Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 195 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4441 Week
» 1549 Month
» 108495 Year
» 1330060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Lord Nelson" Class 4-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 20/07/1954 30858,
30861
70A,
70A
  Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 18/02/1961 30864 71A   Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.    
Sat 25/02/1961 30852 71B   Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.    
Sat 25/02/1961 30864 71A   Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.    
Sun 26/11/1961 30858,
30859
Wdn,
71A
  Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. SLS 1/1962