Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Bulleid "West Country/Battle of Britain" Class 4-6-2


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C101     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C102     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 34003     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C104     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C105     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C106     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C107     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C108     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C109     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C110     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C111     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C112     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C113     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C114     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C115     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C116     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C117     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C118     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C119     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C120     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C121     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C122     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C123     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C124     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C125     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C126     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C127     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C128     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C129     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C130     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C131     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C132     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C133     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C134     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C135     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C136     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C137     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C138     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C139     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C140     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C141     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C142     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C143     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C144     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C145     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C146     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C147     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C148     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C149     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C150     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C151     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C152     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C153     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C154     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C155     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C156     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C157     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C158     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C159     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C160     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 34061     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 34062     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C163     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C164     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C165     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C166     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 34067     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C168     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C169     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C170     RAM Ramsgate  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 34056 DOV Dover Marine BAT Stewarts Lane  
10/1949 To Service 34093   NEW BM Bournemouth  
10/1949 To Service 34094   NEW BM Bournemouth  
10/1949 To Service 34095   NEW RAM Ramsgate  
11/1949 To Service 34096   NEW RAM Ramsgate  
11/1949 To Service 34097   NEW RAM Ramsgate  
12/1949 To Service 34098   NEW RAM Ramsgate  
12/1949 To Service 34099   NEW RAM Ramsgate  
12/1949 To Service 34100   NEW RAM Ramsgate  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 34003 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 34033 BAT Stewarts Lane 73A Stewarts Lane  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 34035 BAT Stewarts Lane 72B Salisbury  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 34003 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 34032 RAM Ramsgate 72B Salisbury  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 34034 BAT Stewarts Lane 73A Stewarts Lane  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 34035 72B Salisbury 73A Stewarts Lane  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 34074     74C Dover Marine  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 34075     74C Dover Marine  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 34034 73A Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 34035 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 34074 74C Dover Marine 73A Stewarts Lane  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 34075 74C Dover Marine 73A Stewarts Lane  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 34012 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 34021 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 34031 RAM Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 34034 72A Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 34035 75A Brighton 72D Plymouth Friary  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 34036 BAT Stewarts Lane 72D Plymouth Friary  
01/1951 To Service 34110   NEW 71B Bournemouth  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 34012 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 34015 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 34028 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 34048 SAL Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 34074 73A Stewarts Lane 74C Dover Marine  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 34075 73A Stewarts Lane 74C Dover Marine  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 34012 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 34015 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 34028 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 34032 72B Salisbury 72D Plymouth Friary  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34005 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34006 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34007 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34008 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34009 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34010 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34011 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34012 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34018 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34019 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34020 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34049 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34050 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34051 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34052 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34053 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34054 BAT Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34055 BAT Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34056 BAT Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34057 DOV Dover Marine 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34058 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 34059 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34013 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34015 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34022 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34023 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34028 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34031 70A Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34032 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34033 73A Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34037 BAT Stewarts Lane 72D Plymouth Friary  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34038 BAT Stewarts Lane 72D Plymouth Friary  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34040 BAT Stewarts Lane 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34041 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34042 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34043 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34044 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34045 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34046 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34047 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34048 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34049 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34060 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34076     74B Ramsgate  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34083     74B Ramsgate  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34084     74B Ramsgate  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34085     74B Ramsgate  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34087     73A Stewarts Lane  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34088     73A Stewarts Lane  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34089     73A Stewarts Lane  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34090     73A Stewarts Lane  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 34100 RAM Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 34039 BAT Stewarts Lane 30A Stratford  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 34057 72A Exmouth Junction 30A Stratford  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 34065 RAM Ramsgate 30A Stratford  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34040 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34041 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34042 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71B Bournemouth  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34045 72B Salisbury 75A Brighton  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34046 72B Salisbury 75A Brighton  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34047 72B Salisbury 75A Brighton  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34048 72B Salisbury 75A Brighton  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34050 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34051 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34052 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34053 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34061 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34062 RAM Ramsgate 72A Exmouth Junction  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 34100 73A Stewarts Lane 74B Ramsgate  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 34031 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 34033 72A Exmouth Junction 72D Plymouth Friary  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 34089 73A Stewarts Lane 30A Stratford  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 34034 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 34057 30A Stratford 91S To Southern Region  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 34065 30A Stratford 91S To Southern Region  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34039 30A Stratford 75A Brighton  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34040 71B Bournemouth 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34043 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71B Bournemouth  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34054 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34055 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34057 91S To Southern Region 72A Exmouth Junction  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34065 91S To Southern Region 70A Nine Elms  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34075 74C Dover Marine 74B Ramsgate  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34076 74B Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 34089 30A Stratford 73A Stewarts Lane  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 34099 RAM Ramsgate 72B Salisbury  
08/01/1953 Reallocation 34099 72B Salisbury 74B Ramsgate  
19/03/1954 Reallocation 34017 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73A Stewarts Lane  
19/03/1954 Reallocation 34069 RAM Ramsgate 72A Exmouth Junction  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 34065 70A Nine Elms 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 34040 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71A Eastleigh  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 34041 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 34042 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 34056 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 34057 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
11/12/1954 Reallocation 34056 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/12/1954 Reallocation 34057 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 34065 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 34070 RAM Ramsgate 74C Dover Marine  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 34071     74C Dover Marine  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 34059 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
27/01/1956 Reallocation 34095 BM Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 34040 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 34041 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 34042 71A Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 34103     74C Dover Marine  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 34104     74C Dover Marine  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 34005 70A Nine Elms 73A Stewarts Lane  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 34090 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34001 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34003 72A Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34013 72A Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34017 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34025 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34027 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34075 74B Ramsgate 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34076 74B Ramsgate 72A Exmouth Junction  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34081     72A Exmouth Junction  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 34086     72A Exmouth Junction  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34005 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34021 72A Exmouth Junction 74B Ramsgate  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34022 72A Exmouth Junction 74B Ramsgate  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34035 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34036 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34037 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34038 72D Plymouth Friary 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34077     73A Stewarts Lane  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 34082     73A Stewarts Lane  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34004 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34012 70A Nine Elms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34014 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34016 EXJ Exmouth Junction 74B Ramsgate  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34017 73B Bricklayers Arms 74B Ramsgate  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34025 73B Bricklayers Arms 74B Ramsgate  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34026 EXJ Exmouth Junction 74B Ramsgate  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34027 73B Bricklayers Arms 74B Ramsgate  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34037 72A Exmouth Junction 74B Ramsgate  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34072     72A Exmouth Junction  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34074 74C Dover Marine 72A Exmouth Junction  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34079     72A Exmouth Junction  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34083 74B Ramsgate 74C Dover Marine  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34084 74B Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34085 74B Ramsgate 74C Dover Marine  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34086 72A Exmouth Junction 74C Dover Marine  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34094 BM Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34097 RAM Ramsgate 71B Bournemouth  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34098 RAM Ramsgate 71B Bournemouth  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34099 74B Ramsgate 71B Bournemouth  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34100 74B Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34102     71B Bournemouth  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34104 74C Dover Marine 72A Exmouth Junction  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34106     72A Exmouth Junction  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34108     72A Exmouth Junction  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 34109     72A Exmouth Junction  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 34082 73A Stewarts Lane 74C Dover Marine  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 34084 73A Stewarts Lane 74C Dover Marine  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 34085 74C Dover Marine 73A Stewarts Lane  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 34086 74C Dover Marine 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 34093 BM Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 34008 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 34019 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 34045 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 34047 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34011 70A Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34028 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34029 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34031 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34039 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34045 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34046 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34048 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34063 RAM Ramsgate 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34097 71B Bournemouth 75A Brighton  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34098 71B Bournemouth 75A Brighton  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34099 71B Bournemouth 75A Brighton  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 34110 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34016 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34017 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34021 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34022 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34025 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34026 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34027 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34029 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34037 74B Ramsgate 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34047 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34064 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34065 70A Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34078     73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 34107     72A Exmouth Junction  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 34048 71B Bournemouth 72B Salisbury  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 34053 72B Salisbury 71B Bournemouth  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 34055 72B Salisbury 75A Brighton  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 34099 75A Brighton 72B Salisbury  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34026 73B Bricklayers Arms 72B Salisbury  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34038 72A Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34050 72B Salisbury 73B Bricklayers Arms  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34057 72A Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34061 72A Exmouth Junction 73H Dover Marine  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34084 74C Dover Marine 72A Exmouth Junction  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34097 75A Brighton 72A Exmouth Junction  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 34098 75A Brighton 72A Exmouth Junction  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 34017 73B Bricklayers Arms 70A Nine Elms  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 34071 74C Dover Marine 70A Nine Elms  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 34085 73A Stewarts Lane 71B Bournemouth  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 34103 74C Dover Marine 71B Bournemouth  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34001 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34003 73B Bricklayers Arms 72B Salisbury  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34004 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34005 73B Bricklayers Arms 72B Salisbury  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34021 73B Bricklayers Arms 71B Bournemouth  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34037 73B Bricklayers Arms 71B Bournemouth  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34066 RAM Ramsgate 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 34078 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34001 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34004 73A Stewarts Lane 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34016 73B Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34022 73B Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34025 73B Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34027 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34061 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34067 RAM Ramsgate 72B Salisbury  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34068 RAM Ramsgate 72B Salisbury  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34070 74C Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34073     70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34077 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34082 74C Dover Marine 70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34083 74C Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34086 73A Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34087 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34088 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34091     72B Salisbury  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34092     72B Salisbury  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 34101     73B Bricklayers Arms  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 34109 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34034 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34038 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34050 73B Bricklayers Arms 70A Nine Elms  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34061 73F Ashford 71A Eastleigh  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34070 73F Ashford 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34083 73F Ashford 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 34104 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 34020 70A Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 34064 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 34097 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 34098 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 34012 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 34013 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 34014 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 34101 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 34008 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 34021 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 34028 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 34037 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 34039 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
27/05/1963 Reallocation 34063 72A Exmouth Junction 75A Brighton  
27/05/1963 Reallocation 34084 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
06/1963 Condemned 34035 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
06/1963 Condemned 34043 71B Bournemouth   COND  
06/1963 Condemned 34074 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
24/06/1963 Reallocation 34088 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
24/06/1963 Reallocation 34101 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 34088 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
09/1963 Condemned 34055 75A Brighton   COND  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34012 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34013 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34014 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34019 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34027 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34057 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34063 75A Brighton 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34089 73A Stewarts Lane 70E Salisbury  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 34100 73A Stewarts Lane 70E Salisbury  
11/1963 Condemned 34011 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 34067 72B Salisbury   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 34069 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 34110 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 34054 72B Salisbury 83D Exmouth Junction  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 34061 71A Eastleigh 83D Exmouth Junction  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 34084 71B Bournemouth 83D Exmouth Junction  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34024 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70F Bournemouth  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34032 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Salisbury  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34036 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Salisbury  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34056 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Salisbury  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34058 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34060 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
11/11/1963 Reallocation 34108 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Salisbury  
12/1963 Condemned 34049 72B Salisbury   COND  
12/1963 Condemned 34068 72B Salisbury   COND  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 34017 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 34018 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 34064 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 34073 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
04/1964 Condemned 34065 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
04/1964 Condemned 34075 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
05/1964 Condemned 34028 71A Eastleigh   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 34016 71A Eastleigh   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 34045 71B Bournemouth   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 34073 70D Eastleigh   COND  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 34061 83D Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 34072 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 34081 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
08/1964 Condemned 34027 70E Salisbury   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 34061 70D Eastleigh   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 34062 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 34070 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 34081 70D Eastleigh   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 34083 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 34094 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34020 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34029 71B Bournemouth   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34030 RAM Ramsgate   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34054 83D Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34078 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34080       COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34091 72B Salisbury   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34096 RAM Ramsgate   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34106 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34107 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 34109 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34001 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34002 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34006 70A Nine Elms 70E Salisbury  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34007 70A Nine Elms 70E Salisbury  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34009 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34010 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34015 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Salisbury  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34019 70E Salisbury 70B Feltham  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34023 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34031 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34033 72D Plymouth Friary 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34036 70E Salisbury 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34041 71B Bournemouth 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34042 71B Bournemouth 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34050 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34060 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34066 72A Exmouth Junction 70E Salisbury  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34071 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34076 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34077 70A Nine Elms 70B Feltham  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34079 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34082 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34084 83D Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34086 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34087 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34088 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34090 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34093 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34095 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34101 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34102 71B Bournemouth 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34103 71B Bournemouth 70D Eastleigh  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 34105     70D Eastleigh  
20/09/1964 Condemned 34003 72B Salisbury   COND  
10/1964 Condemned 34058 70D Eastleigh   COND  
10/1964 Condemned 34072 70D Eastleigh   COND  
10/1964 Condemned 34105 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/1964 Condemned 34092 72B Salisbury   COND  
11/1964 Condemned 34099 72B Salisbury   COND  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 34019 70B Feltham 70D Eastleigh  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 34077 70B Feltham 70D Eastleigh  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 34001 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 34002 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 34021 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 34038 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
02/1965 Condemned 34031 70D Eastleigh   COND  
03/1965 Condemned 34010 70D Eastleigh   COND  
03/1965 Condemned 34014 70E Salisbury   COND  
04/1965 Condemned 34022 71A Eastleigh   COND  
05/1965 Condemned 34039 71A Eastleigh   COND  
08/1965 Condemned 34050 70D Eastleigh   COND  
08/1965 Condemned 34063 70E Salisbury   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 34085 71B Bournemouth   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 34103 70D Eastleigh   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 34007 70E Salisbury   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 34042 70D Eastleigh   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 34046 71B Bournemouth   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 34051 72B Salisbury   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 34053 71B Bournemouth   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 34084 70D Eastleigh   COND  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 34004 71A Eastleigh 70F Bournemouth  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 34005 72B Salisbury 70F Bournemouth  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 34012 70E Salisbury 70F Bournemouth  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 34025 71A Eastleigh 70F Bournemouth  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 34064 70D Eastleigh 70E Salisbury  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 34076 70D Eastleigh 70E Salisbury  
12/1965 Condemned 34033 70D Eastleigh   COND  
01/1966 Condemned 34041 70D Eastleigh   COND  
01/1966 Condemned 34076 70E Salisbury   COND  
02/1966 Condemned 34079 70D Eastleigh   COND  
03/1966 Condemned 34048 72B Salisbury   COND  
04/1966 Condemned 34082 70D Eastleigh   COND  
04/1966 Condemned 34097 71A Eastleigh   COND  
05/1966 Condemned 34059 72B Salisbury   COND  
05/1966 Condemned 34064 70E Salisbury   COND  
06/1966 Condemned 34038 70A Nine Elms   COND  
06/1966 Condemned 34086 70D Eastleigh   COND  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34008 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34009 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34017 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34018 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34019 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34034 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34036 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
27/06/1966 Reallocation 34037 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
07/1966 Condemned 34101 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 34026 72B Salisbury   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 34066 70E Salisbury   COND  
10/1966 Condemned 34005 70F Bournemouth   COND  
10/1966 Condemned 34009 70A Nine Elms   COND  
10/1966 Condemned 34017 70A Nine Elms   COND  
10/1966 Condemned 34032 70E Salisbury   COND  
12/1966 Condemned 34012 70F Bournemouth   COND  
03/1967 Condemned 34006 70E Salisbury   COND  
03/1967 Condemned 34019 70A Nine Elms   COND  
03/1967 Condemned 34077 70D Eastleigh   COND  
03/1967 Condemned 34088 70D Eastleigh   COND  
04/1967 Condemned 34002 70A Nine Elms   COND  
04/1967 Condemned 34015 70E Salisbury   COND  
04/1967 Condemned 34071 70D Eastleigh   COND  
05/1967 Condemned 34044 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
05/1967 Condemned 34056 70E Salisbury   COND  
05/1967 Condemned 34057 70E Salisbury   COND  
15/05/1967 Reallocation 34023 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
15/05/1967 Reallocation 34037 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
06/1967 Condemned 34008 70A Nine Elms   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 34047 71B Bournemouth   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 34060 70D Eastleigh   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 34098 71A Eastleigh   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 34104 71A Eastleigh   COND  
06/1967 Condemned 34108 70E Salisbury   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34001 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34004 70F Bournemouth   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34013 70E Salisbury   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34018 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34021 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34023 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34024 70F Bournemouth   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34025 70F Bournemouth   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34034 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34036 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34037 70D Eastleigh   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34040 71B Bournemouth   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34052 72B Salisbury   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34087 70D Eastleigh   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34089 70E Salisbury   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34090 70D Eastleigh   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34093 70D Eastleigh   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34095 70D Eastleigh   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34100 70E Salisbury   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 34102 70D Eastleigh   COND