SR Maunsell "N15X" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2327 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2328 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2329 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2330 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2331 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2332 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2333 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 32333 | BAS | Basingstoke | BAS | Basingstoke | |
02/1955 | Condemned | 32328 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
13/08/1955 | Condemned | 32330 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
07/01/1956 | Condemned | 32327 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
14/01/1956 | Condemned | 32332 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
14/04/1956 | Condemned | 32333 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
08/1956 | Condemned | 32329 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
20/07/1957 | Condemned | 32331 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND |