377
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/10/1963 |
01/12/2001 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6901
|
37201
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/10/1963 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37/3 v2 |
D6902
|
37202
|
|
|
37331
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/10/1963 |
01/03/1995 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6903
|
37203
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/10/1963 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/3 v2 |
D6904
|
37204
|
|
|
37378
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/11/1963 |
01/05/1996 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37/5 |
D6905
|
37205
|
|
|
|
|
|
37688
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/11/1963 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1975 |
37/9 Ruston |
D6906
|
37206
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
37906
|
|
|
08/11/1963 |
01/01/1999 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
13/03/1970 |
37 |
D6907
|
37207
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/11/1963 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
13/02/1971 |
37/7 v2 |
D6908
|
37208
|
|
|
|
|
37803
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/11/1963 |
01/10/2000 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
11/10/1969 |
37 |
D6909
|
37209
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/12/1963 |
07/07/2002 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1978 |
37/5 |
D6910
|
37210
|
|
|
|
|
|
37693
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/11/1963 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37 |
D6911
|
37211
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/12/1963 |
31/08/2003 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6912
|
37212
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/01/1964 |
31/01/2004 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6913
|
37213
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/01/1964 |
23/04/2003 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6914
|
37214
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/01/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6915
|
37215
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/01/1964 |
16/07/1993 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6916
|
37216
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/01/1964 |
28/02/2007 |
Air Brakes fitted |
26/07/1969 |
37 |
D6917
|
37217
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
97304
|
02/01/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6918
|
37218
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/01/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6919
|
37219
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/01/1964 |
31/08/2005 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
04/1975 |
37 |
D6920
|
37220
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/01/1964 |
31/08/2005 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6921
|
37221
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/01/1964 |
30/09/2008 |
Air Brakes fitted |
14/02/1970 |
37 |
D6922
|
37222
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/01/1964 |
31/07/2008 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6923
|
37223
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/02/1964 |
31/01/2003 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6924
|
37224
|
|
|
|
|
|
37680
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/01/1964 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
10/10/1970 |
37 |
D6925
|
37225
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/02/1964 |
28/02/2004 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6926
|
37226
|
|
|
37379
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/02/1964 |
01/12/2001 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6927
|
37227
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/02/1964 |
31/01/2004 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6928
|
37228
|
|
|
|
|
|
37696
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/02/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6929
|
37229
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/02/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6930
|
37230
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/03/1964 |
31/08/2005 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/7 v1 |
D6931
|
37231
|
|
|
|
|
37896
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/03/1964 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
22/08/1970 |
37 |
D6932
|
37232
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/03/1964 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
13/03/1971 |
37/7 v1 |
D6933
|
37233
|
|
|
|
|
37889
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/04/1964 |
01/06/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/01/1971 |
37/5 |
D6934
|
37234
|
|
|
|
|
|
37685
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/04/1964 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
10/10/1970 |
37 |
D6935
|
37235
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/04/1964 |
31/03/2008 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6936
|
37236
|
|
|
|
|
|
37682
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/04/1964 |
10/2014 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
31/12/1972 |
37/7 v1 |
D6937
|
37237
|
|
|
|
|
37893
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/05/1964 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
01/1972 |
37 |
D6938
|
37238
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1964 |
30/09/2008 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6939
|
37239
|
|
|
37332
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/08/1964 |
01/12/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6940
|
37240
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/08/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6941
|
37241
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/09/1964 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/01/1969 |
37 |
D6942
|
37242
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/09/1964 |
31/01/2006 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6943
|
37243
|
|
|
|
|
|
37697
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1964 |
01/04/1999 |
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37 |
D6944
|
37244
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/09/1964 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/01/1969 |
37 |
D6945
|
37245
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/10/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6946
|
37246
|
|
|
|
|
|
37698
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/10/1964 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
37/5 |
D6947
|
37247
|
|
|
|
|
|
37671
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1964 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
37 |
D6948
|
37248
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/10/1964 |
01/02/2009 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/9 Mirrlees |
D6949
|
37249
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
37903
|
|
|
|
09/12/1964 |
01/12/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37 |
D6950
|
37250
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/12/1964 |
31/12/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37 |
D6951
|
37251
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/12/1964 |
07/12/2001 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
37 |
D6952
|
37252
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/01/1965 |
24/03/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
37/5 |
D6953
|
37253
|
|
|
|
|
|
37699
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/01/1965 |
01/08/1997 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6954
|
37254
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/01/1965 |
31/01/1999 |
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37 |
D6955
|
37255
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/01/1965 |
01/12/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/10/1971 |
37/5 |
D6956
|
37256
|
|
|
|
|
|
37678
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/01/1965 |
01/12/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/01/1971 |
37/5 |
D6957
|
37257
|
|
|
|
|
|
37668
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/01/1965 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
07/11/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6958
|
37258
|
|
|
37384
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/01/1965 |
01/12/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/11/1970 |
37/3 v2 |
D6959
|
37259
|
|
37259
|
37380
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/01/1965 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
37 |
D6960
|
37260
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/01/1965 |
21/08/1989 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
37 |
D6961
|
37261
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1965 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
37 |
D6962
|
37262
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/01/1965 |
31/10/2003 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
07/1975 |
37 |
D6963
|
37263
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/01/1965 |
31/01/2004 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/1977 |
37 |
D6964
|
37264
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/01/1965 |
01/12/1999 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
04/1978 |
37/4 |
D6965
|
37265
|
37430
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/02/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/1977 |
37/4 |
D6966
|
37266
|
37422
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/02/1965 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
07/1975 |
37/4 |
D6967
|
37267
|
37421
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/02/1965 |
01/04/2005 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
37/4 |
D6968
|
37268
|
37401
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/02/1965 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
07/1975 |
37/4 |
D6969
|
37269
|
37417
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1965 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/01/1969 |
37/4 |
D6970
|
37270
|
37409
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/03/1965 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
29/05/1971 |
37/4 |
D6971
|
37271
|
37418
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/03/1965 |
01/04/2005 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
04/1976 |
37/4 |
D6972
|
37272
|
37431
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/03/1965 |
01/04/1999 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/12/1970 |
37/4 |
D6973
|
37273
|
37410
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/04/1965 |
27/09/1991 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
22/02/1969 |
37/4 |
D6974
|
37274
|
37402
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/04/1965 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37 |
D6975
|
37275
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/04/1965 |
01/01/1999 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/03/1969 |
37/4 |
D6976
|
37276
|
37413
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/04/1965 |
01/12/2000 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/01/1969 |
37/4 |
D6977
|
37277
|
37415
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/04/1965 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37 |
D6978
|
37278
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/04/1965 |
16/05/2003 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/01/1969 |
37/4 |
D6979
|
37279
|
37424
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
37558
|
|
03/05/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
06/12/1969 |
37 |
D6980
|
37280
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/05/1965 |
15/10/1994 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
29/03/1969 |
37/4 |
D6981
|
37281
|
37428
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/05/1965 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37/4 |
D6982
|
37282
|
37405
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/05/1965 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37/3 v2 |
D6984
|
37284
|
|
|
37381
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/05/1965 |
01/10/1993 |
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37/3 v2 |
D6985
|
37285
|
|
|
37335
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/05/1965 |
01/08/1994 |
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
03/1979 |
37/4 |
D6986
|
37286
|
37404
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/06/1965 |
01/02/1999 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
26/04/1969 |
37/4 |
D6987
|
37287
|
37414
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/06/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/07/1969 |
37/4 |
D6988
|
37288
|
37427
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/06/1965 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
10/01/1970 |
37/4 |
D6989
|
37289
|
37408
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/06/1965 |
01/08/2005 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
37/4 |
D6990
|
37290
|
37411
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1965 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
12/07/1969 |
37/4 |
D6991
|
37291
|
37419
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/06/1965 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/4 |
D6992
|
37292
|
37425
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/07/1965 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
08/05/1971 |
37 |
D6993
|
37293
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/07/1965 |
30/09/2008 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37 |
D6994
|
37294
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/07/1965 |
30/09/2008 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1977 |
37/4 |
D6995
|
37295
|
37406
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/07/1965 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
06/12/1969 |
37/4 |
D6996
|
37296
|
37423
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/07/1965 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
14/02/1970 |
37/4 |
D6997
|
37297
|
37420
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/07/1965 |
01/07/2000 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
06/1969 |
37 |
D6998
|
37298
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/08/1965 |
30/06/2005 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
26/04/1969 |
37/4 |
D6999
|
37299
|
37426
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/08/1965 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
26/04/1969 |