LSWR/SR Urie "S15" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/1927 | To Service | 823 | NEW | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
03/1927 | To Service | 824 | NEW | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
04/1927 | To Service | 825 | NEW | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
05/1927 | To Service | 826 | NEW | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
06/1927 | To Service | 827 | NEW | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
07/1927 | To Service | 828 | NEW | SAL | Salisbury | ||
07/1927 | To Service | 829 | NEW | SAL | Salisbury | ||
08/1927 | To Service | 830 | NEW | SAL | Salisbury | ||
09/1927 | To Service | 831 | NEW | SAL | Salisbury | ||
10/1927 | To Service | 832 | NEW | SAL | Salisbury | ||
11/1927 | To Service | 833 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
11/1927 | To Service | 834 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
12/1927 | To Service | 835 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
12/1927 | To Service | 836 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
01/1928 | To Service | 837 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
05/1936 | To Service | 838 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
05/1936 | To Service | 839 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
07/1936 | To Service | 841 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
08/1936 | To Service | 840 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
08/1936 | To Service | 842 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
09/1936 | To Service | 843 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
10/1936 | Reallocation | 833 | BTN | Brighton | |||
10/1936 | To Service | 844 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
10/1936 | To Service | 845 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
11/1936 | Reallocation | 834 | BTN | Brighton | |||
11/1936 | To Service | 846 | NEW | FEL | Feltham | ||
12/1936 | Reallocation | 835 | BTN | Brighton | |||
12/1936 | To Service | 847 | NEW | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
05/1937 | Reallocation | 837 | BTN | Brighton | |||
07/1937 | Reallocation | 836 | BTN | Brighton | |||
10/1939 | Reallocation | 838 | FEL | Feltham | |||
10/1939 | Reallocation | 839 | FEL | Feltham | |||
10/1939 | Reallocation | 840 | FEL | Feltham | |||
10/1939 | Reallocation | 841 | FEL | Feltham | |||
10/1939 | Reallocation | 842 | FEL | Feltham | |||
03/1940 | Reallocation | 833 | BTN | Brighton | NX | New Cross Gate | |
03/1940 | Reallocation | 834 | BTN | Brighton | NX | New Cross Gate | |
03/1940 | Reallocation | 835 | BTN | Brighton | NX | New Cross Gate | |
03/1940 | Reallocation | 836 | BTN | Brighton | NX | New Cross Gate | |
03/1940 | Reallocation | 837 | BTN | Brighton | NX | New Cross Gate | |
03/1943 | Reallocation | 833 | NX | New Cross Gate | FEL | Feltham | |
03/1943 | Reallocation | 834 | NX | New Cross Gate | FEL | Feltham | |
03/1943 | Reallocation | 835 | NX | New Cross Gate | FEL | Feltham | |
03/1943 | Reallocation | 836 | NX | New Cross Gate | FEL | Feltham | |
03/1943 | Reallocation | 837 | NX | New Cross Gate | FEL | Feltham | |
11/1946 | Reallocation | 844 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
11/1946 | Reallocation | 845 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
11/1946 | Reallocation | 846 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/1948 | Reallocation | 843 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 496 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 497 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 498 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 499 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 500 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 501 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 502 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 503 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 504 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 505 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 506 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 507 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 508 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 509 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 510 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 511 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 512 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 513 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 514 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 515 | FEL | Feltham | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 843 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |
05/1948 | Reallocation | 841 | FEL | Feltham | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |
05/1948 | Reallocation | 842 | FEL | Feltham | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 496 | FEL | Feltham | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 497 | FEL | Feltham | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 498 | FEL | Feltham | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 841 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 842 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30496 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30497 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 498 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30827 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
28/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30827 | SAL | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 30826 | 72B | Salisbury | |||
09/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30826 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 30823 | 72B | Salisbury | |||
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 30824 | 72B | Salisbury | |||
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 30825 | 72B | Salisbury | |||
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 30846 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 72B | Salisbury | |
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 30847 | 72B | Salisbury | |||
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 30835 | FEL | Feltham | 75B | Redhill | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 30836 | FEL | Feltham | 75B | Redhill | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 30837 | FEL | Feltham | 75B | Redhill | |
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 30846 | 72B | Salisbury | 72A | Exmouth Junction | |
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 30847 | 72B | Salisbury | 75B | Redhill | |
06/07/1961 | Reallocation | 30837 | 75B | Redhill | 70B | Feltham | |
17/11/1962 | Condemned | 30504 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
17/11/1962 | Condemned | 30505 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 30826 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Condemned | 30502 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
26/01/1963 | Condemned | 30846 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
31/03/1963 | Condemned | 30513 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 30496 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 30501 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
23/06/1963 | Condemned | 30503 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
23/06/1963 | Condemned | 30510 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30835 | 75B | Redhill | 70B | Feltham | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30836 | 75B | Redhill | 70B | Feltham | |
24/06/1963 | Reallocation | 30847 | 75B | Redhill | 70B | Feltham | |
30/06/1963 | Condemned | 30500 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 30497 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 30509 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 30511 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 30514 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
14/07/1963 | Condemned | 30515 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
27/07/1963 | Condemned | 30845 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
08/1963 | Condemned | 30498 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 30841 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 30842 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 30843 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 30844 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
10/11/1963 | Condemned | 30831 | COND | ||||
24/11/1963 | Condemned | 30829 | COND | ||||
12/1963 | Condemned | 30508 | 98W | COND | |||
15/12/1963 | Condemned | 30507 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30499 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30506 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30825 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30827 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30828 | COND | ||||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30832 | COND | ||||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30841 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 30847 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 30823 | 72B | Salisbury | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 30824 | 72B | Salisbury | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 30830 | 70B | Feltham | |||
29/03/1964 | Condemned | 30512 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 30844 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
26/07/1964 | Condemned | 30830 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
08/1964 | Condemned | 30836 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
13/09/1964 | Condemned | 30840 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
20/09/1964 | Condemned | 30843 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
01/11/1964 | Condemned | 30834 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
22/11/1964 | Condemned | 30835 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
29/11/1964 | Condemned | 30823 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30824 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30824 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30833 | FEL | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30833 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30837 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30837 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30838 | FEL | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30838 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30839 | FEL | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30839 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30842 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
18/01/1965 | Reallocation | 30842 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
23/05/1965 | Condemned | 30833 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
05/07/1965 | Reallocation | 30824 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
05/07/1965 | Reallocation | 30842 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
05/09/1965 | Condemned | 30824 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
05/09/1965 | Condemned | 30842 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
19/09/1965 | Condemned | 30837 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
19/09/1965 | Condemned | 30838 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
19/09/1965 | Condemned | 30839 | 70B | Feltham | COND |