SR Maunsell "W" Class 2-6-4T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1919 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1920 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1911 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1912 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1913 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1914 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1915 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1916 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1917 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1918 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1919 | HIT | Hither Green | NORW | Norwood Junction | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1920 | HIT | Hither Green | NORW | Norwood Junction | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1921 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1922 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1923 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1924 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1925 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 31915 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 31916 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
24/08/1953 | Reallocation | 31912 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 73C | Hither Green | |
20/08/1954 | Reallocation | 31921 | HIT | Hither Green | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
24/11/1960 | Reallocation | 31914 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
24/11/1960 | Reallocation | 31915 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
24/11/1960 | Reallocation | 31921 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
17/01/1961 | Reallocation | 31923 | HIT | Hither Green | 70B | Feltham | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31911 | HIT | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31912 | 73C | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31913 | HIT | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31916 | 73C | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31922 | HIT | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31924 | HIT | Hither Green | 70B | Feltham | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 31925 | HIT | Hither Green | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
19/11/1962 | Reallocation | 31912 | 71A | Eastleigh | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
19/11/1962 | Reallocation | 31914 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
19/11/1962 | Reallocation | 31924 | 70B | Feltham | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
17/12/1962 | Reallocation | 31917 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
30/01/1963 | Reallocation | 31913 | 71A | Eastleigh | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
30/01/1963 | Reallocation | 31917 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
02/02/1963 | Condemned | 31923 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
23/06/1963 | Condemned | 31921 | 75C | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 31920 | NORW | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
20/07/1963 | Condemned | 31916 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
25/08/1963 | Condemned | 31918 | NORW | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
25/08/1963 | Condemned | 31922 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 31912 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 31914 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 31924 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
05/10/1963 | Condemned | 31911 | 98W | COND | |||
05/10/1963 | Condemned | 31915 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1963 | Condemned | 31925 | 75C | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
10/11/1963 | Condemned | 31919 | NORW | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 31917 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 31912 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 31913 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 31914 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 31924 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
01/03/1964 | Condemned | 31913 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
26/07/1964 | Condemned | 31924 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
30/08/1964 | Condemned | 31912 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
30/08/1964 | Condemned | 31914 | 70B | Feltham | COND |