Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 80 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7540 Week
» 5053 Month
» 232937 Year
» 1454502 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Mongolipers" Class 2-6-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1400 31400 07/1932 14/06/1964 Redhill 31.92 32.44
1401 31401 08/1932 18/07/1965 Guildford 32.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 33.19
1402 31402 08/1932 25/08/1963 Brighton 31 31.94
1403 31403 08/1932 30/06/1963 Brighton 30.83 31.19
1404 31404 10/1932 01/12/1963 Guildford 31.17 31.27
1405 31405 11/1932 05/06/1966 Guildford 33.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1966 33.85
1406 31406 01/1933 14/09/1964 Exmouth Junction 31.67 31.94
1407 31407 08/1932 07/07/1963 Bath Green Park (S&D) 30.92 32.19
1408 31408 09/1933 05/06/1966 32.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1966 33.02
1409 31409 10/1933 17/11/1962 29.08 30.36
1410 31410 11/1933 01/11/1964 31 31.35
1411 31411 11/1933 24/04/1966 32.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1966 32.85
1412 31412 12/1933 09/08/1964 30.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 31.02
1413 31413 01/1934 14/06/1964 30.42 30.94
1414 31414 01/1934 24/11/1962 28.83 29.10
1810 31810 06/1917 29/03/1964 46.75 47.12
1811 31811 06/1920 04/07/1965 45.08 45.45
1812 31812 08/1920 07/1964 43.92 44.36
1813 31813 09/1920 20/10/1963 43.08 43.28
1814 31814 11/1920 26/07/1964 43.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 44.11
1815 31815 12/1920 26/05/1963 42.42 42.61
1816 31816 01/1922 09/01/1966 44 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 44.28
1817 31817 01/1922 12/01/1964 42 42.11
1818 31818 03/1922 01/09/1963 41.5 41.53
1819 31819 05/1922 05/01/1964 41.67 42.20
1820 31820 08/1922 09/1963 41.08 41.36
1821 31821 10/1922 14/05/1964 Exmouth Junction 41.58 42.03
1823 31823 08/1923 15/09/1963 40.08 40.45
1824 31824 12/1923 20/10/1963 39.83 40.11
1825 31825 06/1924 09/1963 39.25 39.61
1826 31826 05/1924 09/1963 39.33 39.70
1827 31827 06/1924 14/06/1964 40 40.53
1828 31828 07/1924 06/09/1964 40.17 40.36
1829 31829 06/1924 05/01/1964 39.58 39.86
1830 31830 06/1924 05/01/1964 39.58 39.86
1831 31831 07/1924 25/04/1965 40.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1965 41.11
1832 31832 07/1924 05/01/1964 39.5 39.78
1833 31833 07/1924 23/02/1964 39.58 39.78
1834 31834 07/1924 14/09/1964 40.17 40.45
1835 31835 07/1924 14/09/1964 40.17 40.45
1836 31836 07/1924 28/12/1963 39.42 39.78
1837 31837 07/1924 14/09/1964 40.17 40.36
1838 31838 07/1924 24/02/1964 39.58 39.69
1839 31839 08/1924 31/12/1963 39.33 39.69
1840 31840 08/1924 14/09/1964 40.08 40.36
1841 31841 08/1924 30/03/1964 39.58 40.19
1842 31842 08/1924 05/09/1965 41.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 41.28
1843 31843 08/1924 14/09/1964 40.08 40.28
1844 31844 08/1924 31/12/1963 39.33 39.69
1845 31845 09/1924 14/09/1964 40 40.36
1846 31846 09/1924 14/09/1964 40 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1964 40.28
1847 31847 01/1925 10/1963 38.75 38.86
1848 31848 02/1925 24/02/1964 39 39.02
1849 31849 02/1925 07/1964 39.42 39.86
1850 31850 02/1925 05/01/1964 38.92 Cut Cohens (at Redhill Depot) 07/1964 39.44
1851 31851 02/1925 09/1963 38.58 39.27
1852 31852 03/1925 15/09/1963 38.5 38.78
1853 31853 04/1925 14/09/1964 39.42 39.70
1854 31854 03/1925 22/06/1964 39.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1964 39.78
1855 31855 03/1925 14/09/1964 39.5 39.78
1856 31856 03/1925 07/1964 39.33 39.78
1857 31857 04/1925 05/01/1964 38.75 38.86
1858 31858 05/1925 26/12/1965 40.58 41.03
1859 31859 04/1925 14/09/1964 39.42 39.70
1860 31860 04/1925 02/11/1963 38.58 38.86
1861 31861 06/1925 05/05/1963 37.92 38.02
1862 31862 05/1925 11/04/1965 39.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1965 40.19
1863 31863 05/1925 07/07/1963 38.17 38.86
1864 31864 06/1925 05/01/1964 38.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 39.53
1865 31865 06/1925 09/1963 38.25 38.78
1866 31866 05/1925 09/01/1966 40.67 Cut Cohens (at Eastleigh Depot) 03/1966 40.86
1867 31867 06/1925 07/07/1963 38.08 38.70
1868 31868 07/1925 05/01/1964 38.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1965 39.62
1869 31869 07/1925 02/08/1964 39.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 39.45
1870 31870 07/1925 05/04/1964 38.75 39.36
1871 31871 07/1925 11/1963 38.33 38.53
1872 31872 08/1925 26/05/1963 37.75 38.02
1873 31873 09/1925 23/01/1966 40.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 40.61
1874 31874 09/1925 30/03/1964 38.5 Prs Preserved
1875 31875 08/1925 10/08/1964 39 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 39.36