LSWR/SR Drummond "L11" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 166 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 134 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 148 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 154 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 155 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 156 | DOR | Dorchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 157 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 158 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 159 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 161 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 163 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 164 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 165 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 166 | FEL | Feltham | FRA | Fratton | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 167 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 168 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 169 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 170 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 171 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 172 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 173 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 174 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 175 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 405 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 406 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 407 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 408 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 409 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 410 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 411 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 412 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 413 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 414 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 435 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 436 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 437 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 438 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 439 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 440 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 441 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 442 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 170 | FRA | Fratton | FRA | Fratton | |
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 172 | FRA | Fratton | FRA | Fratton | |
01/03/1948 | Reallocation | 440 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | DOR | Dorchester | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | 161 | BM | Bournemouth | DOR | Dorchester | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 166 | FRA | Fratton | ELH | Eastleigh | |
01/08/1948 | Reallocation | 168 | BM | Bournemouth | GFD | Guildford | |
01/08/1948 | Reallocation | 169 | BM | Bournemouth | ELH | Eastleigh | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 413 | FRA | Fratton | DOR | Dorchester | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 164 | FRA | Fratton | FRA | Fratton | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 165 | ELH | Eastleigh | ELH | Eastleigh | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 414 | FRA | Fratton | FRA | Fratton | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 30407 | BM | Bournemouth | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 410 | FRA | Fratton | BM | Bournemouth | |
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 30410 | BM | Bournemouth | ELH | Eastleigh | |
05/1949 | Condemned | 30439 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
05/1949 | Condemned | 30440 | DOR | Dorchester | COND | ||
03/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30440 | 98W | YEOs | Yeovil Town | ||
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 30158 | FEL | Feltham | GFD | Guildford | |
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 30413 | DOR | Dorchester | ELH | Eastleigh | |
07/1949 | Condemned | 30169 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/1949 | Condemned | 30167 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
26/09/1949 | Reallocation | 164 | FRA | Fratton | FEL | Feltham | |
15/10/1949 | Reallocation | 30161 | DOR | Dorchester | ELH | Eastleigh | |
12/1949 | Condemned | 30410 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
12/1949 | Condemned | 30435 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 30163 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
02/1950 | Condemned | 30161 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
02/1950 | Condemned | 30168 | GFD | Guildford | COND | ||
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30156 | DOR | Dorchester | ELH | Eastleigh | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30173 | BM | Bournemouth | ELH | Eastleigh | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30442 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | ELH | Eastleigh | |
15/07/1950 | Condemned | 30166 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30414 | FRA | Fratton | 71A | Eastleigh | |
11/1950 | Condemned | 30407 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30413 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
12/1950 | Condemned | 30158 | GFD | Guildford | COND | ||
12/1950 | Condemned | 30412 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 30442 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
02/1951 | Condemned | 30405 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
03/1951 | Condemned | 30134 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
03/1951 | Condemned | 30408 | BM | Bournemouth | COND | ||
03/1951 | Condemned | 30413 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
10/03/1951 | Condemned | 30159 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
14/03/1951 | Reallocation | 30414 | 71A | Eastleigh | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
14/03/1951 | Reallocation | 30442 | 70C | Guildford | 71A | Eastleigh | |
20/03/1951 | Reallocation | 30414 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
20/03/1951 | Reallocation | 30442 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71A | Eastleigh | |
04/1951 | Condemned | 30154 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
04/1951 | Condemned | 30155 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
04/1951 | Condemned | 30165 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
04/1951 | Condemned | 30441 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
05/1951 | Condemned | 30173 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
05/1951 | Condemned | 30414 | 72C | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
05/05/1951 | Condemned | 30156 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 30442 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71A | Eastleigh | |
06/1951 | Condemned | 30406 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
06/1951 | Condemned | 30409 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
07/1951 | Condemned | 30436 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 30438 | GFD | Guildford | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
09/1951 | Condemned | 30171 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/1951 | Condemned | 30174 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
10/1951 | Condemned | 30164 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
10/1951 | Condemned | 30438 | 72C | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
27/10/1951 | Condemned | 30163 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 30175 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 30442 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
08/03/1952 | Condemned | 30148 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
08/03/1952 | Condemned | 30157 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
06/1952 | Condemned | 30170 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
06/1952 | Condemned | 30172 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
06/1952 | Condemned | 30411 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
06/1952 | Condemned | 30437 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND |