LSWR/SR Urie "N15" Class 4-6-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
King Arthur | 448 | 30448 | 05/1925 | SAL SAL W |
Salisbury Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 27/08/1960 |
27/08/1960 |
King Arthur | 449 | 30449 | 06/1925 | SAL W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
King Arthur | 450 | 30450 | 06/1925 | SAL W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1960 |
03/09/1960 |
King Arthur | 451 | 30451 | 06/1925 | SAL BAS SAL BAS 70A 72B W |
Salisbury Basingstoke Salisbury Basingstoke Nine Elms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 28/05/1949 26/09/1949 07/10/1950 08/12/1950 16/06/1962 |
16/06/1962 |
King Arthur | 452 | 30452 | 07/1925 | SAL SAL W |
Salisbury Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
King Arthur | 453 | 30453 | 02/1925 | SAL W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
King Arthur | 454 | 30454 | 03/1925 | SAL SAL SAL W |
Salisbury Salisbury Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 04/02/1950 18/10/1958 |
18/10/1958 |
King Arthur | 455 | 30455 | 03/1925 | SAL SAL 72B 72A 70B 72B 70A 70D W |
Salisbury Salisbury Salisbury Exmouth Junction Feltham Salisbury Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 08/12/1950 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 12/05/1951 30/06/1952 08/10/1957 18/04/1959 |
18/04/1959 |
King Arthur | 456 | 30456 | 04/1925 | SAL SAL 72B 72B 70A 70D W |
Salisbury Salisbury Salisbury Salisbury Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 27/06/1951 01/04/1957 14/05/1960 |
14/05/1960 |
King Arthur | 457 | 30457 | 04/1925 | SAL BAS SAL 72B 72A 70B 72B 70A 70D 70A W |
Salisbury Basingstoke Salisbury Salisbury Exmouth Junction Feltham Salisbury Nine Elms Basingstoke Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 26/09/1949 08/12/1950 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 08/10/1957 06/06/1958 20/05/1961 |
20/05/1961 |
King Arthur | 736 | 30736 | 09/1918 | BM ELH BM W |
Bournemouth Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 08/01/1949 10/1956 |
10/1956 |
King Arthur | 737 | 30737 | 10/1918 | ELH BM ELH BM BM W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 06/10/1948 08/01/1949 28/05/1949 08/1956 |
08/1956 |
King Arthur | 738 | 30738 | 12/1919 | 9E 70B 71B 71B 70D W |
Nine Elms Feltham (Re-instd) Bournemouth Bournemouth Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 12/06/1957 08/03/1958 |
08/03/1958 |
King Arthur | 739 | 30739 | 02/1919 | ELH BM SAL 9E SAL 71B 71B W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Salisbury Nine Elms Salisbury Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 08/01/1949 28/05/1949 04/02/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 04/05/1957 |
04/05/1957 |
King Arthur | 740 | 30740 | 04/1919 | ELH BM W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 10/12/1955 |
10/12/1955 |
King Arthur | 741 | 30741 | 05/1919 | ELH BAS W |
Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 04/02/1956 |
04/02/1956 |
King Arthur | 742 | 30742 | 06/1919 | 9E 9E 71B 71B W |
Nine Elms Nine Elms Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 09/02/1957 |
09/02/1957 |
King Arthur | 743 | 30743 | 08/1919 | BM W |
Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1955 |
15/10/1955 |
King Arthur | 744 | 30744 | 09/1919 | SAL EXJ EXJ 9E SAL 71A 71A 70D 70B 70D 70A 70D W |
Salisbury Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Salisbury Eastleigh Eastleigh Basingstoke Feltham Basingstoke Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 28/05/1949 12/08/1949 04/02/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 27/03/1953 26/05/1953 10/10/1955 07/01/1956 |
07/01/1956 |
King Arthur | 745 | 30745 | 11/1919 | ELH 9E 70D 70D 71A 71A 70D W |
Eastleigh Nine Elms Basingstoke Basingstoke Eastleigh Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 11/02/1956 |
11/02/1956 |
King Arthur | 746 | 30746 | 06/1922 | SAL EXJ ELH BM 71A W |
Salisbury Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 13/11/1948 03/05/1949 08/12/1950 11/1955 |
11/1955 |
King Arthur | 747 | 30747 | 07/1922 | EXJ SAL 9E 71A 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Nine Elms Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 28/05/1949 08/12/1950 20/03/1951 10/1956 |
10/1956 |
King Arthur | 748 | 30748 | 08/1922 | ELH ELH 9E 72B 71A 70D W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Salisbury Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 12/08/1949 20/05/1950 08/12/1950 12/06/1957 07/09/1957 |
07/09/1957 |
King Arthur | 749 | 30749 | 09/1922 | ELH ELH 70D 71A 70D W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Basingstoke Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 26/05/1953 10/10/1955 15/06/1956 22/06/1957 |
22/06/1957 |
King Arthur | 750 | 30750 | 10/1922 | ELH BM 71B 71A 71A 70A 70D 70A 70D W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Bournemouth (Re-instd) Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Basingstoke Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 17/06/1950 08/12/1950 10/10/1955 27/01/1956 17/11/1956 17/12/1956 12/06/1957 06/07/1957 |
06/07/1957 |
King Arthur | 751 | 30751 | 11/1922 | ELH BM BM 71A 71A 70D W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Bournemouth Eastleigh Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 04/02/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 15/06/1956 15/06/1957 |
15/06/1957 |
King Arthur | 752 | 30752 | 12/1922 | ELH BM ELH W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 12/12/1949 17/12/1955 |
17/12/1955 |
King Arthur | 753 | 30753 | 01/1923 | 9E ELH 9E 72B 71A 70D 70A 70D W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Salisbury Eastleigh Basingstoke Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/06/1949 20/05/1950 08/12/1950 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 30/06/1952 16/03/1957 |
16/03/1957 |
King Arthur | 754 | 30754 | 02/1923 | ELH ELH 71B 71A 70D 70D 70A 70D W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Bournemouth (Re-instd) Eastleigh Basingstoke Basingstoke Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1949 17/06/1950 08/12/1950 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 30/06/1952 02/1953 |
02/1953 |
King Arthur | 755 | 30755 | 03/1923 | 9E 71A 71A 70A 70D W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 10/10/1955 27/01/1956 15/06/1956 11/05/1957 |
11/05/1957 |
King Arthur | 763 | 30763 | 05/1925 | BAT RAM BAT 70D 71A 71B 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Eastleigh Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 28/05/1949 12/08/1955 15/06/1956 12/06/1957 08/10/1957 09/1960 |
09/1960 |
King Arthur | 764 | 30764 | 05/1925 | BAT RAM BAT 71A 71B 72B 71B W |
Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Bournemouth Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 03/05/1949 07/07/1955 12/08/1955 05/10/1960 24/11/1960 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
King Arthur | 765 | 30765 | 05/1925 | BAT RAM 9E 9E 72B 72B 70A 70A 73A 71B 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Nine Elms Nine Elms Salisbury Salisbury Nine Elms Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Bournemouth Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 03/05/1949 28/05/1949 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 12/08/1955 13/10/1958 29/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 |
King Arthur | 766 | 30766 | 05/1925 | 9E BAT W |
Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 27/12/1958 |
27/12/1958 |
King Arthur | 767 | 30767 | 06/1925 | DOV 73A 71A W |
Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 14/06/1959 27/06/1959 |
27/06/1959 |
King Arthur | 768 | 30768 | 06/1925 | DOV 73A 71A W |
Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 14/06/1959 10/1961 |
10/1961 |
King Arthur | 769 | 30769 | 06/1925 | DOV 73A 74C 73A 71A W |
Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 14/06/1959 27/02/1960 |
27/02/1960 |
King Arthur | 770 | 30770 | 06/1925 | DOV DOV 73A 70D 71A 70D W |
Dover Marine Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Eastleigh Basingstoke Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 30/06/1952 12/08/1955 15/06/1956 24/09/1962 24/11/1962 |
24/11/1962 |
King Arthur | 771 | 30771 | 06/1925 | DOV DOV 73A 70D 71B 72B W |
Dover Marine Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Bournemouth Salisbury Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 30/06/1952 10/10/1955 15/06/1956 24/11/1960 03/1961 |
03/1961 |
King Arthur | 772 | 30772 | 06/1925 | BM ELH BM ELH 73A 73A 74C 73A 74B 73A 73C 71B W |
Bournemouth Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Hither Green Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 28/05/1949 26/09/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 30/06/1952 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 20/08/1954 12/06/1957 30/09/1961 |
30/09/1961 |
King Arthur | 773 | 30773 | 06/1925 | 9E 72B 72B 73A 73A 74C 73A 70A 71B 70D 71A W |
Nine Elms Salisbury Salisbury Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Bournemouth Basingstoke Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 30/06/1952 16/09/1955 12/06/1957 13/10/1958 01/05/1959 10/02/1962 |
10/02/1962 |
King Arthur | 774 | 30774 | 06/1925 | 9E BAT 74C 73A 70A W |
Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 05/02/1951 30/06/1952 07/07/1955 09/01/1960 |
09/01/1960 |
King Arthur | 775 | 30775 | 06/1925 | BAT 73A 74C 70B W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 05/02/1951 14/06/1959 27/02/1960 |
27/02/1960 |
King Arthur | 776 | 30776 | 06/1925 | BAT 73A 74C W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 05/02/1951 24/01/1959 |
24/01/1959 |
King Arthur | 777 | 30777 | 06/1925 | ELH ELH 70A 73A 74C 74C 70B 70D W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Dover Marine Feltham Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 14/06/1959 05/10/1960 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
King Arthur | 778 | 30778 | 06/1925 | BAT 71A 71A 70A 73A 74C 74C 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Dover Marine Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1950 30/11/1950 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 20/07/1953 23/05/1959 |
23/05/1959 |
King Arthur | 779 | 30779 | 07/1925 | 9E ELH 70A 73A 74C 74C 70A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Dover Marine Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 20/07/1953 11/07/1959 |
11/07/1959 |
King Arthur | 780 | 30780 | 07/1925 | BAT 9E 71A 71A 70D 71B W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Eastleigh Eastleigh Basingstoke Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 08/12/1950 27/06/1951 27/01/1956 15/06/1956 11/07/1959 |
11/07/1959 |
King Arthur | 781 | 30781 | 07/1925 | BAT DOV 71A 70A 71A 70A 70D 71B W |
Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Eastleigh Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Basingstoke Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 05/02/1951 20/03/1951 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 27/01/1956 15/06/1956 12/05/1962 |
12/05/1962 |
King Arthur | 782 | 30782 | 07/1925 | 9E 71A 71B W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 |
King Arthur | 783 | 30783 | 08/1925 | 9E ELH 70A 70A 71A 71B 72B W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Bournemouth Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 24/11/1960 02/1961 |
02/1961 |
King Arthur | 784 | 30784 | 08/1925 | ELH 70A 70A 71A W |
Eastleigh Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 |
King Arthur | 785 | 30785 | 08/1925 | ELH 70A 70A 71A W |
Eastleigh Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 |
King Arthur | 786 | 30786 | 08/1925 | 9E 70A 71A 70A 71A W |
Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 20/03/1951 13/04/1951 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 |
King Arthur | 787 | 30787 | 09/1925 | BM ELH BM 9E 71A 72B 70A 70A 71A W |
Bournemouth Eastleigh Bournemouth Nine Elms Eastleigh Salisbury Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 28/05/1949 26/09/1949 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 28/02/1959 |
28/02/1959 |
King Arthur | 788 | 30788 | 09/1925 | 9E ELH 70A 70A 71A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 10/02/1962 |
10/02/1962 |
King Arthur | 789 | 30789 | 09/1925 | BM ELH 70D 70D 71A W |
Bournemouth Eastleigh Basingstoke Basingstoke Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 26/12/1959 |
26/12/1959 |
King Arthur | 790 | 30790 | 09/1925 | BM ELH 70D 70D 71A W |
Bournemouth Eastleigh Basingstoke Basingstoke Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 10/1961 |
10/1961 |
King Arthur | 791 | 30791 | 09/1925 | 9E 9E 73A 73A 70A 73A 73A 73A 71A W |
Nine Elms Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 13/11/1950 30/11/1950 05/02/1951 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 16/09/1955 21/05/1960 |
21/05/1960 |
King Arthur | 792 | 30792 | 10/1925 | 9E 73A 73A 70A 73A 71A W |
Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1950 30/11/1950 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 12/06/1957 14/02/1959 |
14/02/1959 |
King Arthur | 793 | 30793 | 03/1926 | BAT BAT AFD 73A 70B 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Ashford Stewarts Lane Feltham Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 12/12/1949 17/06/1950 14/06/1959 17/01/1961 08/1962 |
08/1962 |
King Arthur | 794 | 30794 | 03/1926 | BAT BA 74C 73A 73B 73A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 18/06/1954 20/08/1954 11/03/1959 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
King Arthur | 795 | 30795 | 04/1926 | BAT 73B 74B 74C 73A 73C 73A 71A 73A 70B 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Hither Green Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Feltham Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 18/06/1954 20/08/1954 10/10/1955 15/06/1956 14/06/1959 05/10/1960 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
King Arthur | 796 | 30796 | 05/1926 | BAT 74C 73A 74C 74B 73C 72B W |
Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Ramsgate Hither Green Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 27/03/1953 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 03/03/1962 |
03/03/1962 |
King Arthur | 797 | 30797 | 08/1926 | BAT BAT 74A 73C 73C 73B 73A 74C 74A 74C W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Ashford Hither Green Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Ashford Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 25/02/1950 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 27/03/1953 20/07/1953 08/1959 |
08/1959 |
King Arthur | 798 | 30798 | 06/1926 | BA 73A 74C 74C 72B W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Dover Marine Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 20/07/1953 14/06/1959 16/06/1962 |
16/06/1962 |
King Arthur | 799 | 30799 | 07/1926 | BA 72B W |
Bricklayers Arms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 25/02/1961 |
25/02/1961 |
King Arthur | 800 | 30800 | 09/1926 | HIT 73C 73B 74A 73B 71A W |
Hither Green Hither Green (Re-instd) Bricklayers Arms Ashford Bricklayers Arms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 14/06/1959 08/1961 |
08/1961 |
King Arthur | 801 | 30801 | 10/1926 | AFD 73B W |
Ashford Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 11/04/1959 |
11/04/1959 |
King Arthur | 802 | 30802 | 10/1926 | AFD 73A 71A W |
Ashford Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 14/06/1959 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
King Arthur | 803 | 30803 | 11/1926 | AFD AFD 73A 71A W |
Ashford Ashford Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 06/06/1958 14/06/1959 08/1961 |
08/1961 |
King Arthur | 804 | 30804 | 12/1926 | AFD 74A 74C 71A W |
Ashford Ashford Dover Marine Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1950 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 17/02/1962 |
17/02/1962 |
King Arthur | 805 | 30805 | 01/1927 | AFD AFD DOV HIT 74A 74C 71A W |
Ashford Ashford Dover Marine Hither Green Ashford Dover Marine Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 26/09/1949 04/02/1950 17/06/1950 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
King Arthur | 806 | 30806 | 01/1927 | AFD DOV 73C 71A W |
Ashford Dover Marine Hither Green Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 05/02/1951 14/06/1959 29/04/1961 |
29/04/1961 |