Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 80 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7540 Week
» 5053 Month
» 232937 Year
» 1454502 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Mongolipers" Class 2-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1400     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1401     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1402     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1403     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1404     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1405     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1406     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1407     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1408     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1409     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1410     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1411     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1412     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1413     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1414     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1810     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1811     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1812     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1813     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1814     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1815     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1816     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1817     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1818     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1819     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1820     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1821     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1823     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1824     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1825     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1826     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1827     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1828     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1829     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1830     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1831     FRA Fratton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1832     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1833     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1834     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1835     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1836     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1837     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1838     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1839     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1840     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1841     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1842     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1843     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1844     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1845     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1846     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1847     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1848     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1849     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1850     RDG Reading (S.R.)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1851     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1852     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1853     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1854     RDG Reading (S.R.)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1855     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1856     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1857     RDG Reading (S.R.)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1858     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1859     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1860     RDG Reading (S.R.)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1861     RDG Reading (S.R.)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1862     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1863     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1864     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1865     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1866     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1867     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1868     RDG Reading (S.R.)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1869     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1870     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1871     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1872     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1873     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1874     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1875     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 31843 RED Redhill RED Redhill  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 31844 NORW Norwood Junction RED Redhill  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 31860 RDG Reading (S.R.) 74A Ashford  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 31861 RDG Reading (S.R.) 74A Ashford  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 31829 ELH Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 31830 TON Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 31831 FRA Fratton 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 31828 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 31836 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 31846 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 31866 ELH Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 31867 ELH Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/11/1950 Reallocation 31870 ELH Eastleigh 72D Plymouth Friary  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31859 TON Tonbridge 74C Dover Marine  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31870 72D Plymouth Friary 75A Brighton  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31871 EXJ Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31874 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31875 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31407 EXJ Exmouth Junction 74A Ashford  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31408 EXJ Exmouth Junction 74A Ashford  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31843 RED Redhill 72A Exmouth Junction  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31844 RED Redhill 72A Exmouth Junction  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31860 74A Ashford 75B Redhill  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31861 74A Ashford 75B Redhill  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31870 75A Brighton 71D Fratton  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31871 75A Brighton 71D Fratton  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31848 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31849 RED Redhill 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31851 RED Redhill 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31852 RED Redhill 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31866 72A Exmouth Junction 75B Redhill  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31867 72A Exmouth Junction 75B Redhill  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31868 RDG Reading (S.R.) 75B Redhill  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 31869 EXJ Exmouth Junction 75B Redhill  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 31842 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 31828 72A Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 31829 72A Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 31872 SAL Salisbury 73B Bricklayers Arms  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 31873 SAL Salisbury 73B Bricklayers Arms  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 31874 72B Salisbury 73C Hither Green  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 31875 72B Salisbury 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31817 RED Redhill 74C Dover Marine  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31818 RED Redhill 74C Dover Marine  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31823 DOV Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31857 RDG Reading (S.R.) 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31858 RED Redhill 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31859 74C Dover Marine 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31860 75B Redhill 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31861 75B Redhill 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31862 TON Tonbridge 73C Hither Green  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31874 73C Hither Green 73B Bricklayers Arms  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31875 73C Hither Green 73B Bricklayers Arms  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31816 RED Redhill 73D Gillingham (Kent)  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31851 72A Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31852 72A Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31853 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31855 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31856 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73C Hither Green  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31870 71D Fratton 73B Bricklayers Arms  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 31871 71D Fratton 73B Bricklayers Arms  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 31840 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 31841 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 31842 72A Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
13/08/1952 Reallocation 31844 72A Exmouth Junction 71D Fratton  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 31840 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 31841 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 31837 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72C Yeovil Town  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 31842 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 31843 72A Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31400 AFD Ashford 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31406 RED Redhill 73C Hither Green  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31408 74A Ashford 73C Hither Green  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31837 72C Yeovil Town 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31852 71D Fratton 70B Feltham  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31856 73C Hither Green 70C Guildford  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31862 73C Hither Green 70C Guildford  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31863 RED Redhill 70B Feltham  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31864 RED Redhill 70B Feltham  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 31852 70B Feltham 74A Ashford  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 31856 70C Guildford 75B Redhill  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 31862 70C Guildford 75B Redhill  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 31863 70B Feltham 74A Ashford  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 31864 70B Feltham 75B Redhill  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31400 73B Bricklayers Arms 74A Ashford  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31406 73C Hither Green 74A Ashford  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31844 71D Fratton 72E Barnstaple Junction  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31845 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31851 71D Fratton 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31852 74A Ashford 73E Faversham  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31856 75B Redhill 73C Hither Green  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 31863 74A Ashford 75B Redhill  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31408 73C Hither Green 73B Bricklayers Arms  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31813 BAT Stewarts Lane 72B Salisbury  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31814 NORW Norwood Junction 72B Salisbury  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31815 RED Redhill 73A Stewarts Lane  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31816 73D Gillingham (Kent) 73A Stewarts Lane  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31844 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 31845 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 31815 73A Stewarts Lane 73D Gillingham (Kent)  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 31816 73A Stewarts Lane 73D Gillingham (Kent)  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 31842 72A Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 31855 73B Bricklayers Arms 73C Hither Green  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 31854 RDG Reading (S.R.) 73C Hither Green  
08/02/1955 Reallocation 31408 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
08/02/1955 Reallocation 31851 72A Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
11/03/1955 Reallocation 31842 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 31407 74A Ashford 74C Dover Marine  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 31842 72A Exmouth Junction 72E Barnstaple Junction  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 31407 74C Dover Marine 74A Ashford  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 31817 74C Dover Marine 75B Redhill  
01/11/1955 Reallocation 31848 72A Exmouth Junction 74A Ashford  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 31842 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 31843 72E Barnstaple Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
19/07/1957 Reallocation 31854 73C Hither Green 74A Ashford  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 31853 73B Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31408 73A Stewarts Lane 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31409 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31413 BAT Stewarts Lane 73H Dover Marine  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31414 BAT Stewarts Lane 73H Dover Marine  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31810 BAT Stewarts Lane 73H Dover Marine  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31811 BAT Stewarts Lane 70C Guildford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31812 BAT Stewarts Lane 70C Guildford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31815 73D Gillingham (Kent) 70C Guildford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31816 73D Gillingham (Kent) 70C Guildford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31850 RDG Reading (S.R.) 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31851 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31852 73E Faversham 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31853 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31860 73C Hither Green 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31861 73C Hither Green 75B Redhill  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31870 73B Bricklayers Arms 75B Redhill  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31871 73B Bricklayers Arms 75B Redhill  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31872 73B Bricklayers Arms 75B Redhill  
22/10/1959 Reallocation 31816 70C Guildford 73C Hither Green  
22/10/1959 Reallocation 31858 73C Hither Green 70C Guildford  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 31850 72A Exmouth Junction 75B Redhill  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 31851 72A Exmouth Junction 75B Redhill  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 31852 72A Exmouth Junction 75B Redhill  
08/07/1960 Reallocation 31400 74A Ashford 70C Guildford  
08/07/1960 Reallocation 31401 AFD Ashford 70C Guildford  
08/07/1960 Reallocation 31823 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
08/07/1960 Reallocation 31824 BA Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 31414 73H Dover Marine 70B Feltham  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 31857 73C Hither Green 70B Feltham  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31402 AFD Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31403 AFD Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31404 AFD Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31405 BAT Stewarts Lane 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31406 74A Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31407 74A Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31414 70B Feltham 70C Guildford  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31818 74C Dover Marine 73J Tonbridge  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31819 DOV Dover Marine 75B Redhill  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31820 DOV Dover Marine 75B Redhill  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31855 73C Hither Green 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31856 73C Hither Green 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31857 70B Feltham 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31874 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 31875 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31402 73J Tonbridge 70C Guildford  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31403 73J Tonbridge 70C Guildford  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31404 73J Tonbridge 72B Salisbury  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31405 73J Tonbridge 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31406 73J Tonbridge 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31407 73J Tonbridge 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31413 73H Dover Marine 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31810 73H Dover Marine 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31816 73C Hither Green 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31818 73J Tonbridge 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31821 DOV Dover Marine 75C Norwood Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31854 74A Ashford 73A Stewarts Lane  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 31859 73C Hither Green 75C Norwood Junction  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 31819 75B Redhill 75A Brighton  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 31820 75B Redhill 75A Brighton  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 31821 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 31859 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 31408 73F Ashford 72B Salisbury  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 31409 73F Ashford 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 31848 74A Ashford 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31400 70C Guildford 75A Brighton  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31401 70C Guildford 75A Brighton  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31402 70C Guildford 75A Brighton  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31403 70C Guildford 75A Brighton  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31819 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31820 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31821 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 31859 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 31818 71A Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
05/03/1962 Reallocation 31406 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 31825 BA Bricklayers Arms 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 31826 BA Bricklayers Arms 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 31827 ELH Eastleigh 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 31828 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 31829 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 31873 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 31830 72A Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 31831 72A Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 31832 EXJ Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 31833 EXJ Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
22/10/1962 Reallocation 31857 72A Exmouth Junction 70C Guildford  
17/11/1962 Condemned 31409 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 31414 70C Guildford   COND  
05/05/1963 Condemned 31861 75B Redhill   COND  
26/05/1963 Condemned 31815 70C Guildford   COND  
26/05/1963 Condemned 31872 75B Redhill   COND  
30/06/1963 Condemned 31403 75A Brighton   COND  
07/07/1963 Condemned 31407 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
07/07/1963 Condemned 31863 75B Redhill   COND  
07/07/1963 Condemned 31867 75B Redhill   COND  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31400 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31410 BAT Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31411 BAT Stewarts Lane 75B Redhill  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31412 BAT Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31816 71A Eastleigh 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31823 73A Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 31824 73A Stewarts Lane 75B Redhill  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 31825 75D Stewarts Lane 75B Redhill  
25/08/1963 Condemned 31402 75A Brighton   COND  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 31812 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 31818 72A Exmouth Junction 75D Stewarts Lane  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 31821 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 31854 73A Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 31859 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/1963 Condemned 31820 70C Guildford   COND  
09/1963 Condemned 31825 75B Redhill   COND  
09/1963 Condemned 31826 75D Stewarts Lane   COND  
09/1963 Condemned 31851 75B Redhill   COND  
09/1963 Condemned 31865 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
01/09/1963 Condemned 31818 75D Stewarts Lane   COND  
15/09/1963 Condemned 31823 75C Norwood Junction   COND  
15/09/1963 Condemned 31852 75B Redhill   COND  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31404 72B Salisbury 70C Guildford  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31408 72B Salisbury 70C Guildford  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31410 75C Norwood Junction 75B Redhill  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31412 75C Norwood Junction 75B Redhill  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31413 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31810 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31813 72B Salisbury 70C Guildford  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31814 72B Salisbury 70C Guildford  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31823 98W   75B Redhill  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 31827 75D Stewarts Lane 75B Redhill  
10/1963 Condemned 31847 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
20/10/1963 Condemned 31813 70C Guildford   COND  
20/10/1963 Condemned 31824 75B Redhill   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 31871 75B Redhill   COND  
02/11/1963 Condemned 31860 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
01/12/1963 Condemned 31404 70C Guildford   COND  
28/12/1963 Condemned 31836 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
31/12/1963 Condemned 31839 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
31/12/1963 Condemned 31844 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31819 70C Guildford   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31829 75A Brighton   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31830 75A Brighton   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31832 75A Brighton   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31850 75B Redhill   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31857 70C Guildford   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31864 75B Redhill   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 31868 75B Redhill   COND  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31401 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31410 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31412 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31828 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31831 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31833 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31869 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 31873 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
12/01/1964 Condemned 31817 75B Redhill   COND  
23/02/1964 Condemned 31833 70C Guildford   COND  
24/02/1964 Condemned 31838 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
24/02/1964 Condemned 31848 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
29/03/1964 Condemned 31810 70C Guildford   COND  
30/03/1964 Condemned 31841 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
30/03/1964 Condemned 31874 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
05/04/1964 Condemned 31870 75B Redhill   COND  
14/05/1964 Condemned 31821 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 31400 75B Redhill   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 31413 70C Guildford   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 31827 75B Redhill   COND  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 31405 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 75B Redhill  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 31816 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 75B Redhill  
22/06/1964 Condemned 31854 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/1964 Condemned 31812 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/1964 Condemned 31849 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/1964 Condemned 31856 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 31842 72A Exmouth Junction 70C Guildford  
26/07/1964 Condemned 31814 70C Guildford   COND  
02/08/1964 Condemned 31869 70C Guildford   COND  
09/08/1964 Condemned 31412 70C Guildford   COND  
10/08/1964 Condemned 31875 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
06/09/1964 Condemned 31828 75B Redhill   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31406 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31834 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31835 EXJ Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31837 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31840 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31843 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31845 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31846 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31853 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31855 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 31859 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
01/11/1964 Condemned 31410 70C Guildford   COND  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31405 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31411 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31816 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31831 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31862 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31866 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 31873 75B Redhill 70C Guildford  
11/04/1965 Condemned 31862 70C Guildford   COND  
25/04/1965 Condemned 31831 70C Guildford   COND  
04/07/1965 Condemned 31811 70C Guildford   COND  
18/07/1965 Condemned 31401 70C Guildford   COND  
05/09/1965 Condemned 31842 70C Guildford   COND  
26/12/1965 Condemned 31858 70C Guildford   COND  
09/01/1966 Condemned 31816 70C Guildford   COND  
09/01/1966 Condemned 31866 70C Guildford   COND  
23/01/1966 Condemned 31873 70C Guildford   COND  
24/04/1966 Condemned 31411 70C Guildford   COND  
05/06/1966 Condemned 31405 70C Guildford   COND  
05/06/1966 Condemned 31408 70C Guildford   COND