Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 924 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 4247 Week
» 18504 Month
» 246388 Year
» 1467953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Mongolipers" Class 2-6-0


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Mongolipers 1400 31400 07/1932 AFD
73B
74A
70C
75A
75B
W
Ashford
Bricklayers Arms
Ashford
Guildford
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
20/07/1953
08/07/1960
08/12/1961
22/07/1963
14/06/1964
14/06/1964
Mongolipers 1401 31401 08/1932 AFD
70C
75A
70C
W
Ashford
Guildford
Brighton
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/07/1960
08/12/1961
06/01/1964
18/07/1965
18/07/1965
Mongolipers 1402 31402 08/1932 AFD
73J
70C
75A
W
Ashford
Tonbridge
Guildford
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
08/12/1961
25/08/1963
25/08/1963
Mongolipers 1403 31403 08/1932 AFD
73J
70C
75A
W
Ashford
Tonbridge
Guildford
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
08/12/1961
30/06/1963
30/06/1963
Mongolipers 1404 31404 10/1932 AFD
73J
72B
70C
W
Ashford
Tonbridge
Salisbury
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
16/09/1963
01/12/1963
01/12/1963
Mongolipers 1405 31405 11/1932 BAT
73J
71G
75B
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Tonbridge
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
22/06/1964
18/01/1965
05/06/1966
05/06/1966
Mongolipers 1406 31406 01/1933 RED
73C
74A
73J
71G
72A
W
Redhill
Hither Green
Ashford
Tonbridge
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
20/07/1953
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
05/03/1962
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1407 31407 08/1932 EXJ
74A
74C
74A
73J
71G
W
Exmouth Junction
Ashford
Dover Marine
Ashford
Tonbridge
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/02/1951
21/06/1955
10/10/1955
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
07/07/1963
07/07/1963
Mongolipers 1408 31408 09/1933 EXJ
74A
73C
73B
73A
73F
72B
70C
W
Exmouth Junction
Ashford
Hither Green
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Ashford
Salisbury
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/02/1951
14/02/1953
01/10/1953
08/02/1955
14/06/1959
09/11/1961
16/09/1963
05/06/1966
05/06/1966
Mongolipers 1409 31409 10/1933 EXJ
73F
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Ashford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
09/11/1961
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
Mongolipers 1410 31410 11/1933 BAT
75C
75B
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
01/11/1964
01/11/1964
Mongolipers 1411 31411 11/1933 BAT
75B
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1963
18/01/1965
24/04/1966
24/04/1966
Mongolipers 1412 31412 12/1933 BAT
75C
75B
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
09/08/1964
09/08/1964
Mongolipers 1413 31413 01/1934 BAT
73H
71A
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Dover Marine
Eastleigh
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1963
14/06/1964
14/06/1964
Mongolipers 1414 31414 01/1934 BAT
73H
70B
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Dover Marine
Feltham
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
17/01/1961
10/02/1961
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
Mongolipers 1810 31810 06/1917 BAT
73H
71A
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Dover Marine
Eastleigh
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1963
29/03/1964
29/03/1964
Mongolipers 1811 31811 06/1920 BAT
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
04/07/1965
04/07/1965
Mongolipers 1812 31812 08/1920 BAT
70C
72A
W
Stewarts Lane
Guildford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
31/08/1963
07/1964
07/1964
Mongolipers 1813 31813 09/1920 BAT
72B
70C
W
Stewarts Lane
Salisbury
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
16/09/1963
20/10/1963
20/10/1963
Mongolipers 1814 31814 11/1920 NORW
72B
70C
W
Norwood Junction
Salisbury
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
16/09/1963
26/07/1964
26/07/1964
Mongolipers 1815 31815 12/1920 RED
73A
73D
70C
W
Redhill
Stewarts Lane
Gillingham (Kent)
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
13/05/1954
14/06/1959
26/05/1963
26/05/1963
Mongolipers 1816 31816 01/1922 RED
73D
73A
73D
70C
73C
71A
71G
75B
70C
W
Redhill
Gillingham (Kent)
Stewarts Lane
Gillingham (Kent)
Guildford
Hither Green
Eastleigh
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
01/10/1953
13/05/1954
14/06/1959
22/10/1959
26/05/1961
22/07/1963
22/06/1964
18/01/1965
09/01/1966
09/01/1966
Mongolipers 1817 31817 01/1922 RED
74C
75B
W
Redhill
Dover Marine
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1951
10/10/1955
12/01/1964
12/01/1964
Mongolipers 1818 31818 03/1922 RED
74C
73J
71A
72A
75D
W
Redhill
Dover Marine
Tonbridge
Eastleigh
Exmouth Junction
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1951
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
01/02/1962
31/08/1963
01/09/1963
01/09/1963
Mongolipers 1819 31819 05/1922 DOV
75B
75A
70C
W
Dover Marine
Redhill
Brighton
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1961
06/07/1961
08/12/1961
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1820 31820 08/1922 DOV
75B
75A
70C
W
Dover Marine
Redhill
Brighton
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1961
06/07/1961
08/12/1961
09/1963
09/1963
Mongolipers 1821 31821 10/1922 DOV
75C
75A
70C
72A
W
Dover Marine
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Guildford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/05/1961
06/07/1961
08/12/1961
31/08/1963
14/05/1964
14/05/1964
Mongolipers 1823 31823 08/1923 DOV
73B
73A
75C
W
75B
Dover Marine
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
Redhill
01/01/1948
27/07/1951
08/07/1960
22/07/1963
15/09/1963
16/09/1963
15/09/1963
Mongolipers 1824 31824 12/1923 BA
73A
75B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/07/1960
22/07/1963
20/10/1963
20/10/1963
Mongolipers 1825 31825 06/1924 BA
75D
75B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/07/1962
19/08/1963
09/1963
09/1963
Mongolipers 1826 31826 05/1924 BA
75D
W
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/07/1962
09/1963
09/1963
Mongolipers 1827 31827 06/1924 ELH
75D
75B
W
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/07/1962
16/09/1963
14/06/1964
14/06/1964
Mongolipers 1828 31828 07/1924 EXJ
72A
73B
75A
75B
W
Exmouth Junction
Exmouth Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1950
27/06/1951
02/07/1962
06/01/1964
06/09/1964
06/09/1964
Mongolipers 1829 31829 06/1924 ELH
72A
73B
75A
W
Eastleigh
Exmouth Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
27/06/1951
02/07/1962
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1830 31830 06/1924 TON
72A
75A
W
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
22/10/1962
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1831 31831 07/1924 FRA
72A
75A
75B
70C
W
Fratton
Exmouth Junction
Brighton
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
22/10/1962
06/01/1964
18/01/1965
25/04/1965
25/04/1965
Mongolipers 1832 31832 07/1924 EXJ
75A
W
Exmouth Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1962
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1833 31833 07/1924 EXJ
75A
70C
W
Exmouth Junction
Brighton
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1962
06/01/1964
23/02/1964
23/02/1964
Mongolipers 1834 31834 07/1924 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1835 31835 07/1924 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1836 31836 07/1924 EXJ
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1950
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
Mongolipers 1837 31837 07/1924 EXJ
72C
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Yeovil Town
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1952
14/02/1953
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1838 31838 07/1924 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1964
24/02/1964
Mongolipers 1839 31839 08/1924 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1963
31/12/1963
Mongolipers 1840 31840 08/1924 EXJ
72E
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1952
07/10/1952
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1841 31841 08/1924 EXJ
72E
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1952
07/10/1952
30/03/1964
30/03/1964
Mongolipers 1842 31842 08/1924 EXJ
72A
72E
72A
72E
72A
72E
72A
70C
W
Exmouth Junction
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
30/06/1952
11/12/1952
18/06/1954
11/03/1955
21/06/1955
17/11/1956
20/07/1964
05/09/1965
05/09/1965
Mongolipers 1843 31843 08/1924 RED
RED
72A
72E
72A
W
Redhill
Redhill
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1949
05/02/1951
11/12/1952
17/11/1956
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1844 31844 08/1924 NORW
RED
72A
71D
72E
72A
W
Norwood Junction
Redhill
Exmouth Junction
Fratton
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1949
05/02/1951
13/08/1952
20/07/1953
01/10/1953
31/12/1963
31/12/1963
Mongolipers 1845 31845 09/1924 EXJ
72E
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Barnstaple Junction
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
01/10/1953
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1846 31846 09/1924 SAL
72A
W
Salisbury
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1950
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1847 31847 01/1925 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
Mongolipers 1848 31848 02/1925 SAL
72A
74A
72A
W
Salisbury
Exmouth Junction
Ashford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
01/11/1955
09/11/1961
24/02/1964
24/02/1964
Mongolipers 1849 31849 02/1925 RED
72A
W
Redhill
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
07/1964
07/1964
Mongolipers 1850 31850 02/1925 RDG
72A
75B
W
Reading (S.R.)
Exmouth Junction
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
26/11/1959
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1851 31851 02/1925 RED
72A
71D
72A
73B
72A
75B
W
Redhill
Exmouth Junction
Fratton
Exmouth Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
06/10/1951
20/07/1953
08/02/1955
14/06/1959
26/11/1959
09/1963
09/1963
Mongolipers 1852 31852 03/1925 RED
72A
71D
70B
74A
73E
72A
75B
W
Redhill
Exmouth Junction
Fratton
Feltham
Ashford
Faversham
Exmouth Junction
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
06/10/1951
14/02/1953
26/05/1953
20/07/1953
14/06/1959
26/11/1959
15/09/1963
15/09/1963
Mongolipers 1853 31853 04/1925 EXJ
73B
73B
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
13/10/1958
14/06/1959
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1854 31854 03/1925 RDG
73C
74A
73A
72A
W
Reading (S.R.)
Hither Green
Ashford
Stewarts Lane
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
19/07/1957
26/05/1961
31/08/1963
22/06/1964
22/06/1964
Mongolipers 1855 31855 03/1925 EXJ
73B
73C
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Hither Green
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
18/06/1954
10/02/1961
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1856 31856 03/1925 EXJ
73C
70C
75B
73C
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Hither Green
Guildford
Redhill
Hither Green
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
14/02/1953
26/05/1953
20/07/1953
10/02/1961
07/1964
07/1964
Mongolipers 1857 31857 04/1925 RDG
73C
70B
72A
70C
W
Reading (S.R.)
Hither Green
Feltham
Exmouth Junction
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1951
17/01/1961
10/02/1961
22/10/1962
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1858 31858 05/1925 RED
73C
70C
W
Redhill
Hither Green
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1951
22/10/1959
26/12/1965
26/12/1965
Mongolipers 1859 31859 04/1925 TON
74C
73C
75C
75A
70C
72A
W
Tonbridge
Dover Marine
Hither Green
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Guildford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
27/07/1951
26/05/1961
06/07/1961
08/12/1961
31/08/1963
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
Mongolipers 1860 31860 04/1925 RDG
74A
75B
73C
72A
W
Reading (S.R.)
Ashford
Redhill
Hither Green
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
05/02/1951
27/07/1951
14/06/1959
02/11/1963
02/11/1963
Mongolipers 1861 31861 06/1925 RDG
74A
75B
73C
75B
W
Reading (S.R.)
Ashford
Redhill
Hither Green
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
05/02/1951
27/07/1951
14/06/1959
05/05/1963
05/05/1963
Mongolipers 1862 31862 05/1925 TON
73C
70C
75B
70C
W
Tonbridge
Hither Green
Guildford
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1951
14/02/1953
26/05/1953
18/01/1965
11/04/1965
11/04/1965
Mongolipers 1863 31863 05/1925 RED
70B
74A
75B
W
Redhill
Feltham
Ashford
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
26/05/1953
20/07/1953
07/07/1963
07/07/1963
Mongolipers 1864 31864 06/1925 RED
70B
75B
W
Redhill
Feltham
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
26/05/1953
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1865 31865 06/1925 BA
W
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
Mongolipers 1866 31866 05/1925 ELH
72A
75B
70C
W
Eastleigh
Exmouth Junction
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1950
11/04/1951
18/01/1965
09/01/1966
09/01/1966
Mongolipers 1867 31867 06/1925 ELH
72A
75B
W
Eastleigh
Exmouth Junction
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1950
11/04/1951
07/07/1963
07/07/1963
Mongolipers 1868 31868 07/1925 RDG
75B
W
Reading (S.R.)
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Mongolipers 1869 31869 07/1925 EXJ
75B
70C
W
Exmouth Junction
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
06/01/1964
02/08/1964
02/08/1964
Mongolipers 1870 31870 07/1925 ELH
72D
75A
71D
73B
75B
W
Eastleigh
Plymouth Friary
Brighton
Fratton
Bricklayers Arms
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1950
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
06/10/1951
14/06/1959
05/04/1964
05/04/1964
Mongolipers 1871 31871 07/1925 EXJ
75A
71D
73B
75B
W
Exmouth Junction
Brighton
Fratton
Bricklayers Arms
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
06/10/1951
14/06/1959
11/1963
11/1963
Mongolipers 1872 31872 08/1925 SAL
73B
75B
W
Salisbury
Bricklayers Arms
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1951
14/06/1959
26/05/1963
26/05/1963
Mongolipers 1873 31873 09/1925 SAL
73B
75A
75B
70C
W
Salisbury
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Redhill
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1951
02/07/1962
06/01/1964
18/01/1965
23/01/1966
23/01/1966
Mongolipers 1874 31874 09/1925 EXJ
72B
73C
73B
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Salisbury
Hither Green
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
27/06/1951
27/07/1951
10/02/1961
30/03/1964
30/03/1964
Mongolipers 1875 31875 08/1925 EXJ
72B
73C
73B
72A
W
Exmouth Junction
Salisbury
Hither Green
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
27/06/1951
27/07/1951
10/02/1961
10/08/1964
10/08/1964