LSWR/SR Urie "N15" Class 4-6-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
King Arthur | 448 | 05/1925 | SIR TRISTRAM | 05/1925 | 27/08/1960 | 27/08/1960 | |
King Arthur | 449 | 06/1925 | SIR TORRE | 06/1925 | 31/12/1959 | 19/12/1959 | |
King Arthur | 450 | 06/1925 | SIR KAY | 06/1925 | 30/09/1960 | 03/09/1960 | |
King Arthur | 451 | 06/1925 | SIR LAMORAK | 06/1925 | 30/06/1962 | 16/06/1962 | |
King Arthur | 452 | 07/1925 | SIR MELIAGRANCE | 07/1925 | 31/08/1959 | 22/08/1959 | |
King Arthur | 453 | 02/1925 | KING ARTHUR | 02/1925 | 31/07/1960 | 08/07/1961 | |
King Arthur | 454 | 03/1925 | QUEEN GUINEVERE | 03/1925 | 31/03/1959 | 18/10/1958 | |
King Arthur | 455 | 03/1925 | SIR LAUNCELOT | 03/1925 | 30/04/1959 | 18/04/1959 | |
King Arthur | 456 | 04/1925 | SIR GALAHAD | 04/1925 | 31/05/1960 | 14/05/1960 | |
King Arthur | 457 | 04/1925 | SIR BEDIVERE | 04/1925 | 31/05/1961 | 20/05/1961 | |
King Arthur | 736 | 09/1918 | EXCALIBUR | 09/1918 | 10/1956 | ||
King Arthur | 737 | 10/1918 | KING UTHER | 10/1918 | 08/1956 | ||
King Arthur | 738 | 12/1919 | KING PELLINORE | 12/1919 | 08/03/1958 | ||
King Arthur | 739 | 02/1919 | KING LEODEGRANCE | 02/1919 | 04/05/1957 | ||
King Arthur | 740 | 04/1919 | MERLIN | 04/1919 | 10/12/1955 | ||
King Arthur | 741 | 05/1919 | JOYOUS GARD | 05/1919 | 04/02/1956 | ||
King Arthur | 742 | 06/1919 | CAMELOT | 06/1919 | 09/02/1957 | ||
King Arthur | 743 | 08/1919 | LYONNESSE | 08/1919 | 15/10/1955 | ||
King Arthur | 744 | 09/1919 | MAID OF ASTOLAT | 09/1919 | 07/01/1956 | ||
King Arthur | 745 | 11/1919 | TINTAGEL | 11/1919 | 11/02/1956 | ||
King Arthur | 746 | 06/1922 | PENDRAGON | 06/1922 | 11/1955 | ||
King Arthur | 747 | 07/1922 | ELAINE | 07/1922 | 31/10/1956 | 10/1956 | |
King Arthur | 748 | 08/1922 | VIVIEN | 08/1922 | 30/06/1957 | 07/09/1957 | |
King Arthur | 749 | 09/1922 | ISEULT | 09/1922 | 22/06/1957 | ||
King Arthur | 750 | 10/1922 | MORGAN LE FAY | 10/1922 | 06/07/1957 | ||
King Arthur | 751 | 11/1922 | ETARRE | 11/1922 | 15/06/1957 | ||
King Arthur | 752 | 12/1922 | LINETTE | 12/1922 | 17/12/1955 | ||
King Arthur | 753 | 01/1923 | MELISANDE | 01/1923 | 16/03/1957 | ||
King Arthur | 754 | 02/1923 | THE GREEN KNIGHT | 02/1923 | 02/1953 | ||
King Arthur | 755 | 03/1923 | THE RED KNIGHT | 03/1923 | 31/05/1957 | 11/05/1957 | |
King Arthur | 763 | 05/1925 | SIR BORS DE GANIS | 05/1925 | 09/1960 | ||
King Arthur | 764 | 05/1925 | SIR GAWAIN | 05/1925 | 31/07/1961 | 22/07/1961 | |
King Arthur | 765 | 05/1925 | SIR GARETH | 05/1925 | 29/09/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 766 | 05/1925 | SIR GERAINT | 05/1925 | 27/12/1958 | ||
King Arthur | 767 | 06/1925 | SIR VALENCE | 06/1925 | 27/06/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 768 | 06/1925 | SIR BALIN | 06/1925 | 31/10/1961 | 10/1961 | |
King Arthur | 769 | 06/1925 | SIR BALAN | 06/1925 | 27/02/1960 | ||
King Arthur | 770 | 06/1925 | SIR PRIANIUS | 06/1925 | 24/11/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 771 | 06/1925 | SIR SAGRAMORE | 06/1925 | 03/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 772 | 06/1925 | SIR PERCIVALE | 06/1925 | 30/09/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 773 | 06/1925 | SIR LAVAINE | 06/1925 | 28/02/1962 | 10/02/1962 | |
King Arthur | 774 | 06/1925 | SIR GAHERIS | 06/1925 | 09/01/1960 | ||
King Arthur | 775 | 06/1925 | SIR AGRAVAINE | 06/1925 | 27/02/1960 | ||
King Arthur | 776 | 06/1925 | SIR GALAGARS | 06/1925 | 24/01/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 777 | 06/1925 | SIR LAMIEL | 06/1925 | 31/10/1961 | 21/10/1961 | |
King Arthur | 778 | 06/1925 | SIR PELLEAS | 06/1925 | 23/05/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 779 | 07/1925 | SIR COLGREVANCE | 07/1925 | 11/07/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 780 | 07/1925 | SIR PERSANT | 07/1925 | 11/07/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 781 | 07/1925 | SIR AGLOVALE | 07/1925 | 12/05/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 782 | 07/1925 | SIR BRIAN | 07/1925 | 15/09/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 783 | 08/1925 | SIR GILLEMERE | 08/1925 | 02/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 784 | 08/1925 | SIR NEROVENS | 08/1925 | 17/10/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 785 | 08/1925 | SIR MADOR DE LA PORTE | 08/1925 | 17/10/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 786 | 08/1925 | SIR LIONEL | 08/1925 | 29/08/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 787 | 09/1925 | SIR MENADEUKE | 09/1925 | 28/02/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 788 | 09/1925 | SIR URRE OF THE MOUNT | 09/1925 | 28/02/1962 | 10/02/1962 | |
King Arthur | 789 | 09/1925 | SIR GUY | 09/1925 | 26/12/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 790 | 09/1925 | SIR VILLIARS | 09/1925 | 31/10/1961 | 10/1961 | |
King Arthur | 791 | 09/1925 | SIR UWAINE | 09/1925 | 21/05/1960 | ||
King Arthur | 792 | 10/1925 | SIR HERVIS DE REVEL | 10/1925 | 14/02/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 793 | 03/1926 | SIR ONTZLAKE | 03/1926 | 08/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 794 | 03/1926 | SIR ECTOR DE MARIS | 03/1926 | 20/08/1960 | ||
King Arthur | 795 | 04/1926 | SIR DINADAN | 04/1926 | 04/08/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 796 | 05/1926 | SIR DODINAS LE SAVAGE | 05/1926 | 28/02/1962 | 03/03/1962 | |
King Arthur | 797 | 08/1926 | SIR BLAMOR DE GANIS | 08/1926 | 08/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 798 | 06/1926 | SIR HECTIMERE | 06/1926 | 16/06/1962 | ||
King Arthur | 799 | 07/1926 | SIR IRONSIDE | 07/1926 | 25/02/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 800 | 09/1926 | SIR MELEAUS DE LILE | 09/1926 | 08/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 801 | 10/1926 | SIR MELIOT DE LOGRES | 10/1926 | 11/04/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 802 | 10/1926 | SIR DURNORE | 10/1926 | 08/07/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 803 | 11/1926 | SIR HARRY LE FISE LAKE | 11/1926 | 08/1961 | ||
King Arthur | 804 | 12/1926 | SIR CADOR OF CORNWALL | 12/1926 | 28/02/1962 | 17/02/1962 | |
King Arthur | 805 | 01/1927 | SIR CONSTANTINE | 01/1927 | 28/11/1959 | ||
King Arthur | 806 | 01/1927 | SIR GALLERON | 01/1927 | 29/04/1961 |