141
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
56114 | 10/08/1956 | Hull Springhead | 67.68 | |||||||
56115 | 23/10/1956 | Hull Springhead | 67.47 | |||||||
56116 | 02/11/1956 | Hull Springhead | 67.45 | |||||||
56117 | 19/11/1956 | Hull Springhead | 67.40 | |||||||
56118 | 03/12/1956 | Hull Springhead | 67.36 | |||||||
56119 | 20/12/1956 | Hull Springhead | 67.32 | |||||||
56120 | 01/01/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.28 | |||||||
56121 | 12/01/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.25 | |||||||
56122 | 23/01/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.22 | |||||||
56123 | 29/01/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.21 | |||||||
56124 | 01/02/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.20 | |||||||
56125 | 04/02/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.19 | |||||||
56126 | 18/02/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.15 | |||||||
56127 | 21/02/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.14 | |||||||
56128 | 26/02/1957 | Hull Springhead | 27/07/1978 | 21.42 | 67.13 | |||||
56129 | 04/03/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.11 | |||||||
56130 | 11/03/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.09 | |||||||
56131 | 18/03/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.07 | |||||||
56132 | 22/03/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.06 | |||||||
56133 | 11/04/1957 | Hull Springhead | 67.01 | |||||||
56134 | 17/04/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.99 | |||||||
56135 | 26/04/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.97 | |||||||
56136 | 01/05/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.95 | |||||||
56137 | 06/05/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.94 | |||||||
56138 | 13/05/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.92 | |||||||
56139 | 21/05/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.90 | |||||||
56140 | 31/05/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.87 | |||||||
56141 | 31/05/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.87 | |||||||
56142 | 27/06/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.80 | |||||||
56143 | 05/07/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.78 | |||||||
56144 | 05/07/1957 | Hull Springhead | 66.78 | |||||||
56145 | ||||||||||
56146 | ||||||||||
56147 | ||||||||||
56148 | ||||||||||
56149 | ||||||||||
56412 | 31/05/1958 | Lincoln | 65.87 | |||||||
56413 | 31/05/1958 | Lincoln | 65.87 | |||||||
56414 | 06/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.85 | |||||||
56415 | 06/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.85 | |||||||
56416 | 12/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.84 | |||||||
56417 | 19/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.82 | |||||||
56418 | 19/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.82 | |||||||
56419 | 26/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.80 | |||||||
56420 | 26/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.80 | |||||||
56421 | 01/07/1958 | Lincoln | 65.79 | |||||||
56422 | 17/07/1958 | Cambridge | 65.74 | |||||||
56423 | 23/07/1958 | Cambridge | 65.73 | |||||||
56424 | 29/07/1958 | Cambridge | 65.71 | |||||||
56425 | 29/07/1958 | Cambridge | 65.71 | |||||||
56426 | 29/07/1958 | Cambridge | 65.71 | |||||||
56427 | 01/08/1958 | Cambridge | 65.70 | |||||||
56428 | 01/08/1958 | Cambridge | 22/12/1977 | Finsbury Park | 19.33 | 65.70 | ||||
56429 | 08/08/1958 | Cambridge | 65.68 | |||||||
56430 | 03/09/1958 | Cambridge | 09/09/1978 | 20 | 65.61 | |||||
56431 | 03/09/1958 | Cambridge | 65.61 | |||||||
56432 | 09/09/1958 | Cambridge | 65.59 | |||||||
56433 | 12/09/1958 | Cambridge | 65.59 | |||||||
56434 | 19/09/1958 | Cambridge | 65.57 | |||||||
56435 | 24/09/1958 | Cambridge | 65.55 | |||||||
56436 | 26/09/1958 | Cambridge | 65.55 | |||||||
56437 | 03/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.53 | |||||||
56438 | 03/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.53 | |||||||
56439 | 10/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.51 | |||||||
56440 | 17/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.49 | |||||||
56441 | 17/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.49 | |||||||
56442 | 29/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.46 | |||||||
56443 | 29/10/1958 | Cambridge | 65.46 | |||||||
56444 | 05/11/1958 | Cambridge | 65.44 | |||||||
56445 | 05/11/1958 | Cambridge | 65.44 | |||||||
56446 | 12/11/1958 | Cambridge | 65.42 | |||||||
56447 | 23/11/1958 | Lincoln | 65.39 | |||||||
56448 | 23/11/1958 | Lincoln | 65.39 | |||||||
56449 | 29/11/1958 | Lincoln | 65.37 | |||||||
56450 | 06/12/1958 | Lincoln | 65.35 | |||||||
56451 | 06/12/1958 | Lincoln | 65.35 | |||||||
56452 | 13/12/1958 | Lincoln | 65.33 | |||||||
56453 | 18/12/1958 | Lincoln | 65.32 | |||||||
56454 | 31/12/1958 | Cambridge | 65.28 | |||||||
56455 | 05/01/1959 | Lincoln | 65.27 | |||||||
56456 | 05/01/1959 | Cambridge | 65.27 | |||||||
56457 | 15/01/1959 | Cambridge | 65.24 | |||||||
56458 | 21/01/1959 | Lincoln | 65.23 | |||||||
56459 | 29/01/1959 | Lincoln | 65.21 | |||||||
56460 | 09/02/1959 | Lincoln | 65.18 | |||||||
56461 | 09/02/1959 | Lincoln | 65.18 | |||||||
56462 | 14/02/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.16 | |||||||
56463 | 21/02/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.14 | |||||||
56464 | 21/02/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.14 | |||||||
56465 | 16/03/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.08 | |||||||
56466 | 16/03/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.08 | |||||||
56467 | 16/03/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.08 | |||||||
56468 | 16/03/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.08 | |||||||
56469 | 16/03/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.08 | |||||||
56470 | 20/03/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.07 | |||||||
56471 | 01/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.04 | |||||||
56472 | 01/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.04 | |||||||
56473 | 01/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.04 | |||||||
56474 | 08/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 65.02 | |||||||
56475 | 20/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.98 | |||||||
56476 | 20/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 09/04/1978 | 19 | 64.98 | |||||
56477 | 20/04/1959 | Kittybrewster | 09/04/1978 | 19 | 64.98 | |||||
56478 | 05/05/1959 | Kittybrewster | 09/04/1978 | 18.92 | 64.94 | |||||
56479 | 09/04/1978 | |||||||||
56480 | ||||||||||
56481 | 22/12/1973 | |||||||||
56482 | ||||||||||
56483 |